Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC et al v. New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO
Plaintiff: Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., VCL Forever Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Ann Street Hotel LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, NY 29 West LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Realty Corp., LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, Van Dam Hospitality LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, KCL Realty LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., AINAHS Holdings Corp., JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, Soho 54 LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC and A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC
Defendant: New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO and Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv01578
Filed: March 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL... It is hereby stipulated by undersigned counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants respectively, that this action, having been resolved to the satisfaction of each party, should be dismissed as to every count and claim with prejudice, each party bearing its own costs and fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/15/19) (yv)
May 9, 2019 Filing 156 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Saltzman, Barry)
April 17, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Status Conference held on 4/17/2019. REMARK: Robert Hawkins appeared. Barry Saltzman appeared. The parties provided an update. The response due date to the Contempt Motion is extended to April 29, 2019. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Michael McDaniel) (dgo)
April 16, 2019 CALENDAR ENTRY **REMINDER**: Status Conference scheduled to go forward on: Wednesday, April 16, 2019 @ 11:30 AM, 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom 14-C before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. ----- A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY ----- (By David Gonzalez - Courtroom Deputy).(dgo)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #146 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Attorney Mark Andrew Konkel terminated.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/9/19) (yv)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #147 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Attorney Damon William Suden terminated.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/9/19) (yv)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #152 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery until May 15, 2019 addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Robert S. Hawkins dated April 2, 2019. Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, et al. The requested extension to completed discovery is granted. So ordered. (Discovery due by 5/15/2019). (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/5/2019) (rjm)
April 2, 2019 Filing 152 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery until May 15, 2019 addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Robert S. Hawkins dated April 2, 2019. Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC.(Hawkins, Robert)
March 22, 2019 Filing 151 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/5/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 22, 2019 Filing 150 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/5/2019 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 22, 2019 Filing 149 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE CORRECTED proceeding held on 2/5/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 22, 2019 Filing 148 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CORRECTED CONFERENCE held on 2/5/2019 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 1, 2019 Filing 147 MOTION for Damon Suden to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC.(Suden, Damon)
March 1, 2019 Filing 146 MOTION for Mark Konkel to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC.(Konkel, Mark)
February 8, 2019 Filing 145 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Robert S. Hawkins and Barry Neal Saltzman dated February 8, 2019 re: timeframe to complete written discovery. Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC.(Hawkins, Robert)
February 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Pre-Motion Conference held on 2/5/2019. REMARK: Mark Konkel, Damon Suden, and Robert Hawkins appeared for the plaintiffs. Barry Saltzman, Andrew Midgen, and Rich Morroco appeared for the defendants. The motion schedule in 17cv4444 is: Motion due by March 8, 2019. Response due by April 5, 2019. Reply due by April 15, 2019. The parties are directed to propose a CCMP in 15cv1578. A conference is set for April 15, 2019 at 4:30 PM. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Carol Ganley) (dgo)
February 4, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Samuel Hawkins on behalf of A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC. (Hawkins, Robert)
February 4, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John S. Ho on behalf of A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC. (Ho, John)
January 18, 2019 Filing 142 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Barry N. Saltzman dated January 18, 2019 re: Joint letter regarding outstanding discovery disputes. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO.(Saltzman, Barry)
December 3, 2018 Filing 141 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 11/19/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 3, 2018 Filing 140 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 11/19/2018 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Fellis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/24/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/3/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 19, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Status Conference held on 11/19/2018. REMARK: Damon Suden appeared for the plaintiffs. Barry Saltzman and Andrew Midgen appeared for the defendants. In house counsel for defendants, Rich Maroko, was present. The Court set a conference in 17cv4444 for December 13, 2018 at 5 PM. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Lisa Picciano) (dgo)
November 16, 2018 CALENDAR ENTRY **REMINDER**: Status Conference scheduled to go forward on: Monday, November 19, 2018 @ 12:00 PM, 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom *15-C* before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. If the parties deem the conference unnecessary at this time, either party can e-mail three (3) mutually convenient dates to the Courtroom Deputy at David_C_Gonzalez@nysd.uscourts.gov ----- A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY ----- (By David Gonzalez - Courtroom Deputy).(dgo)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting #138 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Status Conference set for 11/19/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo)
