Jablonski v. Special Counsel, Inc.
Plaintiff: Terri Jablonski
Defendant: Special Counsel, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv05243
Filed: July 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Rockland
Presiding Judge: Andrew L. Carter
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER terminating 225 Motion for Sanctions; terminating 232 Motion for Discovery. Pursuant to rulings made on the record, the parties shall meet and confer on three proposed dates in the month of October for Plaintiff's continued depos ition in the Court's courtroom or jury room. The parties shall submit a joint letter informing the Court of their three suggested dates by September 30, 2022. Other rulings related to Plaintiff's continued deposition are as further set fo rth in this Order. Plaintiff is directed to preserve the notebooks discussed at the September 21, 2022, status conference. The Court stays its oral order compelling production of those notebooks pending further briefing. Plaintiff's attorney shall submit her letter motion for a protective order regarding the notebooks by September 28, 2022. Defendant's opposition is due October 3, 2022. The parties' letter briefs shall not exceed three pages and shall cite to relevant law. A ll other discovery is stayed pending completion of Plaintiff's deposition. The parties are requested to order the transcript of the September 21, 2022, status conference and share costs 50-50. The parties are directed to refer to the transcript for all other rulings made on the record. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF Nos. 225 and 232. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 9/21/22) (yv)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER denying 206 Letter Motion for Discovery; denying 211 Letter Motion to Compel; denying 214 Letter Motion for Conference re: 206 LETTER MOTION for Discovery and Protective Order addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang f rom John G. McCarthy dated John G. McCarthy., 211 LETTER MOTION to Compel Defendant Special Counsel Inc. to produce documents in response to Plaintiff's Second Document Production Request addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wan g from M. Jablonski Attorney dated July 26, 2022., 214 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 207 Proposed Order, 205 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Discovery,,,,,, and Requesting that Proposed Order not be Entered ad dressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from John G. McCarthy.The Court has reviewed ECF Nos. 206, 208, 211, 212, and 213, all of which relate to Plaintiff's attempts to expand discovery, or to circumvent or relitigate the Court's prior ord ers on discovery. See ECF 158, 178, 192, 196, 204, and 205. Plaintiff's motions for additional discovery are DENIED.Additionally, the parties called the Court during Plaintiff's deposition on July 29, 2022, and now indicate that it was not completed, largely due to Plaintiff and her counsel's conduct. See ECF 214. Defendant is directed to submit their brief seeking their relief related to Plaintiff's deposition by August 19, 2022. Defendant shall submit the full transcript of Plaintiff's deposition and the deposition video no later than August 19, 2022. Plaintiff's opposition shall be filed by September 9, 2022. There shall be no replies unless directed by the Court. No other briefing will be allowed during the pendency of this briefing. Attempts to raise other discovery issues before September 9 shall subject the filing attorney to a $5 sanction for each violation. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(g). The previously-scheduled depositions of Alison Hugelmeyer i n her individual capacity and Special Counsel's 30(b)(6) deposition are adjourned sine die and shall not proceed unless and until Plaintiff's deposition is completed. All other discovery is stayed. Plaintiff is directed not to serve any other discovery requests or notices of deposition. Any violations of this Order may result in sanctions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f), 26(g), 30(d)(2), 37, or 28 U.S.C. § 1927. The parties are directed to appear for an in-person status conferen ce on Wednesday, September 21, 2022 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF Nos. 206, 211, and 214. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 8/2/2022) (rro)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting 197 Motion to Compel; granting 197 Motion for Discovery. The Court has reviewed ECF Nos. 197-198. Depositions shall be scheduled as follows: Plaintiff shall be deposed first; Defendant's individual fact witnesses, in cluding Alison Hugelmeyer, shall be deposed after Plaintiff's deposition has been completed; Defendant's 30(b)(6) witness shall be deposed third; Third party fact witnesses, if any, shall be deposed last. The parties are directed to meet and confer and submit one proposed deposition scheduling order by July 22, 2022. If the parties cannot agree on dates to schedule the above depositions, the Court shall choose the deposition dates for the parties. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 7/12/2022) (ks)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER denying 183 Motion to Compel. The Court held a status conference in this matter on June 14, 2022. For the reasons stated on the record at the status conference, Defendants Motion to Compel Plaintiff to produce documents related to Plaintiffs past OCAHO complaints is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 6/14/22) (yv)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER: The Court has reviewed ECF 182, along with Plaintiff's objections to Defendant's proposed 30(b)(6) topic modifications and objections. Defendant's motion to modify and/or object to Plaintiff's proposed 30(b)(6) topics is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The parties are directed to refer to the attached annotated version of Plaintiff's List of Proposed Topics for Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 6/7/2022) (rro)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 1/6/2022) (js)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 OPINION AND ORDER: re: 88 MOTION to Strike Document No. 77 Defendant's Amended Answer (correction of docket # 86)filed by Terri Jablonski. For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiff's motion to strike is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Additionally, Plaintiff's motion for sanctions is DENIED and Defendant is GRANTED leave to amend its Amended Answer. Defendant shall file a Second Amended Answer on or before May 8, 2020. SO ORDERED., Special Counsel, Inc. answer due 5/8/2020. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/25/2020) (ama)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 OPINION & ORDER re: 37 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 36 Memorandum & Opinion filed by Terri Jablonski. For the reasons stated above, Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration is GRANTED as to her Second, Third, and Fourth Causes of Action, but DENIED as to her Fifth Cause of Action. Plaintiff is GRANTED forty-five days from the date of this order to amend the complaint consistent with this order, as well as the Court's previous order regarding her F irst, Sixth, Seventh, and Eighth Causes of Action. Order Granting Def.'s Mot to Dismiss 14, ECF No. 36. The Court recommends that Plaintiff also edit, i.e., pare down and make concise, the allegations underlying Second, Third, and Fourth Causes of Action. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/20/2018) (mro)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION AND ORDER re: 28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. filed by Special Counsel, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, the Court dismisses the second, third, fourth, fifth, ninth, tenth, eleventh, twelfth, t hirteenth, and fourteenth causes of action. Plaintiff is afforded leave to replead the defamation (first) and retaliation (sixth, seventh, and eighth) claims within 45 days of the date of this Opinion and Order. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/28/2017) (rj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jablonski v. Special Counsel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Jablonski
Represented By: Maria Estelle Jablonski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Counsel, Inc.
Represented By: Carrie Elizabeth Anderer
Represented By: Peter Greg Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?