Soueidan v. Breeze-Eastern Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Soueidan and Majed Soueidan
Defendant: Breeze-Eastern Corporation, Nelson Obus, William M. Shockley, Serge Dupuis, Robert J. Kelly and Brad Pedersen
Case Number: 1:2016cv00015
Filed: January 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2017 Filing 39 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated February 15, 2017, Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 02/16/2017) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal, #2 Right to Appeal)(km)
February 16, 2017 Terminate Transcript Deadlines (km)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 OPINION AND ORDER re: #29 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6), and the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act filed by William M. Shockley, Robert J. Kelly, Serge Dupuis, Brad Pedersen, Nelson Obus. For the reasons set forth above, Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, Doc. 29, and close the case. (As further set forth in this Opinion and Order.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/15/2017) (mro)
February 15, 2017 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: #38 Memorandum & Opinion, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (mro)
July 25, 2016 Filing 37 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 5/6/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Siwik, Christine)
July 25, 2016 Filing 36 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 5/6/2016 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/18/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2016.(Siwik, Christine)
July 15, 2016 Filing 35 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #29 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6), and the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act. . Document filed by Breeze-Eastern Corporation, Serge Dupuis, Robert J. Kelly, Nelson Obus, Brad Pedersen, William M. Shockley. (Gabriel, Jessie)
July 1, 2016 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Samuel K. Rosen in Opposition re: #29 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6), and the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act.. Document filed by Majed Soueidan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Rosen Declaration)(Rosen, Samuel)
July 1, 2016 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #29 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6), and the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act. . Document filed by Majed Soueidan. (Rosen, Samuel)
May 27, 2016 Filing 32 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Linda H. Martin dated May 27, 2016 re: request for oral argument on Joint Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Serge Dupuis, Robert J. Kelly, Nelson Obus, Brad Pedersen, William M. Shockley.(Martin, Linda)
May 27, 2016 Filing 31 JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #29 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6), and the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act. . Document filed by Serge Dupuis, Robert J. Kelly, Nelson Obus, Brad Pedersen, William M. Shockley. (Martin, Linda)
May 27, 2016 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Linda H. Martin in Support re: #29 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6), and the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act.. Document filed by Serge Dupuis, Robert J. Kelly, Nelson Obus, Brad Pedersen, William M. Shockley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Martin, Linda)
May 27, 2016 Filing 29 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6), and the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act. Document filed by Serge Dupuis, Robert J. Kelly, Nelson Obus, Brad Pedersen, William M. Shockley.(Martin, Linda)
May 6, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Pre-Motion Conference held on 5/6/2016. Plaintiff's counsel present. Defendants' counsel present. Defendants granted leave to file a motion to dismiss with the following briefing schedule: moving papers due May 27, 2016; opposition due July 1, 2016; and reply due July 15, 2016. Parties are granted leave to file briefs 30 pages in length. (jar)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Douglas L. Shively to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Daniel Rubin Warren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
April 27, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert I. Harwood on behalf of Majed Soueidan. (Harwood, Robert)
April 27, 2016 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Breeze-Eastern Corporation served on 1/21/2016, answer due 2/11/2016. Document filed by Majed Soueidan. (Rosen, Samuel)
April 22, 2016 Filing 24 MOTION for Douglas L. Shively to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED MOTION). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Breeze-Eastern Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing-Ohio, #2 Certificate of Good Standing-Illinois, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shively, Douglas)
April 22, 2016 Filing 23 MOTION for Daniel Rubin Warren to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED MOTION). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Breeze-Eastern Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing-Ohio, #2 Certificate of Good Standing-Illinois, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Warren, Daniel)
April 22, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #23 MOTION for Daniel Rubin Warren to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED MOTION). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #24 MOTION for Douglas L. Shively to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED MOTION). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for James Alexander Slater, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
April 14, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION for James Alexander Slater, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Breeze-Eastern Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Ohio - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Slater, James)
April 14, 2016 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Douglas L. Shively to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12186283. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Breeze-Eastern Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Illinois - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Ohio - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shively, Douglas) Modified on 4/14/2016 (sdi).
April 14, 2016 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Daniel Rubin Warren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12186072. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Breeze-Eastern Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Illinois - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Ohio - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Warren, Daniel) Modified on 4/14/2016 (bcu).
