American Federation of Teachers v. Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency et al
Plaintiff: American Federation of Teachers
Defendant: Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Jefferies LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Bank of America Corp., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., RBS Securities Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., Countrywide Securities Corp., UBS Securities LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets, LLC and Commerz Markets LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv01177
Filed: February 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (334) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. Attorney Hugh Daniel Sandler terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/7/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (jca)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (330 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Melissa Carrie King terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/4/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(jca)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (329) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Elizabeth P. Papez terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/4/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (jca)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (328) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. Attorney Thomas Popejoy terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/4/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (jca)
August 1, 2018 Filing 105 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maude Paquin on behalf of RBS Securities Inc., RBS Securities Inc., RBS Securities Inc.,, RBS Securities, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Paquin, Maude)
August 1, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Steel Mishkin on behalf of RBS Securities Inc., RBS Securities Inc., RBS Securities Inc.,, RBS Securities, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Mishkin, Paul)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (169 in 1:15-cv-07420-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (210 in 1:15-cv-06129-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (173 in 1:15-cv-05931-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (137 in 1:15-cv-07329-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (215 in 1:15-cv-05794-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (139 in 1:15-cv-07642-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (106 in 1:15-cv-07631-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (177 in 1:15-cv-07385-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (128 in 1:15-cv-07735-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (201 in 1:15-cv-06474-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (102 in 1:16-cv-01177-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (215 in 1:15-cv-05939-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (147 in 1:15-cv-09803-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (148 in 1:15-cv-06003-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (145 in 1:15-cv-06892-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (95 in 1:15-cv-07855-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (245 in 1:15-cv-05807-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc.,, (138 in 1:15-cv-06853-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (163 in 1:15-cv-06782-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (127 in 1:15-cv-08149-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (218 in 1:15-cv-05957-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (162 in 1:15-cv-07688-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (180 in 1:15-cv-07006-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (171 in 1:15-cv-08766-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (179 in 1:15-cv-07390-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (98 in 1:16-cv-00180-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (169 in 1:15-cv-05830-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (299 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (147 in 1:15-cv-06072-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (120 in 1:15-cv-07111-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (89 in 1:15-cv-08484-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Joel M. Cohen terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/2/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(cf)
June 29, 2018 Filing 102 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Joel M. Cohen dated June 29, 2018 re: To Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Document filed by RBS Securities Inc..(Cohen, Joel)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (291) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Stephanie Szaro Heglund terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/30/2018) ***Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (anc) Modified on 8/13/2018 (anc).
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT CREDIT SUISSE INTERNATIONAL: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), Plaintiffs hereby voluntarily dismiss all claims against Defendant CSI without prejudice to reassert such claims against CSI at a later time should evidence arise in discovery or otherwise that reveals information providing a basis for joining CSI on the claims being litigated in this case, as further set forth in this Order. Credit Suisse International terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/23/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(cf) Modified on 5/16/2018 (cf).
February 23, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claire Catalano Dean on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P Morgan Securities LLC, JP. Morgan Securities, LLC., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Dean, Claire)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS CITIGROUP INC.; CREDIT SUISSE GROUP AG; THE GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC.; JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.; MORGAN STANLEY; AND THE ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND GROUP PLC: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), Plaintiffs hereby voluntarily dismiss all claims against Defendants Citigroup Inc.; Credit Suisse Group AG; The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.; JP Morgan Chase & Co.; Morgan Stanley; and The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc without prejudice to reassert such claims against such Defendants at a later time should evidence arise in discovery (as further set forth in this Order.) JP Morgan Chase & Co., Morgan Stanley, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, CitiGroup, Inc. and Credit Suisse Group AG terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/23/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(cf)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: granting (242) MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 1.4. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Attorney David J. Woll terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/2/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (ap) Modified on 3/28/2018 (ap).
