Wexler et al v. Allegion (UK) Limited et al
Plaintiff: Wexler, Zero Realty NC LLC, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC, 391 Concord Avenue, Inc., Elias Wexler, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd. and Zero East, Ltd.
Defendant: Allegion (UK) Limited and Allegion plc
Consolidated Defendant: Legacy Manufacturing LLC and Jacob Wexler
Consolidated Plaintiff: Schlage Lock Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv02252
Filed: March 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ANSWER to #88 Counterclaim. Document filed by Elias Wexler.(Bowen, Michael)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 OPINION AND ORDER re: #95 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice Of Motion To Dismiss In Part Schlage's Counterclaim. filed by Elias Wexler, #98 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Sondra D. Grisby dated July 13, 2018. filed by Elias Wexler. Wexler's motion to dismiss is GRANTED insofar as Schlage's counterclaims for defamation and breach of the non-disparagement clause are based on the Press Release. Wexler's motion is DENIED insofar as those counterclaims are based on the Article. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions, Docs. 95, 98. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/19/2019) (kv) .
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER granting (114) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:16-cv-02252-ER; granting (22) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:18-cv-04033-ER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. All parties do not agree as to whether these actions are to be tried to a jury. As to Elias Wexler, et al. v. Allegion (UK) Limited, et al., Civ. Action No.: 1:16-cv-02252-ER (the "First Action"), Plaintiffs take the position that all claims are jury claims. Defendants take the position that a contractual jury waiver applies to some of the claims. As to Schlage Lock Company LLC v. Jacob Wexler et al., Civ. Action No.: 1:18-cv-04033-ER (the "Second Action"), Plaintiff and Defendants agree that all claims are jury claims. Joinder of additional parties must be accomplished by January 15, 2019. Amended pleadings may be filed until January 15, 2019.Non-expert Deposition due by 8/30/2019. Deposition due by 11/29/2019. Discovery due by 11/29/2019. The next case management conference is scheduled for Dec 4. 2019 at 11:00 AM. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/22/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-02252-ER, 1:18-cv-04033-ER (jwh)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 REVISED STIPULATION OF CONFIDENTIALITY AND ORDER FOR PROTECTION OF RECORDS AND INFORMATION regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/22/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-02252-ER, 1:18-cv-04033-ER(jwh)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-02252-ER, 1:18-cv-04033-ER(jwh)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time and modification of the discovery schedule to extend time for the parties to complete discovery and to seek the entry of a revised protective order for discovery addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Sondra D. Grigsby dated February 21, 2019. Document filed by Legacy Manufacturing LLC, Jacob Wexler, Elias Wexler. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order of Revised Stipulation of Confidentiality and Order for Protection of Records and Information)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-02252-ER, 1:18-cv-04033-ER(Grigsby, Sondra)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #101 Motion for Thomas J. Rattay to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #95 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice Of Motion To Dismiss In Part Schlage's Counterclaim. . Document filed by Elias Wexler. (Bowen, Michael)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #110 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #95 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice Of Motion To Dismiss In Part Schlage's Counterclaim. Replies due by 9/21/2018. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in further Support of Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Sondra D. Grigsby dated 9/6/18. Document filed by Elias Wexler.(Grigsby, Sondra)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). All parties do not agree as to whether these actions are to be tried to a jury. As to Elias Wexler, et al. v. Allegion (UK) Limited, et al., Civ. Action No.: 1:16-cv-02252-ER (the "First Action"), Plaintiffs take the position that all claims are jury claims. Defendants take the position that a contractual jury waiver applies to some of the claims. As to Schlage Lock Company LLC v. Jacob Wexler et al., Civ. Action No.: 1:18-cv-04033-ER (the "Second Action"), Plaintiff and Defendants agree that all claims are jury claims. Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2019. Non-expert depositions shall be completed by 5/31/2019. Expert Deposition due by 8/30/2019. All Discovery due by 8/30/2019. All document discovery shall be completed by 12/17/2018. The Magistrate Judge assigned to the First Action is the Hon. Kevin Nathaniel Fox. Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-02252-ER, 1:18-cv-04033-ER(mro)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION OF CONFIDENTIALITY AND ORDER FOR PROTECTION OF RECORDS AND INFORMATION...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-02252-ER, 1:18-cv-04033-ER(mro)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 AFFIDAVIT of Robin Koshy, Esq. in Opposition re: #95 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice Of Motion To Dismiss In Part Schlage's Counterclaim.. Document filed by Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #95 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice Of Motion To Dismiss In Part Schlage's Counterclaim. . Document filed by Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Diana, Mark)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 SO-ORDERED STIPULATION CONSOLIDATING CASES PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 42(a)(2): IT IS STIPULATED AND AGREED by all parties to this action as follows: 1. The First Action (Civ. Action No.: 1:16-cv-02252-ER) shall be consolidated with the Second Action (Civ. Action No.: 1:18-cv-04033-ER) pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 42(a)(2). 