In re Signet Jewelers Limited Securities Litigation
Plaintiff: Dube, Lyubomir Spasov, Susan Dube and Nebil Aydin
Defendant: Signet Jewelers Limited, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Virginia C. Drosos, Michele Santana and Michael Barnes
Petitioner: Heather Salway and Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund
Interested Party: Maria Mikolchak
Lead Plaintiff: Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi
Intervenor: Irving Firemen's Relief & Retirement System
Consolidated Plaintiff: Scopia LB LLC, Marcato International Master Fund, LTD., Scopia Long LLC, Scopia Partners LLC, Scopia PX LLC, Scopia Long QP LLC, Scopia International Master Fund LP, Scopia PX International Master Fund LP, Scopia LB International Master Fund LP, Scopia Windmill Fund LP, Scopia Long International Master Fund LP and Marcato LP
Case Number: 1:2016cv06728
Filed: August 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Stewart D Aaron
Referring Judge: Jesse M Furman
2 Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 246 TRUE COPY ORDER of USCA as to #242 Order of USCA pursuant to FRCP 23(f). USCA Case Number 19-3837. The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to Local Rule 42.1. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered". Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 1/16/2020. (tp)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #246 USCA Order. (tp)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 19-2268. Petitioners request, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(f), leave to appeal the district court's order granting Respondent's motion for class certification. Petitioners also move to file a reply and to supplement the appendix. Both parties move to file documents under seal. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion to file a reply and the motions to file documents under seal are GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the motion to supplement the appendix is DENIED because Petitioners have not shown that the requirements of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 10(e)(2) are met. Finally, it is ORDERED that the Rule 23(f) petition is GRANTED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 12/18/2019. (nd)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). USCA Case Number 19-3837, Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #163 Declaration in Support of Motion,, filed by Virginia C. Drosos, Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #82 Notice of Appearance filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #61 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Irving Firemen's Relief & Retirement System, #99 Letter, filed by Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #76 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,,,,, filed by Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund, #10 Response filed by Susan Dube, #146 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,, #101 MOTION to Dismiss The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by Virginia C. Drosos, Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #109 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Virginia C. Drosos, Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #45 Affidavit of Service Complaints filed by Lyubomir Spasov, Susan Dube, #1 Complaint filed by Susan Dube, #156 Memo Endorsement, #96 Amended Complaint, filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #120 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #52 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #178 Letter, filed by Virginia C. Drosos, Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #89 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #121 Notice of Appearance filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #64 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Heather Salway, #179 Letter filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #49 Transcript,, #44 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lyubomir Spasov, Susan Dube, #91 Declaration in Support of Motion,,, filed by Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #48 Affidavit of Service Complaints filed by Lyubomir Spasov, Susan Dube, #122 Notice of Appearance filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #172 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief . filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #132 Memo Endorsement, #131 Letter, filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #170 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion filed by Virginia C. Drosos, Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #77 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund, #137 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Michael Barnes, #71 Notice (Other) filed by Heather Salway, #150 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Virginia C. Drosos, Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #50 Notice of Filing Transcript,, #129 Proposed Protective Order filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #29 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jeremy A. Lieberman dated March 1, 2017. filed by Lyubomir Spasov, Susan Dube, #86 Amended Complaint, filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #159 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #153 Memo Endorsement, Set Deadlines, #106 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Virginia C. Drosos, Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #94 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Joseph S. Allerhand dated December 21, 2017. filed by Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #176 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, #18 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Lyubomir Spasov, Susan Dube, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons filed by Susan Dube, #40 Notice of Appearance filed by Irving Firemen's Relief & Retirement System, #81 Notice of Appearance filed by Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund, #158 Declaration in Support of Motion,, filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #90 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #62 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Irving Firemen's Relief & Retirement System, #130 Protective Order, #168 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Virginia C. Drosos, Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #70 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #66 MOTION to Appoint Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . filed by Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund, #34 Request for Issuance of Summons filed by Lyubomir Spasov, Susan Dube, #24 Notice of Appearance filed by Lyubomir Spasov, Susan Dube, #58 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,, #41 Notice of Appearance filed by Maria Mikolchak, #59 Notice of Change of Address, filed by Lyubomir Spasov, Susan Dube, #69 Declaration in Support of Motion,,, filed by Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund, #27 Notice of Change of Address filed by Susan Dube, #112 MOTION to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 111] the Fifth Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by Virginia C. Drosos, Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #103 Declaration in Support of Motion,,, filed by Virginia C. Drosos, Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #171 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Virginia C. Drosos, Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #35 Request for Issuance of Summons filed by Lyubomir Spasov, Susan Dube, #7 Order, Set Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, #142 MOTION to Certify Class . filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #118 Declaration in Support of Motion,, filed by Virginia C. Drosos, Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #85 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines,,,,,, #73 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, filed by Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund, #134 Letter, filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #65 MOTION to Appoint Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #87 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Stacy Nettleton dated November 21, 2017. filed by Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #68 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #33 Amended Complaint, filed by Lyubomir Spasov, Susan Dube, #116 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #144 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #55 Letter filed by Lyubomir Spasov, Susan Dube, #60 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Irving Firemen's Relief & Retirement System, #166 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #117 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Virginia C. Drosos, Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #67 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, filed by Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund, #125 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #105 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #174 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #42 Letter, filed by Maria Mikolchak, #75 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund, #36 Summons Issued, #151 Letter filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #128 Memo Endorsement, Set Hearings,, #164 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #92 Order, Set Deadlines,,,,,,,,,,,, #83 Notice of Appearance filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #113 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Virginia C. Drosos, Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #46 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,, #80 Declaration in Support of Motion,,,, filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #111 Amended Complaint, filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #102 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Virginia C. Drosos, Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes, #141 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Michele Santana, #98 Response, filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #22 Letter filed by Lyubomir Spasov, Susan Dube, #133 Case Management Plan,,,, #56 Letter filed by Irving Firemen's Relief & Retirement System, #180 Memo Endorsement, #54 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,, #124 MOTION for Brenna D. Nelinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15999484. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, #14 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, #135 Stipulation and Order,,, #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP and Pomerantz LLP
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting #243 Letter Motion to Stay. As long as this appeal is proceeding on an expedited basis, I will grant the stay. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/21/2019) (mml)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00 receipt number 465401248955 on 11/21/2019 re: #242 USCA Order granting leave to appeal pursuant to FRCP 23(f). [USCA Case No. 19-3837].. (nd)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 243 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Joseph S. Allerhand dated November 20, 2019. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.(Allerhand, Joseph)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 19-2268. Petitioners request, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(f), leave to appeal the district court's order granting Respondent's motion for class certification. Petitioners also move to file a reply and to supplement the appendix. Both parties move to file documents under seal. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion to file a reply and the motions to file documents under seal are GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the motion to supplement the appendix is DENIED because Petitioners have not shown that the requirements of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 10(e)(2) are met. Finally, it is ORDERED that the Rule 23(f) petition is GRANTED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 11/20/2019. [New case number assigned: 19-3837].(nd)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order APPEAL FILING FEE of $505.00 due for the #242 USCA Order granting leave to appeal pursuant to FRCP 23(f). (nd)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Abram Harrod, III on behalf of Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Harrod, James)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Uslaner, Jonathan)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Richard A. Bodnar dated October 31, 2019 re: the Court's October 28, 2019 Order. Document filed by Marcato International Master Fund, LTD., Marcato LP, Scopia International Master Fund LP, Scopia LB International Master Fund LP, Scopia LB LLC, Scopia Long International Master Fund LP, Scopia Long LLC, Scopia Long QP LLC, Scopia PX International Master Fund LP, Scopia PX LLC, Scopia Partners LLC, Scopia Windmill Fund LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order in the Scopia Action, #2 Text of Proposed Order in the Marcato Action)(Bodnar, Richard)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 238 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting #236 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. OK. Expert Deposition due by 12/13/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/30/2019) (mml)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 236 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from John Rizio-Hamilton dated October 29, 2019. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi.(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TELEPHONE CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/24/2019 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(kgo)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 10/24/2019 before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2020.(kgo)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS FOR ALL PURPOSES WITH PREVIOUSLY-FILED ACTIONS, PLACING THESE TWO LATE-FILED ACTIONS ON THE SAME DISCOVERY SCHEDULE AS THE PENDING ACTIONS, AND BARRING THE DUPLICATION OR REOPENING OF COMPLETED DISCOVERY OR RULINGS: These cases are consolidated for all purposes with In re Signet Jewelers Limited Securities Litigation, 16 Civ. 6728 (CM). No further filings will be accepted under these civil action numbers. All filings must be made in In Re Signet, as further set forth herein. The Clerk of Court is directed to close these docket numbers administratively so that no further filings can be made under the 2019 docket numbers. The parties to these new actions are on the same schedule as the other parties. Fact discovery ended on September 13, 2019, and it will not be reopened, so these plaintiffs will have to use the discovery already taken and are bound by rulings already made. Expert discovery ends on December 6, 2019, and it will not be extended to accommodate these late-comers. Having waited this long to join the party, these new plaintiffs come to the case as it stands. There will be no extension of deadlines to accommodate them, no reopening of any matter already concluded. The defendants' answer to the Fifth Amended Complaint in In Re Signet will be deemed applicable to these newly filed complaints unless Defendants wish to file a supplemental answer, in which case they must do so by November 8, 2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/28/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-06728-CM-SDA, 1:19-cv-09916-CM, 1:19-cv-09917-CM(mro)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron: Telephone Conference held on 10/24/2019. (kl)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER denying #220 Letter Motion for Conference. Pending before the Court is a Letter Motion by Defendants to compel non-party Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC ("Cohen Milstein") to comply with Defendants' subpoena issued on September 12, 2019 (the "Subpoena") seeking communications between Cohen Milstein and any media company regarding the Jock litigation. (Def. Letter Motion, ECF No. 220.) For the reasons set forth below, Defendants' Letter Motion is DENIED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/24/2019) (kl)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 231 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER: Defendant has objected to so much of the September 5, 2019 order of Magistrate Judge Aaron as required it to produce, or decline to allow Defendant to claw back, certain documents that Judge Aaron concluded, after in camera review, were not subject to the attorney client privilege, either because of the nature of the communications contained therein or because the privilege had been waived. Defendant also objects to Judge Aaron's legal conclusion concerning the privileged nature of communications to which both attorneys and third party consultants who were not attorneys (public relations firms) were party. I affirm Judge Aaron's order in all respects, as further set forth in this Order. Judge Aaron generously granted the parties time to meet and confer about documents that he had not yet reviewed, but that were being withheld by Signet notwithstanding the fact that they were copied to Ogilvy & Mather and/or Joele Frank. I assume that, now that his earlier order has been affirmed, Defendant will abandon its misguided efforts to withhold documents that do not fall within what this court deems to be the attorney-client privilege. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/7/2019) (mml) Modified on 11/25/2019 (mml).
