Villalva-Zeferino v. Park Pizza, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Ponciano Villalva-Zeferino |
Defendant: |
Park Pizza, Inc. and Arturo Ientile |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv06932 |
Filed: |
September 2, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
New York |
Presiding Judge: |
Jesse M. Furman |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 19, 2016 |
Filing
19
CORRECTED OPINION AND ORDER: This matter is before me on the parties' joint application to approve the settlement reached in this matter. The application was made orally after the conclusion of a settlement conference held on February 4, 2016 at which I presided. Accordingly, I approve the settlement in this matter. In light of the settlement, the action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement. See Hendrickson v. United States, 791 F.3d 354, 358 (2d Cir. 2015). (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 2/19/2016) (kko)
|
February 17, 2016 |
Filing
18
OPINION AND ORDER. This matter is before me on the parties' joint application to approve the settlement reached in this matter. The application was made orally after the conclusion of a settlement conference held on February 4, 2016 at which I p resided as further set forth in this order. Accordingly, I approve the settlement in this matter. In light of the settlement, the action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement. See Hendrickson v. United States, 791 F.3d 354, 358 (2d Cir. 2015) in the event of a default. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 2/17/2016) Copies Sent By Chambers. (lmb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?