2. Any pleadings or motions submitted to the Court shall contain the caption for both cases. 3. The parties shall meet and confer and submit a Case Management Order to the Court no later than August 24, 2018 which shall set forth a consolidated discovery schedule for the First Action and the Second Action which shall supersede the parties' Case Management Order filed in the First Action [D.E. 91]. 4. All parties agree that this consolidation best serves the interest of judicial economy. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/10/2018) (jwh)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION for Thomas J. Rattay to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Thomas J. Rattay, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rattay, Thomas)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #101 MOTION for Thomas J. Rattay to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Thomas J. Rattay, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thomas J. Rattay, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rattay, Thomas) Modified on 7/17/2018 (jc).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Thomas Joseph Rattay to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15330939. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rattay, Thomas) Modified on 7/17/2018 (wb).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #99 MOTION for Thomas Joseph Rattay to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15330939. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Pursuant to Local Rule 1.3. missing affidavit of the attorney.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #100 MOTION for Thomas J. Rattay, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney must submit an Affidavit OR Declaration pursuant to Local Rules 1.3 and 1.9, not a Certification. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit or Declaration - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Sondra D. Grisby dated July 13, 2018. Document filed by Elias Wexler.(Grigsby, Sondra)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 DECLARATION of Michael Paul Bowen in Support re: #95 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice Of Motion To Dismiss In Part Schlage's Counterclaim.. Document filed by Elias Wexler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Defendants Answer And Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit 2-Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3-Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4-Press Release, #5 Exhibit 5-Crains NY Article)(Bowen, Michael)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #95 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice Of Motion To Dismiss In Part Schlage's Counterclaim. . Document filed by Elias Wexler. (Bowen, Michael)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice Of Motion To Dismiss In Part Schlage's Counterclaim. Document filed by Elias Wexler.(Bowen, Michael)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. Wexler's motion is now due July 13, 2018. Defendant Schlage's opposition is due August 23 2018. Wexler's reply is due September 13, 2018. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 7/13/2018. Responses due by 8/23/2018 Replies due by 7/23/2018. (jar)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Sondra D. Grisby dated 06/01/18. Document filed by Elias Wexler.(Grigsby, Sondra)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNT V OF THE COUNTERCLAIM. Document filed by Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. All parties do not agree as to whether the case is to be tried to a jury. Plaintiffs take the position that all claims are jury claims. Defendants take the position that a contractual jury waiver applies to some of the claims. Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 5/15/2018. Non-Expert Deposition due by 1/31/2018. Expert Deposition due by 4/30/2019. Discovery due by 4/30/2019. Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/11/2018) (jwh)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Status Conference held on 5/2/2018. Plaintiffs' counsel present. Defendants' counsel present. Plaintiff is granted leave to file a motion to dismiss certain counter-claims with the following briefing schedule: moving papers due June 4, 2018; opposition due July 9, 2018; and reply due July 23, 2018. The parties are directed to submit a proposed joint discovery plan by Wednesday, May 9, 2018. (Motions due by 6/4/2018. Responses due by 7/9/2018. Replies due by 7/23/2018.) (jar)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #89 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference is adjourned to Wednesday, May 2, 2018 at 12:15 pm. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 5/2/2018 at 12:15 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/18/2018) (anc)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Sondra D. Grigsby dated April 17, 2018. Document filed by 391 Concord Avenue, Inc., Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC, Zero Realty NC LLC.(Grigsby, Sondra)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ANSWER to #52 Amended Complaint,., COUNTERCLAIM against Elias Wexler. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC.(Diana, Mark)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 OPINION AND ORDER re: #67 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Allegion plc, Schlage Lock Company, LLC: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Wexler's claims for fraudulent inducement, tortious interference, and breach of contract based on the board position (Counts One, Two, and Five, respectively) are dismissed and he will not be given leave to amend his complaint a second time. Plaintiffs' claims against Allegion plc are dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction. The parties are directed to appear for a conference on April 24, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, Doc. 67, Doc. 78. (Allegion plc terminated. Status Conference set for 4/24/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/29/2018) (jwh)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION OF CONFIDENTIALITY AND ORDER FOR PROTECTION OF RECORDS AND INFORMATION...