October 16, 2018 Filing 138 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Damon W. Suden dated 10/16/2018. Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC.(Suden, Damon)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #136 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. All parties consent do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before aMagistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is not to be tried to a jury. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than 1/31/19. Depositions to be completed by 1/31/2019. All expert discovery shall be completed no later than 3/15/2019. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is: four (4) days. The next pretrial conference is scheduled fir 10/18/2018 at 11:45 a.m. in Courtroom 14C. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/26/2018) (rro)
July 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: (Deposition due by 1/31/2019., Expert Discovery due by 3/15/2019., Fact Discovery due by 1/31/2019.), Set/Reset Hearings:(Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2018 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty.) (rro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 136 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and requesting that the Court enter a revised Case Management Order extending discovery addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Damon W. Suden dated 7/25/2018. Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Revised Case Management Order)(Suden, Damon)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER. Upon review of defendant Union's discovery requests, Plaintiffs are directed to respond to Defendants' First Requests for the Production of Documents as follows: Produce documents responsive to paragraphs 5, 13, 14, 16, and 18-28. Documents responsive to Request 12 must be produced to the extent that any of the 40 entities use the same insurer/provider for health and welfare benefits, workers' compensation and unemployment insurance. Plaintiffs' tax returns do not have to be produced. With respect to Defendants' discovery requests, which do not refer to interactions or transactions with Chelsea Grand and the 40 Lam entities, the Court approves the union's proposal to spot check on Requests 4, 6, 8-11, and 15. These requests will be spread across the 40 Plaintiffs (as opposed to all Plaintiffs); and will be limited to a two year period. The defendant Union is willing to limit individual production for Messrs. Lam, Luk, and Jeff Lam. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/28/18) (yv)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #133 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The May 16, 2018 conference is adjourned pending the resolution of the discovery dispute. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/15/2018) (ne)
May 14, 2018 Filing 133 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference requesting that the status conference scheduled for 5/16/2018 be adjourned sine die or to some later date as convenient to the Court. addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Damon W. Suden dated 5/14/2018. Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC.(Suden, Damon)
May 14, 2018 CALENDAR ENTRY **REMINDER**: Status Conference scheduled to go forward on: Wednesday, May 16, 2018 @ 4:15 PM, 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom 14-C before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. ----- A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY ----- (By David Gonzalez - Courtroom Deputy).(dgo)
May 9, 2018 Filing 132 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Damon W. Suden dated 5/09/2018 re: responding to the Court's Order (ECF 130 and 4/25/18 Minute Entry) to set forth Plaintiff's position on the scope of discovery. Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC.(Suden, Damon)
May 9, 2018 Filing 131 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Barry N. Saltzman dated May 9, 2018 re: Letter requesting Plaintiffs comply with Defendants discovery requests. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO.(Saltzman, Barry)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting #129 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. May 9, 2018 is the new deadline. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/4/18) (yv)
May 2, 2018 Filing 129 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time requesting that the deadline for writing to the Court with any unresolved issues be extended to 5/09/2018 addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Damon W. Suden dated 5/02/2018. Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC.(Suden, Damon)
May 2, 2018 Filing 128 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/25/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 2, 2018 Filing 127 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/25/2018 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 25, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Status Conference held on 4/25/2018. REMARK: Damon Suden and Mark Konkel appeared for the plaintiffs. Barry Saltzman, Andrew Midgen, and Richard Morroco appeared for the defendants. The parties are directed to meet and confer in good faith in regards to the discovery disputes. If no resolution, the parties are to submit a letter by May 4, 2018 stating their positions as to what should be produced and what is discoverable. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Eve Giniger) (dgo)
April 24, 2018 CALENDAR ENTRY **REMINDER**: Status Conference scheduled to go forward on: Wednesday, April 25, 2018 @ 11:30 AM, 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom 14-C before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. ----- A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY ----- (By David Gonzalez - Courtroom Deputy)(dgo)
April 20, 2018 Filing 126 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Damon W. Suden dated April 20, 2018 re: #125 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Barry N. Saltzman dated April 17, 2018 re: requesting the Court's direction in securing discovery compliance by Plaintiffs. Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Suden, Damon)
April 17, 2018 Filing 125 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Barry N. Saltzman dated April 17, 2018 re: requesting the Court's direction in securing discovery compliance by Plaintiffs. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Saltzman, Barry)
April 16, 2018 NOTICE of Conference: A Status Conference is set for Thursday, April 25, 2018 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before the Honorable Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. The conference will take place at the same of the 17cv4444 case. Per letter of April 13, 2018, the Union Defendant may submit a letter by April 17, 2018. Response due by April 20, 2018. A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY ----- (By: David Gonzalez - Courtroom Deputy) -----(dgo)
April 13, 2018 Filing 124 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Barry N. Saltzman dated April 13, 2018 re: conference to resolve remaining discovery disputes. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO.(Saltzman, Barry)
