August 17, 2022 |
Filing
91
ORDER. Plaintiffs' Request is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. By August 22, 2022, Defendants shall produce the Non-Privileged Documents and the Partially Privileged Documents as instructed in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 8/17/22) (yv)
|
July 5, 2022 |
Filing
87
ORDER terminating 83 Letter Motion for Discovery. Accordingly, the Court orders as follows: 1. Plaintiffs' request for an order directing Defendants to review the Materials for communications concerning the July 14, 2015 and O ctober 20, 2015 letters is DENIED. Despite having the opportunity to raise these letters at the Conference or in the two weeks after the Court issued the June 3 Order, Plaintiffs failed to do so. See Favors v. Cuomo, No. 11 Civ. 5632 (DLI) (RR) (G EL), 2013 WL 12358269, at *4 (E.D.N.Y. Aug. 27, 2013) (denying party's request to produce documents where the party made "noattempt to show 'good cause' for failing to timely raise, within the period specified in the Court's [] Order, its objection to discovery" of the documents); David v. Weinstein Co. LLC, No. 18 Civ. 5414 (RA), 2020 WL 4042773, at *4 (S.D.N.Y. July 17, 2020) (noting that "the Second Circuit and courts within this Circuit have ro utinely held that failure to file objections to a magistrate judge's order in a timely manner operates as a waiver of such objections") (citing O'Neal v. Spota, 744 F. App'x 35, 37 (2d Cir. 2018)). 2. By July 6, 2022, Defendan ts shall email the Challenged Documents (i.e., Privilege Log entry nos. 20-76) to Chambers (Cave_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) for the Court's in camera review. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 7/5/2022) (tg)
|
June 14, 2022 |
Filing
84
ORDER. By June 24, 2022, Plaintiffs shall a letter no longer than three (3) pages in length identifying any documents on the Privilege Log as to which Plaintiffs challenge the asserted justification for non-disclosure and explaining the basis of their challenge (the Letter). If Plaintiffs file the Letter, then by July 1, 2022, Defendants shall (i) file a response to the Letter of no longer than three (3) pages in length, and (ii) email to Chambers (Cave_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) copies of the challenged documents for the Courts in camera review. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 6/14/22) (yv)
|
June 3, 2022 |
Filing
82
ORDER: Pursuant to the discovery conference held today, June 3, 2022, to discuss Plaintiffs' request (ECF No. 74) for an order compelling Defendants to provide a "detailed" log of the emails and documents that Defendants withheld a s privileged (the "Materials"), the Court orders as follows: 1. Defendants shall promptly review the Materials (the "Review") to determine the number of documents or emails falling under each of the following categories: (i ) communications sent to or received by Defendant Karl Schledwitz; (ii) communications containing or referencing comments made by Mr. Schledwitz regarding any documents filed in the matter DNV Inv. P'ship v. Regent Priv. Cap., LLC, No. 15 Ci v. 1255 (PAC) (SLC); and (iii) communications concerning the March 18, 2015 Letter (see ECF No. 63-4 at 2-3). 2. By June 10, 2022, Defendants shall file a letter advising the Court of the results of the Review (the "Letter"). 3. On receipt of the Letter, the Court will determine the nature of the privilege log that Defendants must provide to Plaintiffs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 6/3/2022) (vfr)
|
May 13, 2022 |
Filing
75
TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER granting 74 Letter Motion for Conference re: 74 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Dan J. Schulman dated May 13, 2022. LETTER MOTION for Discovery Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Dan J. Schulman dated May 13, 2022. ; granting 74 Letter Motion for Discovery. Plaintiffs' letter-motion for a discovery conference (ECF No. 74 (the "Letter-Motion" )) is GRANTED. A telephone conference to discuss the issues raised in the Letter-Motion is scheduled for Friday, June 3, 2022 at 2:00 pm. The parties are directed to call: (866) 390-1828; access code: 380-9799, at the scheduled time. Per the Court 's Individual Practices, by May 18, 2022, Defendants shall file a response to the Letter-Motion. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 74. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 6/3/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave.). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 5/13/22) (yv)
|
May 12, 2022 |
Filing
73
ORDER. By May 13, 2022, the parties shall order the transcripts of the March 1, 2022 and May 11, 2022 conferences before the Honorable Paul A. Crotty (see ECF min. entries Mar. 1, 2022 & May 11, 2022), and promptly file the transcripts on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 5/12/22) (yv)
|
March 23, 2022 |
Filing
67
ORDER: Should Plaintiffs wish to continue seeking disclosure of these materials, the parties are directed to meet and confer concerning: 1. Any available avenues to resolve this discovery dispute without judicial intervention; 2. Should such eff orts fail, a timetable for Defendants to prepare and produce a detailed privilege log that will allow Plaintiffs to meaningfully assess and, where applicable, challenge the asserted justification for non-disclosure of each withheld document; 3. If applicable, a timetable for Plaintiffs' motion to compel to be presented at a pre-motion conference, filed, and briefed-a briefing that would presumably cover the proper privilege law to be applied in this case, the relevant work product standards, and the application of both doctrines to the unique circumstances presented in this action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/23/2022) (va)
|
August 10, 2021 |
Filing
59
PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 8/10/2021) (vfr)
|
January 12, 2017 |
Filing
35
OPINION & ORDER re: 20 MOTION to Dismiss OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO TRANSFER THE MATTER TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF TENNESSEE. filed by Karl Schledwitz, A James Andrews, Richard Gaines. CONCLUSION: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants m otion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, improper venue, and failure to state a claim, and, in the alternative to transfer the action to the Western District of Tennessee, is denied. The Clerk is directed to close the motion at Docket 20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1-12-17) (mov)
|