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/4/2017) (mro)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 AFFIDAVIT of Robin Koshy, Esq in Support re: #67 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Allegion plc, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Wayne Bewley in Support re: #67 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Allegion plc, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Anshu Mehrotra in Support re: #67 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Allegion plc, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of S. Wade Sheek in Support re: #67 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Allegion plc, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #67 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Allegion plc, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Diana, Mark)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #79 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #67 MOTION to Dismiss . Defendants' reply is now due October 13, 2017. Defendants may file a reply brief not longer than 20 pages. (Replies due by 10/13/2017.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Mark Diana, Esq. dated September 8, 2017. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Allegion plc, Schlage Lock Company, LLC.(Diana, Mark)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Motion to Dismiss Allegion PLC for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Sondra D. Grigsby dated August 29, 2017. Document filed by 391 Concord Avenue, Inc., Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC, Zero Realty NC LLC.(Grigsby, Sondra)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 DECLARATION of Elias Wexler in Opposition re: #67 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by 391 Concord Avenue, Inc., Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC, Zero Realty NC LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LinkedIn Profile, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email, #4 Exhibit 4- Press Release)(Bowen, Michael)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 DECLARATION of Michael P. Bowen in Opposition re: #67 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by 391 Concord Avenue, Inc., Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC, Zero Realty NC LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Amended Complaint)(Bowen, Michael)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #67 MOTION to Dismiss . /Plaintiffs Memorandum Of Law In Opposition To Defendants Motion To Dismiss In Part The Amended Complaint. Document filed by 391 Concord Avenue, Inc., Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC, Zero Realty NC LLC. (Bowen, Michael)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #67 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/29/2017. Replies due by 9/29/2017. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Partial Motion To Dismiss The Amended Complaint From August 15, 2017 until August 29, 2017 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Sondra D. Grigsby dated August 8, 2017. Document filed by Elias Wexler.(Grigsby, Sondra)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 DECLARATION of Wayne Bewley in Support re: #67 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Allegion plc, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 DECLARATION of Anshu Mehrotra in Support re: #67 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Allegion plc, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DECLARATION of S. Wade Sheek in Support re: #67 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Allegion plc, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #67 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Allegion plc, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Allegion plc, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Diana, Mark)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Pre-Motion Conference held on 6/15/2017. Court granted leave for parties to submit motion papers and opposition up to 40 pages long. Motion papers due 6/30/2017; opposition due 8/15/2017; reply due 9/15/2017. (Court Reporter Steven Griffing) (jar)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sondra Denise Grigsby on behalf of 391 Concord Avenue, Inc., Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC, Zero Realty NC LLC. New Address: Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP, 1633 Broadway, New York, New York, USA 10019, 212-506-1700. (Grigsby, Sondra)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 RESCHEDULING NOTICE:The status conference previously scheduled for June 14, 2017, is hereby rescheduled until June 15, 2017 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 619 before the Hon. Edgardo Ramos, at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. (Status Conference set for 6/15/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 619, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Edgardo Ramos.)(jwh)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE CANCELLATION: The status conference previously scheduled for June 15, 2017 is cancelled. (ap)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Sondra D. Grigsby dated June 7, 2017 re: In Response to the Defendants' Letter dated May 26, 2017 Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference (CORRECTED). Document filed by 391 Concord Avenue, Inc., Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC, Zero Realty NC LLC.(Grigsby, Sondra)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #63) - LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Sondra D. Grigsby dated June 7, 2017 re: In Response to the Defendants' Letter dated May 26, 2017 Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by 391 Concord Avenue, Inc., Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC, Zero Realty NC LLC.(Grigsby, Sondra) Modified on 6/9/2017 (ldi).