February 28, 2018 Filing 123 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/30/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 28, 2018 Filing 122 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/30/2018 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/21/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 30, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Status Conference held on 1/30/2018. REMARK: Damon Suden appeared for the plaintiffs. Barry Saltzman and Joseph Bonomo appeared for the defendants. The parties report that discovery is ongoing and on schedule. A control date for a conference is set for May 16, 2018 at 4:30 PM. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Steven Greenblum) (dgo)
January 26, 2018 CALENDAR ENTRY **REMINDER**: Pretrial Conference scheduled to go forward on: Tuesday, January 30, 2018 @ 11:00 AM, 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom 14-C before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. ----- A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY ----- (By David Gonzalez - Courtroom Deputy). (dgo)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 12/15/2017) (jwh)
December 15, 2017 Filing 120 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Mark A. Konkel dated 12/15/2017 re: Requesting that the order enclosed as Exhibit A be entered by the court forthwith so that discovery may proceed. Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Konkel, Mark)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #118 Letter, filed by Van Dam Hospitality LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, NY 29 West LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC, AINAHS Holdings Corp., JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, KCL Realty LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Soho 54 LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, Ann Street Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Realty Corp., A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H & C Duffield III LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Paragraph 8e should be modified so that it is bilateral counsel for both sides must advise the other prior to any disclosure to parties. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 12/12/2017) (ap)
December 7, 2017 Filing 118 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Mark A. Konkel dated December 7, 2017 re: Confidentiality Order. Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brooklyn Downtown - Proposed Confidentiality Order, #2 Exhibit B - 11.9.17 Proceeding Transcript)(Konkel, Mark)
December 7, 2017 Filing 117 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Barry N. Saltzman dated December 7, 2017 re: Confidentiality Question. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO.(Saltzman, Barry)
November 21, 2017 Filing 116 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNECE proceeding held on 11/9/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 21, 2017 Filing 115 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 11/9/2017 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 REVISED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is not to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 5/22/2018. Requests to Admit to be served by: 5/30/2018. Fact Discovery due by 6/11/2018. Expert Discovery due by 7/26/2018. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is: four (4) days. Parties to meet to confer on scheduled for expert disclosures no later than: 5/11/2018. All counsel to meet face-to-face to discuss settlement no later than: 6/25/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11/9/17) (yv)
November 9, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 11/9/2017. REMARK: Mark Konkel and Damon Suden appeared on behalf of the plaintiffs. Barry Saltzman and Andrew Midgen appeared on behalf of the defendants. The Court approved the submitted Revised Civil Case Management Plan. In regards to the two (2) issues that plaintiff brought to the attention of the Court, (1) the Court rules that the Confidentiality Order is enough; (2) Mr. Ward cannot be shown the confidential documents, any one else must be approved by plaintiffs.. A pretrial conference is set for January 30, 2017. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Andrew Walker) (dgo)
November 7, 2017 CALENDAR ENTRY **REMINDER**: Pretrial Conference scheduled to go forward on: Thursday, November 9, 2017 @ 10:45 AM, 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom 14-C before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. If the parties deem the conference unnecessary at this time, either party can e-mail three (3) mutually convenient dates to the Courtroom Deputy at David_C_Gonzalez@nysd.uscourts.gov ----- A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY ----- (By David Gonzalez - Courtroom Deputy).(dgo)
August 15, 2017 Filing 113 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 08/01/2017 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Jackson, Jasmine)
August 15, 2017 Filing 112 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 8/1/2017 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2017.(Jackson, Jasmine)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is not to be tried to a jury. Initial disclosure pursuant to Rules 26(a)(1), Fed. R. Civ. P., shall be completed by 8/25/2017. Deposition due by 11/22/2017. Fact Discovery due by 12/11/2017. Initial requests for production of documents to be served by 9/12/17. Interrogatories to be served by 9/12/2017. Requests to Admit to be served by 11/30/2017. Expert Discovery due by 1/25/2018. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is four (4) days. Parties to meet to confer on scheduled for expert disclosures no later than 11/11/2017. All counsel to meet face-to-face to discuss settlement no later than 12/21/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2017 at 10:45 AM before Judge Paul A. Crotty in Courtroom 14C. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 8/15/17) (yv)
August 11, 2017 Filing 110 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Barry N. Saltzman, Esq. dated August 11, 2017 re: With Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO.(Saltzman, Barry)
August 11, 2017 Filing 109 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Damon William Suden on behalf of A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC. (Suden, Damon)
August 11, 2017 Filing 108 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Andrew Konkel on behalf of A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC. (Konkel, Mark)
August 1, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Pre-Motion Conference held on 8/1/2017. REMARK: Mark Delaquil and Client Representative Julie Cho appeared via telephone for plaintiffs. Barry Saltzman along with co-counsel Andrew Midgen and Richard Maroko appeared on behalf of New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. Leave to take whatever discovery is appropriate is allowed until December 11, 2017. Plaintiff may make his motion by December 11, 2017. The parties are to submit a Civil Case Management Plan. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Tom Murray) (dgo) Modified on 8/2/2017 (dgo).