January 31, 2018 Filing 96 MOTION for David J. Woll to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Woll, David)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ANTHONY R. VAN VUREN: granting (240) Motion for Anthony R. Van Vuren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/31/2018). (Motion filed in 15-md-2673 # 240) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (ama)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. Defendants' deadline to move against or answer the complaint will be extended from January 23, 2018 to February 23, 2018. 2. Plaintiffs' deadline to file their Opposition to any Motion(s) to Dismiss the complaint will be extended from March 9, 2018 to April 17, 2018. 3. Defendants' deadline to reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to any Motion(s) to Dismiss the complaint will be extended from April 17, 2018 to May 22, 2018. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Motions due by 2/23/2018., Responses due by 4/17/2018, Replies due by 5/22/2018.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/17/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(cf)
September 29, 2017 Filing 93 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kavitha Satya Sivashanker on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutche Bank Securities Inc., Deustche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Sivashanker, Kavitha)
September 15, 2017 Filing 92 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time In Further Support of Proposed Scheduling Stipulation filed on September 1, 2017 (Dkt. 189) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Faith E. Gay, Jay L. Himes, J.Douglas Richards, dated September 15, 2017. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, State-Boston Retirement System, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Gay, Faith)
September 1, 2017 Filing 91 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re: Proposed Scheduling Stipulation addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Faith E. Gay, Jay L. Himes, J. Douglas Richards, Robert Y. Sperling, Brad S. Karp and David J. Woll dated September 1, 2017. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, State-Boston Retirement System, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation regarding deadlines for Consolidated Complaint and Motion to Dismiss Briefing)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Gay, Faith)
August 31, 2017 Filing 90 NOTICE of Corporate Name Change to Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Sperling, Robert)
July 28, 2017 Filing 89 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory D. Andres dated July 28, 2017 re: Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Document filed by RBS Securities Inc., RBS Securities Inc.,, RBS Securities Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Andres, Greg)
June 12, 2017 Filing 88 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Esinam Mawuena Daisy Agbemenu on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutche Bank Securities Inc., Deustche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Agbemenu, Esinam)
May 15, 2017 Filing 87 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Myers on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Myers, Jonathan)
May 15, 2017 Filing 86 MOTION for Patrick Joseph Campbell to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Campbell, Patrick)
May 3, 2017 Filing 85 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Faith E. Gay, J. Douglas Richards & Jay L. Himes dated May 3, 2017 re: Recent Disclosures regarding US Treasuries Market. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, State-Boston Retirement System, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Gay, Faith)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (173 in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Joel Steven Sanders terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/7/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (cla) Modified on 4/17/2017 (cla).
January 26, 2017 Filing 83 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from J. Douglas Richards, Jay L. Himes and Faith E. Gay dated January 26, 2017 re: Response to Mr. Zelcs' letter of January 23, 2017. Document filed by Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Eisenkraft, Michael)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #71 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/12/2016) (kl)
September 16, 2016 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: (94 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP. MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP. . Document filed by Rock Capital Markets, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Fata, Anthony)
September 16, 2016 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: (98 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel Alongside Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC and Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP., (88 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC., (86 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. . Document filed by American Federation of Teachers, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Gay, Faith)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (75) MOTION for Daniel J. Veroff to Withdraw as Attorney. This motion for an order directing the withdrawal of Daniel J. Veroff as counsel for Plaintiffs Jane Franklin and Jonathan Richard Williamson ("Plaintiffs") is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. Daniel J. Veroff is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiffs and fully discharged from any further representation or obligation in this case. 2. Pillsbury & Coleman, LLP will continue to represent Plaintiffs in this action. 3. Daniel J. Veroff (email: dveroff@pillsburycoleman.com) is removed from the mailing matrix and from receiving electronic filings in this case. SO ORDERED. Attorney Daniel J Veroff terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/6/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (kl)
September 6, 2016 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (94 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP. MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP. . Document filed by Rock Capital Markets, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Fata, Anthony)
