Impax Laboratories, Inc. v. Turing Pharmaceuticals AG
Plaintiff: Impax Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant: Turing Pharmaceuticals AG
Counter_claimant: Turing Pharmaceuticals AG
Counter_defendant: Impax Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv03241
Filed: May 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER re: 112 MOTION for Reconsideration: For the reasons set forth above, Impax's motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/6/2018) (jwh)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 OPINION AND ORDER re: 118 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel H. Weiner dated Oct. 27, 2017 filed by Turing Pharmaceuticals AG, 111 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument regarding Motio n for Clarification and/or Reconsideration addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from James E. Brandt dated October 13, 2017 filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc., 112 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 110 Memorandum & Opinion -- Moti on for Clarification and/or Reconsideration of the Court's September 29, 2017 Opinion and Order filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc. For the reasons set forth above, Impax's motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The parties a re directed to appear for a status conference September 12, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. at the United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, Courtroom 619, New York, NY 10007. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions, Docs. 111, 112, and 118. It is SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 9/12/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 619, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/21/2018) (anc)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re: 92 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Impax Laboratories, Inc. ("Impax") brought this action for declaratory judgment, breach of contract, and unjust enrichment aga inst Turing Pharmaceuticals AG ("Turing") on May 2, 2016, seeking to recover millions of dollars of rebate liability related to sales of the drug Daraprim. Turing counterclaimed, asserting breach of the same contract and breach of the duty of good faith and fair dealing. Pending before the Court are (1) Impax's motion for summary judgment on one of its breach of contract claims against Turing (Count 3) and Turing's counterclaims, Doc. 78, and (2) Turing's cross-motion fo r summary judgment on Impax's claim for declaratory judgment, Impax's breach of contract claims, and Turing's breach of contract counterclaim against Impax, Doc. 92. For the reasons set forth above, Impax's motion is GRANTED in pa rt and DENIED in part, and Turing's motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The parties are directed to appear for a status conference on October 18, 2017 at 2:30pm at the United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, Courtroom 619, New York, NY 10007. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions, Docs. 78, 82, 92, and 96. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/28/2017) (jwh)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 OPINION AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's motion to dismiss with prejudice Plaintiff's unjust enrichment claim (Count V of the Amended Complaint) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion for oral argument is DENIED as moot. The C lerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions, Doc. 60 & 65. It is SO ORDERED. re: 60 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Unjust Enrichment Claim. filed by Turing Pharmaceuticals AG, 65 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel Adams dated August 18, 2016. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/16/2017) (rjm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Impax Laboratories, Inc. v. Turing Pharmaceuticals AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Impax Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel DeCederfelt Adams
Represented By: James Ellis Brandt
Represented By: Benjamin Naftalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turing Pharmaceuticals AG
Represented By: Hagit Muriel Elul
Represented By: Diane E. Lifton
Represented By: Faranak Sharon Tabatabai Asl
Represented By: Daniel Haym Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Turing Pharmaceuticals AG
Represented By: Hagit Muriel Elul
Represented By: Diane E. Lifton
Represented By: Faranak Sharon Tabatabai Asl
Represented By: Daniel Haym Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Impax Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel DeCederfelt Adams
Represented By: James Ellis Brandt
Represented By: Benjamin Naftalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?