June 20, 2016 |
Filing
76
OPINION & ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court approves the parties' settlement agreement, pursuant to which Cortes is to receive $174,478.51, Kono is to receive $113,589.89, Takano is to receive $63,799.37, Ramir ez is to receive $52,086.40, Noel is to receive $46,045.83, and plaintiffs' counsel is to receive $225,000. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice, and the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. (As further set forth in this Opinion) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/20/2016) (kl)
|
November 20, 2015 |
Filing
54
OPINION & ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Within two weeks of this Order, plaintiffs' counsel shall mail by first class the Notice and Consent forms to: All current and former employees who worked at Sasabune located at 401 East 73rd Str eet, New York, New York, as a sushi chef, server and/or kitchen employee, who were not paid time and one-half for any work performed in excess of 40 hours per week at any time from three years prior to the date of this Notice to the present. 2. With in two days of this Order, defendant Takahashi shall post a copy of the Notice and Consent forms in a conspicuous place at Sasabune. 3. The Notice and Consent forms shall be published in English, Spanish, and Japanese. 4. The Court approves the form of the Notice and Consent forms, and finds that the mailing of such in the manner and form set forth in Paragraphs 1-3 this Order will constitute the best notice practicable under the circumstances to members of the Class. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/20/2015) (kl)
|
November 12, 2015 |
Filing
52
OPINION & ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants collective certification for a class of all employees who worked as sushi chefs, servers, and/or kitchen workers at Sasabune at any point during the three years preceding the issuance of a Court-approved Notice. Defense counsel is directed to, within five days from the entry of this Order, produce to plaintiffs' counsel the names, mailing addresses, and dates of employment of all prospective class members; and, for all form er employees within the class, all known home and mobile telephone numbers, and if no such numbers are available for a particular employee, any email address known to Takahashi. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to provide defense counsel, by No vember 16, 2015, a revised Notice, consistent with this Order. Defense counsel, in turn, is directed to notify plaintiffs' counsel, by November 18, 2015, of any remaining objections to the Notice. Plaintiffs' counsel shall, by November 1 9, 2015, submit a revised, agreed-upon, Notice to the Court. Finally, plaintiffs' counsel shall mail the Notice to putative class members, and Takahashi shall post the Notice at Sasabune, within five days of the Court's approval of the revised Notice. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/12/2015) (kl)
|