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #59 Letter filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Allegion plc, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. AMENDED ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. A pre-motion conference will be held on June 14, 2017 at 4pm. Plaintiffs are directed to respond to Defendants' letter by June 7, 2017. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/30/2017) (cf)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #59 Letter filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Allegion plc, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. A pre-motion conference will be held on June 14, 2017 at 4pm. Plaintiffs are directed to respond to Defendants' letter by May 31, 2017. ( Pre-Motion Conference set for 6/14/2017 at 04:00 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/26/2017) (mro)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Mark Diana, Esq. dated May 26, 2017 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Allegion plc, Schlage Lock Company, LLC.(Diana, Mark)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Allegion plc waiver sent on 5/4/2017, answer due 7/3/2017. Document filed by Zero East, Ltd.; Zero Realty NC LLC; Zero Ohio, LLC; Zero International Realty Co., Inc.; 391 Concord Avenue, Inc.; Elias Wexler; Zero America Latina, LTD; Zero Asia Pacific Ltd.. (Bowen, Michael)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allegion plc. (pc)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allegion PLC, re: #52 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by 391 Concord Avenue, Inc., Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC, Zero Realty NC LLC. (Bowen, Michael)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney to RE-FILE Document No. #53 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney's address field was not filled out. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Zero Realty NC LLC.(Bowen, Michael)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 391 Concord Avenue, Inc..(Bowen, Michael)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allegion PLC, re: #52 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by 391 Concord Avenue, Inc., Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC, Zero Realty NC LLC. (Bowen, Michael) Modified on 5/2/2017 (pc).
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC, Allegion plc with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Zero East, Ltd., Zero Ohio, LLC, Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., 391 Concord Avenue, Inc., Zero Realty NC LLC. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation)(Bowen, Michael)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name. Document filed by Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC. (Bowen, Michael)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RESCHEDULING NOTICE: The status conference scheduled for April 21, 2017, is hereby rescheduled until June 15, 2017 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 619 before the Hon. Edgardo Ramos, at the Thurgood Marshal United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. Status Conference set for 6/15/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 619, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (jwh) Modified on 3/27/2017 (jar). (Main Document 50 replaced on 3/27/2017) (jar).
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SO-ORDERED STIPULATION FOR THE EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT: In sum, the applicable pleading dates pursuant to this stipulation are: (1) plaintiffs must file their amended complaint, or their motion for leave to amend, by April 28, 2017; and (2) defendants must file their response to the amended complaint, or to plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend, by May 30, 2017. Further, the Court will reschedule the April 21, 2017 conference to a date after May 30, 2017. ( Amended Pleadings due by 4/28/2017., Motions due by 4/28/2017., Responses due by 5/30/2017) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/24/2017) (mro)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, the law firm of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP, 1633 Broadway, New York, New York 10019, has been substituted as counsel of record for plaintiffs Elias Wexler, Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC, Zero America Latina, LTD., Zero Asia Pacific LTD., and Zero East, LTD., in the above-captioned proceeding, in place of the law firm of Smith & Associates, 570 Lexington Avenue, New York, New York 10022. A supporting declaration is attached hereto pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4. (Attorney E. David Smith terminated.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/17/2017) (cla)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 DECLARATION of Michael Paul Bowen Pursuant to Local Rule 1.4. Document filed by Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowen, Michael)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Wexler is permitted to proceed on his defamation claim and is granted leave to replead his age discrimination claims. Zero Latina, Zero Asia, and Zero East are granted leave to replead their breach of distributor contract claim. As Plaintiffs voluntarily dismissed their conversion claim, Defendants' motion to dismiss that claim is denied as moot. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint must be filed, if at all, on or before March 30, 2017. Defendants' response is due April 20, 2017. The parties are directed to appear for a conference on April 21, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, Doc. 18. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/9/2017) (jwh)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/30/2017. Allegion (UK) Limited answer due 4/20/2017; Schlage Lock Company, LLC answer due 4/20/2017. Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/21/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (jwh)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Diana, Mark)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE OF PARTIAL VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT RPEJUDICE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff ZERO INTERNATIONAL REALTY COMPANY, INC., and its counsel, hereby give notice that the Eighth Cause of Action pleaded in the February 29, 2016 Complaint is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice against the Defendants ALLEGION (UK) LIMITED and SCHLAGE LOCK COMPANY, LLC. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/13/2016) (rjm)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from E. David Smith dated December 12, 2016 re: Request for Oral Argument. Document filed by Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC.(Smith, E.)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC. (Smith, E.)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Smith, E.) Modified on 12/12/2016 (km).
