Torres v. NYC Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Torres
Defendant: NYC Police Department, NYC Department of Buildings and Bellevue South Associates LLP
Case Number: 1:2016cv02362
Filed: March 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A. Preska
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Torres's remaining claims against Defendants Wahligh, Pepe, Scordus, and Barvels in the 2362 Action, and his claims against Bellevue South Associates and the New York Police Department in the 3437 Action are DISMISSED. Torres's motion for sanctions and to disbar defense counsel is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close case numbers 16- CV-2362 and 16-CV-3437. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this order to the plaintiff. SO ORDERED., Motions terminated: (446 in 1:16-cv-02362-RA-KNF) MOTION TO DISBAR THE DEFENDANTS' LAWYERS, AND IMPOSE MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST THEIR LAW-FIRMS. filed by Wilfredo Torres. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/31/2021) (rj)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 445 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 419 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Aaron Buckland, Doctor Aaron Buckland, 414 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Dennis McGowan. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at docket entries 414 and 419 and to terminate Defendants Dennis McGowan and Dr. Aaron Buckland from this case. SO ORDERED. Dennis McGowan, Aaron Buckland and Doctor Aaron Buckland (of NYU Hospitals Center) terminated. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/7/2021) (kv)
January 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER: denying 435 Motion for Sanctions. Accordingly, Torres's motion, Docket Entry No. 435, is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to the plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 1/03/2021) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER denying as moot 378 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; denying as moot 382 Motion; denying as moot 383 Motion; denying 386 Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases. On February 5, 2018, Defendant Bellevue Hospital filed a motion fo r summary judgment. Dkt 197. On February 26, 2020, Magistrate Judge Fox issued a report and recommendation recommending the Court deny the motion. Dkt. 377. Bellevue moved for leave to refile its motion for summary judgment on March 11, 2020. Dkt. 378. Two weeks later, Plaintiff filed two letters opposing the motion for leave to refile. Dkt. 382; Dkt. 383. On June 18, 2020, however, the Court declined to adopt the report and recommendation and granted summary judgment to Defendant Bellevue H ospital. Dkt. 392. For this reason, Bellevue's motion to refile its motion for summary judgment (pending at docket entry 378) is moot, as are Plaintiff's letters opposing that motion (pending at docket entries 382 and 383). On May 18, 2020 , Defendant Dennis McGowan filed a motion to consolidate this case with case number 19-CV-6332, which is currently pending before Judge Ramos. Dkt. 386. The Court denied this motion in its June 18, 2020 opinion addressing McGowan's motion to di smiss the Complaint. Dkt. 390 at 3 n.2. Thus, the motion to consolidate is no longer a pending motion. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is accordingly directed to terminate the motions at docket entries 378, 382, 383, and 386. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/23/2020) (mml)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER: In a letter dated May 7, 2020 and docketed on August 3, 2020, Plaintiff, proceeding pro se, seeks "access to the Court docket information." Dkt. 100. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail Plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet. The docket reflects that the Clerk of Court mailed Plaintiff copies of this Court's June 18, 2020 Opinions and Orders, Dkts. 388-392, as well as Magistrate Judge Fox's June 19, 2020 Order, Dkt. 393, July 8, 2020 Order, Dkt. 397, and July 17, 2020 Order, Dkt. 399. To the extent that Plaintiff has not received any of these Opinions or Orders, he shall write a letter so informing the Court. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/04/2020) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. the defendants' motions for summary judgment be served and filed on or before August 16, 2020; 2. the plaintiff's response to the motions shall be served and filed on or before September 16, 2020; a nd 3. any replies shall be served and filed on or before September 30, 2020. (As further set forth herein this Order.) The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to the plaintiff. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 8/16/2020. Responses due by 9/16/2020. Replies due by 9/30/2020.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 7/17/2020) (va) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a telephone conference shall be held in the above captioned action on July 16, 2020, at 3:30 p.m. All parties are directed to call (888) 557-8511 and, thereafter, enter access code 4862532. The Court encourages an y pro se party who is not currently incarcerated to consent to receive service of any documents filed in this case electronically through the Court's Electronic Case Filing System. Doing so will allow the pro se party to file documents electr onically on ECF instead of having to mail any filings to the Pro Se Office. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to the plaintiff. ( Telephone Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 7/8/2020) (va) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a telephone conference shall be held in the above captioned action on July 2, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. All parties are directed to call (888) 557-8511 and, thereafter, enter access code 4862532. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to the plaintiff. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 7/2/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 6/22/2020) (va) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 392 OPINION DECLINING TO ADOPT REPORT & RECOMMENDATION re: 197 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Bellevue Hospital. After undertaking a de novo review, the Court declines to adopt the Report's recommendation to deny HHC' ;s motion without prejudice for failing to comply with Local Civil Rule 56.2. The Court thus reviews HHC's motion for summary judgment and, for the reasons explained above, grants the motion. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 197 and to close this case as to Defendant HHC, sued herein as "Bellevue Hospital." SO ORDERED. Bellevue Hospital terminated. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/18/2020) (kv)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER: Defendant Bellevue Hospital, via the New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation ("HHC"), filed a motion for summary judgment, Docket Entry No. 197. In support of the motion, HHC filed a "Statement of Undisputed Facts Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 56.1," Docket Entry No. 198. That statement has pages numbered one through ten. However, page numbers eight and nine are not part of Docket Entry No. 198. Therefore, on or before January 31, 2020, HHC shall file pages eight and nine of its "Statement of Undisputed Facts Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 56.1" and shall, on or before January 31, 2020, submit a courtesy copy of pages eight and nine to the Court's chambers. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 1/28/2020) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (js)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER: Therefore, the City Defendants shall, on or before January 29, 2020, file a copy of the following pages from the plaintiff's November 8, 2017 deposition transcript: 68, 69, 70, 71, 73, 74, 75, 76, 77, and 106. A courtesy copy of these tr anscript pages shall be submitted to the Court's chambers on or before January 29, 2020. The City Defendants also assert that "an audio recording of the 911 call placed on April 28, 2016 after plaintiff left NYU Hospital is attached [to the Ceriello declaration] as Exhibit 'E'"; it is not. Therefore, on or before January 28, 2020, the City defendants shall file that audio recording and submit a courtesy copy of it to the Court's chambers. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 1/27/2020) (va)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. NYC Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Department of Buildings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellevue South Associates LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?