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting #227 Motion to Seal Document. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/23/2019) (kl) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting #222 Motion to Seal Document. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/23/2019) (kl) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document #224 Response to Motion, addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from John Rizio-Hamilton dated October 23, 2019. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi.(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Joseph S. Allerhand dated October 22, 2019 re: #220 LETTER MOTION for Conference to Compel Non-Party Cohen Milstein addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Joseph S. Allerhand dated October 11, 2019. . Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Allerhand, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 225 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Stacy Nettleton dated October 21, 2019 re: October 7, 2019 order [ECF 219]. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.(Nettleton, Stacy)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Joseph M. Sellers dated October 18, 2019 re: #220 LETTER MOTION for Conference to Compel Non-Party Cohen Milstein addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Joseph S. Allerhand dated October 11, 2019. [REDACTED]. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Rizio-Hamilton, John)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from John Rizio-Hamilton dated October 18, 2019 re: #220 LETTER MOTION for Conference to Compel Non-Party Cohen Milstein addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Joseph S. Allerhand dated October 11, 2019. . Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Rizio-Hamilton, John)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document #220 LETTER MOTION for Conference to Compel Non-Party Cohen Milstein addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Joseph S. Allerhand dated October 11, 2019. addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Joseph S. Allerhand dated October 17, 2019. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.(Allerhand, Joseph)
October 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: (Responses due by 10/18/2019, Replies due by 10/22/2019.), (Telephone Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron.) (kl)
October 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER re: #220 LETTER MOTION for Conference to Compel Non-Party Cohen Milstein addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Joseph S. Allerhand dated October 11, 2019. filed by Virginia C. Drosos, Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes: No later than Friday, 10/18/2019, Cohen Milstein shall respond to Defendants' Letter Motion (ECF No. 220). Any reply by Defendants shall be filed no later than Tuesday, 10/22/2019. A Telephone conference shall be held on Thursday, 10/24/2019, at 2 p.m. to address the Letter Motion. The parties shall call the Court's conference line (212-805-0110) once all parties are on the line. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/12/2019) Judge Aaron's Chambers shall email a copy of this Order to Cohen Milstein.(Aaron, Stewart)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 LETTER MOTION for Conference to Compel Non-Party Cohen Milstein addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Joseph S. Allerhand dated October 11, 2019. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Cohen Milstein Subpoena, #2 Exhibit 2 - NY Times Mar. 24, 2014 Article, #3 Exhibit 3 - Washington Post Feb. 27, 2014 Article, #4 Exhibit 4 - Cohen Milstein R&Os, #5 Exhibit 5 - Sterling Discovery Motion in Jock Arbitration (under seal), #6 Exhibit 6 - Claimants Sur-Reply in Jock Arbitration (under seal), #7 Exhibit 7 - Arbitrator Roberts April 14, 2017 Order)(Allerhand, Joseph)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER: Following Chief Judge McMahon's Order Affirming my September 5, 2019 Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, dated October 7, 2019 (ECF No. 217), it is hereby ORDERED, as follows: 1. In view of Judge McMahon's Order, Defendants shall re-review those emails supplied to me for in camera review with Defendants' letter of September 27, 2019 (ECF No.209), as well as those emails in category nos. 2 and 3 that were supplied to me for in camera review with Defendants' letter of September 23, 2019 (ECF No. 200), and shall review the Teneo emails referenced in Defendant's letter of September 27, 2019. 2. Defendants shall not withhold or redact emails to or from public relations ("PR") firms,or on which PR firms are copied, unless Defendants can demonstrate that any particular email was sent for the purpose of obtaining legal advice from counsel, and to that end, Defendants must demonstrate for each such email what was said that communicated this desire and how including a PR firm on the email would have facilitated the giving of legal advice. 3. With respect to the emails discussed in paragraph 1 above, no later than October 21, 2019, Defendants shall (a) produce to Plaintiff unredacted versions of such emails, and/or (b) provide to me for my in camera review emails that are withheld or redacted, along with a letter setting forth as to each email withheld or redacted the showing set forth in paragraph 2 above. 4. This Order supersedes my Order of September 27, 2019 regarding the deadline for the Teneo-related in camera submission (ECF No. 210). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/7/2019) (kl)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE JUDGE AARON'S SEPTEMBER 5, 2019 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL: Judge Aaron generously granted the parties time to meet and confer about documents that he had not yet reviewed, but that were being withheld by Signet notwithstanding the fact that they were copied to Ogilvy & Mather and/or Joele Frank. I assume that, now that his earlier order has been affirmed, Defendant will abandon its misguided efforts to withhold documents that do not fall within what this court deems to be the attorney-client privilege. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/7/2019) (ks)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 TEMPORARY SEALING ORDER: The court has today filed under seal a copy of a decision affirming in its entirety the order of The Hon. Stewart Aaron, U.S.M.J., which directed the production of certain documents by Defendants in these consolidated securities fraud actions. A redacted copy of the order has been publicly filed. The redactions discuss the text of the email chain that was the subject of the appeal. As I have ordered the document produced, and affirmed that any privilege was waived, I believe the unredacted version of the opinion should be unsealed and be publicly available. I will order the unredacted version unsealed on Friday, October 11 at 12 noon unless I am convinced that there is some further remedy available to Defendants that would necessitate continued sealing. If Defendants have anything to say, they must file their request for more permanent sealing by Thursday, October 10, at 10 AM (in deference to Yom Kippur, should any counsel be observing the day, I am not requiring a filing on Wednesday). If Defendants seek further sealing, Plaintiffs have until 10 AM on Friday, October 11 to make their position known. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/7/2019) (mml)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting #212 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. After consulting with Judge Aaron - you can have three extra weeks not six. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/2/2019) (mml)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from John Rizio-Hamilton dated October 1, 2019 re: #212 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Re: Expert Reports addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Stacy Nettleton dated September 30, 2019. . Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Rizio-Hamilton, John)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Re: Expert Reports addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Stacy Nettleton dated September 30, 2019. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Sept. 4, 2019 Email from M. Traylor to J. Allerhand, R. Carangelo, S. Nettleton, R. Ruff, and N. Kaplanov)(Nettleton, Stacy)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 RESPONSE re: #196 Objection (non-motion) [Lead Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Objections to the Magistrate Judge's September 5, 2019 Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel]. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER re: #209 Letter, filed by Virginia C. Drosos, Ronald Ristau, Mark Light, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michele Santana, Michael Barnes: Defendants shall submit the Teneo documents for the Court's in camera review no later than 10/16/2019. The Court will not be making piece-meal rulings regarding the documents submitted by Defendants, but will issue its rulings regarding all documents at issue at one time. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 9/27/2019) (Aaron, Stewart)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Stacy Nettleton dated September 27, 2019 re: In Camera Submission pursuant to Sept. 21, 2019 order [ECF 199].. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.(Nettleton, Stacy)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #207 Letter, filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. ENDORSEMENT: Fine. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/26/2019) (mml)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from John Rizio-Hamilton dated September 26, 2019 re: Response to Defendants' Objections to September 5, 2019 Order. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi.(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER denying without prejudice #194 Letter Motion for Discovery: Plaintiff's Letter Motion (ECF No. 194) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. See Imperial Chemicals Indus., PLC v. Barr Labs., Inc., 126 F.R.D. 467, 471 (S.D.N.Y. 1989) ("As a general rule, it is preferable that cases be decided on their merits, not by denying parties access to relevant evidence as a penalty for procedural irregularities."). If, after meeting and conferring, the third parties' counsel and Defendants' counsel are unable to resolve any objections asserted to the subpoenas (see Pl.'s 9/18/19 Ltr. Motion at 3 n.1), and motions to quash are filed in this Court, in reaching its decision on such motions, the Court will consider Plaintiff's timeliness objections at that time. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 9/25/2019) (Aaron, Stewart)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #204 Order on Motion for Discovery, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (kl)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from John Rizio-Hamilton dated 09/24/2019 re: #194 LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from John Rizio-Hamilton dated September 18, 2019. . Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER: With respect to the Court's Order of 9/21/19 (ECF No. 199), for the avoidance of doubt, the documents that Defendants are to provide to the Court for its in camera review no later than 9/27/2019 are only those documents in category nos. 2 and 3 set forth in the parties' 9/20/19 joint status letter (ECF No. 198) that were not provided to the Court with Defendants' 9/23/19 Letter (ECF No. 200). Defendants need not provide to the Court documents in category no. 1 since Plaintiff is not seeking the production of such documents. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 9/24/2019) (Text Only Order) (kl)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Joseph S. Allerhand dated September 23, 2019 re: #194 LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from John Rizio-Hamilton dated September 18, 2019. . Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Deposition Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 - Timecard Statement 2012-2013, #3 Exhibit 3 - Timecard Statement 2015, #4 Exhibit 4 - Jock Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 - NSC Verification Lynchburg College, #6 Exhibit 6 - NSC Verification Univ. of Va., #7 Exhibit 7 - NSC Verification Central VA Comm. College, #8 Exhibit 8 - Mustard Seed Kidz Response, #9 Exhibit 9 - June 14 Letter from S. Nettleton, #10 Exhibit 10 - June 26 Email from N. Kaplanov, #11 Exhibit 11 - Document Subpoena, #12 Exhibit 12 - Email Chain with S.Cochran, #13 Exhibit 13 - Aug. 12 Email from S.Cochran, #14 Exhibit 14 - Cohen Milstein Subpoena)(Allerhand, Joseph)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Stacy Nettleton dated September 23, 2019 re: In Camera Submission pursuant to Sept. 21, 2019 order [ECF 199]. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.(Nettleton, Stacy)
