Witherspoon v. Rivera et al
Plaintiff: Desmond M. Witherspoon
Defendant: Matthew Lawson, Terrane Thomas, Marvin Anderson, Victoria Harris, Nyla Funderburk, Michael Brigttonham, Tony Yayo, Drake, Derrek Williams, Lataya Rivera, Rudder Yanov, Smitty the Passenger, Young Chris, Isiah Grudup, Terrance Goodwin, Jevon Cooper, Nas the Cook, Carto Yancy, Machine Gun Kelly, Markita Rutgar, Yandy Smith, Juelz Santana, Christopher Lemon, Brian McPherson, Jevon Witherspoon, Beyonce Knowles, John Leach, Nekiesha Banke, Mercendez, Markeish McNair, Michael Good, Edobe Garbitt, Yeefan THomas, Windsor "Slow Labin and Rodney Charlemagne" Bucks", Lloyd Banks, Julian Latimore, Bruce Anthony Hulitt, Jim Jones, Carol Garbitt, Che Mack, Teresa Garbitt, Donald Trump, Carrmine Gurrier, Joe Buddens, Arsonal and Brandon Carley
Case Number: 1:2015cv04328
Filed: May 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying without prejudice #17 Motion to Reopen Case: Before the Court is Plaintiff's motion to re-open the above-captioned action. (See Plaintiff's Motion to Re-Open, dated October 31, 2019 [dkt. no. 17]). Plaintiff has not shown any basis for re-opening the action. Accordingly, the motion is denied without prejudice to renewal upon a showing of a reason to re-open. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/5/2019) (jwh)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION, re: to Reopen Case. Document filed by Desmond M. Witherspoon.(sc)
October 12, 2018 Mailed a copy of #16 Order, to Desmond M. Witherspoon 296 Ninth Ave. New York, NY 10001. (aea)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court construes the letters from Plaintiff in these actions that were received by the Court on January 10, 2018, to be requests for relief under Rule 60(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Witherspoon v. Rivera, No. 15-CV-4328 (LAP) (ECF No. 15); Witherspoon v. Raymour & Flanigan, No. 15-CV-4915 (LAP) (ECF No. 14). The Court denies these requests. These actions are closed. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to not accept for filing any future documents from Plaintiff in either of these actions, except for those that are directed to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/12/2018) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 10, 2018 Filing 15 LETTER from Desmond Witherspoon dated 1/2/18 re: Plaintiff requests that the Court remove the mandate order given in the listed cases. Document filed by Desmond M. Witherspoon.(sc)
February 3, 2016 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #14 USCA Mandate. (tp)
February 3, 2016 Filing 14 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #12 Notice of Appeal filed by Desmond M. Witherspoon USCA Case Number 15-3731. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appeal is dismissed effective January 11, 2016 unless by that date appellant either pays the fee in full, moves for in forma pauperis status in district court or, if district court has denied in forma pauperis status, moves in this Court for in forma pauperis status. If appellant has filed the motion in district court and the motion is pending, appellant must so advise this Court in writing by the same date. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 3/2/2016. (tp)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #10 Motion for Reconsideration; denying #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File appeal. Plaintiff's request for reconsideration (ECF No. 10) and his motion for an extension of time to appeal (ECF No. 11) are denied. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/19/2015) (spo)
November 19, 2015 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #12 Notice of Appeal filed by Desmond M. Witherspoon were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
November 19, 2015 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #12 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
November 18, 2015 Appeal Fee Due: for #12 Notice of Appeal. Appeal fee due by 12/2/2015. (tp)
November 18, 2015 Appeal Remark as to #12 Notice of Appeal filed by Desmond M. Witherspoon. IFP DENIED 06/30/2015. (tp)
November 18, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #7 Order. Document filed by Desmond M. Witherspoon. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Motion for IFP). (tp)
November 18, 2015 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal. Document filed by Desmond M. Witherspoon.(tp)
November 9, 2015 Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration. Document filed by Desmond M. Witherspoon.(man)
July 6, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION re: that upon the annexed affidavit or affirmation Desmond Witherspoon sworn to or affirmed July 2, 2015. Document filed by Desmond M. Witherspoon. (sac)
July 6, 2015 Mailed notice of Right to Appeal re: #7 Order, #8 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), to Desmond M. Witherspoon 296 Ninth Ave. New York, NY 10001. (ca)
June 30, 2015 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #7 Order, #8 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (kko)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CIVIL JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the order issued June 9, 2015, dismissing the complaint, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed as frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from the Courts judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/30/2015) (kko)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 BAR ORDER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1651: Plaintiff is barred from filing future actions IFP in this Court without first obtaining from the Court leave to file. Any motion for leave to file must be captioned "Application Pursuant to Court Order Seeking Leave to File." Plaintiff must attach a copy of his proposed complaint and this order with each such motion. The motion must be filed with the Pro Se Intake Unit of this Court. Should Plaintiff violate this order and file an action without first filing a motion for leave to file, the action will be dismissed for failure to comply with this order. Plaintiff is warned that the continued submission of further frivolous documents may result in the imposition of additional sanctions, including monetary penalties. See 28 U.S.C. 1651. The Clerk is directed to close this action. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/30/2015) (kko) Modified on 7/2/2015 (kko).
