July 26, 2017 |
Filing
93
OPINION. Defendant Citibank, N.A. ("Citibank" or the "Defendant"), by a letter to the Court treated as a motion to compel, has sought document production from Plaintiffs Eduardo and Gervasio Negrete (the "Negretes" or th e "Plaintiffs"). For the reasons in this Opinion, Defendant's motion is granted, and as further specified and set forth in this Opinion. Plaintiffs will comply with the document request relating to the contract within 20 days or such o ther time as counsel agree upon. Although the demand appears to be narrowly drawn, Plaintiffs are granted leave within the same timeframe to move to vacate this order in the event a meet and confer does not resolve any objections. The parties will al so meet and confer on a discovery plan and a schedule to resolve any issues upon which agreement cannot be reached. It is so ordered. re: 81 LETTER MOTION for Conference [Pursuant to Southern District Local Rule 37.2], addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Marshall H. Fishman dated March 29, 2017. Document filed by Citibank, N.A. 82 LETTER MOTION for Conference [Pursuant to Southern District Local Rule 37.2] addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Marshall H. Fishman dated March 29, 2017. Document filed by Citibank, N.A. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/26/2017) (rjm)
|
July 11, 2017 |
Filing
92
OPINION re: 77 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . filed by Eduardo Negrete, Gervasio Negrete: Plaintiffs Eduardo Negrete and Gervasio Negrete (collectively, the "Negretes" or the "Plaintiffs") have moved pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b) to certify the Court's February 27, 2017, dismissal of Counts I, II, IV, V, and part of Count III as a partial final judgment. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion for certification pursuant to Rule 54(b) is denied. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/11/2017) (jwh)
|
February 27, 2017 |
Filing
75
OPINION: Upon the conclusions set forth above, the motion of the Defendant to dismiss the Complaint is granted in part and denied in part, without leave to amend, and the cross-motion of the Plaintiffs for partial summary judgment for breach of contract is denied. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/24/2017) (jwh)
|
May 19, 2016 |
Filing
49
OPINION re: 30 CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Eduardo Negrete, Gervasio Negrete, 13 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Citibank, N.A. Upon the conclusions set forth above, the motion of the Defendant to d ismiss the Complaint is granted without prejudice and with leave to amend, and the cross - motion of the Plaintiffs for partial summary judgment for breach of contract is denied. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/19/2016) (spo)
|
January 5, 2016 |
Filing
38
OPINION: The Defendant's letter-motion for a stay is denied. The Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment will be heard, along with the Defendant's previously-scheduled motion to dismiss, at noon on Thursday, January 28, 2016 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. It is so ordered. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/2/2016) (kl)
|
December 7, 2015 |
Filing
25
OPINION re: 16 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, filed by Citibank, N.A. the Defendants have advanced viable arguments for dismissal, the proposed discovery be significantly burdensome, and the Plaintiffs should suffer little or no prejudice from a stay. The Defendants' motion is therefore granted. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/4/2015) (spo)
|