Kotler v. Boley et al
Plaintiff: Kerry Kotler
Defendant: C. Boley, J. Carreras, K. Chauvin and S. Reams
Case Number: 1:2017cv00239
Filed: January 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Franklin
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 156 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Granted. The conference is adjourned to 6/26/24 at 10:30. So Ordered. ( Status Conference set for 6/26/2024 at 10:30 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/4/24) (yv)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER: In light of the Dutchess County District Attorney's response, the Court now considers discovery complete. The parties are directed to write to Judge Karas, requesting that the Court schedule a Case Management Conference. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 5/15/2024) (ks)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER: On November 6, 2023, the Court held a telephonic Status Conference and heard oral argument on Plaintiff's motion. For the reasons explained during the Status Conference, the Court GRANTED Plaintiff's motion to reopen discovery. D iscovery has been reopened for the limited purpose of (1) serving a non-party subpoena on the Dutchess County District Attorney; and (2) serving a request for an interrogatory on Defendants, as discussed on the record. The Court will direct th e U.S. Marshals to serve the subpoena, to be returnable in 30 days. By no later than December 21, 2023, the parties must submit a joint letter to the Court with an update on the status of the subpoena and the interrogatory. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 11/7/2023) (ks)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter motion, requesting that the Court reopen discovery. (ECF No. 131). Defendants are directed to respond by no later than October 31, 2023. A Status Conference (via Teams) is hereby sched uled for November 6, 2023, at 10:30 AM. This conference will be conducted on the Teams platform. The Court will supply Defendants' counsel with a Teams conference link. Defendants' counsel shall then forward the Teams conference link to Pl aintiff's facility. The parties should be prepared to discuss the matters raised in Plaintiff's letter motion to reopen discovery. (ECF No. 131). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 10/25/2023) ( Responses due by 10/31/2023, Status Conference set for 11/6/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik.) (ks)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER: Accordingly, because discovery closed on September 12, 2023, and because I lack authority to reopen discovery, I cannot grant Plaintiff's request. If Plaintiff needs to conduct additional discovery, he is directed to address his request to reopen discovery to Judge Karas. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's request is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 10/6/2023) (tg)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER: The Court has received the parties' joint letter, dated September 22, 2023, regarding their outstanding discovery disputes. (ECF No. 123). For the reasons stated below, Plaintiff's Requests for Production Nos. 8 and 9 are DENIED , and Plaintiff's Request for Admission No. 3 is GRANTED in part. For Requests for Production Nos. 10 and 12 and for Request for Admission No. 3, Defendants are directed to provide the Court with a status update on the requested documents by no later than October 6, 2023. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 9/28/2023) (tg)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 115 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Granted. The conference is adjourned to 10/11/2023 at 11:00. Movant's pre-motion letter is due 9/30/23. Non-Movant's letter is due 10/6/23. So Ordered. (Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 7/21/23) (yv)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER RE STAUS CONFERENCE: A Status Conference (via Teams) is hereby scheduled for 8/9/23 at 11 am. This conference will be conducted on the Teams platform. Defense counsel will be provided with the Teams conference link, which they will forward t o Plaintiff's facility. Re: Incarcerated Prisoners Incarcerated petitioners/plaintiffs shall participate in the conference by videoconference (in lieu of a writ appearance). It is the responsibility of counsel for respondent/defendant to make pr ior arrangements with the appropriate facility to have the petitioner/plaintiff available via telephone. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 7/17/2023) ( Status Conference set for 8/9/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik.) (ks)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 DISCOVERY ORDER: The above-referenced action has been referred to the undersigned for general pre-trial purposes. See 28 U.S.C. §636(b)(1)(A). All pre-trial applications submitted to the undersigned must comply with this Court's Indivi dual Practices. All discovery (including requests for admission and any applications to the Court regarding the conduct of discovery) must be initiated in time to be concluded by the deadline for all discovery. As further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 6/20/2023) (ks)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: Plaintiff's argument is therefore moot, and his requests are denied. Accordingly, Plaintiffs motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 2/10/2023) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ks)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: Beginning March 30, 2020, until further notice, all parties to civil conferences before Judge Davison shall attend by phone, using the following information: Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1839 Access Code: 5999739 The parties should call in f rom a landline and announce their names before speaking. For Settlement Conferences: Clients should NOT be on the conference call. Counsel must have ready telephonic access to clients. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 1/18/2023) (ks)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned action has been scheduled for a status conference before the Honorable Kenneth M. Karas, United States District Judge, on Tuesday, January 17, 2023 at 2:30 p.m. NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INF ORMATION: Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Cour t is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the prose party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. So Ordered. ( Status Conference set for 1/17/2023 at 02:30 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/29/2022) (tg)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER OF DISMISSAL... Plaintiff's claims against Chauvin are dismissed without prejudice for failure to serve. See Herring v. City of Syracuse, No. 09-CV-1168, 2010 WL 3981960, at *2 (N.D.N.Y. Oct. 8, 2010) (dismissing pro se prisoner complai nt pursuant to Rule 4(m) where "the [c]ourt repeatedly gave notice to [the] [p]laintiff that it was going to dismiss the action if he did not" comply with court orders); Thomas v. Keane, No. 99-CV-4302, 2001 WL 410095, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Ap r. 23, 2001) (noting that claims by an incarcerated pro se plaintiff were "dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) for failure to complete service on these defendants"). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff, and to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/1/21) (yv) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to issue a summons, complete the USM-285 forms with the address for Defendan t K. Chauvin, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. The U.S. Marshals Service is respectfully directed to attempt in-person service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/9/2021) (jca) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 47 Motion Request for Reconsideration. For the reasons stated above, Plaintiff's Motion is denied insofar as it requests reconsideration of the Court's 2020 Opinion, and grant ed insofar as it requests an extension of time to effect service on Chauvin. Plaintiff must serve Chauvin by February 9, 2021. Consistent with its Order of October 3, 2018, (Dkt. No. 31), the U.S. Marshals Service is respectfully directed to again a ttempt to effect service upon Chauvin at her last known address. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending Motion, (Dkt. No. 47), and mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at the address listed on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/9/2020) (nb)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMO ENDORSEMENT with respect to 47 Motion for Extension of Time; with respect to 47 MOTION reinstating plaintiff's retaliation and due process related claims. ENDORSEMENT: The motion will be considered on the papers. No return date is necessary. Defense response is 4/7/20. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to the Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/23/2020) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 OPINION & ORDER re: 43 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by C. Boley, J. Carreras, S. Reams. Defendants' Motion To Dismiss is granted. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Boley, Carreras, and Reams are dismissed with prejudice. This is the second time adjudicating those claims, and Plaintiff has fixed virtually none of the problems identified by the Court in the 2018 Opinion. See Denny v. Barber, 576 F.2d 465, 471 (2d Cir. 1978) (holding that the plaintiff was not entitl ed to "a third go-around"); Melvin v. County of Westchester, No. 14-CV-2995, 2016 WL 1254394, at *24 n.19 (S.D.N.Y. Mar. 29, 2016) (granting motion to dismiss with prejudice where "[the] [p]laintiff has already had two bites at the ap ple, and they have proven fruitless" (citation, alterations and quotation marks omitted)). Furthermore, Chauvin is dismissed for failure to serve, but this dismissal is without prejudice. If service is not effected as to Chauvin within 30 days of this Opinion & Order and if Plaintiff continues to fail to request an extension of time to serve her, the Court may dismiss her from the Action with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending Motion, (Dkt. No. 43), and mail a copy of this Opinion & Order to Plaintiff at the address listed on the docket. SO ORDERED., (S. Reams (Inmate Grievance Program Supervisor), C. Boley (Correction Officer) and J. Carreras (Sergeant) terminated.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/25/20) (yv) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 OPINION & ORDER re: 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by C. Boley, J. Carreras, S. Reams: For the reasons stated above, Defendants' Motion To Dismiss is granted. This Opinion does not impact Plaintiff's outstanding claims against Defenda nt Chauvin. Moreover, because this is the first adjudication of Plaintiff's claims on the merits, the dismissal is without prejudice. If Plaintiff wishes to file an amended complaint, Plaintiff must do so within 30 days of the date of this Opini on. Plaintiff should include within the amended complaint any changes to correct the deficiencies identified in this Opinion that Plaintiff wishes the Court to consider. Plaintiff is advised that the amended complaint will replace, not supplement, th e original complaint. The amended complaint must contain all of the claims against all Defendants, including those who have not joined in this Motion to Dismiss. The Court will not consider factual allegations contained in supplemental letters, decla rations, or memoranda. If Plaintiff fails to abide by the 30-day deadline, his claims against the moving Defendants may be dismissed with prejudice. Moreover, Chauvin remains unserved and unrepresented. It appears that Chauvin was not served because she "retired," and is no longer able to be served at Fishkill. (Dkt. No. 18.) Accordingly, Defendants are instructed to inform the Court of the proper service address for Chauvin within 30 days of the issuance of this Opinion. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending Motion, (Dkt. No. 20), and mail a copy of this Opinion to Plaintiff at the address listed on the docket. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/28/2018) (jwh) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kotler v. Boley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Kotler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Boley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Carreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Chauvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Reams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?