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO EMAIL DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney E. Smith to E-MAIL Document No. #41 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with a handwritten signature of the attorney to judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. This document is not filed via ECF. (km)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. Plaintiffs' motion for certification for interlocutory appeal is DENIED. As set forth in the November 9 Order, Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' motion to dismiss is due by December 12, 2016, and Defendants' reply is due by December 27, 2016. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, Doc. 37. It is SO ORDERED. Denying #37 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Conference for Interlocutory Appeal addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from E. David Smith dated November 28, 2016. Document filed by Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/2/2016) (rjm)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/12/2016. Replies due by 12/27/2016. (rjm)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Mark Diana, Esq. dated December 1, 2016 re: Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' November 28 letter requesting a pre-motion conference. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC.(Diana, Mark)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #37 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Conference for Interlocutory Appeal addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from E. David Smith dated November 28, 2016 filed by Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero Ohio, LLC, Zero East, Ltd. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants are directed to submit a written response by December 6, 2016. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 12/6/2016) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/29/2016) (rjm)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Conference for Interlocutory Appeal addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from E. David Smith dated November 28, 2016. Document filed by Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC.(Smith, E.)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION AND ORDER # 106943: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion for remand is DENIED, as is their corresponding request for costs and expenses pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, Doc. 21. The stay of briefing with respect to Defendants' motion to dismiss Counts I, II, III, VII, and VIII of the Complaint is lifted. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' motion is due by December 12, 2016, and Defendants' reply is due by December 27, 2016. (As further set forth in this Opinion) (Responses due by 12/12/2016, Replies due by 12/27/2016.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/9/2016) (kl)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of S. Wade Sheek in Support re: #15 MOTION to Seal Asset Purchase Agreement.. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #15 MOTION to Seal Asset Purchase Agreement. . Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Diana, Mark)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #21 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court State of New York, Bronx County. . Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #30 Letter filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC re: Defendants' request for leave to file sur-reply letter brief. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/17/2016) (kko)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from E. David Smith dated June 17, 2016 re: Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendants' request for leave to file sur-reply letter brief. Document filed by Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC.(Smith, E.)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Mark Diana, Esq. dated June 16, 2016 re: Defendants' request for leave to file sur-reply letter brief. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC.(Diana, Mark)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FIRST REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #21 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court State of New York, Bronx County. . Document filed by Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC. (Smith, E.)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #15 MOTION to Seal Asset Purchase Agreement. . Document filed by Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC. (Smith, E.)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AFFIRMATION of Robin Koshy, Esq. in Opposition re: #21 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court State of New York, Bronx County.. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AFFIRMATION of S. Wade Sheek in Opposition re: #21 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court State of New York, Bronx County.. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AFFIRMATION of John Stanley in Opposition re: #21 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court State of New York, Bronx County.. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #21 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court State of New York, Bronx County. . Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Diana, Mark)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #21 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court State of New York, Bronx County. . Document filed by Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC. (Smith, E.)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AFFIRMATION of E. David Smith in Support re: #21 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court State of New York, Bronx County.. Document filed by Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit Screenshot of Zero Website)(Smith, E.)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court State of New York, Bronx County. Document filed by Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC.(Smith, E.)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Pre-Motion Conference held on 5/10/2016. Plaintiff's counsel present. Defendant's counsel present. Plaintiff granted leave to file a motion to remand with the following briefing schedule: moving papers due May 24, 2016; opposition due June 6, 2016; and reply due June 14, 2016. (Motions due by 5/24/2016. Replies due by 6/14/2016. Responses due by 6/7/2016.) (jar)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(6). Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. Responses due by 6/9/2016 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Diana, Mark)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #15 MOTION to Seal Asset Purchase Agreement. . Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECLARATION of S. Wade Sheek in Support re: #15 MOTION to Seal Asset Purchase Agreement.. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Diana, Mark)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Seal Asset Purchase Agreement. