Clark v. N.Y.C.P.D. et al
Plaintiff: |
Christopher C. Clark |
Defendant: |
N.Y.C.P.D., Bill Bratton, Manhattan District Attorney's Office, Supreme Court New York, Craig Sikorski, Michael Alfieri, Germaine Corprew, Stanley Dash and Tavarez |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv07744 |
Filed: |
October 4, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
Queens |
Presiding Judge: |
Unassigned |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 31, 2020 |
Filing
112
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: 111 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Craig Sikorski against Christopher C. Clark. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated January 29, 2020, Officer Sikorski's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED and judgment is entered for the defendant. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), the Court certifies that any appeal from the Opinion and Order would not be taken in good faith and in forma pauperis status is denied. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 1/31/2020) (Attachments: # 1 Right to Appeal)(km) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
|
January 29, 2020 |
Filing
111
OPINION AND ORDER re: 91 MOTION for Summary Judgment: For the reasons explained, Officer Sikorski's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to terminate the motion (Doc 91) and enter judgment for the defendant. Pursua nt to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), the Court certifies that any appeal from this Opinion and Order would not be taken in good faith and in forma pauperis status is denied. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/29/2020) (jwh) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
|
September 13, 2018 |
Filing
80
OPINION AND ORDER re: 54 FIRST MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings: Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED as to plaintiff's federal claims against defendants Alfieri, Dash, Bratton, and the City of New York and DENIED as to feder al claims against defendant Sikorski. Defendants' motion to dismiss all state law claims against all defendants is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to terminate the motion. (Dkt. 54). The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) tha t any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962). (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/13/2018) (jwh)
|
September 7, 2017 |
Filing
53
OPINION AND ORDER re: 46 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Discovery Opposing Disclosure of Grand Jury Minutes addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from W. KeAupuni Akina dated August 4, 2017. filed by Stanley Dash, Michael Alfieri , Bill Bratton, Craig Sikorski, City of New York. Plaintiff has not demonstrated a "particularized need" for obtaining the grand jury minutes. Accordingly, Plaintiff's request to compel the production of this information is denied. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending as Doc. No. 46. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 9/7/17) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (yv)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?