Greer v. Mehiel et al
Plaintiff: Steven E. Greer
Defendant: Dennis Mehiel, Robert Serpico, The Battery Park City Authority, Howard Milstein, Steven Rossi, Janet Martin, Milford Management and Mariners Cove Site B Associates
Case Number: 1:2015cv06119
Filed: August 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: James L. Cott
Presiding Judge: Alison J. Nathan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 485 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court denies Plaintiffs Rule 60 motion. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/31/2019) (jca)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 433 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re: 371 MOTION for Summary Judgment; 366 FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment; 379 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Defendants' motions for summary judgment are granted, while Plaintiff's motion for sum mary judgment is denied. This resolves Docket Numbers 366, 371, and 379. Within three weeks of the date of this Order, Defendants shall file on the public docket the documents discussed above. Similarly, within three weeks of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall submit to the Court a clean, unredacted copy of Exhibit zD to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. In addition, within three weeks of the date of this Order, the parties shall submit a status update regarding the remaining counterclaim for attorneys' fees and a proposed schedule for resolution of that claim. See Dkt. Nos. 235, 425. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/28/2018) (jwh)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER denying 194 Letter Motion to Reopen. In summary, the case may move forward to discovery on the First Amendment Retaliation claim as alleged against, inter alia, Howard Milstein, Steven Rossi, Janet Martin, Mariners Cove Site B Associates, and Milford Management (the "Landlord Defendants"). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/12/2017) (ama)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, Greer's request for a preliminary injunction is DENIED. This resolves Docket Nos. 2 and 133. So ordered. Denying 133 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on Order to Show Cause addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Steven Greer dated February 2, 2016. Document filed by Steven E. Greer. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/24/2016) (rjm).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greer v. Mehiel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven E. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Mehiel
Represented By: Steven Barshov
Represented By: Dan Chorost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Serpico
Represented By: Steven Barshov
Represented By: Dan Chorost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Battery Park City Authority
Represented By: Steven Barshov
Represented By: Dan Chorost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Milstein
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Riegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Rossi
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Riegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Martin
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Riegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milford Management
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Riegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariners Cove Site B Associates
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Riegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?