July 31, 2017 Filing 107 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Cecelia L. Fanelli dated July 31, 2017 re: August 1 Conference. Document filed by Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc..(Fanelli, Cecelia)
July 28, 2017 Filing 106 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Barry N. Saltzman dated July 28, 2017 re: Opposing leave to move and limited discovery. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO.(Saltzman, Barry)
July 28, 2017 CALENDAR ENTRY **REMINDER**: Pre-motion Conference scheduled to go forward on: Tuesday, August 1, 2017 @ 3:15 PM, 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom 14-C before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. The dial-in number is: 888-363-4749. The access code is: 8539662. ----- A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY ----- (By David Gonzalez - Courtroom Deputy).(dgo)
July 25, 2017 Filing 105 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Mark W. DeLaquil dated 7/25/2017 re: Case Proceedings. Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC.(Delaquil, Mark)
June 23, 2017 Filing 104 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO.(Saltzman, Barry)
June 23, 2017 Filing 103 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO.(Saltzman, Barry)
June 9, 2017 Filing 102 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Mark W. DeLaquil dated June 9, 2017 re: Defendant's Answer and Case Scheduling. Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC.(Delaquil, Mark)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 OPINION & ORDER re: #77 MOTION to Dismiss filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO; #81 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc. Interstate's motion to dismiss all of Plaintiffs' claims against it (Claims IV-VIII) is granted. The Hotel Workers Union's motion to dismiss is granted with respect to Claims IV-VIII, and denied with respect to Claims I-III. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at Docket 77 and 81. SO ORDERED. (Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc. terminated.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/29/2017) (anc)
February 16, 2017 Filing 100 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 2/1/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 16, 2017 Filing 99 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 2/1/2017 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 1, 2017 Filing 98 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew David Midgen on behalf of New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Midgen, Andrew)
February 1, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Oral Argument held on 2/1/2017 re: #77 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO, #81 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc. REMARK: Oral argument heard. Decision by Judge is pending. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Pamela Utter) (dgo)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #95 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vesselina Musick terminated (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul)
January 13, 2017 Filing 96 DECLARATION of Vesselina H. Musick in Support re: #95 MOTION for Vesselina H. Musick to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc.. Document filed by Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc.. (Musick, Vesselina)
January 13, 2017 Filing 95 MOTION for Vesselina H. Musick to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc. Document filed by Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc..(Musick, Vesselina)
December 28, 2016 Calendar Entry *Date Change*: The oral argument scheduled to go forward on Tuesday, January 10, 2017 at 2:15 PM is adjourned to: Wednesday, February 1, 2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before the Honorable Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J (rescheduled -on consent- via e-mail communication by: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy). (mov)
December 20, 2016 NOTICE of Oral Argument (only in 15-cv-1578-PAC): Oral Argument on the pending motions is scheduled to go forward on: Tuesday, January 10, 2017 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before the Honorable Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. If the date is not convenient, either party can e-mail three (3) mutually convenient dates to the Courtroom Deputy at: Marlon_Ovalles@nysd.uscourts.gov ----- A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY ----- (By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy). (mov)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #92 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Danya Ahmed terminated from ECF in case no: 15cv1578-PAC (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul)
October 13, 2016 Filing 93 DECLARATION of Danya Ahmed in Support re: #92 MOTION for Danya Ahmed to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant New York Hotel & Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO.. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Ahmed, Danya)
October 13, 2016 Filing 92 MOTION for Danya Ahmed to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant New York Hotel & Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO.(Ahmed, Danya)
May 6, 2016 Filing 91 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #81 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc.. (Fanelli, Cecelia)
May 6, 2016 Filing 90 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #77 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Saltzman, Barry)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #88 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul)
May 3, 2016 Filing 88 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Barry N. Saltzman dated May 3, 2016. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO.(Saltzman, Barry)
April 6, 2016 Filing 87 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #77 MOTION to Dismiss ., #81 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC. (Rivkin, David)
March 11, 2016 DOCKET ANNOTATION: If not done so, the parties are directed to view the pdf at docket entry # 74 in 15-cv-1578 and docket entry # 34 in 09-cv-924. The consolidated response brief is limited to 50 pages, not 60. A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY (By: Marlon Ovalles, Courtroom Deputy). (mov)
March 10, 2016 Filing 86 DECLARATION of Barry N. Saltzman in Support re: #77 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Saltzman, Barry)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #84 Motion for Daniel A. Small to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul)
March 8, 2016 Filing 84 MOTION for Daniel A. Small to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12043429. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, DC, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, Maryland, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Small, Daniel)
March 8, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #84 MOTION for Daniel A. Small to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12043429. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 7, 2016 Filing 83 DECLARATION of Cecelia L. Fanelli in Support re: #81 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - HMA)(Fanelli, Cecelia)
March 7, 2016 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #81 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc.. (Fanelli, Cecelia)
March 7, 2016 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc..(Fanelli, Cecelia)
March 7, 2016 Filing 80 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner on behalf of New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Dubner, Jeffrey)
March 7, 2016 Filing 79 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MISSING PAGES - (SEE DOCUMENT #86) DECLARATION of Barry N. Saltzman in Support re: #77 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Saltzman, Barry) Modified on 3/10/2016 (lb).
