Zhang v. Aviles et al.
Petitioner: |
Yun Zhou Zhang |
Respondent: |
Oscar Aviles, Christopher Shanahan, Jeh Johnson and Loretta E. Lynch |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv05340 |
Filed: |
July 9, 2015 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
XX Out of State |
Presiding Judge: |
Shira A. Scheindlin |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 2, 2020 |
Filing
14
ORDER: Accordingly, the parties advised the Court that Petitioner had received the relief sought in his Petition. The parties requested that the Petition be dismissed without prejudice. In light of the fact that Petitioner has received the reli ef sought in his Petition, the parties' acknowledgment that no further action is required in this case, and the parties' joint request for dismissal without prejudice, the Petition is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to Petitioner 9;s ability to refile a habeas petition should future circumstances warrant it. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions, adjourn all remaining dates, and close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/2/2020) (rro)
|
May 18, 2020 |
Filing
12
SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of these developments, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file letters on or before June 2, 2020, advising the Court as to their positions regarding whether the Petition has been mooted, and if they believe it has not be en mooted, proposing next steps in this proceeding. If the parties believe the matter has not been mooted, they are further directed to provide the Court with the names of the public officers who succeeded the named Defendants in their official positions, so the case caption can be updated pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/18/2020) (rro)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?