Ameruso v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Marc Ameruso
Defendant: City of New York, Marvin Johnson and John/Jane Does, Nos. 1-10
Case Number: 1:2015cv03381
Filed: April 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER : By no later than January 24, 2022, the parties shall file a letter updating the Court on the status of this case. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/10/2022) (ate)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting 145 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File pre-trial submission. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/20/2021) (jca)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER: The following is hereby ORDERED: The parties shall be prepared to try this case on November 8, 2021. The Court notes, however, that although it will request that trial date, it cannot provide assurance that a reconfigured COVID- safe court room will be available at that time. In any event, in accordance with the Court's individual rules, the parties shall submit a joint pretrial order, motions in limine, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law, and pretrial memoranda of law by October 4, 2021; any oppositions shall be filed by October 11, 2021; and any replies shall be filed by October 18, 2021. A final pretrial conference is scheduled for November 1, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. SO ORDERED., Motions due by 10/4/2021., Responses due by 10/11/2021, Replies due by 10/18/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/14/2021) (rj)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER. No later than May 13, 2021, the parties shall file a joint letter advising the Court (1) of the expected length of trial in this case and (2) of their availability to proceed with trial between July and December of this year. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/6/21) (yv)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 139 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED to the extent that the settlement conference scheduled for September 9, 2020 at 2:15 p.m. shall instead be a counsel-only settlement-related conference. Party representatives need not attend. The dial-in information remains the same. (Dkt. No. 138 paragraph 6.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 9/8/2020) (cf)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A settlement conference is scheduled before Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses on September 9, 2020, at 2:15 p.m. For the duration of the COVID-19 public health emergency, and unless otherwise ordered by the Co urt, all attendees must participate in the settlement conference telephonically, using the Court's teleconferencing facilities. The parties are directed to call (888) 557-8511 on their scheduled date, a few minutes before their scheduled time , and enter (a) the access code 7746387 and (b) the security code that the Court will provide to you, by email, on receipt of all parties' confidential settlement letters. Neither the scheduling of a settlement conference nor any adjournment affects the parties' other litigation deadlines or obligations. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Telephone Conference set for 9/9/2020 at 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 7/30/2020) (cf)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER: For the reasons discussed during today's conference, all previously scheduled deadlines, including the September 14, 2020 trial date, are hereby adjourned sine die. Within one week of the requested settlement conference, the parties shall update the Court on the status of this action. In the event that the settlement effort is unsuccessful, the parties shall propose new dates for trial. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/20/2020) (cf)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER, The Court will hold a status conference on July 20, 2020 at 3:00 PM. The parties shall call the conference line (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 7/20/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/17/20) (yv)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting 134 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Trial in this matter will begin on September 14, 2020. A final pre-trial conference will take place on September 11, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. The parties' pre-trial submissions, consistent with the Court's individual rules, shall be filed no later than August 28, 2020. Responses to the submissions are due no later than September 4, 2020. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/2/2020) (rj)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER: Pursuant to the Southern District of New York's Standing Order of March 27, 2020 regarding the suspension of civil jury trials until June 1, 2020, see 20 Misc. 172, the trial in this action currently scheduled to begin on May 4, 2020 is hereby adjourned. No later than April 10, 2020, the parties shall file a letter proposing alternative trial dates between June and September 2020. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/30/2020) (rj)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion for Summary Judgment. As discussed at today's conference, Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Specifically, Defendants' motion is gran ted as to the following five claims: the right to a fair trial (Count Six), failure to intervene (Count Seven), and municipal liability (Count Eight) under 42 U.S.C. § 1983, and negligent screening, hiring, and retention (Count Fifteen) and n egligent training and supervision (Count Sixteen) under New York law. Summary judgment is denied as to the remaining claims. No later than January 14, 2020, the parties shall file a letter proposing dates for trial. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/8/2020) (cf)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting 123 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The conference to discuss Defendants' pending motion is adjourned until January 8, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. Status Conference set for 1/8/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/5/2019) (rj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ameruso v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Ameruso
Represented By: Robert Thomas Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does, Nos. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?