September 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #198 Letter. ENDORSEMENT: No later than 9/23/2019, Defendants shall provide to the Court for its in camera review 20 examples of documents from each of the categories of documents set forth in ECF No. 198. Thereafter, no later than 9/27/2019, Defendants shall provide to the Court for its in camera review all the documents at issue. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 9/21/2019) (Aaron, Stewart) Modified on 9/23/2019 (kl).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Joseph S. Allerhand dated September 20, 2019 re: Status Pursuant to September 5, 2019 order [ECF 187]. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.(Allerhand, Joseph)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 DECLARATION of Joseph S. Allerhand in Support re: #196 Objection (non-motion). Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Email of March 1, 2017)(Allerhand, Joseph)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Objection re: #187 Memorandum & Opinion,,, . Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Allerhand, Joseph)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER with respect to #194 Letter Motion for Discovery. The undersigned will be handling the resolution of Plaintiff's September 18, 2019 letter motion (ECF No. 194) in accordance with the Order of Reference issued August 20, 2019 (ECF No. 182) and reassigned to Judge Aaron on August 28, 2019. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's letter no later than Monday, September 23, 2019, and Plaintiff shall reply no later than Tuesday, September 24, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 9/19/2019) (js)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/23/2019 Replies due by 9/24/2019. (js)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from John Rizio-Hamilton dated September 18, 2019. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi.(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER denying #191 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. No stay. No delay. Objections due as presently scheduled. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/13/2019) (mro)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from John Rizio-Hamilton dated September 12, 2019 re: #191 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Joseph S. Allerhand dated September 12, 2019. . Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Rizio-Hamilton, John)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Joseph S. Allerhand dated September 12, 2019. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.(Allerhand, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER re: #189 Order on Motion for Conference. Following a Telephone conference with the parties held today, the Court hereby grants an extension of Defendants' time to produce the documents set forth in the second sentence of the Conclusion contained in my 9/5/19 Opinion and Order (ECF No. 187), so long as objections are timely filed by Defendants to that Opinion and Order. Such extension shall expire five days after Chief Judge McMahon rules on Defendants' objections. If Defendants fail to timely file objections to my Opinion and Order, the extension shall lapse. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 9/11/2019) (Text Only Order) (kl)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron: Telephone Conference held on 9/11/2019. (kl)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER terminating #188 Letter Motion for Conference. ENDORSEMENT: The Court shall hold a Telephone conference on Wednesday, September 11, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. to discuss issues raised by Defendants. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at 212-805-0110 once all parties are on the line. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 9/10/2019) (kl)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Joseph S. Allerhand dated September 10, 2019. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.(Allerhand, Joseph)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (kl)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 OPINION AND ORDER re: #181 LETTER MOTION to Compel addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from John Rizio-Hamilton dated August 19, 2019, filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' Letter-Motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendants shall produce to Plaintiff within seven (7) days of the date of this Order (1) unredacted versions of Exhibits B to E of Plaintiffs Letter-Motion; (2) unredacted versions of the documents contained in Tabs 2, 4, 6, 7, 8 and 9; and (3) a partially unredacted version of Tab 10, as set forth above. No later than September 13, 2019, the parties shall meet and confer as set forth above. No later than September 20, 2019, the parties shall file a joint letter with the Court advising the Court of the status of the meet and confer process. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 9/5/2019) (kl)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron: Telephone Conference held on 9/4/2019. Court Reporter Karen Gorlaski. (kl)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Joseph S. Allerhand dated August 30, 2019 re: August 28, 2019 Order (ECF No. 184). Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpted Privilege Log)(Allerhand, Joseph)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER re: 184 Order: My prior Order (ECF No. 184), in part, directed Defendants to "email to the Court (Aaron_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) for its in camera review unredacted copies of the emails attached as Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Letter-Motion (ECF No. 181-2)." I had intended to direct Defendants to email to the Court for its in camera review all the redacted documents that were attached to Plaintiff's Letter-Motion (ECF No. 181). It therefore is HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants email to the Court for its in camera review unredacted copies of the emails attached as Exhibits B, C, D and E to Plaintiff's Letter-Motion (ECF Nos. 181-2 to 181-5). With respect to Exhibit B, they shall do so no later than today (8/30/2019); with respect to Exhibits C, D and E, they shall do so today, if feasible, and if not feasible, no later than 9/3/2019 at 12 noon. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 8/30/2019) (Text Only Order) (Aaron, Stewart)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER: The parties shall appear for a Telephone conference to address Plaintiff's Letter-Motion (ECF No. 181) on Wednesday. September 4, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. The parties shall jointly call the Court's conference line at 212-805-0110 once all parties are on the line. No later than Friday, August 30, 2019, Defendants shall: (1) email to the Court (Aaron_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) for its in camera review unredacted copies of the emails attached as Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Letter-Motion (ECF No. 181-2); and (2) file on ECF a document containing those privilege log entries that reflect communications with Signet's PR firms, or on which Signet's PR firms were copied. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 8/28/2019) (Text Only Order) (kl)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (wb)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron, for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger no longer referred to the case. Motions referred to Stewart D. Aaron. (wb)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Joseph S. Allerhand dated August 22, 2019 re: #181 LETTER MOTION to Compel addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from John Rizio-Hamilton dated August 19, 2019. . Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Capitol Forum Article, #2 Exhibit 2 - Washington Post Article)(Allerhand, Joseph)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. Motions referred to Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/20/2019) (rro)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 LETTER MOTION to Compel addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from John Rizio-Hamilton dated August 19, 2019. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #178 Letter. ENDORSEMENT: I agree with Plaintiff's counsel - my ruling is crystal clear. There is nothing to clarify. Your understanding is completely, totally and utterly WRONG. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/11/2019) (jwh) Modified on 7/12/2019 (jwh).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from John Rizio-Hamilton dated July 11, 2019 re: Defendants' request for clarification. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi.(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Joseph S. Allerhand dated July 11, 2019 re: Seeking Clarification of Order. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.(Allerhand, Joseph)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION granting #142 Motion to Certify Class. Plaintiff's motion to certify a class is granted in accordance with this opinion. As stated earlier, the Class modified to encompass all persons and entities who purchased or otherwise acquired Signet common stock from August 29, 2013 to May 25, 2017. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Dkt. No. 142. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/10/2019) (mro)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER denying #172 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. ENDORSEMENT: The motion is denied. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Dkt. No. 172. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/1/2019) (mml)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 DECLARATION of John Rizio-Hamilton in Support re: #172 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief .. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Lead Plaintiff's Proposed Submission (Redacted Proposed Brief; Redacted Proposed Declaration; Sealed Exhibits), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - In re Elysium Health Memo Endorsement, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - In re JPM Order)(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #172 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief . (Redacted). Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Rizio-Hamilton, John)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief . Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi.(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 DECLARATION of Joseph S. Allerhand in Opposition re: #142 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R - Chart: Information Allegedly Revealed by the Post Article and Where It Appears in Prior Disclosures, #2 Exhibit S - Jock Class Certification Brief (June 21, 2013), #3 Exhibit T - Jock Class Determination Award (February 2, 2015))(Allerhand, Joseph)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #142 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Allerhand, Joseph)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION denying #167 Motion for Reargument. It remains to be seen whether Signet investors in fact considered Signet's code statements material. But as a matter of law, and in light of the concrete, specific, and voluminous allegations contained in the FAC, Defendants are simply incorrect that Signet's code statements constituted inactionable puffery. The motion is denied. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Dkt. No. 167. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/19/2019) (mml)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #167 MOTION for Reargument re: #166 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, . . Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Allerhand, Joseph)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MOTION for Reargument re: #166 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, . Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.(Allerhand, Joseph)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS denying #149 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Based on the foregoing, Defendants' motion is denied. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Dkt. No. 149. This constitutes the decision and order of the Court. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/11/2019) (mml)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #142 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Rizio-Hamilton, John)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #142 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Rizio-Hamilton, John)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 DECLARATION of Joseph S. Allerhand in Support re: #149 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings .. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt of Deposition Transcript of Matthew Kamm, dated March 19, 2019 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 2 - Signet's Code of Business Conduct and Ethics, dated February 27, 2014, #3 Exhibit 3 - Signet's Code of Ethics for Senior Officers, dated February 27, 2014)(Allerhand, Joseph)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #149 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . . Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Allerhand, Joseph)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #149 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . . Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal)(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 DECLARATION of John Rizio-Hamilton in Support re: #142 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hartzmark Signet Rebuttal Report, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Maloney Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit C - Email from Rizio-Hamilton to Ruff, #4 Exhibit D - CFPB/NYAG Stipulated Final Judgment and Order, #5 Exhibit E - Excerpts from Ferrell Deposition Transcript, #6 Exhibit F - New York Times Article, #7 Exhibit G - Corr. App'x C)(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #142 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Rizio-Hamilton, John)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #154 Letter filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. ENDORSEMENT: I have reviewed both letters. Lead Plaintiff EBT will go forward a scheduled. There will be no stay pending adjudication ofhe recently filed Rule 12(c) motion or for any other reason. An order of reference to the Magistrate will issue in case efforts are made to impede the lead plaintiff EBTs while they are taking place. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/14/2019) (mml)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from John Rizio-Hamilton dated 5/13/2019 re: Defendants' May 13, 2019 Letter [Redacted]. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi.(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #151 Letter filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. ENDORSEMENT: OK. (Brief due by 6/21/2019. Motions due by 6/7/2019.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/13/2019) (mml)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Joseph S. Allerhand dated May 13, 2019 re: reference to a magistrate judge to resolve a discovery dispute. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.(Allerhand, Joseph)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so redesignated. (wb)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from John Rizio-Hamilton dated May 10, 2019 re: Class Certification Page Limits and Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi.(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #149 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . . Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Allerhand, Joseph)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.(Allerhand, Joseph)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 DECLARATION of Joseph S. Allerhand in Opposition re: #142 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ferrell Expert Report, #2 Exhibit B - Maloney Expert Report, #3 Exhibit C - Aug. 29, 2013 10-Q Excerpt, #4 Exhibit D - Nov. 24, 2015 Earnings Release, #5 Exhibit E - May 25, 2016 Earnings Release, #6 Exhibit F - Deutsche Bank Report, #7 Exhibit G - Grants Article, #8 Exhibit H - Aug. 25, 2016 Earnings Release, #9 Exhibit I - Buckingham Report, #10 Exhibit J - May 25, 2017 Earnings Release, #11 Exhibit K - May 25, 2017 Sale Announcement, #12 Exhibit L - Nov. 21, 2017 Earnings Release, #13 Exhibit M - Dec. 1, 2017 10-Q Excerpt, #14 Exhibit N - Mar. 14, 2018 Earnings Release, #15 Exhibit O - Washington Post Article, #16 Exhibit P - Class Determination Award, #17 Exhibit Q - NERA Report)(Allerhand, Joseph)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #142 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Allerhand, Joseph)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY ROSS M. SHIKOWITZ granting #145 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Upon consideration of the Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney Ross M. Shikowitz (the "Motion"), and for good cause shown, it is hereby ordered that: 1. The Motion is GRANTED. 2. The Clerk is ordered to reflect on the docket the termination of attorney Ross M. Shikowitz as counsel of record for Lead Plaintiff Public Employees' Retirement System ofMississippi. SO ORDERED. Attorney Ross Mitchell Shikowitz terminated. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/1/2019) (mml)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION for Ross M. Shikowitz to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney Ross M. Shikowitz)(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 DECLARATION of John Rizio-Hamilton in Support re: #142 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #142 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Rizio-Hamilton, John)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MOTION to Certify Class . Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi.(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ANSWER to #111 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Michele Santana.(Nettleton, Stacy)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ANSWER to #111 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Ronald Ristau.(Nettleton, Stacy)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ANSWER to #111 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Mark Light.(Nettleton, Stacy)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ANSWER to #111 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Virginia C. Drosos.(Nettleton, Stacy)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ANSWER to #111 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Barnes.(Nettleton, Stacy)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ANSWER to #111 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Signet Jewelers Limited.(Nettleton, Stacy)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 STIPULATED ESI PROTOCOL AND ORDER: The parties to this Agreed ESI Protocol Order have agreed to the terms of this Order; accordingly, it is ORDERED: This protocol describes the specifications for document production. It is not intended to supersede or conflict with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the local rules of the Southern District of New York, or any other rule or order of the Court. Issues, if any, arising on subject matter within the scope of this Order, but not directly addressed in it, shall be governed by those rules except as otherwise stipulated by the parties under Rule 29 or as addressed by motion as described in Section 8 below, as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/12/2019) (mml)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from John Rizio-Hamilton dated 2/11/2019 re: Stipulated ESI Protocol and Proposed Order. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated ESI Protocol and Proposed Order)(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: This case is to be tried to a jury. Defendants shall answer the Fifth Amended Class Action Complaint by February 15, 2019. Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 3/1/2019. The following deadlines shall apply to Lead Plaintiffs motion to certify the putative class in this action: a. Lead Plaintiffs position: Lead Plaintiff shall move to certify the class by March 15, 2019; Defendants shall file their opposition, if any, by April 26, 2019; Lead Plaintiff shall file its reply, if any, by May 17, 2019. Fact Discovery due by 9/13/2019. Expert Discovery due by 12/6/2019. Summary Judgment Motions due by 12/19/2019. Responses due by 1/31/2020 Replies due by 2/14/2020. Pretrial Order due by 3/18/2020. In limine motions must be filed within five days of receiving notice of the final pretrial conference; responses to in limine motions are due five days after the motions are made. Cases may be called for trial at any time following the final pretrial conference. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/6/2019) (jwh)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #131 Letter, filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. ENDORSEMENT: No more delays. No more stays. Order signed. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/7/2019) (jwh)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Michael Barnes answer due 2/15/2019; Virginia C. Drosos answer due 2/15/2019; Mark Light answer due 2/15/2019; Ronald Ristau answer due 2/15/2019; Michele Santana answer due 2/15/2019; Signet Jewelers Limited answer due 2/15/2019. (jwh)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from John Rizio-Hamilton dated 02/06/2019 re: Proposed Civil Case Management Plan. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Civil Case Management Plan)(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/28/2019) (jca)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Rizio-Hamilton, John)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #127 Letter, filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. ENDORSEMENT: (1) Judge Ellis has retired. (2) This schedule is not acceptable to me in a 2016 case. (3) Conference on 2/8/2019 at 9:45 am, o'clock. (Status Conference set for 2/8/2019 at 09:45 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/4/2019) (mml)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from John Rizio-Hamilton dated 01/03/2019 re: Proposed Civil Case Management Plan. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Civil Case Management Plan)(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #123 Motion for Jason M. Kirschberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/6/2018) (mml)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #124 Motion for Brenna D. Nelinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/6/2018) (mml)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION for Brenna D. Nelinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15999484. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelinson, Brenna)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MOTION for Jason Matthew Kirschberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15997876. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of motion, #2 Exhibit A - MS Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - CA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit C - AL Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Kirschberg, Jason)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #123 MOTION for Jason Matthew Kirschberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15997876. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #124 MOTION for Brenna D. Nelinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15999484. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Madakacherry Mathai on behalf of Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Mathai, Michael)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Ellen Boon on behalf of Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Boon, Rebecca)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIFTH AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT denying #112 Motion to Dismiss. Based on the foregoing, Defendants' motion to dismiss the FAC is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Dkt. No. 112. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/26/2018) (mml)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to to all counsel in In re: Signet Jewelers Limited Securities Litigation from Chief Judge McMahon dated 5/29/2018 re: The above-captioned case has been reassigned to Chief Judge McMahon. The judge is aware that there is a pending fully briefed motion. Please deliver one courtesy copy of the brief and any exhibits filed in support of or in opposition to the motion to Judge Chief Judge McMahon's chambers, 2550, at 500 Pearl Street. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/29/2018) (rro)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Jesse M. Furman is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 DECLARATION of Joseph S. Allerhand in Support re: #112 MOTION to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 111] the Fifth Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O - FAS 107, #2 Exhibit P - FAS 157, #3 Exhibit Q - Table of Puffery or Opinion Statements, #4 Exhibit R - Barrons article, #5 Exhibit S - Signets 2016 Code of Ethics, #6 Exhibit T - Signets 2016 Code of Conduct, #7 Exhibit U - Redline)(Allerhand, Joseph)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #112 MOTION to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 111] the Fifth Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Allerhand, Joseph)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 DECLARATION of John Rizio-Hamilton in Opposition re: #112 MOTION to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 111] the Fifth Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summary of Class Period Stock Sales and Purchases, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from 10-Q Filed May 23, 2013, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts from 10-Q Filed December 1, 2017, #4 Exhibit D - Redline of Memorandum)(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #112 MOTION to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 111] the Fifth Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Rizio-Hamilton, John)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 DECLARATION of Joseph S. Allerhand in Support re: #112 MOTION to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 111] the Fifth Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1) - Compilation of credit disclosures, #2 Exhibit A (Part 2) - Compilation of credit disclosures, #3 Exhibit B - Compilation of arbitration disclosures, #4 Exhibit C - Signet's FY2017 10-K, #5 Exhibit D - Signet's 2016 Proxy, #6 Exhibit E - Signet's Oct. 18, 2016 letter to SEC, #7 Exhibit F - Signet's FY2014 10-K, #8 Exhibit G -Signet's FY2015 10-K, #9 Exhibit H - Signet's FY2016 10-K, #10 Exhibit I - Select Form 3 and Form 4s, #11 Exhibit J - New York Times article, #12 Exhibit K - FASB 310-10-50, #13 Exhibit L - FAS 114, #14 Exhibit M - AICPA SOP 01-6, #15 Exhibit N - Redline)(Allerhand, Joseph)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #112 MOTION to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 111] the Fifth Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Allerhand, Joseph)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 111] the Fifth Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.