September 6, 2016 Filing 77 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Michael Eisenkraft dated September 6, 2016 re: courtesy copies of Application to Appoint Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC Interim Co-lead Class Counsel Alongside Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP and Labaton Sucharow LLP. Document filed by Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Eisenkraft, Michael)
September 6, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Anthony F. Fata to RE-FILE Document (141 in 1:15-cv-05830-PGG, 150 in 1:15-cv-07385-PGG, 121 in 1:15-cv-06003-PGG, 138 in 1:15-cv-08287-PGG, 76 in 1:16-cv-01177-PGG, 70 in 1:15-cv-10116-PGG, 183 in 1:15-cv-06129-PGG, 191 in 1:15-cv-05957-PGG, 146 in 1:15-cv-05931-PGG, 103 in 1:15-cv-07325-PGG, 108 in 1:15-cv-07329-PGG, 184 in 1:15-cv-05794-PGG, 187 in 1:15-cv-05939-PGG, 66 in 1:15-cv-10118-PGG, 93 in 1:15-cv-07111-PGG, 135 in 1:15-cv-06782-PGG, 120 in 1:15-cv-06072-PGG, 99 in 1:15-cv-07481-PGG, 114 in 1:15-cv-06892-PGG, 218 in 1:15-cv-05807-PGG, 142 in 1:15-cv-07420-PGG, 152 in 1:15-cv-07390-PGG, 21 in 1:15-cv-09975-PGG, 92 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 107 in 1:15-cv-06853-PGG, 72 in 1:16-cv-00180-PGG, 99 in 1:15-cv-07735-PGG, 70 in 1:16-cv-00005-PGG, 135 in 1:15-cv-06139-PGG, 62 in 1:15-cv-09968-PGG, 31 in 1:16-cv-00030-PGG, 153 in 1:15-cv-07006-PGG, 121 in 1:15-cv-09803-PGG, 55 in 1:15-cv-10117-PGG, 37 in 1:15-cv-09169-PGG, 174 in 1:15-cv-06474-PGG, 138 in 1:15-cv-05843-PGG) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rock Capital, LLC's/Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP's Motion to Appoint Scott+Scott, Korein Tillery and Kellog Huber as Co-Lead Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rock Capital, LLC's/Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP's Motion to Appoint Scott+Scott, Korein Tillery and Kellog Huber as Co-Lead Counsel. Use the event type Memorandum in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. ***REMINDER*** - Motion to Appoint Counsel WAS NOT FILED. First file motion, then file and link any supporting documents. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(db)
September 2, 2016 Filing 76 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rock Capital, LLC's/Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP's Motion to Appoint Scott+Scott, Korein Tillery and Kellog Huber as Co-Lead Counsel. Document filed by Rock Capital Markets, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Fata, Anthony) Modified on 9/6/2016 (db).
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: After consultation with counsel for the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule will apply to motions to appoint lead counsel, submissions concerning the plaintiffs' steering committee, the filing of a Consolidated Amended Complaint, and any motion to dismiss: 1. As to motions to appoint lead counsel: a. Moving papers must be filed by September 2, 2016, and are limited to 15 pages; b. Responses are due on September 16, 2016, and are limited to 10 pages; and c. Reply briefs, if any, are due on September 23, 2016, and are limited to 7 pages. 2. Within fourteen days of appointment of lead counsel, lead counsel will make a recommendation to the Court as to the membership and size of the plaintiffs' steering committee. Any party objecting to lead counsel's recommendation will file its objection with the Court within seven days. 3. The Consolidated Amended Complaint will be filed 60 days after the appointment of lead counsel. 4. Any motion to dismiss will be filed 60 days after the filing of the Consolidated Amended Complaint. Winston & Strawn LLP, Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP, and Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP will serve as liaison counsel for Defendants. The attached Schedule A reflects the cases that have been consolidated for pretrial purposes. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 9/2/2016., Responses due by 9/16/2016, Replies due by 9/23/2016.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/22/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(kl)
August 22, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/22/2016. (Court Reporter Sonya Huggins) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(mr)
August 19, 2016 Filing 74 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Faith E. Gay dated August 19, 2016 re: Additions to Schedule of Consolidated Cases. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Gay, Faith)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference scheduled for Monday, August 22, 2016 at 10:30 a.m., will take place in Courtroom 110 at the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. It is further ORDERED that Schedule A, which reflects the cases that have been consolidated for pretrial purposes, is modified as reflected in the attached version. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(kl)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (60) Motion for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al., per Chambers. (kko)
August 5, 2016 Filing 71 MOTION for Alexis A. Lien to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Collogan, Lauren)
July 27, 2016 Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sharon Kunjumon Robertson on behalf of Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, American Federation of Teachers, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-06782-PGG, 1:16-cv-00180-PGG, 1:16-cv-01177-PGG(Robertson, Sharon)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING DIRECT FILING OF CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK FOR THE PURPOSES OF PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties and their respective counsel as follows: 1. Plaintiffs who file a Direct Filed Case are required to designate for each such case the original venue in which the case would have been filed but for the direct filing procedure (the "Designated Forum"). 2. Each Direct Filed Case filed in accordance with the direct filing procedure will be deemed to have been originally filed in the Designated Forum. 