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Diana, Mark)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Mark Diana, Esq. dated May 4, 2016 re: Defendants opposition to Plaintiffs April 26, 2016 letter requesting a pre-motion conference. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC.(Diana, Mark)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: On April 26, 2016, Plaintiffs submitted a letter requesting a pre-motion conference on their motion to remand the case to state court. Doc. 12. Plaintiffs also requested that this Court issue an order staying the deadline for Plaintiffs to file their motion to remand pending any new deadline set by the Court at the pre-motion conference. Id. Plaintiffs' requests are GRANTED. A pre-motion conference will be held on May 10, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file their motion to remand is stayed pendingany new deadline set by the Court at the pre-motion conference. Defendants are directed to respond to Plaintiffs' letter by May 6, 2016. It is SO ORDERED. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 5/10/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/26/2016) (kl)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from E. David Smith dated April 26, 2016 re: Request a Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC.(Smith, E.)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by E. David Smith on behalf of Elias Wexler, Zero America Latina, LTD, Zero Asia Pacific Ltd., Zero East, Ltd., Zero International Realty Co., Inc., Zero Ohio, LLC. (Smith, E.)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #6 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Robin Koshy, Esq. dated March 31, 2016 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant is granted leave to file a partial motion to dismiss and motion to file the purchase agreement under seal with the following briefing schedule: moving papers due May 9, 2016; opposition due June 9, 2016; and reply due June 23, 2016. The asset purchase agreement shall remain under a temporary seal until the decision of this Court. Parties are granted leave to file briefs of not more than 30 pages. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 5/9/2016. Responses due by 6/9/2016. Replies due by 6/23/2016.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/8/2016) (rjm) Modified on 5/17/2016 (rjm).
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Mark Diana to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from E. David Smith dated 04/05/2016 re: Preliminary Conference. Document filed by Elias Wexler.(Smith, E.)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Mark Diana to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12139775. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Diana, Mark)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Mark Diana to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12139775. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Robin Koshy, Esq. dated March 31, 2016 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC.(Koshy, Robin)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Allegion plc for Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC.(Koshy, Robin)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #2 Notice of Removal. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number 0208-12114155, paid on 3/28/2016. (rch)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robin Koshy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); Jury Demand code n (None); Dollar Demand none; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (rch)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. (rch)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (rch)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (rch)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Robin Koshy to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Koshy, Robin)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Allegion S&S Holding Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Allegion US Holding Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Allegion S&S Lock Holding Company Inc. for Schlage Lock Company, LLC; Corporate Parent Allegion Investments (UK) Limitied for Allegion (UK) Limited. Document filed by Allegion (UK) Limited, Schlage Lock Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Koshy, Robin) Modified on 3/29/2016 (lb).
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 21347/2016E..Document filed by Schlage Lock Company, LLC, Allegion (UK) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A continued, #3 Exhibit B)(Koshy, Robin)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING -PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Koshy, Robin) Modified on 3/29/2016 (rch).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wexler et al v. Allegion (UK) Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegion (UK) Limited
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Rattay
Represented By: Robin Koshy
Represented By: Mark Diana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegion plc
Represented By: Mark Diana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zero Realty NC LLC
Represented By: Sondra Denise Grigsby
Represented By: Michael Paul Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zero America Latina, LTD
Represented By: Michael Paul Bowen
Represented By: E. David Smith
Represented By: Sondra Denise Grigsby
Represented By: Bradley Peter Lerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zero International Realty Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael Paul Bowen
Represented By: E. David Smith
Represented By: Sondra Denise Grigsby
Represented By: Bradley Peter Lerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zero Ohio, LLC
Represented By: Michael Paul Bowen
Represented By: E. David Smith
Represented By: Sondra Denise Grigsby
Represented By: Bradley Peter Lerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 391 Concord Avenue, Inc.
Represented By: Sondra Denise Grigsby
Represented By: Michael Paul Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elias Wexler
Represented By: Michael Paul Bowen
Represented By: E. David Smith
Represented By: Sondra Denise Grigsby
Represented By: Bradley Peter Lerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zero Asia Pacific Ltd.
Represented By: Michael Paul Bowen
Represented By: E. David Smith
Represented By: Sondra Denise Grigsby
Represented By: Bradley Peter Lerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zero East, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael Paul Bowen
Represented By: E. David Smith
Represented By: Sondra Denise Grigsby
Represented By: Bradley Peter Lerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Legacy Manufacturing LLC
Represented By: Sondra Denise Grigsby
Represented By: Michael Paul Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Jacob Wexler
Represented By: Sondra Denise Grigsby
Represented By: Michael Paul Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Schlage Lock Company, LLC
Represented By: Robin Koshy
Represented By: Mark Diana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?