International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Pension Fund v. FXCM Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Pension Fund |
Defendant: |
FXCM Inc., Dror Niv and Robert Lande |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv03599 |
Filed: |
May 8, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
New York |
Presiding Judge: |
Kimba M. Wood |
Nature of Suit: |
Securities/Commodities |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 78 j(b)ss Stockholder Suit |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 28, 2017 |
Filing
93
OPINION AND ORDER re: 79 MOTION to Alter Judgment re: 77 Clerk's Judgment, 76 Order on Motion for Judgment, Plaintiff's Notice of Motion, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a), 60(b) and 62.1. On July 27, 2017, in light o f the newly available enforcement evidence, the Second Circuit vacated this Court's previous judgment and remanded for further proceedings consistent with its Summary Order. The Second Circuit's Order obviates Plaintiff's request for 6 2.1(a)(3) and 60(b) relief, and those motions are DENIED. Plaintiff's motion to file an amended complaint, which incorporates the enforcement evidence, is GRANTED. Plaintiff must file an amended complaint by August 25, 2017. This order resolves Docket Entry 79. (Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2017.) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 7/27/2017) (ras)
|
August 18, 2016 |
Filing
73
Opinion and Order re: 53 MOTION to Dismiss Amended and Consolidated Complaint filed by Robert Lande, FXCM Inc., Dror Niv, 56 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Paul R. Bessette dated Februa ry 25, 2016. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff is given thirty days to file an amended complaint, should it choose to do so. This Opinion resolves docket numbers 53 and 56. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/18/2016) (kko)
|
November 12, 2015 |
Filing
41
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court APPOINTS PABF Chicago lead plaintiff and Scott+Scott lead counsel. A Rule 16 Conference shall take place on December 14, 2015 at 4:00 p.m. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the following motions: ECF Nos. 13, 16, 19, 22, 25, and 27. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 11/12/2015) (kl)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?