Lockheed Martin Corporation v. Glencore, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Defendant: Glencore, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2015cv03636
Filed: May 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: George B. Daniels
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER: The parties' proposed briefing schedule is GRANTED and is as follows: Plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment on or before January 8, 2021. Defendant shall file an opposition to Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment on or be fore February 12, 2021. Plaintiff shall file a reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before March 5, 2021. The status conference scheduled to occur on December 8, 2020 at 9:45 a.m. is cancelled. Oral argument is scheduled for March 23, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. (Motions due by 1/8/2021. Responses due by 2/12/2021. Replies due by 3/5/2021. Oral Argument set for 3/23/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/30/2020) (jwh)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER: The status conference scheduled to occur on October 13, 2020 at 9:45 a.m. is hereby adjourned to December 8, 2020 at 9:45 a.m. ( Status Conference set for 12/8/2020 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/13/2020) (cf)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: The June 2, 2020 conference is adjourned to August 11, 2020 at 9:45 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/1/2020) ( Status Conference set for 8/11/2020 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (ks)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lockheed Martin Corporation v. Glencore, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Robert Brager
Represented By: John S. Guttmann
Represented By: Paula J. Schauwecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glencore, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?