March 7, 2016 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #77 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Saltzman, Barry)
March 7, 2016 Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO.(Saltzman, Barry)
March 4, 2016 Filing 76 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hotel Acquisition Company, LLC for Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc.. Document filed by Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc..(Fanelli, Cecelia)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #72 Motion for Vesselina Musick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #73 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/1/2016) (lmb)
February 29, 2016 Filing 73 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Cecelia L. Fanelli dated February 29, 2016. Document filed by Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc..(Fanelli, Cecelia)
February 29, 2016 Filing 72 MOTION for Vesselina Musick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Musick, Vesselina)
February 29, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #70 MOTION for Vesselina Musick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11988297. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #72 MOTION for Vesselina Musick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Kenneth Ewing to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul)
February 24, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #69 MOTION for Kenneth Ewing to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
February 24, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #70 MOTION for Vesselina Musick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11988297. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
February 23, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #69 MOTION for Kenneth Ewing to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00. Pay.gov receipt number 0208-11988138, paid on 2/23/2016. (wb)
February 23, 2016 Filing 70 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Vesselina Musick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11988297. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Musick, Vesselina) Modified on 2/24/2016 (wb).
February 23, 2016 Filing 69 MOTION for Kenneth Ewing to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ewing, Kenneth)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Mark W. DeLaquil dated 1-7-16 re: Second Amended Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: The Second Amended Complaint is to be filed on the public docket without sealing or redaction. The Clerk of Court is directed to accept the 3rd amended complaint for filing. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1-15-16) (mov)
January 12, 2016 Filing 67 RESPONSE to Letter Response to Motion addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Mark W. DeLaquil dated January 11, 2016. Document filed by Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc.. (Fanelli, Cecelia)
January 11, 2016 Filing 66 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Mark W. DeLaquil dated January 11, 2016 re: #65 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Cecelia L. Fanelli dated January 8, 2016. Concerning complaint in case 09cv924. Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC. (Delaquil, Mark)
January 8, 2016 Filing 65 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Cecelia L. Fanelli dated January 8, 2016. Document filed by Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc..(Fanelli, Cecelia)
December 23, 2015 Filing 64 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a nterim Pretrial Conference proceeding held on 12/21/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca)
December 23, 2015 Filing 63 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: nterim Pretrial Conference held on 12/21/2015 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/16/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/26/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/25/2016.(ca)
December 21, 2015 Filing 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 12/21/2015. REMARK: Amended pleading: 1-7-16. The following motion schedule was set: motions: 3-7-16; responses: 04-06-16; replies 05-06-16. The Court will defer on consolidation. See transcript for complete details of this proceeding. The transcript "order form" is attached to this entry. In the alternative, visit ------ http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/courtrm_tech.php ------- with respect to ordering a transcript of a recorded proceeding via "Courtflow." (mov)
December 18, 2015 Filing 61 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Barry N. Saltzman dated December 18, 2015 re: Pretrial Conference. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO.(Saltzman, Barry)
December 15, 2015 CALENDAR ENTRY **Date Change**: The Pretrial Conference scheduled to go forward December 16, 2015 is adjourned to: Monday, December 21, 2015 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 14-C, 500 Pearl, before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. Reason for adjournment (on consent): plaintiff's counsel not available on 12-16-15 --- A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY --- (reset via e-mail communication by: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy). (mov)
December 14, 2015 Filing 60 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Cecelia L. Fanelli dated December 14, 2015. Document filed by Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc..(Fanelli, Cecelia)
December 14, 2015 NOTICE of Conference: Status Conference set for Wednesday, December 16, 2015 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before the Honorable Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. If the date is not convenient, either party can e-mail three (3) mutually convenient dates to the Courtroom Deputy at: Marlon_Ovalles@nysd.uscourts.gov. If requesting an adjournment, the parties should note that Judge Crotty will be away from 12-23-15 through 1-5-16. His Honor is also not available on Thursday, December 17 and Friday, December 18. A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY ----- (By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy) (mov) Modified on 12/14/2015 (mov).
