FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, Ltd. et al v. Citibank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, Ltd., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD. and FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P.
Defendant: Citibank, N.A., CitiGroup Inc., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., JPMorgan Chase & Co, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland Group Plc., RBS Securities Japan Limited, UBS AG, UBS Securities Japan Co., Ltd., ING Groep NV, ING Bank N.V., BNP Paribas, S.A., BNP Paribas North America, Inc., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., BNP Paribas Prime Brokerage, Inc., Oversea-Chinese Banking Corporation Ltd., Barclays PLC, Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse AG, Standard Chartered Bank, Standard Chartered PLC, DBS Bank Ltd., DBS Group Holdings Ltd., DBS Vickers Securities (USA) Inc., United Overseas Bank Limited, Australia and New Zealand Banking Group, Ltd., Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC USA Inc., Macquarie Bank Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd., Commerzbank AG and John Does Nos. 1-50
Case Number: 1:2016cv05263
Filed: July 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Alvin K. Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ORDER AMENDING ORDERS PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENTS, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The June 9 Orders are modified to the extent described herein. The deadline to substantially complete mailing of the Class Notice shall be extended from Septembe r 19, 2022 to October 3, 2022; The deadline for the Settlement Administrator to file a sworn statement attesting to compliance with the notice provisions shall be extended from October 3, 2022 to October 10, 2022; The deadline for Class Counsel to file their motions for payment of attorneys' fees and reimbursement of expenses, incentive awards, and for final approval of the Settlements shall be extended from October 3, 2022 to October 10, 2022; The deadline to submit any Request for Ex clusion from the Settlements (the "Exclusion Bar Date") shall be extended from October 17, 2022 to October 31, 2022; The deadline to file any objections or any request to be heard shall be extended from October 17, 2022 to October 31, 2022 ; There will be no change to the scheduled Fairness Hearing, which will be held on November 29, 2022 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 14D of this Courthouse before the undersigned, to consider the fairness, reasonableness, and adequacy of the Settlement Agreement. Class Counsel are directed to post this Order on the settlement website as soon as is practicable. Except as modified herein, the June 9 Orders remain in effect. ENTERED. ( Motions due by 10/10/2022.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/19/22) (yv)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER CONCERNING SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATOR REPORTING IN CONNECTION WITH DISTRIBUTION OF THE NET SETTLEMENT FUNDS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Except for the terms expressly defined herein, the Court adopts and incorporates the definitions in the Settlement Agreements for the purposes of this Order. 2. Representative Plaintiffs will file a motion(s) for distribution of the Net Settlement Funds following the time A.B. Data has completed its processing, review and auditing of the Proofs of C laim and Release submitted in connection with the administration of claims for the Settlements. 3. In connection with the motion(s) for distribution of the Net Settlement Funds, A.B. Data will provide a declaration that will report on the following topics as further set forth in this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/17/22) (yv)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DEUTSCHE BANK AG, SCHEDULING A HEARING FOR FINAL APPROVAL THEREOF, AND APPROVING THE PROPOSED FORM AND PROGRAM OF NOTICE TO THE CLASS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The Court finds that it has subject matter jurisdiction to preliminarily approve the Settlement Agreement, including all exhibits thereto, and the Settlement contained therein under 28 U.S.C. § 1331. Solely for purposes of the Settlement, the Settlement Class is hereby preliminarily certified and maintained as a class action, pursuant to Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court finds that the applicable provisions of Rules 23(a) and 23(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure have been sati sfied and that the Court will likely be able to