The Medical Society of the State of New York et al v. UnitedHealth Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Medical Society of the State of New York, Society of New York Office Based Surgery Facilities and Podiatric OR of Midtown Manhattan, P.C.
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Service LLC, Optum Group, LLC and Optum, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv05265
Filed: July 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Nassau
Presiding Judge: J. Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER denying 237 Motion to Compel; granting 244 Motion to Compel. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration is GRANTED, and upon reconsideration, Plaintiffs' motion to compel production (Dkt. No. 231) is granted. Defendants' motion to compel is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at Docket Numbers 237 and 244. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/16/2020) (ks)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER denying 231 Letter Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 232 Letter Motion to Seal. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' motion to compel is DENIED and their motion for a conference is DENIED as moot. Additionally, Plaintiffs& #039; motion to seal is GRANTED with respect to Exhibit B and DENIED with respect to Exhibits A and C, which shall be filed publicly. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at Docket Numbers 231 and 232. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/7/2020) (rro)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER re: 217 Notice (Other), filed by Oxford Health Plans LLC, Optum Group, LLC, Optum, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Service LLC, UnitedHealth Group Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc. Accordingly, the request to withdraw is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Attorneys Gregory F. Jacob and Danielle C. Gray as counsel for the Defendants. SO ORDERED. Attorney Danielle Carim Gray and Gregory Frederick Jacob terminated. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/3/2020) (va)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 215 OPINION AND ORDER: re: 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Oxford Health Plans LLC, Optum Group, LLC, Optum, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Service LLC, UnitedHealth Group Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., 158 MOTION to Strike The Expert Report Of Michael D. Miscoe. filed by Oxford Health Plans LLC, Optum Group, LLC, Optum, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., United HealthCare Service LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants motion to strike is DENIED and Defendants' motion for summary judgment i s GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The parties are directed to file a status letter on or before April 27, 2020. The letter should also indicate whether the parties are interested in pursuing mediation before a bench trial is scheduled. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at Docket Numbers 158 and 161. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/26/2020) (js)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 OPINION AND ORDER: re: 208 MOTION for Reconsideration . filed by Oxford Health Plans LLC, Optum Group, LLC, Optum, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Service LLC, UnitedHealth Group Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants motion for reconsideration is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 208. So ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/18/2019) (js)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 OPINION AND ORDER re: 142 MOTION to Certify Class . filed by Society of New York Office Based Surgery Facilities, The Medical Society of the State of New York, Columbia East Side Surgery, P.C.. For the foregoing reasons, Plainti ffs' motion for class certification is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. A class composed of "any United Plan member, or member's valid assignee, whose claim for facility fees for services rendered by an out-of network OBS provider a ccredited under Section 230-d was denied," as set out in Part III, is certified for purposes of seeking declaratory and injunctive relief. The Court hereby appoints Columbia, MSSNY, and NYOBS as representatives of the certified class, and appoints Zuckerman Spaeder LLP and Buttaci Leardi & Werner LLC as co-lead class counsel. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 142. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/11/2019) (kv)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 OPINION AND ORDER: re: 97 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Counterclaims filed by Columbia East Side Surgery, P.C., 107 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Oxford Health Plans LLC, Optum Group, LLC, Optum, Inc., United Healthcare Serv ices, Inc., United Health Care Insurance Company, United Health Care Service LLC, United Health Group Inc., United Health Care Services, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, Columbia's motion to dismiss United's counterclaims is GRANTED, and Uni ted's motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTED. United shall file amended counterclaims, if any, within 21 days of the date of this opinion. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at Docket Numbers 97 and 107. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/28/2019) (ama) Modified on 3/28/2019 (ama). Modified on 3/28/2019 (ama).
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 OPINION AND ORDER re: 75 MOTION to Strike Document No. 73 (Notice of Defendants' Motion to Strike the Class Action Complaint) filed by Oxford Health Plans LLC, Optum Group, LLC, Optum, Inc., United Healthcare Services, I nc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Service LLC, UnitedHealth Group Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, United's motion to strike the class allegations from the Complaint is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 75. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/6/2018) (mml)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 OPINION AND ORDER: re: 50 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Oxford Health Plans LLC, Optum Group, LLC, Optum, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Service LLC, UnitedHealth Group Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., 32 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint filed by Optum Group, LLC, Optum, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., United Hea lthCare Service LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, United's motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. The motion to dismiss the superseded complaint at Docket Number 32 is DENIED as moot. United shall file an answer to the surviving claims by September 25, 2017. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at Docket Number 32 and 50. The Clerk of Court is further directed to dismiss Plaintiffs Dr. Jeffrey Adl er; Podiatric OR of Midtown Manhattan, P.C.; Dr. Darrick Antell; and Dr. Albert B. Knapp, M.D., P.C. in the name of his business only. SO ORDERED., United HealthCare Insurance Company answer due 9/25/2017; United HealthCare Service LLC answer due 9/ 25/2017; UnitedHealth Group Inc. answer due 9/25/2017; United HealthCare Services, Inc. answer due 9/25/2017., Darrick Antell (in his own name and in the name of his business), Podiatric OR of Midtown Manhattan, P.C. (on its own behalf, on behalf of its patients, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jeffrey Adler (in his own name and in the name of his business) and Albert B. Knapp, M.D., P.C. (in his own name and in the name of his business, which is identical, both directly and as the representative of PATIENT G, and on behalf of all others similarly situated) terminated. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/11/2017) (ama)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Medical Society of the State of New York et al v. UnitedHealth Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Medical Society of the State of New York
Represented By: Jason Samuel Cowart
Represented By: Donn Brian Hufford
Represented By: John William Leardi
Represented By: Cyril V. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Society of New York Office Based Surgery Facilities
Represented By: Jason Samuel Cowart
Represented By: Donn Brian Hufford
Represented By: John William Leardi
Represented By: Cyril V. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Podiatric OR of Midtown Manhattan, P.C.
Represented By: Jason Samuel Cowart
Represented By: Donn Brian Hufford
Represented By: John William Leardi
Represented By: Cyril V. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Inc.
Represented By: Sloane Ackerman
Represented By: Brian David Boyle
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Gregory Frederick Jacob
Represented By: Anton Metlitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Sloane Ackerman
Represented By: Brian David Boyle
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Gregory Frederick Jacob
Represented By: Anton Metlitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Insurance Company
Represented By: Sloane Ackerman
Represented By: Brian David Boyle
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Gregory Frederick Jacob
Represented By: Anton Metlitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Service LLC
Represented By: Sloane Ackerman
Represented By: Brian David Boyle
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Gregory Frederick Jacob
Represented By: Anton Metlitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Group, LLC
Represented By: Sloane Ackerman
Represented By: Brian David Boyle
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Gregory Frederick Jacob
Represented By: Anton Metlitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Sloane Ackerman
Represented By: Brian David Boyle
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Gregory Frederick Jacob
Represented By: Anton Metlitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?