(Allerhand, Joseph)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #96 Amended Complaint, against Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. Related document: #96 Amended Complaint,.(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying as moot #89 Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint; denying without prejudice #101 Motion to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint; and granting #108 Letter Motion for Leave to File the Fifth Amended Complaint. In the Court's judgment, Defendants' primary argument in opposition to Plaintiff's request to file another amended complaint - futility - is better addressed in the context of Defendants' motion to dismiss, with full briefing. Defendants' other arguments in opposition to the request for leave to amend are unpersuasive. Accordingly, the motion for leave to amend is GRANTED. The Court, however, agrees with Defendants that it would be better to file new motion papers altogether than to file supplemental papers. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall file the Fifth Amended Complaint by March 22, 2018; Defendants shall renew their motion to dismiss by March 30, 2018; Plaintiff shall file its opposition to the motion to dismiss by April 9, 2018; and Defendants shall file their reply by April 13, 2018. The parties may not make new arguments in their motion papers, except to the extent that they pertain to the amendment of the Complaint. To ensure that the parties heed that limitation, they shall file, at the same time as their motion papers, a declaration attaching a redline showing the differences between the prior brief and the new brief. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Joseph S. Allerhand dated March 19, 2018 re: #108 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from John Rizio-Hamilton dated 03/16/2018. . Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Allerhand, Joseph)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from John Rizio-Hamilton dated 03/16/2018. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redline Against Fourth Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Fifth Amended Complaint)(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 DECLARATION of Joseph S. Allerhand in Support re: #101 MOTION to Dismiss The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L - Table of Puffery or Opinion Statements, #2 Exhibit M - Signet Jewelers 2016 Code of Conduct, #3 Exhibit N - Signet Jewelers 2016 Code of Ethics, #4 Exhibit O - Barrons article)(Allerhand, Joseph)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #101 MOTION to Dismiss The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Allerhand, Joseph)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 DECLARATION of John Rizio-Hamilton in Opposition re: #101 MOTION to Dismiss The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary of Class Period Stock Sales and Purchases)(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #101 MOTION to Dismiss The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Rizio-Hamilton, John)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 DECLARATION of Joseph S. Allerhand in Support re: #101 MOTION to Dismiss The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1 - Compilation of credit disclosures, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2 - Compilation of credit disclosures, #3 Exhibit B - Compilation of arbitration disclosures, #4 Exhibit C - Signets FY2017 10-K, #5 Exhibit D - Signets 2016 Proxy, #6 Exhibit E - Signets Oct. 18, 2016 letter to SEC, #7 Exhibit F - Signets FY2014 10-K, #8 Exhibit G - Signets FY2015 10-K, #9 Exhibit H - Signets FY2016 10-K, #10 Exhibit I - Select Form 3 and Form 4s, #11 Exhibit J - New York Time article, #12 Exhibit K - FASB 310-10-50)(Allerhand, Joseph)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #101 MOTION to Dismiss The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Allerhand, Joseph)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION to Dismiss The Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Virginia C. Drosos, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.(Allerhand, Joseph)
January 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/26/2018. Responses due by 2/23/2018. Replies due by 3/9/2018. (ras)
January 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER re: #97 , #98 , and #99 Responses to the Court's Order To Show Cause. As all parties agree that Aydin v. Signet Jewelers Ltd. et al., 17-CV-9853, should be consolidated with this action, it is hereby consolidated for all purposes. The PSLRA notice issued by counsel for the Aydin Plaintiffs is hereby vacated, and Lead Counsel is authorized to issue the proposed corrective notice. The Clerk of Court shall close 17-CV-9583; all future filings shall be made in this case. Defendants shall file any motion to dismiss the Fourth Amended Consolidated Complaint no later than January 26, 2018; any opposition shall be filed by February 23, 2018; and any reply shall be filed by March 9, 2018. The parties are granted up to 40 pages for their principal briefs; and Defendants are granted up to 15 pages for their reply. Although the Court believes that counsel for the Aydin Plaintiffs should have alerted the Court to the filing of the Aydin Complaint and preemptively explained their view why the case was not related (prior to the filing of the Fourth Amended Consolidated Complaint), the Court declines to impose sanctions. Finally, in light of the foregoing, the Court sees no reason for the conference on January 9, 2018. Accordingly, the conference is hereby cancelled. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/7/2018) (Text Only Order)(Furman, Jesse)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Joseph S. Allerhand dated January 5, 2018 re: (i) Your Honor's December 22, 2017 Order to Show (ECF No. 95) and (ii) the recent submission by the Aydin Plaintiff (ECF No. 97). Document filed by Michael Barnes, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.(Allerhand, Joseph)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 RESPONSE re: #97 Response, 95 Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,,,,, . Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Corrected Notice)(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 RESPONSE re: 95 Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,,,,, . Document filed by Nebil Aydin. (Murray, Brian)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #86 Amended Complaint, against Michael Barnes, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited, Virginia C. Drosos with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. Related document: #86 Amended Complaint,.(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER with respect to #93 Letter Motion to Expedite; and #94 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The Court has accepted the Aydin action as related. No later than January 2, 2018, counsel to the Aydin Plaintiff shall show cause in writing (1) why Aydin should not be consolidated with In re Signet Jewelers Limited Securities Litigation, 16-CV-6728, and (2) why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to designate Aydin as related to 16-CV-6728. Any response to that show cause filing shall be filed by January 5, 2018, and the parties - including counsel to the Aydin Plaintiff - shall appear for a conference with the Court on January 9, 2018, at 4 p.m. At that conference, the Court will address whether and when Defendants need to respond to the forthcoming amended complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Joseph S. Allerhand dated December 21, 2017. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.(Allerhand, Joseph)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 LETTER MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule for Motion to Consolidate and to Seek Reassignment of Aydin Case as Related addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from John Rizio-Hamilton dated 12/21/2017. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Aydin Cover Sheet & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - GP&M Aydin Notice, #3 Exhibit C - Alerts)(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER: On December 1, 2017, Defendants filed a motion to dismiss the complaint under Rule 12(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Under Rule 15(a)(1)(B), a plaintiff has twenty-one (21) days after the service of a motion under Rule 12(b) to amend the complaint once as a matter of course. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file any amended complaint by December 22, 2017. Plaintiffs will not be given any further opportunity to amend the complaint to address issues raised by the motion to dismiss. If Plaintiffs do amend, by three (3) weeks after the amended complaint is filed, Defendants shall: (1) file an answer; (2) file a new motion to dismiss; or (3) submit a letter to the Court, copying Plaintiffs, stating that they rely on the previously filed motion to dismiss. If Defendants file an answer or a new motion to dismiss, the Court will deny the previously filed motion to dismiss as moot. It is further ORDERED that if no amended complaint is filed, Plaintiffs shall, as the Court previously ordered (Docket No. 85), serve any opposition to the motion to dismiss by January 19, 2018. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be served by February 16, 2018. At the time any reply is served, the moving party shall supply the Court with one courtesy hard copy of all motion papers by mailing or delivering them to the United States Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/22/2017.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/4/2017) (mro)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 DECLARATION of Joseph S. Allerhand in Support re: #89 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1) - Compilation of credit disclosures, #2 Exhibit A (Part 2) - Compilation of credit disclosures, #3 Exhibit A (Part 3) - Compilation of credit disclosures, #4 Exhibit A (Part 4) - Compilation of credit disclosures, #5 Exhibit B - Compilation of arbitration disclosures, #6 Exhibit C - Signets FY2017 10-K, #7 Exhibit D - Signets 2016 Proxy, #8 Exhibit E - Signets Oct. 18, 2016 letter to SEC, #9 Exhibit F - Signets FY2014 10-K, #10 Exhibit G - Signets FY2015 10-K, #11 Exhibit H - Signets FY2016 10-K, #12 Exhibit I - Select Form 3 and Form 4s, #13 Exhibit J - Bloomberg law article, #14 Exhibit K - New York Time article)(Allerhand, Joseph)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #89 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Michael Barnes, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Allerhand, Joseph)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.(Allerhand, Joseph)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #87 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Stacy Nettleton dated November 21, 2017. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.(Nettleton, Stacy)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #33 Amended Complaint, against Michael Barnes, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. Related document: #33 Amended Complaint,.(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER: ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, AGREED, AND ORDERED THAT: Lead Plaintiff shall file a third amended complaint (the "Third Amended Complaint") on or before September 29, 2017; Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Lead Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by December 1, 2017; If Defendants move to dismiss the Third Amended Complaint, Lead Plaintiff shall file any opposition to such motion on or before January 19, 2018, and Defendants shall file any reply in support of such motion on or before February 16, 2018. Given the generosity of the deadlines, the parties should not expect any extensions. (Amended Pleadings due by 9/29/2017. Motions due by 12/1/2017. Responses due by 1/19/2018. Replies due by 2/16/2018.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/3/2017) (ap) Modified on 8/23/2017 (ap).