approve the Settlement and certify the Settlement Class for purposes of judgment. The Settlement Class is defined as further set forth in this Order. The Court hereby appoints Lowey Dannenberg, P.C. as Class Counsel to such Settlement Class for purposes of the Settlement, having determined that the requirements of Rule 23(g) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure are fully satisfied by this appointment. The Court appoints A.B. Data, Ltd. as Settlement Administrator for purposes of the Settlement. Fund Liquidation Holdings LLC, Moon Capital Partners Master Fund Ltd., and Moon Capital Master Fund Ltd. are hereby appointed as representatives of the Settlement Class. A hearing will be h eld on or about November 29, 2022 at 12 p.m. in Courtroom 140 of this Courthouse before the undersigned to consider the fairness, reasonableness, and adequacy of the Settlement (the "Fairness Hearing"). All proceedings in this Action as to Deutsche Bank, other than such proceedings as may be necessary to implement the proposed Settlement or to effectuate the terms of the Settlement Agreement, are hereby stayed and suspended until further order of this Court. The Court prelimina rily approves the establishment of the Settlement Fund defined in the Settlement Agreement (the "Settlement Fund") as a qualified settlement fund pursuant to Section 468B of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, and the Treasury Regulations promulgated thereunder. The Court appoints Citibank, N.A. to act as Escrow Agent for the Settlement Fund. Class Counsel shall file their motions for payment of attorneys' fees and reimbursement of expenses, incentive awards, and for final approval of the Settlement on or before October 3, 2022; and reply papers, if any, shall be filed no later than seven (7) days before the Fairness Hearing. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/9/22) (yv)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT, I held a status conference on Thursday, October 21, 2021. I ordered as follows: 1. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File the Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint, ECF No. 347, is gra nted, with consent and without waiver of, or prejudice to, any defenses. The Clerk of the Court shall terminate ECF No. 347. 2. All motions to dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint, on jurisdictional or substantive grounds, or and party to the Compl aint, shall be filed by November 24, 2021. Opposition papers shall be filed by December 23, 2021. Reply papers shall be filed by January 13, 2022. These dates are not adjournable. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 11/24/2021., Responses due by 12/23/2021, Replies due by 1/13/2022.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/21/21) (yv)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 430 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF WILMER CUTLER PICKERING HALE AND DORR LLP AND ORDER, Based on the accompanying declaration, the law firm Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP ("WilmerHale") hereby withdraws as counsel of record for Defendants The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc (n/k/a NatWest Group plc), The Royal Bank of Scotland plc (n/k/a NatWest Markets plc), and RBS Securities Japan Limited (collectively, "Defendants") in the above-captioned matter. In particular, the following counsel withdraw from this action and respectfully request that their names and email addresses be removed from the official docket: Jamie S. Dycus, Fraser L. Hunter, Jr. SO ORDERED. (Attorney Jamie Stephen Dycus and Fraser Lee Hunter, Jr terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/25/21) (yv)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER granting 424 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Upon the parties' request, the status conference previously scheduled for July 9, 2021, is hereby adjourned to August 24, 2021, at 2:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 8/24/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/24/2021) (kv)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER re: 414 Notice of Withdraw of Counsel filed by Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd. Upon the motion of Elizabeth A. Cassady for leave to withdraw as counsel for defendant MUFG Bank, Ltd. (f/k/a The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd.) ("MUFG Bank"), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The motion is granted. SO ORDERED. Attorney Elizabeth A Cassady terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/24/2021) (vfr) Modified on 5/24/2021 (vfr).