April 14, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for James Alexander Slater, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 14, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #19 MOTION for Daniel Rubin Warren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12186072. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Illinois;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
April 14, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #21 MOTION for James Alexander Slater, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00. Pay.gov receipt number 0208-12186504, paid on 4/14/2016. (wb)
April 14, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #20 MOTION for Douglas L. Shively to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12186283. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Illinois;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (sdi)
April 8, 2016 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Samuel K. Rosen dated April 8, 2016 re: response to defendants' letter seeking a pre-motion conference.. Document filed by Majed Soueidan.(Rosen, Samuel)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The pre-motion conference is adjourned to May 6, 2016, at 12:00 pm. (Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2016 at 12:00 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
March 29, 2016 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference presently scheduled for April 15, 2016 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Linda H. Martin dated March 29, 2016. Document filed by Serge Dupuis, Robert J. Kelly, Nelson Obus, Brad Pedersen, William M. Shockley.(Martin, Linda)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Conference. A pre-motion conference will be held on April 15, 2016, at 12:00 pm. Plaintiff is directed to sumbit a written response not longer than 3 pages by 5:00 pm on Friday, April 8, 2016. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 4/15/2016 at 12:00 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
March 23, 2016 Filing 14 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference /Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Jessie M. Gabriel dated March 23, 2016. Document filed by Breeze-Eastern Corporation.(Gabriel, Jessie)
February 23, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Linda Halliday Martin on behalf of Serge Dupuis, Robert J. Kelly, Nelson Obus, Brad Pedersen, William M. Shockley. New Address: Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP, 601 Lexington Avenue, 31st Floor, New York, New York, USA 10022, 212-277-4000. (Martin, Linda)
February 8, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Kaplin on behalf of Serge Dupuis, Robert J. Kelly, Nelson Obus, Brad Pedersen, William M. Shockley. (Kaplin, Lauren)
February 8, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Linda Halliday Martin on behalf of Serge Dupuis, Robert J. Kelly, Nelson Obus, Brad Pedersen, William M. Shockley. (Martin, Linda)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION: The deadline for Defendants to serve and file their respective pre-motion letters in accordance with Rule 2(A)(ii) will be March 23, 2016; The undersigned counsel for the Individual Defendants agrees to accept service of the Complaint for the Individual Defendants; And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/04/2016) (ama)
February 3, 2016 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TransDigm Group Incorporated for Breeze-Eastern Corporation. Document filed by Breeze-Eastern Corporation.(Gabriel, Jessie)
February 3, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessie Morgan Gabriel on behalf of Breeze-Eastern Corporation. (Gabriel, Jessie)
January 5, 2016 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rosen, Samuel)
January 5, 2016 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Breeze-Eastern Corporation, Serge Dupuis, Robert J. Kelly, Nelson Obus, Brad Pedersen, William M. Shockley. Document filed by Majed Soueidan.(Rosen, Samuel)
January 5, 2016 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Breeze-Eastern Corporation, Serge Dupuis, Robert J. Kelly, Nelson Obus, Brad Pedersen, William M. Shockley. (pc)
January 5, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Samuel Kenneth Rosen to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Citizenship of principal parties were filled out despite the case having a federal question jurisdiction. (pc)
January 5, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Samuel Kenneth Rosen to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
January 5, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Samuel Kenneth Rosen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Majid Soueidan and Robert K. Kelly. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (pc)
January 5, 2016 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
January 5, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Samuel Kenneth Rosen. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pc)
January 5, 2016 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. (pc)
January 5, 2016 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 4, 2016 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Majid Soueidan.(Rosen, Samuel)
January 4, 2016 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BREEZE-EASTERN CORPORATION, BRAD PEDERSEN, ROBERT J. KELLY, NELSON OBUS, WILLIAM M. SHOCKLEY, and SERGE DUPUIS, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Majid Soueidan. (Rosen, Samuel)
January 4, 2016 Filing 2 FILING ERROR PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rosen, Samuel) Modified on 1/5/2016 (pc).
January 4, 2016 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11793625)Document filed by Majid Soueidan.(Rosen, Samuel) Modified on 1/5/2016 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soueidan v. Breeze-Eastern Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soueidan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Majed Soueidan
Represented By: Samuel Kenneth Rosen
Represented By: Robert I. Harwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breeze-Eastern Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Rubin Warren
Represented By: Jessie Morgan Gabriel
Represented By: Douglas L Shively
Represented By: James A. Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Obus
Represented By: Lauren Kaplin
Represented By: Linda Halliday Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M. Shockley
Represented By: Lauren Kaplin
Represented By: Linda Halliday Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serge Dupuis
Represented By: Lauren Kaplin
Represented By: Linda Halliday Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Lauren Kaplin
Represented By: Linda Halliday Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Pedersen
Represented By: Lauren Kaplin
Represented By: Linda Halliday Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?