May 28, 2015 Filing 59 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Initial Pretrial Conference proceeding held on 05/05/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca)
May 28, 2015 Filing 58 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/5/2015 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2015.(ca)
May 5, 2015 Filing 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/5/2015. REMARK: The Court STAYED the case for thirty (30) days following the mandate of the Court of Appeals in Chelsea Grand, LLC v. New York Hotel & Motel. See transcript for complete details of this proceeding. The transcript "order form" is attached to this entry. In the alternative, visit------ http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/courtrm_tech.php -------with respect to ordering a transcript of a recorded proceeding via "Courtflow." (mov)
May 5, 2015 Filing 56 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Barry N. Saltzman dated 5/1/2015 re: Initial Conference. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO.(Saltzman, Barry)
May 1, 2015 Filing 55 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #56 Letter) - LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Barry N. Saltzman dated May 1, 2015 re: Initial Conference. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO.(Saltzman, Barry) Modified on 5/12/2015 (db).
April 3, 2015 CALENDAR ENTRY *Date Change*: Pretrial Conference scheduled to go forward on: Tuesday, May 5, 2015 @ 02:30 PM (*NOT Thursday, April 9, 2015*), 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom 14-C before Judge Crotty. A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY --- (reset via e-mail, on consent, By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy) (mov)
March 30, 2015 CALENDAR ENTRY: Pretrial Conference scheduled to go forward on: Thursday, April 9, 2015 @ 03:30 PM, 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom 14-C before Judge Crotty. If the date is not convenient, either party can e-mail three (3) mutually convenient dates to the Courtroom Deputy at: Marlon_Ovalles@nysd.uscourts.gov ----- A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY --- (By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy). (mov) Modified on 3/30/2015 (mov).
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Mark W. Delaquil to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul)
March 18, 2015 Filing 53 MOTION for Mark W. Delaquil to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10715337. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC. (Attachments: #1 District of Columbia Good Standing Certificate, #2 Supreme Court of Virginia Good Standing Certificate, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Delaquil, Mark)
March 18, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #53 MOTION for Mark W. Delaquil to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10715337. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Marc A. Antonett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul)
March 11, 2015 Filing 51 MOTION for Marc A. Antonetti to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10688179. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supreme Court of Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit District of Columbia Court of Appeals Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order to Admit Marc A. Antonetti Pro Hac Vice)(Antonetti, Marc)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Jay P. Krupin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #47 Motion for David B. Rivkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul)
March 11, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #51 MOTION for Marc A. Antonetti to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10688179. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
March 10, 2015 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu)
March 10, 2015 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:07-cv-02614-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (pgu)
March 10, 2015 Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (pgu)
March 9, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #48 MOTION for Jay P. Krupin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10674519. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #47 MOTION for David B. Rivkin, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10674397. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 6, 2015 Filing 48 MOTION for Jay P. Krupin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10674519. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Krupin, Jay)
March 6, 2015 Filing 47 MOTION for David B. Rivkin, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10674397. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rivkin, David)
March 4, 2015 Filing 46 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Eastern; Case Number: 1:14-cv-06067. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
March 4, 2015 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
March 4, 2015 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly similar to 1:07-cv-2614. (sjo)
March 4, 2015 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
February 25, 2015 Case transferred to the Southern District of N.Y. as per #45 . Original file sent via ECF. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting in part and denying in part #23 & #24 , Motions to Change Venue, or, in the Alternative, for a Stay. For the reasons set forth herein, defendants' motions to transfer venue of this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York are GRANTED. All other relief sought by defendants, including Interstate's motion for costs and attorney's fees, is DENIED without prejudice to the renewal of the requests before the transferee court. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the Southern District of New York in accordance with the procedures set forth in Local Civil Rule 83.1 and to close the case here as soon as that transfer is complete. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 2/25/2015. (Carey, Charles) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER, ENDORSED on #43 , granting letter application from Mark DeLaquil dtd. 2/20/15, to withdraw the appearance of counsel Timothy Scott Pfeifer. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 2/23/2015. (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Timothy Scott Pfeifer terminated. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/23/2015. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
February 20, 2015 Filing 43 Letter MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC (DeLaquil, Mark) Modified on 2/23/2015 (Vasquez, Lea). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
February 20, 2015 Filing 42 STATUS REPORT JOINT by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC (DeLaquil, Mark) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
February 18, 2015 Filing 41 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on Dec. 16, 2014, before Judge Glasser. Court Reporter/Transcriber H. Driscoll, Telephone number 718-613-2274. Email address: hdrisc@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 3/11/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2015. (Driscoll, Holly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
January 6, 2015 Filing 40 REPLY in Support re #23 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York or in the Alternative for a Stay filed by Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Fanelli, Cecelia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
January 6, 2015 Filing 39 REPLY in Support filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Saltzman, Barry) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
January 6, 2015 Filing 38 REPLY in Support , AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #24 MOTION to Change Venue filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Saltzman, Barry) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
December 22, 2014 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York or in the Alternative for a Stay, #24 MOTION to Change Venue (Declaration of David B. Rivkin, Jr.) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Discovery Order Dated September 27, 2007, #2 Exhibit B-Discovery Order Dated December 21, 2007, #3 Exhibit C-Post Trial Brief of the New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, #4 Exhibit D-First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit E-Excerpt of the Deposition of Peter Ward) (Rivkin, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
