October 7, 2020 |
Filing
114
JUDGMENT: It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That after a Jury Trial before the Honorable P. Kevin Castel, United States District Judge, Plaintiff Mark Sussman, Stefani Lombardi and Terance Bright have judgment as against the defendant as fo llows: In favor of Mark Sussman for lost earnings in the amount of $95,000; agency fees paid to union in the amount of $412.00; and emotional distress in the amount of $190,000. In favor of Stefani Lombardi for lost earnings in the amo unt of $95,000; and emotional distress in the amount of $190,000. In favor of Terance Bright for lost earnings in the amount of $95,000; agency fees paid to union in the amount of $4,640.00; and emotional distress in the amount of $190,000. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/7/2020) (jwh)
|
September 28, 2020 |
Filing
111
ORDER: Trial in this matter will proceed as scheduled on September 29, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 26B. To facilitate access to the Courthouse on each day of the trial, follow the instructions attached to this Order. Remote public access to this proceeding is available through the following call-in information: Dial-in: (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 3667981 (Jury Trial set for 9/29/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/28/2020) (jwh)
|
September 16, 2020 |
Filing
108
ORDER: The pre-trial walkthrough in this matter will proceed as scheduled on September 23, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. starting in Courtroom 11D. To facilitate access to the Courthouse on the day of the conference, follow the instructions attached to this Orde r. Remote public access to this proceeding is available through the following call-in information: Dial-in: (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 3667981 (Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/16/2020) (jwh)
|
August 28, 2020 |
Filing
107
ORDER: The final pre-trial conference in this matter will proceed as scheduled on September 2, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11D. To facilitate access to the Courthouse on the day of the conference, follow the instructions attached to this Order. Remote public access to this proceeding is available through the following call-in information: Dial-in: (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 3667981 SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/28/2020) (kv)
|
July 27, 2020 |
Filing
106
OPINION AND ORDER: While styled as a motion to reconsider the Court's summary judgment decision, it advances legal arguments that were neither raised in NMDU's motion to dismiss nor its motion for summary judgment. For all of the above reasons, NMDU's belated motion for reconsideration, (Doc. 91), is DENIED. The Court adheres to the Memorandum and Order of February 10, 2020 in its entirety. (Doc. 84). (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/27/2020) (jwh)
|
May 13, 2020 |
Filing
105
ORDER: The final pretrial conference originally scheduled for May 21, 2020 is adjourned to September 2, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11D. (Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2020 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/13/2020) (jwh)
|
February 26, 2020 |
Filing
88
ORDER: Plaintiffs' proposed voir dire, proposed verdict sheet, proposed jury instructions and their motions in limine shall be filed by 3/24/2020. Defendant's proposed voir dire, proposed verdict sheet, proposed jury instructions, its mot ions in limine and its responses to plaintiff's motions in limine shall be filed by 4/17/2020. Motions due by 4/17/2020. Responses due by 5/1/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/1/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. The Clerk shall amend the caption to the manner in which it appears in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/26/2020) (va) Modified on 2/27/2020 (va).
|
February 12, 2020 |
Filing
86
ORDER: The parties are encouraged to consider consenting to conducting all further proceedings in this action before a Magistrate Judge. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). The parties are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequenc es but shall advise the Court of their decision in writing within 14 days. If the parties decline to consent, as is their right, the Court promptly will enter an Order scheduling further proceedings in this action. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/12/2020) (mro)
|
February 10, 2020 |
Filing
84
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 69 Motion for Summary Judgment: Having considered the balance of the arguments on defendant NMDU's motion for summary judgment, the Court holds that this motion is DENIED. (Doc. 69). (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/10/2020) (jwh)
|
January 31, 2020 |
Filing
83
ORDER: The Court will hear oral arguments concerning defendant Newspaper and Mail Deliverer's Union of New York and Vicinity's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 69) on Febmary 7, 2020 at 3:45 p.m. ( Oral Argument set for 2/7/2020 at 03:45 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/31/2020) (jwh)
|