Sneed et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb et al
Plaintiff: |
Michael Sneed and Janet Sneed |
Defendant: |
Bristol-Myers Squibb and Pfizer, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv02899 |
Filed: |
April 19, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
XX Out of State |
Presiding Judge: |
Denise L. Cote |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Injury: Health Care |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 26, 2017 |
Filing
61
OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff Sheila Fortner (Fortner) brings this product liability lawsuit against defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (BMS) and Pfizer Inc. (Pfizer), alleging that she suffered gastrointestinal bleeding caused by taking Eliquis, a prescription drug manufactured, marketed, and distributed by the defendants. Two previous Opinions addressed Eliquis product liability claims -- Utts v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. & Pfizer Inc., 16cv5668 (DLC), 2016 WL 7429449 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 23, 20 16) (Utts I), and Utts v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. & Pfizer Inc., 16cv5668 (DLC), 2017 WL 1906875 (S.D.N.Y. May 8, 2017) (Utts II) -- and explained the principles of preemption that govern state law failure to warn and design defect claims against br and name drug manufacturers. The Utts Opinions further addressed whether the Eliquis complaints at issue satisfied the pleading standards of Rules 8(a) and 9(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. Plaintiff in this action was given an opportunity to amend her complai nt in light of the analyses in Utts I and Utts II. The plaintiffs amended complaint fails to correct the pleading deficiencies described in Utts I and Utts II, and largely for the reasons set forth in the Utts Opinions, the present action is dismiss ed with prejudice......The amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment for the defendants and close this case. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/26/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02754-DLC et al.(gr)
|
May 8, 2017 |
Filing
55
OPINION AND ORDER.......[Regarding 16cv5668 Utts, et al., v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., et al.]The defendants March 10, 2017 motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint is granted in its entirety. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment for the defendants. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/8/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02754-DLC et al.(gr)
|
December 23, 2016 |
Filing
30
OPINION AND ORDER: The defendants October 5 motion to dismiss is granted in part. The design defect claims are dismissed with prejudice. The plaintiffs are given leave to amend their remaining claims. A separate scheduling order accompanies this Opinion. (Signed by Judge Denise Cote on 12/23/2016)(gr)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?