Gayle v. Aviles et al
Petitioner: |
Stevano Javed Gayle |
Respondent: |
Oscar Aviles, Christopher Shanahan, Jeh Johnson, Eric Holder and U.S. Department of Homeland Security |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv02134 |
Filed: |
March 20, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
XX Out of State |
Presiding Judge: |
P. Kevin Castel |
Nature of Suit: |
General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2241 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 2, 2020 |
Filing
28
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 27 JOINT LETTER. ENDORSEMENT: Based on the application of the parties, this action is dismissed without prejudice. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/2/2020) (jwh)
|
October 23, 2020 |
Filing
26
ORDER: In view of the Mandate of the Second Circuit filed April 27, 2020 (Doc 25) that vacated and remanded the Court's Memorandum and Order of June 22, 2015 conditionally granting the petitioner's writ of habeas corpus and the Court's July 10, 2015 Memorandum and Order denying the government's motion to reconsider (Doc 21), the parties are directed to file supplemental briefs addressing (i) the impact of Nielsen v. Preap, 139 S. Ct. 954 (2019) and Jennings v. Rodriguez, 138 S. Ct. 830 (2018), (ii) whether intervening evens have rendered the petition moot, and (iii) what further action should be taken to resolve this matter. The supplemental briefs must be filed by December 2, 2020, and any responses to the supplemental briefs must be filed by December 18, 2020. (Brief due by 12/2/2020. Responses to Brief due by 12/18/2020) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/23/2020) (jwh)
|
July 10, 2015 |
Filing
21
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 17 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 16 Order and Request to Stay Pending Decision on This Motion, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Oscar Aviles, Jeh Johnson, Eric Holder, Christopher Shanahan. The government's motion for reconsideration is DENIED. (As is further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/10/2015) (spo)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?