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: terminating #63 Motion to Appoint Counsel; terminating #63 Motion to Appoint MissPERS as Lead Plaintiff(s); granting #65 Motion to Appoint MissPERS as Lead Plaintiff(s). Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS that: The Court's order of October 24, 2016 (Docket No. 23), is vacated. Accordingly, the Original Lead Plaintiffs and the Original Co-Lead Counsels are no longer lead plaintiff and lead counsel in this matter. MissPERS is appointed as Lead Plaintiff. The Court finds that its satisfies the requirements for Lead Plaintiff set forth in Section 78u-4(a)(3)(B). MissPERS selection of Lead Counsel is approved, and Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP is appointed as Lead Counsel for the Class. Lead Plaintiff shall confer with counsel for Defendants and, no later than August 3, 2017, agree to a stipulation, subject to Court approval, putting in place a schedule setting forth Lead Plaintiffs time to file a third amended complaint or designate the existing complaint as the operative complaint and Defendants time to answer or otherwise respond to the existing complaint in this action. (Docket No. 33). In light of the foregoing, the hearing scheduled for August 1, 2017, is CANCELLED. The Clerk of Court is directed to change the caption in this action to "In re Signet Jewelers Limited Securities Litigation." The file shall be maintained under Master File No. 1:16-CV-06728 (JMF). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket Nos. 63, 65, and 66, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/27/2017) (ap)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ross Mitchell Shikowitz on behalf of Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Shikowitz, Ross)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John James Rizio-Hamilton on behalf of Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Rizio-Hamilton, John)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Howard Rudman on behalf of Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 DECLARATION of Gerald H. Silk in Support re: #65 MOTION to Appoint Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Neville Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Chart of Recoveries, #3 Exhibit C - Semtech Order, #4 Exhibit D - Morgan Stanley Brief, #5 Exhibit E - Morgan Stanley Reply Brief, #6 Exhibit F - CVS Reply, #7 Exhibit G - Pension Fund Forum, #8 Exhibit H - Bernstein Statement, #9 Exhibit I - Trinity Order, #10 Exhibit J - Green Mountain Class Cert Order, #11 Exhibit K - DFC Global Order, #12 Exhibit L - KBR Docket, #13 Exhibit M - Roadrunner Order, #14 Exhibit N - Treehouse Order, #15 Exhibit O - Stericycle Order, #16 Exhibit P - Banco Bradesco Order, #17 Exhibit Q - Green Mountain LP Order, #18 Exhibit R - JPMorgan Acceptance Order, #19 Exhibit S - Willbros Opposition Brief)(Silk, Gerald)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #65 MOTION to Appoint Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Silk, Gerald)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER with respect to #65 Motion to Appoint the Mississippi Public Employees' Retirement System ("MPERS") as Lead Plaintiff. MPERS is granted leave to file a reply, no later than July 25, 2017, and not to exceed seven pages, addressing the Norfolk Pension Fund's arguments that MPERS is not adequate to serve as lead plaintiff and is presumptively barred from serving as lead plaintiff. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 DECLARATION of Samuel H. Rudman in Opposition re: #65 MOTION to Appoint Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., #63 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm. MOTION to Appoint Heather Salway to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Rudman, Samuel)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 DECLARATION of Samuel H. Rudman in Opposition re: #65 MOTION to Appoint Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., #63 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm. MOTION to Appoint Heather Salway to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Statement Regarding Technical Difficulties, #2 Exhibit A - 2/24/16 Forbes article, #3 Exhibit B - 9/13 U.S. Chamber Institute article, #4 Exhibit C - 4/11/16 Y'all Politics article, #5 Exhibit D - 11/2/09 RespondMississippi article, #6 Exhibit E - 2/29/16 U.S. Chamber Institute article, #7 Exhibit F - 12/4/10 RespondMississippi article, #8 Exhibit G - Bernstein Complaint, #9 Exhibit H - 2008 Annual Report of Receipts of Disbursements, #10 Exhibit I - 2009 Annual Report of Receipts and Disbursements, #11 Exhibit J - 2010 Annual Report of Receipts and Disbursements, #12 Exhibit K - 2011 Periodic Report of Receipts and Disbursements, #13 Exhibit L - 2013 Annual Report of Receipts and Disbursements, #14 Exhibit M - 2015 Periodic Report of Receipts and Disbursements, #15 Exhibit N - 2016 Annual Report of Receipts and Disbursements, #16 Exhibit O - 5/20/13 and 5/29/13 Letters from George Neville)(Rudman, Samuel)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 DECLARATION of Samuel H. Rudman in Opposition re: #65 MOTION to Appoint Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., #63 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm. MOTION to Appoint Heather Salway to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H - Part 1, #9 Exhibit H - Part 2 a, #10 Exhibit H - Part 2 b, #11 Exhibit O - George Neville Letters)(Rudman, Samuel)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #65 MOTION to Appoint Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Silk, Gerald)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #65 MOTION to Appoint Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., #63 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm. MOTION to Appoint Heather Salway to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lesley Frank Portnoy on behalf of Susan Dube, Lyubomir Spasov. New Address: Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP, 230 Park Ave., Ste. 530, New York, New York, United States 10169, (212) 682-5340. (Portnoy, Lesley)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Lead Plaintiff Motion re: #63 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm. MOTION to Appoint Heather Salway to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Heather Salway. (Kim, Phillip)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 DECLARATION of Gerald H. Silk in Support re: #65 MOTION to Appoint Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Loss Charts, #3 Exhibit C - Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Silk, Gerald)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DECLARATION of David A. Rosenfeld in Support re: (12 in 1:17-cv-02845-JMF, 12 in 1:17-cv-02845-JMF, 66 in 1:16-cv-06728-JMF, 66 in 1:16-cv-06728-JMF, 16 in 1:16-cv-06861-JMF, 16 in 1:16-cv-06861-JMF, 15 in 1:17-cv-02846-JMF, 15 in 1:17-cv-02846-JMF) MOTION to Appoint Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Sworn Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Estimate of losses, #4 Exhibit D - Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP firm resume)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-06728-JMF, 1:16-cv-06861-JMF, 1:17-cv-02845-JMF, 1:17-cv-02846-JMF(Rosenfeld, David)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #65 MOTION to Appoint Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi. (Silk, Gerald)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (15 in 1:17-cv-02846-JMF, 15 in 1:17-cv-02846-JMF, 12 in 1:17-cv-02845-JMF, 12 in 1:17-cv-02845-JMF, 66 in 1:16-cv-06728-JMF, 66 in 1:16-cv-06728-JMF, 16 in 1:16-cv-06861-JMF, 16 in 1:16-cv-06861-JMF) MOTION to Appoint Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-06728-JMF, 1:16-cv-06861-JMF, 1:17-cv-02845-JMF, 1:17-cv-02846-JMF(Rosenfeld, David)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION to Appoint Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel .( Return Date set for 8/1/2017 at 03:00 PM.) Document filed by Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-06728-JMF, 1:16-cv-06861-JMF, 1:17-cv-02845-JMF, 1:17-cv-02846-JMF(Rosenfeld, David)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION to Appoint Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi.(Silk, Gerald)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #63 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm. MOTION to Appoint Heather Salway to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Heather Salway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Kim, Phillip)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm., MOTION to Appoint Heather Salway to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Heather Salway. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Phillip)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Irving Firemen's Relief & Retirement System. (Rosenfeld, David)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Irving Firemen's Relief & Retirement System. (Rosenfeld, David)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Irving Firemen's Relief & Retirement System. (Rosenfeld, David)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Garth Avery Spencer on behalf of Susan Dube, Lyubomir Spasov. New Address: Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP, 230 Park Avenue, Suite 530, New York, NY, USA 10169, 212-682-5340. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-06728-JMF, 1:16-cv-06861-JMF, 1:17-cv-02845-JMF, 1:17-cv-02846-JMF(Spencer, Garth)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: As the above-captioned actions involve common questions of law and fact and Plaintiffs agree that consolidation is appropriate, it is hereby ordered that pursuant to Rule 42(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, they are consolidated under the case number 16-CV-6728. Any motions to serve as lead plaintiffs and lead counsel shall be filed by July 5, 2017. It is further ORDERED that opposition to any motion for appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel shall be filed by July 19, 2017. Plaintiffs Irving Firemens Relief and Retirement System and Maria Mikolchak shall promptly provide supplemental notice of the new deadline to their purported classes. Finally, it is hereby ORDERED that a conference shall be held on August 1, 2017, at 3 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York to consider any motions for appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel The Clerk of court is directed to consolidate 16-CV-6728, 17-CV-2845, and 17-CV-2846 under case number 16-CV-6728, and to close 17-CV-2845 and 17-CV-2846, and as further set forth herein. (Motions due by 7/5/2017, Responses due by 7/19/2017, Status Conference set for 8/1/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/12/2017) (ras)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Joseph S. Allerhand dated May 10, 2017 re: consolidation and clarification of due dates for lead plaintiff motions. Document filed by Michael Barnes, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.(Allerhand, Joseph)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Samuel H. Rudman dated May 9, 2017 re: clarification of due dates for lead plaintiff motions. Document filed by Irving Firemen's Relief & Retirement System.(Rudman, Samuel)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jeremy A. Lieberman dated 05/08/2017 re: Pursuant to the Order of the Court daed May 4, 2017. Document filed by Susan Dube, Lyubomir Spasov.(Lieberman, Jeremy)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 51 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jeremy A. Lieberman dated April 21, 2017 in 16cv6728. Upon review of the parties' submissions, Lead Plaintiffs' motion is DENIED, substantially for the reasons set forth in IFRRS's letter. Thus, the Court adheres to its prior conclusions and denies Lead Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the operative Second Amended Complaint. Instead, Lead Plaintiffs shall republish notice in this action to reflect the asserted class and class periods in the Second Amended Complaint, after which the Court will revisit the question of who should be appointed as lead plaintiff and lead counsel under the PSLRA. Typically, plaintiffs are required to publish PSLRA notice no more than twenty days after a complaint is filed. See 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3)(A). Taking its cue from that provision, the Court orders that, no later than May 24, 2017, Lead Plaintiffs shall advise the Court in writing of the date and manner in which they published notice. As of this Order, no motion for consolidation has been filed, but the Court accepted the two new cases as related to 16-CV-6728, and the cases appear to involve certain common questions of law and fact. Accordingly, the parties in each case are directed to file letters no later than May 11, 2017, not to exceed three single-spaced pages each, indicating their views on whether the cases should be consolidated. If the parties do not file letters opposing consolidation, the Court intends to consolidate the three cases without further notice to the parties. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate 16-CV-6728 Docket No. 51, and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/4/2017) (ras) Modified on 5/25/2017 (ras).
