Local 2006, Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, United Food and Commercial Workers v. Basic Wear Inc. et al
Petitioner: |
Local 2006, Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, United Food and Commercial Workers |
Respondent: |
Basic Wear, Inc., Underground Culture, Inc., Street Wear 18, Inc., Fashion Place Inc., Leather Caves, Inc., X-Treem Vibe, Inc. and Yellow Rat Bastard |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00624 |
Filed: |
January 28, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
New York |
Presiding Judge: |
Paul A. Engelmayer |
Nature of Suit: |
Labor/Management Relations |
Cause of Action: |
9 U.S.C. ยง 9 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 9, 2017 |
Filing
32
OPINION & ORDER re: 28 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Local 2006, Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, United Food and Commercial Workers. For these reasons, the request for attorney's fees and costs incurred during this proceeding is granted in the amount of $17,450.00 in attorney's fees and $448.49 in costs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/9/2017) (anc)
|
December 28, 2016 |
Filing
24
OPINION & ORDER: For the reasons stated above, the Court confirms the Award in favor of the Union and issues judgment in the amount of $4,043.22, plus pre-and post-judgment interest. As to the Union's request for attorneys' ; fees and costs, the Court directs the Union to, by January 12, 2017, submit a revised request, with appropriate specification and documentation as set forth above. The Court will promptly resolve that request. If no such request is filed by that date, the Court will treat the Union as foregoing its request for fees and costs, and close this case. (As further set forth in this Opinion & Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/28/2016) (mro)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Local 2006, Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, United Food and Commercial Workers v. Basic Wear Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Respondent: Basic Wear, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Respondent: Underground Culture, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Respondent: Street Wear 18, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Respondent: Fashion Place Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Respondent: Leather Caves, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Respondent: X-Treem Vibe, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Respondent: Yellow Rat Bastard |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Petitioner: Local 2006, Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, United Food and Commercial Workers |
Represented By: |
Christopher Stephen Baluzy |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?