December 22, 2014 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York or in the Alternative for a Stay, #24 MOTION to Change Venue (Declaration of Kin Chung Lam) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rivkin, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
December 22, 2014 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York or in the Alternative for a Stay, #24 MOTION to Change Venue filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rivkin, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
December 17, 2014 Filing 34 Case called. Counsel for all parties present. The defendants motions to stay their answers to the amended complaint are granted. If the Court denies defendants motions to transfer to the SDNY, or, in the alternative, stay its determination pending a decision of the 2nd Circuit in related case 14-3976, defendants answers will be due 30 days later. The parties agree that plaintiffs papers in opposition to the motions to transfer will be filed on 12/22/2014 and defendants replies, if any, will be filed on 1/6/2015. (Court Reporter Holly Driscoll.) (Kessler, Stanley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #26 & #28 , Motions for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' time to respond to the Amended Complaint is stayed, subject to the conditions set forth herein. The parties' proposed briefing schedule for defendants' pending transfer/stay motions is adopted; plaintiffs' opposition papers are to be filed on 12/22/2014, and defendants' replies, if any, are to be filed on 1/6/2015. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 12/16/2014. (Carey, Charles) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
December 15, 2014 NOTICE: The Court has directed counsel Mark DeLaquil, Esq., Barry N. Saltzman, Esq. and Cecelia Laura Fanelli, Esq. to appear in Courtroom 8B on Tuesday, December 16 at 2:30 p.m. concerning the pending motions in this case. (Kessler, Stanley)[Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
December 11, 2014 Filing 32 Letter Enclosing Letter re SDNY No. 1:09-cv-00924 (PAC) by Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc. (Fanelli, Cecelia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
December 11, 2014 Filing 31 Letter re Motion Scheduling by Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc. (Fanelli, Cecelia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
December 11, 2014 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference , #25 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for January 7, 2015 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (DeLaquil, Mark) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #25 Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting #27 Motion to Adjourn Conference. THE INITIAL CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SET FOR JANUARY 7, 2015 IS ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE. Counsel shall submit a report on the status of the recently filed motions by February 20, 2015. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Steven M. Gold on 12/11/2014. (Gold, Steven) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
December 10, 2014 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , #28 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (DeLaquil, Mark) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
December 10, 2014 Filing 28 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Saltzman, Barry) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
December 10, 2014 Filing 27 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Fanelli, Cecelia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
December 10, 2014 Filing 26 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Fanelli, Cecelia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
December 10, 2014 Filing 25 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for January 7, 2015 by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Saltzman, Barry) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
December 4, 2014 Filing 24 MOTION to Change Venue by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of R. Maroko, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Rule 7.1 Statement, #13 Certificate of Service) (Saltzman, Barry) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
December 4, 2014 Filing 23 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York or in the Alternative for a Stay by Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Declaration of Cecelia L. Fanelli, Esq., in Support, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8) (Fanelli, Cecelia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
December 3, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Cecelia Laura Fanelli on behalf of Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Fanelli, Cecelia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
December 2, 2014 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jay P. Krupin Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7368282. by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jay P. Krupin in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Krupin, Jay) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave for Jay P. Krupin to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brooklyn Downtown Hotel, LLC, et al. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 12/2/2014. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on January 7, 2015 in Courtroom 13-D South before the undersigned. Counsel are directed to refer to and comply with the attached Order. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 11/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Chambers Individual Rules) (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
November 19, 2014 Filing 19 Letter From Paul Rosenberg Dated November 19, 2014 Regarding Chelsea Grand LLC v. Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc. by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC (Rosenberg, Paul) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
November 19, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Rosenberg on behalf of A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC (aty to be noticed) (Rosenberg, Paul) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The defendant's time to respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to 1/22/2015. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 11/18/2014. (Carey, Charles) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
November 18, 2014 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Saltzman, Barry) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
November 14, 2014 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, H & C Duffield III LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Realty Corp., HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, AINAHS Holdings Corp., S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, Van Dam Hospitality LLC, NY 29 West LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., AHSAT Holdings Corp., JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, Ann Street Hotel LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC. Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc. served on 11/10/2014, answer due 12/1/2014. (Pfeifer, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
November 14, 2014 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, H & C Duffield III LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, AINAHS Holdings Corp., S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, NY 29 West LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., AHSAT Holdings Corp., JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, Ann Street Hotel LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC. New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO served on 10/17/2014, answer due 11/20/2014. (Pfeifer, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
November 10, 2014 Filing 13 AMENDED Summons Issued as to Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
November 7, 2014 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO, Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc., filed by Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, H & C Duffield III LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Realty Corp., HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, AINAHS Holdings Corp., S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, Van Dam Hospitality LLC, NY 29 West LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., AHSAT Holdings Corp., JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, Ann Street Hotel LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3.) (Modified) (Rivkin, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
