Olaf Soot Design, LLC v. Daktronics, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Olaf Soot Design, LLC
Defendant: Daktronics, Inc. and Daktronics Hoist, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv05024
Filed: June 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Sweet
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 312 OPINION: The Court's holding in the Summary Judgment Opinion is clear: the "base member," the "first means," and the "elongated screw" elements are not literally infringed by the Vortek product, but a reasonable jur y could nonetheless find infringement under the doctrine of equivalents. See Summary Judgment Opinion at 33 ("Summary Judgment is denied because a reasonable factfinder could find infringement for each term") The language Plaintiffs invoke to argue otherwise, while inartful, conflicts both with the Summary Judgment Opinion's holding as well as this the Court's clarification of the same in its reconsideration opinion. See ECF Nos. 72 and 82. It therefore has no effect on the "law of the case." The issues to be determined at trial, then, include whether each of these terms (base member, first means, and elongated screw) is infringed upon under the doctrine of equivalents. Parties shall incorporate the above clarification into their presentment of the issues at trial. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/10/2018) (js)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 309 OPINION. For the reasons set forth above, Defendant's motion for reconsideration is granted. Clarification having been provided with respect to parties' Joint Pre-trial Order, parties' final order shall conform with the guidance provided herein. ECF No. 197. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/7/2018) (rjm)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 304 OPINION: For the reasons set forth above, Defendant's motions in limine are granted in part and denied in part. Likewise, Plaintiff's motions in limine are granted in part and denied in part. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/4/2018) (jca)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 OPINION re: 261 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 258 Memorandum & Opinion,, Grant of Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement filed by Olaf Soot Design, LLC. Based on the conclusions set forth above, Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is denied. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/27/2018) (mro)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 258 OPINION: re: 200 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement filed by Daktronics, Inc., Daktronics Hoist, Inc., 223 CROSS MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to 28 USC 1927 filed by Daktronics, Inc., Daktronics Hoist, Inc., 198 MOTION Relief Under Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 37 filed by Olaf Soot Design, LLC. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted. Plaintiff's motion for Rule 37 sanctions is denied. Defendants' cross-motion for sanctions under Section 1927 is denied. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/17/2018) (ama)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 OPINION re: 147 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rule 15 filed by Olaf Soot Design, LLC. Plaintiff's motion to amend its Complaint is granted. The parties will meet and confer with respect to any additional discovery necessary to the issue of willful infringement and theschedule for any further motions, including the presently scheduled motions in limine, and for trial. Any unresolved issues will be the subject of the pretrial conference scheduled for October 31, 2017, at noon, or at such adjourned date as the parties may agree upon. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/26/2017) (anc)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 OPINION re: 74 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 72 Memorandum & Opinion, (Denial of Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement) filed by Daktronics, Inc., Daktronics Hoist, Inc. : Defendants Daktronics, Inc. and Daktronics Hoist, I nc. ("Daktronics" or the "Defendants") have moved for reconsideration of this Court's October 26, 2016 decision to deny Defendants' motion for summary judgment on non-infringement regarding Defendants' Vortek winch and Plaintiff Olaf Soot Design, LLC's ("Olaf Soot" or the "Plaintiff") U.S. Patent No. 6,520,485 ("the '485 Patent"). For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion for reconsideration is denied. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/17/2017) (jwh)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 OPINION. Based on the conclusions set forth above and the claim constructions determined by the Court, the motion for summary judgment on non-infringement is denied. It is so ordered. re: 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Daktronics, Inc., Daktronics Hoist, Inc. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/26/2016) (rjm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olaf Soot Design, LLC v. Daktronics, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olaf Soot Design, LLC
Represented By: James M. Bollinger
Represented By: Timothy Patrick Heaton
Represented By: Phoenix Sung Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daktronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daktronics Hoist, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?