Range, Jr. v. 230 West 41st Street LLC et al
Plaintiff: King Range, Jr.
Defendant: 230 West 41st Street LLC, Hat Trick Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza LLC and Domino's Pizza Franchising LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00149
Filed: January 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A. Preska
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12188
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting 110 Motion for Attorney Fees. To the extent and for the reasons stated above, the motion for attorney's fees and litigation costs [dkt. no. 110] is GRANTED. The Court orders Plaintiff's counsel, Parker Hanski, within thirty days to pay Domino's attorney's fees in the amount of $16,330.00 and costs in the amount of $877.69. The Clerk of the Court shall close the motion. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/16/2020) (va) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing.
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 80 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 103 Motion for Summary Judgment. To the extent they are not addressed above, the Court has considered the parties' remaining arguments and finds them un availing. For the foregoing reasons, Domino's summary judgment motion is GRANTED in full. Hat Trick and 230 West's motion is GRANTED with respect to the claims for negligence, violations of the NYSCRL, and for injunctive relief under ( i) the ADA for alleged alterations; (ii) the ADA and NYSHRL based on removal of access barriers via proposals 2-5 on page 12 of Plaintiff's opposition brief; and (iii) the NYCHRL for failure to provide a reasonable accommodation. Hat Trick and 230 West's motion for summary judgment is otherwise DENIED. The Clerk of the Court shall close the open motions [dkt. nos. 80, 103.] SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/5/2020) (va)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 100 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/7/2020) (va)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 91 Letter Motion to Seal. The Court is persuaded that the redacted information is confidential and should remain so. It also is not particularly relevant to the performance of the judicial function in this case. Accordingly, the redacted material shall be sealed from the public docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/13/2020) (va)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Range, Jr. v. 230 West 41st Street LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Range, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Gerald Hanski
Represented By: Glen Howard Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 230 West 41st Street LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hat Trick Pizza, Inc.
Represented By: Angela M. Objay-Stenroos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domino's Pizza LLC
Represented By: Christopher Kendric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domino's Pizza Franchising LLC
Represented By: Christopher Kendric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?