Underwood v. Lastrada Entertainment Company, Ltd. et al.
Plaintiff: William R. Underwood
Defendant: Lastrada Entertainment Company, Ltd. and Steve Arrington
Case Number: 1:2016cv09058
Filed: November 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Deborah A. Batts
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: 165 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, in favor of Lastrada Entertainment Company, Ltd., Charles Carter, Roger Parker, Sam Carter against William R. Underwood. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That fo r the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated September 8, 2021, because Underwood lacks standing to pursue his sole remaining claim, the defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted. judgment is entered for the defendants and the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 9/8/2021) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal) (dt)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting 157 Motion to Seal. On April 9, 2021, plaintiff William Underwood moved to file under seal a document submitted in conjunction with his reply in support of his motion for summary judgment. This Court has reviewed the motion and the document. It is hereby ORDERED that Underwood's motion to file under seal is granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/12/2021) (mro)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting 143 MOTION to Seal BMI Documents and Lastrada Discovery Docs. It is hereby ORDERED that Underwood's motion to file under seal is granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/29/2021) (jca)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting 133 MOTION to Seal Declaration of Rick Marshall in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion to file under seal is granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/24/2021) (jca)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting 118 MOTION to Seal Declaration of Rick Marshall in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion to file under seal is granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/4/2021) (jca)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER terminating 116 Letter Motion to Seal. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall re-submit their request to file the Warner Music Group documents under seal. The request shall be made in a manner that is compliant with the Southern District of New York ECF Rules and Instructions and this Court's Individual Practices. The request shall also include proposed findings that support the request. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/4/2021) (jca)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE: It having been reported to this Court that this case has been settled, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the application to restore the action is made by October 16, 2020. If no such application is made by that date, today's dismissal of the action is with prejudice. See Muze, Inc. v. Digital On Demand, Inc., 356 F.3d 492, 494 n.1 (2d Cir. 2004). (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/18/2020) (jca)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic conference is scheduled for Wednesday, July 22 at 2:00 pm. The parties shall use the following credentials to dial in to the conference, which will be accessible to the press and public: Dial-in: 888-3 63-4749 Access code: 4324948 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall use a landline if one is available. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 7/22/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/16/2020) (jca)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER: On July 6, 2020, the Court granted in part the defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings and to dismiss. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed schedule for further proceedings on the remaining claim by July 17, 2020. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/6/2020) (jwh)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 85 Motion to Correct Judgment; granting 85 Motion to Alter Judgment re: 83 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document. It is hereby ORDERED that, for the reasons stated on the record at the Marc h 19 Conference, plaintiffs February 20 Motion for Reconsideration of the February 2019 Order dismissing this action is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/20/2020) (jca) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER: A March 10, 2020 Order directed the parties to call the Chambers telephone number to participate in the telephone conference scheduled for March 19, 2020 at 2 p.m. It is hereby ORDERED that, instead, the parties shall use the following dial-in instructions for the telephone conference: Dial-in: 888-363-4749 / Access code: 4324948. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/18/2020) (gr)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER: On February 19, 2020, this case was transferred to this Court. It is hereby ORDERED that a telephone conference is scheduled for March 19, 2020 at 2 p.m. Counsel for the plaintiff shall have all parties on the line and call chambers at 212-805-0202. (Telephone Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/10/2020) (jca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Underwood v. Lastrada Entertainment Company, Ltd. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R. Underwood
Represented By: Lita Teresa Rosario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lastrada Entertainment Company, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?