March 14, 2024 |
Filing
139
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case has been reassigned to the undersigned. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, all prior orders, dates, and deadlines shall remain in effect notwithstanding the case's reassignment, including the previou sly ordered summary judgment briefing schedule, see Dkt. No. 138. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules & Practices, which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-margaret-m-garnett. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 3/14/2024) (tg)
|
January 31, 2024 |
Filing
138
ORDER TO EXTEND TIME: IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE JOINT STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT of Plaintiffs and Counterclaim-Defendants Noble Security, Inc. and Meir Avganim and Defendant and Counterclaim-Plaintiff ACCO Brands Corp., the deadlines for the schedul e for briefing the parties' motions for summary judgment are extended as follows: 1. Moving Papers would be due on March 29, 2024. 2. Opposition Papers would be due on April 26, 2024. 3. Reply Papers would be due on May 17, 2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED this 31dt day of January, 2024 (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/31/2024) ( Motions due by 3/29/2024., Replies due by 5/17/2024., Responses due by 4/26/2024) (ks)
|
January 18, 2024 |
Filing
136
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule will apply to Plaintiffs' Defendant's motions for summary judgment: 1. Moving papers are due on February 16, 2024; 2. Opposition papers are due on March 15, 2024; and 3. Reply papers, if any, are due on March 29, 2024. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motions. (Dkt. Nos. 132, 133). SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 2/16/2024., Replies due by 3/29/2024., Responses due by 3/15/2024) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/18/2024) (tg)
|
August 8, 2022 |
Filing
121
ORDER: The status conference scheduled for August 25, 2022, is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/08/2022) (ama)
|
July 27, 2022 |
Filing
117
ORDER : The status conference previously scheduled for July 28, 2022, is adjourned to August 25, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. The parties are directed to dial 888-363-4749 to participate, and to enter the access code 6212642. The press and public may obtai n access to the telephone conference by dialing the same number and using the same access code. The Court is holding multiple telephone conferences on this date. The parties should call in at the scheduled time and wait on the line for their case t o be called. At that time, the Court will un-mute the parties' lines. Two days before the conference, the parties must email Michael_Ruocco@nysd.uscourts.gov and GardepheNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov with the phone numbers that the p arties will be using to dial into the conference so that the Court knows which numbers to un-mute. The email should include the case name and case number in the subject line. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/27/2022) ( Telephone Conference set for 8/25/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (ks)
|
May 11, 2022 |
Filing
114
ORDER: The conference scheduled for May 12, 2022, will now take place at 11:45 a.m. by telephone. The parties are directed to dial 888-363-4749 to participate, and to enter the access code 6212642. The press and public may obtain access to the tel ephone conference by dialing the same number and using the same access code. The Court is holding multiple telephone conferences on this date. The parties should call in at the scheduled time and wait on the line for their case to be called. At th at time, the Court will un-mute the parties lines. Before the conference, the parties must email Michael_Ruocco@nysd.uscourts.gov and GardepheNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov with the phone numbers that the parties will be using to dial into the conference so that the Court knows which numbers to un-mute. The email should include the case name and case number in the subject line. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/11/2022) (ks)
|
January 21, 2022 |
Filing
111
ORDER: As discussed at today's conference, by January 28, 2022, the parties will file a joint submission addressing the following: (1) a proposed case management plan for completing discovery, a standard form of which is available on the Co urt's website; (2) expected motion practice; and (3) the prospect for settlement, including whether both sides believe that a settlement conference before the assigned magistrate judge Judge Gorenstein might be productive. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/21/2022) (ks)
|
January 12, 2022 |
Filing
110
ORDER granting 109 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The application is granted. The conference currently scheduled on January 14, 2022 is adjourned to January 21, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 1/21/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/12/2022) (vfr)
|
January 11, 2022 |
Filing
108
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: For the reasons stated above, this Court declines to construe the disputed terms of the '697 Patent, the '422 Patent, and the '558 Patent. This Court further concludes that the terms "protrusion,&quo t; "lock interface member," and portable electronic device" are claim limitations of the '422 Patent, and that "aperture" is a claim limitation of the '422 Patent and the '558 Patent. A telephonic conference in this matter will take place on January 14, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/11/2022) ( Telephone Conference set for 1/14/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (ks)
|