Mount Whitney Investments LLLP v. Goldman Morgenstern & Partners Consulting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mount Whitney Investments LLLP
Defendant: Goldman Morgenstern & Partners Consulting, LLC, Manfred Ritter, Thomas Schulte and Stefan Elsterman
Case Number: 1:2015cv04479
Filed: June 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Albany
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER: DISMISSES Plaintiff's action without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate any pending motions and to close the case. It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/31/2020) (ks)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER: On April 9, 2019, the parties were directed to provide a status report by April 23, 2019. Doc. 127. Neither party did so. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a status report by May 1, 2020. Failure to comply with this Order may result in sanctions, including dismissal for failure to prosecute. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/6/2020) (mro)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re: 71 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. filed by Thomas Schulte, 78 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Thomas Schulte: For the reasons set forth above, Schulte's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate Schulte as a Defendant, and to terminate the motions, Docs. 71, 78. (Thomas Schulte terminated.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/23/2017) (jwh)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 OPINION AND ORDER re: 58 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Goldman Morgenstern & Partners Consulting, LLC. For the reasons set forth above, Defendant GoMoPa's motion to dismiss is DENIED. The parties are directed to appear for a conference on May 13, 2016, at 12:00 pm. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, Doc. 58. It is SO ORDERED. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/2/2016) (kko)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mount Whitney Investments LLLP v. Goldman Morgenstern & Partners Consulting, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mount Whitney Investments LLLP
Represented By: Charles Conway Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Morgenstern & Partners Consulting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manfred Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefan Elsterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?