3. For any Direct Filed Case that meets the conditions set forth in paragraphs 1 and 2 above, Defendants will not object that the Southern District of New York is an improper venue for such Case. 4. Upon completion of all pretrial proceedings applicable to a Direct Filed Case, this Court, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), may transfer that case to the Designated Forum, after considering the recommendations of the parties to that case. 5. Except for an objection that the Southern District of New York is an improper venue for a Direct Filed Case, all other rights, arguments and defenses of Defendants are preserved and not waived, including, but not limited to, whether the Designated Forum is an improper venue and whether a Defendant is subject to personal jurisdiction in the Designated Forum. 6. Any plaintiff filing a Direct Filed Case who objects to any part of this Stipulation and [Proposed] Order shall have 10 days from the date that its case is filed to file a notice of motion with the Court to bring on a motion asserting such objection, and setting forth the basis for objection. If such a motion is granted in a Direct Filed Case, Defendants shall not be bound by the terms of this Stipulation and [Proposed] Order with respect to that case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/26/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(kl)
July 15, 2016 Filing 68 NOTICE of Filing of Updated Exhibit B to Letter of 7/14/2016 re: (130 in 1:15-cv-05843-PGG, 183 in 1:15-cv-05957-PGG, 112 in 1:15-cv-06072-PGG, 134 in 1:15-cv-07420-PGG, 54 in 1:15-cv-09968-PGG, 113 in 1:15-cv-06003-PGG, 210 in 1:15-cv-05807-PGG, 175 in 1:15-cv-06129-PGG, 138 in 1:15-cv-05931-PGG, 99 in 1:15-cv-06853-PGG, 88 in 1:15-cv-07735-PGG, 133 in 1:15-cv-05830-PGG, 125 in 1:15-cv-06782-PGG, 63 in 1:16-cv-00180-PGG, 62 in 1:16-cv-00005-PGG, 44 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 29 in 1:15-cv-09169-PGG, 85 in 1:15-cv-07111-PGG, 106 in 1:15-cv-06892-PGG, 13 in 1:15-cv-09975-PGG, 176 in 1:15-cv-05794-PGG, 127 in 1:15-cv-06139-PGG, 145 in 1:15-cv-07006-PGG, 113 in 1:15-cv-09803-PGG, 142 in 1:15-cv-07385-PGG, 62 in 1:15-cv-10116-PGG, 91 in 1:15-cv-07481-PGG, 47 in 1:15-cv-10117-PGG, 100 in 1:15-cv-07329-PGG, 23 in 1:16-cv-00030-PGG, 67 in 1:16-cv-01177-PGG, 144 in 1:15-cv-07390-PGG, 177 in 1:15-cv-05939-PGG, 95 in 1:15-cv-07325-PGG, 165 in 1:15-cv-06474-PGG, 130 in 1:15-cv-08287-PGG, 58 in 1:15-cv-10118-PGG) Letter,,. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, State-Boston Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Updated Exhibit B to Letter of 7/14/2016)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Himes, Jay)
July 14, 2016 Filing 67 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jay L. Himes, J. Douglas Richards and Faith E. Gay dated 07/14/2016 re: Plaintiffs' counsel's views re lead and liaison counsel, a Plaintiffs' steering committee, and proposed method and schedule re appointment of lead and liaison counsel. Document filed by State-Boston Retirement System, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Himes, Jay)
July 13, 2016 Filing 66 MOTION for Henry B. Liu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12533215. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P Morgan Securities LLC, JP. Morgan Securities, LLC., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Liu, Henry)
July 7, 2016 Filing 65 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David J. Woll dated July 7, 2016 re: the protocol for the direct filing of additional cases in this District. Document filed by 3RED TRADING LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corp., Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, Barclays Capital Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Citigroup Global Market Inc., Commerz Markets LLC, Countrywide Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, Jeffries LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Woll, David)
June 30, 2016 Filing 64 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David J. Woll dated June 30, 2016 re: Order dated June 13, 2016. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Woll, David)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The civil actions listed on Schedule A are consolidated for pretrial purposes. Any "tag-along" actions later removed to or transferred to this Court, or directly filed in the Southern District of New York, will automatically be consolidated with this action without the necessity of future motions or orders. This consolidation, however, does not constitute a determination that the actions should be consolidated for trial, nor does it have the effect of making any entity a party to any action in which he, she, or it has not been named, served, or added in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. In the Court's view, a master case file limited to filings of significance to the MDL as a whole or a substantial number of member cases would be advantageous. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to open a master case file bearing docket number 16-MC-2673. Any filing fees associated with opening the master case file docket are waived. The caption shall read "In re: Treasury Securities Auction Antitrust Litigation." For administrative purposes only, in 16-MC-2673, Plaintiffs shall be listed as "Treasury Securities Auction Antitrust MDL Plaintiffs," and Defendants shall be listed as "Treasury Securities Auction Antitrust MDL Defendants." There will be no appearances entered unless and until the Court orders otherwise. The Court will transfer any and all relevant documents filed in 15-MD-2673 to 15-MD-2673. This Order and all subsequent entries docketed in 16-MC-2543 are to be docketed simultaneously in 15-MD-2673. The Clerk of the Court is directed to Transfer Docket No. 1 (Transfer Order) from 15-MD-2673 to 16-MC-2673. The Court will conduct an Initial Conference on Monday, August 22, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 at the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. Counsel shall check in with the Courtroom Deputy at least fifteen minutes in advance. This Order vacates any case management or scheduling order issued by a court prior to the transfer of a case to 15-MD-2673. Pending the Initial Conference and further orders of this Court, all deadlines in this action (except those set forth herein), including Defendants' time to respond to any of the