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from David A. Rosenfeld dated April 24, 2017 re: #51 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jeremy A. Lieberman dated April 21, 2017. . Document filed by Irving Firemen's Relief & Retirement System. (Rosenfeld, David)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Joseph S. Allerhand dated April 24, 2017 re: #51 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jeremy A. Lieberman dated April 21, 2017. . Document filed by Michael Barnes, Mark Light, Ronald Ristau, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Allerhand, Joseph)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jeremy A. Lieberman dated April 21, 2017. Document filed by Susan Dube, Lyubomir Spasov.(Lieberman, Jeremy)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/7/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/7/2017 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/11/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Ronald Ristau served on 4/7/2017, answer due 5/1/2017. Service was accepted by Ronald Ristau, defendant. Document filed by Susan Dube; Lyubomir Spasov. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #48 Affidavit) - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Ronald Ristau served on 4/10/2017, answer due 5/1/2017. Service was accepted by Ronald Ristau, Defendant. Document filed by Susan Dube; Lyubomir Spasov. (Lieberman, Jeremy) Modified on 4/18/2017 (db).
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Thus, the only possible way for Lead Plaintiffs to avoid the need for republication (and the revisiting of the lead plaintiff and lead counsel selection that might follow) is to revert to the claims and allegations in the original Complaint, which formed the basis for the original PSLRA notice. (See Docket Nos. 1, 6). If, in light of the Court's ruling, Lead Plaintiffs wish to strike the new claims and allegations in both the First and Second Amended Complaints and revert to the claims and allegations in the original Complaint, they shall file a letter brief to that effect within one week of the date of this Order, showing cause why the Court should permit them to do so; within three days of any such letter brief, any interested party including Defendants and IFRRS shall file any response. The Clerk of Court is directed to add IFRRS to the docket as an Intervenor and to terminate Docket Nos. 31 and 38. As discussed on the record at the April 7, 2017 conference, Defendants need not answer or otherwise respond to Lead Plaintiffs' complaints at present; the Court will set a deadline to answer or otherwise respond when the questions of lead plaintiff and the operative complaint have been clarified. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/14/2017) (ap)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Michael Barnes served on 4/5/2017, answer due 4/26/2017. Service was accepted by Michael Barnes, Defendant. Document filed by Susan Dube; Lyubomir Spasov. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jesse M. Furman: Pretrial Conference held on 4/7/2017. Jeremy Lieberman, Garth Spencer, and Austin Van present for Plaintiffs. Joseph Allerhand, Stacy Nettleton, and Robert Ruff present for Defendants. David Rosenfeld present for Intervenor Irving Firemen's Relief & Retirement System. Court reporter present. (ab)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jeremy A. Lieberman dated April 6, 2017 re: #31 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Letter regarding Intervention and PSLRA notice addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Samuel H. Rudman dated March 30, 2017. . Document filed by Susan Dube, Lyubomir Spasov. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Garth Avery Spencer on behalf of Susan Dube, Lyubomir Spasov. (Spencer, Garth)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Phillip Kim dated 4/6/2017 re: Irving Firemen's Relief & Retirement System's Letter Motion for Leave to File Letter regarding Intervention and PSLRA notice. Document filed by Maria Mikolchak.(Kim, Phillip)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Phillip C. Kim on behalf of Maria Mikolchak. (Kim, Phillip)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Avi Rosenfeld on behalf of Irving Firemen's Relief & Retirement System. (Rosenfeld, David)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER with respect to #31 Letter Motion for Leave to File Letter regarding Intervention and PSLRA notice; and #38 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Dube Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and in Response to the March 30, 2017 Letter Motion Filed by the Irving Firemen's Relief & Retirement System. The parties and proposed Intervenor shall appear for a conference with the Court on April 7, 2017, at 1:15 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Dube Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and in Response to the March 30, 2017 Letter Motion Filed by the Irving Firemen's Relief & Retirement System addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Joseph S. Allerhand dated April 4, 2017. Document filed by Mark Light, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.(Allerhand, Joseph)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Barnes. (pc)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ronald Ristau. (pc)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ronald Ristau, re: #33 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Susan Dube, Lyubomir Spasov. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Barnes, re: #33 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Susan Dube, Lyubomir Spasov. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #28 Amended Complaint, against Mark Light, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited, Michael Barnes, Ronald Ristau with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Susan Dube, Lyubomir Spasov. Related document: #28 Amended Complaint, filed by Lyubomir Spasov, Susan Dube.(Lieberman, Jeremy) Modified on 4/4/2017 (pc). Modified on 4/4/2017 (pc).
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER with respect to #31 Letter Motion regarding intervention and PSLRA notice. Lead Plaintiffs and - if they wish - Defendants shall file any response to proposed Intervenor's letter no later than April 6, 2017. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Letter regarding Intervention and PSLRA notice addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Samuel H. Rudman dated March 30, 2017. Document filed by Irving Firemen's Relief & Retirement System.(Rudman, Samuel)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Letter Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Lead Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a second amended complaint on or before April 3, 2017. The parties' proposed briefing schedule for Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss is hereby adopted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jeremy A. Lieberman dated March 1, 2017. Document filed by Susan Dube, Lyubomir Spasov.(Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Mark Light, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Susan Dube, Lyubomir Spasov. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Susan Dube.(Lieberman, Jeremy) Modified on 1/31/2017 (pc).
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Austin Patrick Van on behalf of Susan Dube. New Address: Pomerantz LLP, 600 Third Avenue, 20th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10016, 212-661-1100. (Van, Austin)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Austin Patrick Van on behalf of Susan Dube, Lyubomir Spasov. (Van, Austin)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Lead Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a consolidated amended complaint (the "Amended Complaint") on or before January 30, 2017. Defendants shall answer and otherwise respond to Lead Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by March 16, 2017. If Defendants move to dismiss the Amended Complaint, Lead Plaintiffs shall file any opposition to such motion on or before May 1, 2017, and Defendants shall file any reply in support of such motion on or before June 7, 2017. The proposed schedule is adopted. The parties should not expect any extensions of the deadlines given their generosity. ( Amended Pleadings due by 1/30/2017., Motions due by 3/16/2017., Responses due by 5/1/2017, Replies due by 6/7/2017.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/29/2016) (mro) Modified on 1/9/2017 (mro).
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tamar Aliza Weinrib on behalf of Susan Dube, Lyubomir Spasov. (Weinrib, Tamar)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Vacated as per Judges Order dated 7/27/2017, Doc. # 84 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting #16 Motion to Appoint. Spasov and Dube are appointed as Lead Plaintiffs. The Court finds that they satisfy the requirements for Lead Plaintiff set forth in Section 78u-4(a) (3)(B). Lead Plaintiffs, pursuant to Section 78u-4(a)(3)(B)(v), have selected and retained Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP and Pomerantz LLP as Co-Lead Counsel. In light of the foregoing, the hearing scheduled for November 22, 2016, is CANCELLED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket No. 16. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/21/2016) (kgo) Modified on 8/8/2017 (ap).
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Lesley F. Portnoy dated November 14, 2016 re: Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel. Document filed by Susan Dube, Lyubomir Spasov.(Portnoy, Lesley)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: On October 24, 2016, Lyubomir Spasov and Susan Dube filed a motion for appointment as lead plaintiffs pursuant to Section 78-u(a)(3)(B) of the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act ("PSLRA"). (Docket No. 16). The filing also included a motion for approval of Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP and Pomerantz LLP as co-lead counsel for the class. Despite the fact that no opposition was filed, the Court has an independent duty under the PSLRA to assure itself that Spasov and Dube satisfy the requirements of Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. 15 U.S.C. 78-u(a)(3)(B)(iii)(I)(bb)-(cc). Where, as here, the movant is a group rather than an individual person or entity, the question of whether the group can fairly and adequately represent the interests of the class includes consideration of "the way in which a group seeking to become lead plaintiff was formed" and "the extent of the prior relationships and/or connection between the members of a movant group." In re Cendant Corp. Litig., 264 F.3d 201, 266 (3d. Cir. 2001). Accordingly, no later than November 14, 2016, Spasov and Dube shall file a supplemental letter addressing those considerations and their bearing on the motion for appointment as lead plaintiff. The letter should address the propriety or need to have two firms serve as co-lead counsel rather than a single firm. Upon review of the letter, the Court will determine whether there is need to hold the hearing presently scheduled for November 22, 2016. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/9/2016) (mro)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Robert V. Prongay to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Robert V. Prongay to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12945535. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Robert V. Prongay to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12945535. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Susan Dube, Lyubomir Spasov. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing)(Prongay, Robert)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DECLARATION of Lesley F. Portnoy in Support re: #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP and Pomerantz LLP. MOTION to Appoint Lyubomir Spasov and Susan Dube to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Susan Dube, Lyubomir Spasov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Portnoy, Lesley)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP and Pomerantz LLP. MOTION to Appoint Lyubomir Spasov and Susan Dube to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Susan Dube, Lyubomir Spasov. (Portnoy, Lesley)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP and Pomerantz LLP. MOTION to Appoint Lyubomir Spasov and Susan Dube to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Susan Dube, Lyubomir Spasov. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Portnoy, Lesley) Modified on 7/27/2017 (ap). Modified on 8/8/2017 (ap).