November 4, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Danya Ahmed on behalf of New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO (aty to be noticed) (Ahmed, Danya) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. Answer due 11/20/2014. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 10/30/2014. (Kessler, Stanley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
October 30, 2014 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Saltzman, Barry) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
October 30, 2014 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark W. DeLaquil Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7301413. by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mark W. Delaquil, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, Virginia, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, DC, #4 Proposed Order) (DeLaquil, Mark) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave for Mark W. DeLaquil to appear Pro Hac Vice for plaintiffs. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/30/2014. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, the #6 MOTION for Admission of Marc A. Antonetti To Practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned matter in granted. The admitted attorney is permitted to argue or try this particular case in whole/part as counsel for Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, et al. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 10/27/2014. (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave for Marc A. Antonetti to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendants. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/27/2014. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
October 24, 2014 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice to Admit Marc A. Antonetti Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7289637. by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Marc A. Antonetti in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standings District of Columbia, #3 Certificagte of Good Standings Supreme Court of Texas, #4 Proposed Order) (Antonetti, Marc) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave for David B. Rivkin, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice for plaintiffs. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/24/2014. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
October 23, 2014 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David B. Rivkin, Jr. Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7286560. by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David B. Rivkin, Jr., #2 Good Standing Certificate, #3 Proposed Order) (Rivkin, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
October 16, 2014 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
October 16, 2014 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
October 16, 2014 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, AHSAT Holdings Corp., AINAHS Holdings Corp., Ann Street Hotel LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., H & C Duffield III LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC, Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, NY 29 West LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., VCL Forever Realty Corp., Van Dam Hospitality LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC (Pfeifer, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
October 16, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-7268225, filed by Hanan 66 Charlton LLC, H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC, H & C Duffield III LLC, YJL 216 Duffield LLC, Solita Soho Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Realty Corp., HLAM 216 Duffield LLC, Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC, AINAHS Holdings Corp., S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC, S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC, Van Dam Hospitality LLC, NY 29 West LLC, Soho 54 LLC, Seaport Heights LLC, LAM Generation Duffield LLC, H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC, A&J Lee Duffield III LLC, HLAM 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC, A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC, Henan Duffield III LLC, HANAN 222 Duffield LLC, HLAM Duffield III LLC, KCL Realty LLC, H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC, LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC, VCL Forever Holdings Inc., CJC Realty & Holdings Inc., AHSAT Holdings Corp., JLAM 222 Duffield LLC, YJL 222 Duffield LLC, LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC, S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC, JLAM 216 Duffield LLC, HLAM 66 Charlton LLC, Ann Street Hotel LLC, JLAM Duffield III LLC, Hanan 216 Duffield LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3) (Pfeifer, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
October 16, 2014 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. The following corrections were made: none. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]
October 16, 2014 Case assigned to Judge I. Leo Glasser and Chief Mag. Judge Steven M. Gold. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/4/2015.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC et al v. New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooklyn Downtown Hotel LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHSAT Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VCL Forever Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H & C Duffield III LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanan 66 Charlton LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HLAM 222 Duffield LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HLAM Duffield III LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Street Hotel LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solita Soho Hotel LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YJL 216 Duffield LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YJL 222 Duffield LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H&C LUK 222 Duffield LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A&J Lee 222 Duffield LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seaport Heights LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NY 29 West LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JLAM 216 Duffield LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S&J Tang 216 Duffield LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HLAM 66 Charlton LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAM Pearl Street Hotel LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VCL Forever Realty Corp.
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAM Platt Street Hotel LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Dam Hospitality LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S&J Tang 222 Duffield LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H&C Luk 216 Duffield LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KCL Realty LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S&J Tang 66 Charlton LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henan Duffield III LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YJL 66 Charlton LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HLAM 216 Duffield LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CJC Realty & Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AINAHS Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JLAM 222 Duffield LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H&C Luk 66 Charlton LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANAN 222 Duffield LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanan 216 Duffield LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JLAM Duffield III LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soho 54 LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAM Generation Duffield LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A&J Lee Duffield III LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A&J Lee 66 Charlton LLC
Represented By: Robert Samuel Hawkins
Represented By: John S. Ho
Represented By: Jay P. Krupin
Represented By: Mark Andrew Konkel
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Antoney Antonetti
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Damon William Suden
Represented By: Mark W Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
Represented By: Daniel A. Small
Represented By: Danya Ahmed
Represented By: Barry Neal Saltzman
Represented By: Andrew David Midgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Ewing
Represented By: Cecelia Laura Fanelli
Represented By: Vesselina Musick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?