complaints and all discovery deadlines, are stayed. This Order does not, however, preclude the provision of voluntary discovery by any party. Any and all pending motions in the transferor courts are denied without prejudice, and will be adjudicated under the procedures set forth in this Order and subsequent orders issued by this Court. (As further set forth in this Order) Initial Conference set for 8/22/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/13/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(kl)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (33) Motion for Shannon Price Torres to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Shannon Price Torres terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/7/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (kl)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF GEOFFREY A. GRABER granting #60 Motion for Geoffrey A. Graber to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/26/2016) (ama)
April 25, 2016 Filing 60 MOTION for Geoffrey A. Graber to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Geoffrey)
April 25, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #60 MOTION for Geoffrey A. Graber to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
April 20, 2016 Filing 59 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Geoffrey Graber to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED Doc. 58). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Geoffrey) Modified on 4/20/2016 (sdi).
April 20, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #58 MOTION for Geoffrey A. Graber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12205398. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (sdi)
April 20, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #59 MOTION for Geoffrey Graber to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED Doc. 58). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (sdi)
April 19, 2016 Filing 58 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Geoffrey A. Graber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12205398. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Geoffrey) Modified on 4/20/2016 (sdi).
March 25, 2016 Filing 57 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., 7-1 Marunouchi 2-chrome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8330 for Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. Document filed by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC.(Karp, Brad)
March 25, 2016 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susanna Michele Buergel on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Buergel, Susanna)
March 25, 2016 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard A. Rosen on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Rosen, Richard)
March 25, 2016 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Anthony Gallo on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Gallo, Kenneth)
March 25, 2016 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brad Scott Karp on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Karp, Brad)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ON MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE: granting #41 Motion for Elizabeth P. Papez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/24/2016) (ama)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ON MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE: granting #40 Motion for Robert Y. Sperling to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/24/2016) (ama)
March 24, 2016 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (ama)
March 23, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Nathaniel Moss on behalf of TD Securities (USA) LLC. (Moss, Edward)
March 23, 2016 Filing 49 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TD Holdings II Inc., Other Affiliate The Toronto-Dominion Bank, Other Affiliate Toronto Dominion Holdings (U.S.A.), Inc. for TD Securities (USA) LLC. Document filed by TD Securities (USA) LLC.(Miller, Pamela)
March 23, 2016 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pamela Addison Miller on behalf of TD Securities (USA) LLC. (Miller, Pamela)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION SETTING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT AND FOR THE PARTIES TO PROPOSE CERTAIN CASE MANAGEMENT DATES: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. The undersigned counsel accept service of the complaint in the Uniqa Capital Markets case and the American Federation of Teachers case (the "Complaints") on behalf of their respective clients, expressly reserving the right to contest whether any party in the Complaints is properly named, and without waiver of any defenses, including those related to personal jurisdiction and venue, except as to the sufficiency of process and the service of process. 2. Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaints is hereby suspended until such time as the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York enters a scheduling order for the Consolidated Cases and Related Cases, provided that the parties shall confer in good faith regarding a proposed schedule for filing and responding to any consolidated complaint. 3. If Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to a complaint in any Consolidated Case, Related Case, or other pending action, is not similarly suspended pending a scheduling order for the Consolidated Cases and Related Cases, the parties shall meet and confer in good faith concerning the schedule in such action, with each side preserving all rights to apply to this Court or any other Court of competent jurisdiction for appropriate relief. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/22/2016) (kl)
March 22, 2016 Filing 46 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC for RBS Securities Inc.. Document filed by RBS Securities Inc..(Cohen, Joel)
March 22, 2016 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Carrie King on behalf of RBS Securities Inc.. (King, Melissa)
March 22, 2016 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Greg Donald Andres on behalf of RBS Securities Inc.. (Andres, Greg)
March 22, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel Murray Cohen on behalf of RBS Securities Inc.. (Cohen, Joel)