June 30, 2015 Filing 6 AFFIRMATION UNDER 28:1651. Document filed by Desmond M. Witherspoon. (sc)
June 24, 2015 Received returned mail re: #3 Order Granting IFP Application. Mail was addressed to Desmond Whitherspoon at 296 Ninth Ave. New York, NY 10001 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return to Sender, Unable to Forward. (sbr)
June 19, 2015 Mailed a copy of #5 Order of Dismissal, to Desmond M. Witherspoon 296 Ninth Ave. New York, NY 10001. (ca)
June 10, 2015 Filing 4 PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 6/10/15 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Desmond M. Witherspoon. New Address: 296 Ninth Ave., New York, New York, 10001. (sc)
June 9, 2015 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #5 Order of Dismissal and Order to Show Cause Under 28 U.S.C. 1651, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (tn)
June 9, 2015 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (tn) Modified on 6/19/2015 (tn).
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND TO SHOW CAUSE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1651: The Clerk is directed to assign this matter to my docket, to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The complaint, filed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a), is dismissed as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), (ii). Plaintiff shall have thirty days to show cause by written affirmation why an order should not be entered barring Plaintiff from filing any future action in forma pauperis in this Court without prior permission. An "Affirmation Under 28 U.S.C. 1651" form is attached to this order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/9/2015) (tn)
June 9, 2015 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Granting IFP Application to DESMOND M. WITHERSPOON at 90 Lafayette St. New York, NY 10026. (sbr)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/9/2015) (sbr)
May 29, 2015 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
May 29, 2015 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Marvin Anderson, Arsonal, Nekiesha Banke, Lloyd Banks, Michael Brigttonham, Joe Buddens, Brandon Carley, Young Chris, Jevon Cooper, Drake, Nyla Funderburk, Carol Garbitt, Edobe Garbitt, Teresa Garbitt, Michael Good, Terrance Goodwin, Isiah Grudup, Carrmine Gurrier, Victoria Harris, Bruce Anthony Hulitt, Jim Jones, Beyonce Knowles, Julian Latimore, Matthew Lawson, John Leach, Christopher Lemon, Machine Gun Kelly, Che Mack, Markeish McNair, Brian McPherson, Mercendez, Nas the Cook, Lataya Rivera, Markita Rutgar, Juelz Santana, Yandy Smith, Smitty the Passenger, Yeefan THomas, Terrane Thomas, Donald Trump, Derrek Williams, Windsor "Slow Labin and Rodney Charlemagne" Bucks", Jevon Witherspoon, Carto Yancy, Rudder Yanov, Tony Yayo. Document filed by Desmond M. Witherspoon.(sac)
May 29, 2015 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Desmond M. Witherspoon.(sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witherspoon v. Rivera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrane Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nyla Funderburk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Brigttonham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Yayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrek Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lataya Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudder Yanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smitty the Passenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Chris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isiah Grudup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jevon Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nas the Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carto Yancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Machine Gun Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markita Rutgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yandy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juelz Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Lemon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jevon Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beyonce Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nekiesha Banke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markeish McNair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edobe Garbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yeefan THomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor "Slow Labin and Rodney Charlemagne" Bucks"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian Latimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Anthony Hulitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Garbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Che Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Garbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrmine Gurrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Buddens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arsonal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Carley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desmond M. Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?