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 393 OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE re: 347 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Fund Liquidation Holdings LLC, 318 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Standard Chartered Bank, Oversea-Chinese Banking Corporation Ltd., Australia and New Zealand Banking Group, Ltd., Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., BNP Paribas, S.A., UBS AG, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Agricole Corporate and Inves tment Bank, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited, United Overseas Bank Limited, Bank of America, N.A., Deutsche Bank AG, DBS Bank Ltd., 314 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval o f Class Action Settlement filed by Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Fund Liquidation Holdings LLC, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P. Because the APA does not effect the assignment of claims from FrontPoint to FLH, plaintiff lack s standing to bring its antitrust and breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing claims. Defendants' motion to dismiss the case is granted. Pursuant to my oral order at the May 2, 2019 hearing, Tr. at 5:11-16, plaintiff shall file an unredacted copy of the APA on the docket. See Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110, 124 (2d Cir. 2006). The motions for preliminary approval of the class settlements and to file a Fourth Amended Complaint are also denied. The clerk is instructed to terminate the motions (ECF 318, 314, 347), grant judgment to defendants, and close the case. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2019) (ne) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 302 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS re: 238 MOTION to Dismiss the Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Barclays Capital Inc., Royal Bank of Scotland Group Plc., Standard Chartered Bank, Citibank, N.A., DBS Group Holdings Ltd., CitiGroup Inc., Credit Suisse International, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Barclays Bank PLC, DBS Bank Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd., Australia and New Zealand Banking Group, Ltd., UBS Securities Japan Co., Ltd., Barclays PLC, Macquarie Bank Ltd., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Bank Of America Corporation, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., ING Groep NV, ING Bank N.V., Credit Suisse Group AG, Standard Chartered PLC, Oversea-Chinese Banking Corporation Ltd., BNP Paribas North America, Inc., Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., ING Capital Markets LLC, HSBC Bank US A, N.A., BNP Paribas, S.A., JPMorgan Chase & Co, UBS AG, BNP Paribas Prime Brokerage, Inc., HSBC USA Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, RBS Securities Japan Limited, Commerzbank AG, DBS Vickers Securities (USA) Inc., BNP Paribas Securities C orp., UOB Global Capital, LLC, HSBC Holdings plc, ANZ Securities, Inc., Credit Agricole S.A., The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited, Bank of America, N.A., United Overseas Bank Limited. For the reasons state above, defe ndants' motions are granted in part and denied in part, as follows: I. Antitrust Claims a. The antitrust claim (Count I) is dismissed without leave to amend as against the defendants who were not SIBOR Panel Members (ANZ Securities Inc., Bank o f America Corporation, Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC, BNP Bamibas North America Inc., BNP Bamibas Prime Brokerage Inc., BNP Bamibas Securities Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Commerzbank AG, Credit Agricole A.S., Credit Suisse G roup AG, Credit Suisse International, DBS Group Holdings LTD, DBS Vickers Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC Bank USA N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC USA Inc., ING Capital Markets LLC, ING Groep N.V., JP Morgan Chase & Co., M acquarie Bank LTD, Macquarie LTD, RBS Securities Japan Limited, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Standard Chartered PLC, UBS Securities Japan Co. LTD, and UOB Global Capital LLC). b. The antitrust claims remain as against the SIBOR Panel Members (Australia and New Zealand Banking Group, Bank of America N.A., The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd., BNP Paribas, Citibank N.A., Credit Suisse AG, DBS Bank Ltd, Deutsche Bank AG, The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Ltd., ING Bank N.V., J PMorgan Chase Bank N.A., OverseaChinese Banking Corporation Ltd, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Standard Chartered Bank, UBS AG, United Overseas Bank Ltd., and Credit Agricole CIB). c. The antitrust claims, as alleged by Plaintiff Sonterra, are dism issed without leave to amend. Since no claims for relief remain as to Sonterra, Sonterra's complaint is dismissed entirely. See Dkt. No. Dkt. No. 30. II. Personal Jurisdiction a. The Foreign Defendants who did not serve on the SIBOR Panel are di smissed without leave to amend for lack of personal jurisdiction (Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays PLC, Commerzbank AG, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, DBS Group Holdings LTD, HSBC Holdings PLC, ING Groep N.V., M acquarie Bank LTD., Macquarie LTD, RBS Securities Japan Limited, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Standard Chartered PLC, and UBS Securities Japan Co. LTD). III. RICO Claims a. Count II (RICO) and Count III (RICO conspiracy) are dismissed withou t leave to amend. IV. Breach of Implied Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing a. The motion to dismiss Count IV (breach of the covenant of good faith and fair dealing) for failure to state a claim is denied. V. Real Party in Interest a. Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend to substitute the real party in interest and allege the assignments of interest. The clerk shall terminate the motion (Dkt. No. 238). Plaintiffs shall file a third amended complaint to amend the caption, and reflect the r ulings in this opinion, by October 25, 2018. Defendants remaining in this case shall file their answers or otherwise respond by November 15, 2018. The parties shall appear for a status conference on November 28, 2018, at 2:30 P.M. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/4/2018) (ne)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS re: 144 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by Barclays Capital Inc., Royal Bank of Scotland Group Plc., Standa rd Chartered Bank, Citibank, N.A., DBS Group Holdings Ltd., CitiGroup Inc., Credit Suisse International, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Barclays Bank PLC, DBS Bank Ltd., Macquarie G roup Ltd., Australia and New Zealand Banking Group, Ltd., UBS Securities Japan Co., Ltd., Barclays PLC, Macquarie Bank Ltd., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Bank Of America Corporation, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., ING G roep NV, ING Bank N.V., Credit Suisse Group AG, Standard Chartered PLC, Oversea-Chinese Banking Corporation Ltd., BNP Paribas North America, Inc., Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., ING Capital Markets LLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., BNP Paribas, S.A., JPMorgan Chase & Co, UBS AG, BNP Paribas Prime Brokerage, Inc., HSBC USA Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, RBS Securities Japan Limited, Commerzbank AG, DBS Vickers Securities (USA) Inc., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., UOB Gl obal Capital, LLC, HSBC Holdings plc, ANZ Securities, Inc., Credit Agricole S.A., The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited, Bank of America, N.A., United Overseas Bank Limited. After considering the briefs submitted by the pa rties and their oral arguments, for the reasons discussed in this opinion and order, I hold that defendants' motion is granted in part and denied in part. I grant plaintiffs leave to file a second amended complaint, except with respect to their unjust enrichment claim, which is dismissed with prejudice. The Foreign Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is granted. All claims against the Foreign Defendants are dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend to make plausible allegations of personal jurisdiction over the Foreign Defendants. Defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint for lack of Article III standing is denied. Defendants' motion to dismiss Count I (antitrust) as alleged by pla intiff FrontPoint is denied as alleged against the defendants who served on the SIBOR panel. Defendants' motion to dismiss Count I (antitrust) as alleged by plaintiff Sonterra is granted, for failure to establish any connection between defendant s' conduct and its alleged injury. Defendants' motion to dismiss Counts II and III (RICO and RICO conspiracy) is granted. Defendants Deutsche Bank and Citibank's motion to dismiss Count IV (Frontpoint's claim for breach of the cov enant of good faith and fair dealing) is granted. Defendants' motion to dismiss Count V (unjust enrichment) is granted as a matter of law. Count V is dismissed with prejudice and without leave to amend. The clerk shall terminate the motion (Dkt. No. 144). Plaintiffs shall file a second amended complaint by September 18, 2017. Defendants shall answer or move by October 18, 2017, and as further set forth in this order. (Amended Pleadings due by 9/18/2017.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/18/2017) (ras)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, Ltd. et al v. Citibank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiGroup Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Bank of Scotland PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Bank of Scotland Group Plc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Securities Japan Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities Japan Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ING Groep NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ING Bank N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Prime Brokerage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oversea-Chinese Banking Corporation Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Agricole S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Group AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Chartered Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Chartered PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBS Bank Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBS Group Holdings Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBS Vickers Securities (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Overseas Bank Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Australia and New Zealand Banking Group, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Holdings plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC North America Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquarie Bank Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquarie Group Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerzbank AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does Nos. 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Geoffrey Milbank Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Raymond Peter Girnys
Represented By: Geoffrey Milbank Horn
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Raymond Peter Girnys
Represented By: Geoffrey Milbank Horn
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?