March 22, 2016 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susannah Providence Torpey on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Torpey, Susannah)
March 22, 2016 Filing 41 MOTION for Elizabeth P. Papez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12094314. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Papez, Elizabeth)
March 22, 2016 Filing 40 MOTION for Robert Y. Sperling to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12094240. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sperling, Robert)
March 22, 2016 Filing 39 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Goldman, Sachs & Co.. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Shane, Penny)
March 22, 2016 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Ehrenberg on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Ehrenberg, Stephen)
March 22, 2016 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Penny Shane on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Shane, Penny)
March 22, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #40 MOTION for Robert Y. Sperling to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12094240. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #41 MOTION for Elizabeth P. Papez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12094314. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 16, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by H. Miriam Farber on behalf of Mizuho Securities USA Inc.. (Farber, H.)
March 16, 2016 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John A. Nathanson on behalf of Mizuho Securities USA Inc.. (Nathanson, John)
March 16, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart Jay Baskin on behalf of Mizuho Securities USA Inc.. (Baskin, Stuart)
March 16, 2016 Filing 33 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Corporate Parent Mizuho Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Mizuho Securities Co., Ltd. for Mizuho Securities USA Inc.. Document filed by Mizuho Securities USA Inc..(Fortinsky, Jerome)
March 16, 2016 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jerome Steven Fortinsky on behalf of Mizuho Securities USA Inc.. (Fortinsky, Jerome)
March 15, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John D. Friel on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp.. (Friel, John)
March 15, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David J. Yeres on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp.. (Yeres, David)
March 15, 2016 Filing 29 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank of Montreal for BMO Capital Markets Corp.. Document filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp..(Houck, Robert)
March 15, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert G. Houck on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp.. (Houck, Robert)
February 29, 2016 Filing 27 MOTION for CAROL V. GILDEN to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12010223. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers.(Gilden, Carol)
February 29, 2016 Filing 26 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent DB US Financial Markets Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent DB USA Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG for Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc..(Rice, Thomas)
February 29, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey H. Knox on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Knox, Jeffrey)
February 29, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Joseph Campbell on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Campbell, Patrick)
February 29, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Omari Largos Royter Mason on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Mason, Omari)
February 29, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shannon Price Torres on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Torres, Shannon)
February 29, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Elbaum on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Elbaum, David)
February 29, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David J. Woll on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Woll, David)
February 29, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas C. Rice on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Rice, Thomas)
February 29, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #27 MOTION for CAROL V. GILDEN to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12010223. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
February 18, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Madison Eckles on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Eckles, Paul)
February 18, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shepard Goldfein on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Goldfein, Shepard)
February 18, 2016 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc., Other Affiliate Citigroup Financial Products,Inc., Other Affiliate Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets Inc..(Kasner, Jay)
February 18, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay B. Kasner on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Kasner, Jay)
February 18, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Douglas Richards on behalf of American Federation of Teachers. (Richards, John)
February 18, 2016 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Leucadia National Corporation, Corporate Parent Jefferies Group LLC, Corporate Parent Limestone Merger Sub LLC for Jefferies LLC. Document filed by Jefferies LLC.(Schacter, Kenneth)
February 18, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Ian Schacter on behalf of Jefferies LLC. (Schacter, Kenneth)
February 18, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft on behalf of American Federation of Teachers. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
February 18, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Faith E. Gay on behalf of American Federation of Teachers. (Gay, Faith)
February 18, 2016 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate The Bank of Nova Scotia for Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency. Document filed by Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency.(Pepperman, Richard)
