Thomas v. Shiloh Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Raymond Thomas |
Defendant: |
Shiloh Industries, Inc., Ramzi Hermiz and Thomas M. Dugan |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv07449 |
Filed: |
September 21, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
Nassau |
Presiding Judge: |
Kimba M. Wood |
Nature of Suit: |
Securities/Commodities/Exchanges |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 77 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 19, 2018 |
Filing
55
OPINION AND ORDER re: 47 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Thomas M. Dugan, Ramzi Hermiz, Shiloh Industries, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's motion to dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Co mplaint is GRANTED in its entirety. Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice and without leave to amend. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 9/19/2018) (ne) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
|
July 7, 2017 |
Filing
44
OPINION AND ORDER re: 40 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 38 Memorandum & Opinion, 39 Clerk's Judgment, filed by Raymond Thomas, William Porter. Plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs' ; request to vacate the Court's March 23, 2017 order is DENIED. Plaintiff's request to further amend the Corrected Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint by August 6, 2017, with any changes to the Corrected Amended Complaint indicated by redline, and as further set forth herein. (Amended Pleadings due by 8/6/2017.) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 7/7/2017) (ras)
|
March 23, 2017 |
Filing
38
OPINION & ORDER re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Amended Complaint. filed by Thomas M. Dugan, Ramzi Hermiz, Shiloh Industries, Inc.. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Any pending motions are moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 3/23/2017) (kgo)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?