Solid Oak Sketches, LLC v. Visual Concepts, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Solid Oak Sketches, LLC
Defendant: Visual Concepts, LLC, 2K Games, Inc. and Take-Two Interactive Software Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00724
Filed: February 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 JOINT STIPULATION AND FINAL JUDGMENT: WHEREFORE, upon the consent and request of Solid Oak and Take-Two, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED THAT: 1. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Take- Two's C ounterclaim III (Fraud on the Copyright Office) is voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. 2. Final judgment is hereby entered in favor of Take-Two and against Solid Oak. 3. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to entertain such further proceedings and to enter such further orders as may be necessary or appropriate to implement and/or enforce the judgment. The Parties specifically consent to personal jurisdiction and venue in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York 4. Each Party affirms that its consent to this Final Judgment is given freely and voluntarily, and after having had the opportunity to discuss same with its legal counsel. 5. The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to mark this case closed. IT IS SO ORDERED., Take-Two Interactive Software Inc. (a Delaware corporation) terminated. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/20/2020) (ama)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: re: 127 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by 2K Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software Inc. For the foregoing reasons, the Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted in its entirety and Plaintiff' s cross motion to exclude Defendants' expert testimony is denied. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is dismissed in its entirety. Defendants are granted summary judgment on their First and Second Counterclaims, and the Court hereby decla res that Defendants' use of the Tattoos in the challenged versions of their video game is de minimis and fair use and therefore does not infringe Plaintiff's copyrights. This Memorandum Opinion and Order resolves Docket Entry Nos. 127 and 1 47. Defendants' Third Counterclaim remains unresolved. The parties are directed to meet and confer and file a joint report as to what, if any, steps remain to be taken to settle or otherwise resolve the Third Counterclaim. The joint report must be filed by May 15, 2020, and shall be directed to Magistrate Judge Aaron, to whom this case remains referred for general pretrial management. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/26/2020) (ama)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER: granting 162 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Conference is adjourned to May 15, 2020, at 11:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/18/2019) (ama)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting 160 Letter Motion to Stay. The final pretrial conference is adjourned to April 24, 2020, at 11:00 AM and the related deadlines are suspended pending further order of the Court. DE # 160 resolved. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/13/2019) (cf)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: re: 76 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by 2K Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software Inc. For the foregoing reasons, the Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings is denied. This Memorandum Op inion and Order resolves Docket Entry No. 76. The parties are directed to contact the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron promptly to request a conference to address settlement and any outstanding discovery issues. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/30/2018) (ama)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 32 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by 2K Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software Inc. For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiff's claims for statutory dam ages and attorneys' fees. This Memorandum Opinion and Order resolves Docket Entry No. 32. The initial pretrial conference in this matter remains scheduled for November 4, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. The parties are directed to make their pre-conference submissions in accordance with the Initial Conference Order. (Docket Entry No. 34.)(As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/2/2016) (cf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solid Oak Sketches, LLC v. Visual Concepts, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solid Oak Sketches, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Miles Spritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visual Concepts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2K Games, Inc.
Represented By: Dale Margaret Cendali
Represented By: Emma Phaff Raviv
Represented By: Joshua Levicoff Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Take-Two Interactive Software Inc.
Represented By: Dale Margaret Cendali
Represented By: Emma Phaff Raviv
Represented By: Joshua Levicoff Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?