February 18, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Joseph Hughes, III on behalf of Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency. (Hughes, John)
February 18, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard C. Pepperman, II on behalf of Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency. (Pepperman, Richard)
February 17, 2016 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corp., Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, Barclays Capital Inc., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Commerz Markets LLC, Countrywide Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC. (moh)
February 17, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel Lawrence Brockett. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: American Federation of Teachers. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (moh)
February 17, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Jeremy D. Andersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11959208. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
February 17, 2016 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (moh)
February 17, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Daniel Lawrence Brockett. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:15 Antitrust Litigation. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:1 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade). (moh)
February 17, 2016 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul G. Gardephe as possibly related to 1:15-cv-5794. (moh)
February 17, 2016 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
February 17, 2016 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:15-cv-05794-PGG. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
February 17, 2016 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (wb)
February 17, 2016 Case Designated ECF. (moh)
February 16, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION for Jeremy D. Andersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11959208. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers. (Attachments: #1 California Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Andersen, Jeremy)
February 16, 2016 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency; Barclays Capital Inc.; BMO Capital Markets Corp.; BNP Paribas Securities Corp.; Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.; Citigroup Global Markets Inc.; Commerz Markets LLC; Countrywide Securities Corp.; Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC; Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc.; Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.; Goldman, Sachs & Co.; HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.; Jefferies LLC; J.P. Morgan Securities LLC; Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated; Bank of America Corp.; Mizuho Securities USA Inc.; Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC; Nomura Securities International, Inc.; RBC Capital Markets, LLC; RBS Securities Inc.; SG Americas Securities, LLC; TD Securities (USA) LLC; UBS Securities LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers. (Brockett, Daniel)
February 16, 2016 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 15-5794. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers.(Brockett, Daniel)
February 16, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Brockett, Daniel)
February 16, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corp., Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, Barclays Capital Inc., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Commerz Markets LLC, Countrywide Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11957293)Document filed by American Federation of Teachers. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E, #6 Appendix F, #7 Appendix G, #8 Appendix H, #9 Appendix I, #10 Appendix J)(Brockett, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Federation of Teachers v. Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Federation of Teachers
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Carol V. Gilden
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Geoffrey A Graber
Represented By: John Douglas Richards
Represented By: Jeremy Daniel Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency
Represented By: John Joseph Hughes, III
Represented By: Richard C. Pepperman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Ian Schacter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Americas Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Price Torres
Represented By: Omari Largos Royter Mason
Represented By: Thomas C. Rice
Represented By: David J. Woll
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Campbell
Represented By: David Elbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Knox
Represented By: Esinam Mawuena Daisy Agbemenu
Represented By: Kavitha Satya Sivashanker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co.
Represented By: Susannah Providence Torpey
Represented By: Penny Shane, II
Represented By: Stephen Ehrenberg
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Papez
Represented By: Robert Y. Sperling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Securities Inc.
Represented By: Greg Donald Andres
Represented By: Melissa Carrie King
Represented By: Maude Paquin
Represented By: Paul Steel Mishkin
Represented By: Joel M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Claire Catalano Dean
Represented By: Henry Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp.
Represented By: John D. Friel
Represented By: Robert G. Houck
Represented By: David J. Yeres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Securities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Pamela Addison Miller
Represented By: Edward Nathaniel Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Susanna Michele Buergel
Represented By: Richard A. Rosen
Represented By: Brad Scott Karp
Represented By: Kenneth Anthony Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Securities International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizuho Securities USA Inc.
Represented By: Jerome Steven Fortinsky
Represented By: John A. Nathanson
Represented By: Stuart Jay Baskin
Represented By: H. Miriam Farber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerz Markets LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?