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, subject to the Court's approval, by and among the undersigned counsel to the parties in the above-captioned actions, as follows: 1. Defendants Signet Jewelers Limited, Mark Light, and Michele Santana's ("Defendants") time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaints filed by plaintiffs Susan Dube and Lyubomir Spasov is extended until after the Court Appoints a lead plaintiff and lead counsel for lead plaintiff and such lead plaintiff either serves a consolidated amended complaint or designates a complaint as the operative complaint. 2. After the Court appoints a lead plaintiff and lead counsel, counsel for Defendants shall confer with lead plaintiff's counsel and agree to a stipulation, subject to court approval, putting in place a schedule setting forth the lead plaintiffs' time to file a consolidated amended complaint or otherwise designate an operative complaint and Defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the operative complaint in this action. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/28/2016) (cla)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mark Light, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-06728-JMF, 1:16-cv-06861-JMF(Allerhand, Joseph)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stacy Nettleton on behalf of Mark Light, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-06728-JMF, 1:16-cv-06861-JMF(Nettleton, Stacy)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph S. Allerhand on behalf of Mark Light, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-06728-JMF, 1:16-cv-06861-JMF(Allerhand, Joseph)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: that pursuant to Rule 42(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, they are consolidated under the case number 16-CV-6728. The motion deadlines and the hearing date in appointing a lead plaintiff will proceed as previously ordered. (16-CV-6728, Docket No. 7). It is further ORDERED that the named plaintiffs shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on each of the Defendants and file proof of service on the docket. The Clerk of court is directed to consolidate 16-CV-6728 and 16-CV-6861 under case number 16-CV-6728, and to close 16-CV-6861. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/16/2016) (tn)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE re: #8 Order,,,, . Document filed by Susan Dube. (Portnoy, Lesley)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Court Orders served on Defendants Signet Jewelers Limited, Mark Light, and Michele Santana on September 9, 2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Susan Dube. (Portnoy, Lesley)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: On August 25, 2016, Plaintiff Susan Dube filed a complaint in 16-CV-6728. On August 31, 2016, Plaintiff Lyubomir Spasov filed a similar complaint in 16-CV-6861. As of this Order, no motion for consolidation has been filed, but 16-CV-6861 has been accepted by the Court as related to 16-CV-6728, and the cases appear to involve common questions of law and fact. The parties in each case are directed to file letters no later than September 15, 2016, not to exceed three single-spaced pages each, indicating their views on whether the cases should be consolidated and, if so, whether the Court should proceed as previously ordered (16-CV-6728, Docket No. 7) with respect to the motion deadlines and the hearing date in appointing a lead plaintiff. If the parties do not file letters opposing consolidation, the Court may consolidate the two cases without further notice to the parties. It is further ORDERED that the named plaintiffs shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on each of the defendants and file proof of service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/8/2016) (tn)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (ad)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel notified the Court in the attached letter that the required notice was published on August 25, 2016. Members of the purported class therefore have until October 24, 2016, to move the Court to serve as lead plaintiffs. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that a conference shall be held on November 22, 2016, at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York to consider any motions for appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel and for consolidation. It is further ORDERED that opposition to any motion for appointment of lead plaintiff shall be served and filed by November 7, 2016. It is further ORDERED that the named plaintiffs shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on each of the defendants. (As further set forth in this order), ( Motions due by 10/24/2016., Responses due by 11/7/2016.), ( Status Conference set for 11/22/2016 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/1/2016) (lmb) Modified on 9/2/2016 (lmb).
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESPONSE re: #5 Order,,,, . Document filed by Susan Dube. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice)(Portnoy, Lesley)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: On August 25, 2016, Plaintiff filed a class action lawsuit on behalf of the public stockholders of Signet Jewelers Limited. The Complaint alleges violations of Sections 10(b) and 20(a) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 ("1934 Act") and Rule 10b-5, promulgated thereunder. Section 78u-4(a)(3)(A) of the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act ("PSLRA"), 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3)(A), requires that: Not later than 20 days after the date on which the complaint is filed, the plaintiff or plaintiffs shall cause to be published, in a widely circulated national business-oriented publication or wire service, a notice advising members of the purported plaintiff class - (I) of the pendency of the action, the claims asserted therein, and the purported class period.... 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3)(A)(i). No later than September 16, 2016, Plaintiff shall advise the Court in writing of the date and manner in which it published this notice. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/31/2016) (tn)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark Light, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (rch)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lesley Frank Portnoy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Susan Dube. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (rch)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lesley Frank Portnoy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code XX Out of U.S.;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (rch)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (rch)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (rch)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (rch)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Portnoy, Lesley)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SIGNET JEWELERS LIMITED, MARK LIGHT, and MICHELE SANTANA, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Susan Dube, Individually and On Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Portnoy, Lesley)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Light, Michele Santana, Signet Jewelers Limited. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12692047)Document filed by Susan Dube, Individually and On Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated.(Portnoy, Lesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Signet Jewelers Limited Securities Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyubomir Spasov
Represented By: Tamar Aliza Weinrib
Represented By: Austin Patrick Van
Represented By: Garth Avery Spencer
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Represented By: Lesley Frank Portnoy
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Dube
Represented By: Tamar Aliza Weinrib
Represented By: Austin Patrick Van
Represented By: Garth Avery Spencer
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Represented By: Lesley Frank Portnoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebil Aydin
Represented By: Lesley Frank Portnoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signet Jewelers Limited
Represented By: Joseph S. Allerhand
Represented By: Stacy Nettleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Light
Represented By: Joseph S. Allerhand
Represented By: Stacy Nettleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Ristau
Represented By: Joseph S. Allerhand
Represented By: Stacy Nettleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia C. Drosos
Represented By: Joseph S. Allerhand
Represented By: Stacy Nettleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Santana
Represented By: Joseph S. Allerhand
Represented By: Stacy Nettleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Barnes
Represented By: Joseph S. Allerhand
Represented By: Stacy Nettleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Maria Mikolchak
Represented By: Phillip C. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lead plaintiff: Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi
Represented By: Rebecca Ellen Boon
Represented By: Brenna D Nelinson
Represented By: Gerald H. Silk
Represented By: Ross Mitchell Shikowitz
Represented By: John James Rizio-Hamilton
Represented By: Jason Matthew Kirschberg
Represented By: Michael Madakacherry Mathai
Represented By: James Abram Harrod, III
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Uslaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Heather Salway
Represented By: Phillip C. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Norfolk County Council as Administering Authority of the Norfolk Pension Fund
Represented By: David Avi Rosenfeld
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Irving Firemen's Relief & Retirement System
Represented By: David Avi Rosenfeld
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Scopia LB LLC
Represented By: Marc Bradley Kramer
Represented By: Richard A. Bodnar
Represented By: Nicole Theresa Castiglione
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Randolph
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Marcato International Master Fund, LTD.
Represented By: Marc Bradley Kramer
Represented By: Richard A. Bodnar
Represented By: Nicole Theresa Castiglione
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Randolph
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Scopia Long LLC
Represented By: Marc Bradley Kramer
Represented By: Richard A. Bodnar
Represented By: Nicole Theresa Castiglione
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Randolph
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Scopia Partners LLC
Represented By: Marc Bradley Kramer
Represented By: Richard A. Bodnar
Represented By: Nicole Theresa Castiglione
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Randolph
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Scopia PX LLC
Represented By: Marc Bradley Kramer
Represented By: Richard A. Bodnar
Represented By: Nicole Theresa Castiglione
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Randolph
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Scopia Long QP LLC
Represented By: Marc Bradley Kramer
Represented By: Richard A. Bodnar
Represented By: Nicole Theresa Castiglione
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Randolph
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Scopia International Master Fund LP
Represented By: Marc Bradley Kramer
Represented By: Richard A. Bodnar
Represented By: Nicole Theresa Castiglione
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Randolph
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Scopia PX International Master Fund LP
Represented By: Marc Bradley Kramer
Represented By: Richard A. Bodnar
Represented By: Nicole Theresa Castiglione
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Randolph
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Scopia LB International Master Fund LP
Represented By: Marc Bradley Kramer
Represented By: Richard A. Bodnar
Represented By: Nicole Theresa Castiglione
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Randolph
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Scopia Windmill Fund LP
Represented By: Marc Bradley Kramer
Represented By: Richard A. Bodnar
Represented By: Nicole Theresa Castiglione
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Randolph
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Scopia Long International Master Fund LP
Represented By: Marc Bradley Kramer
Represented By: Richard A. Bodnar
Represented By: Nicole Theresa Castiglione
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Randolph
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Marcato LP
Represented By: Marc Bradley Kramer
Represented By: Richard A. Bodnar
Represented By: Nicole Theresa Castiglione
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Randolph
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?