Medidata Solutions, Inc. v. Veeva Systems Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Medidata Solutions, Inc. and MDSOL Europe Limited
Defendant: Veeva Systems Inc, Alan Mateo, Michelle Marlborough, Sondra Pepe, Richard Young, Veeva Systems Inc. and Jason Rizzo
Not Classified By Court: Jill Johnston
Case Number: 1:2017cv00589
Filed: January 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Robert W Lehrburger
Referring Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 303 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Khari Tillery dated 04/07/2020 re: #302 LETTER MOTION for Conference or Clarification of Court's April 3, 2020 Order (DKT301) addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated April 7, 2020. . Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc...(Tillery, Khari)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 302 LETTER MOTION for Conference or Clarification of Court's April 3, 2020 Order (DKT301) addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated April 7, 2020. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc...(Ray, Claudia)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that both parties proposed redactions are accepted. Although [t]he common law right of public access to judicial documents is firmly rooted in our nations history, this right is not absolute, and courts must balance competing considerations against the presumption of access. Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110, 119-20 (2d Cir.2006) (internal quotation marks omitted). The proposed redactions are necessary to prevent what is covered under the parties confidentiality agreement and alleged to be sensitive commercial information. It is further ORDERED that, the parties requests for a pre-motion conference regarding their proposed summary judgment motions is denied. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its motion for summary judgment, not to exceed thirty (30) pages, by April 24, 2020. Defendants shall file their opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment, not to exceed forty (40) pages, by May 15, 2020. Plaintiff shall file its reply and opposition to Defendants cross-motion for summary judgment, not to exceed thirty (30) pages, by June 5, 2020. Defendant shall file its reply in support of its cross-motion, not to exceed twenty (20) pages, by June 17, 2020, As further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/03/2020) (jcs) Modified on 4/3/2020 (jcs). (Main Document 301 replaced on 4/3/2020) (jcs).
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated April 2, 2020 re: Pre-Motion Letter Pursuant to Court's Individual Rule III.A.1. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc., Veeva Systems Inc., MDSOL Europe Limited.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #298 .(Ray, Claudia)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 299 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated April 2, 2020 re: Pre-Motion Letter Pursuant to Court's Individual Rule III.A.1. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc...(Ray, Claudia)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 298 LETTER MOTION to Seal Regarding Pre-Motion Letter addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated April 2, 2020. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc...(Ray, Claudia)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Khari Tillery dated 04/02/2020 re: Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc., Veeva Systems Inc., MDSOL Europe Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #295 .(Tillery, Khari)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 296 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Khari Tillery dated 04/02/2020 re: Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H).(Tillery, Khari)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 295 LETTER MOTION to Seal Pre-Motion Letter and Exhibits addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Khari Tillery dated 04/02/2020. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc...(Tillery, Khari)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 294 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated March 26, 2020 re: Public Version of DKT279. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter Motion, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 - Part 1, #5 Exhibit 3 - Part 2, #6 Exhibit 3 - Part 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7).(Ray, Claudia)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 293 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari Tillery dated 03/12/2020 re: Partially Unredacted Opposition to Medidata Motion Seeking Disqualification of Defendant's Expert as Ordered at Dkt. 292. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4).(Tillery, Khari)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER: This resolves Medidata's request (Dkt. 290) to maintain sealing of portions of materials filed in connection with its letter motion to disqualify a Veeva expert as reflected in Dkt. 279 and 285. The request is granted in part and denied in part. Medidata may maintain under seal the portions already redacted with respect to the following paragraphs of the report of expert Hunnewell: 68, 69, 70, 76 (and any redacted footnotes included in those paragraphs). The request is otherwise denied. This order does not at all address or concern the merits of the case and may not be used as evidence of the merits. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger) (Text Only Order) (Farkas, Brian)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 291 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated March 19, 2020. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(Ray, Claudia)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 290 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #291) - LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated March 19, 2020. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.(Ray, Claudia) Modified on 3/24/2020 (ldi).
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 289 AMENDED ORDER re: #283 Order. This Order amends this Court's March 11, 2020 Order (Dkt. 283) and resolves the letter motions at Dkt. 275 and 279, addressing Medidata's requests to exclude certain opinions of expert Andrew Crain, and to compel production of deposition transcripts of Veeva witnesses and materials pertaining to a motion for spoliation sanctions from the separate IQVIA trade secret litigation against Veeva. Dkt. 275 and 279. 1. Medidata's letter motion to exclude opinions of expert Andrew Crain pertaining to the File Lists is DENIED. The parties shall (1) meet and confer to discuss a schedule for Medidata's expert Julian Ackert to supplement or amend his expert report based on the File Lists, and whether there is any resulting need for extending completion of expert discovery (including expert depositions); and (2) if so, apply to the Court for said extension by March 18, 2020. 2. Medidata's request to compel production of Veeva witness transcripts from the IQVIA litigation is DENIED given the dissimilarity in subject matter and nature of the claims. That both actions involve trade secret claims is not sufficient and does not make production of the materials proportional to this litigation. 3. Medidata's request for production of the IQVIA spoliation briefing materials is DENIED for similar reasons. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 3/19/2020) Copies transmitted to all counsel of record. (mml)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER: This order resolves Plaintiff's letter motion at Dkt. 280. Medidata's request to exclude the testimony of Veeva expert George Hunnewell is DENIED for substantially the reasons as set forth in Veeva's letter dated March 12, 2020. (Dkt. 285). (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger)(Text Only Order) (Farkas, Brian)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting #286 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. So Ordered. (Deposition due by 4/7/2020.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 3/18/20) (yv)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 286 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated March 18, 2020. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc...(Ray, Claudia)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 285 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari Tillery dated March 12, 2020 re: #280 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Seeking Disqualification of Defendant's Expert addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated March 9, 2020. . Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4).(Tillery, Khari)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #282 Letter filed by Veeva Systems Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 3/11/2020) (mml)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER denying #275 Letter Motion for Discovery; denying #279 Letter Motion for Discovery. This Order resolves the letter motions at Dkt. 275 and 279, addressing Medidata's requests to exclude certain opinions of expert Andrew Crain, and to compel production of deposition transcripts of Veeva witnesses and materials pertaining to a motion for spoliation sanctions from the separate IQVIA trade secret litigation against Veeva. Dkt. 275 and 279. 1. Medidata's letter opinions of expert Andrew Crain pertaining to the File Lists is DENIED. The parties shall (1) meet and confer to discuss a schedule for Medidata's expert Julian Ackert to supplement or amend his expert report based on the File Lists, and whether there is any resulting need for extending completion of expert discovery (including expert depositions); and (2) if so, apply to the Court for said extension by March 18, 2020. 2. Medidata's request to compel production of Veeva witness transcripts from the IQVIA litigation is DENIED given the dissimilarity in subject matter and nature of the claims. That both actions involve trade secret claims is not sufficient and does not make production of the materials proportional to this litigation. 3. Medidata's request for production of the IQVIA spoliation briefing materials is DENIED for similar reasons. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 3/11/2020) (mml)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 3/18/2020. (mml)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 282 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated 03/10/2020 re: Maintaining Redactions to DKT Nos. 275 and 278. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc...(Tillery, Khari)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 281 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari Tillery dated March 10, 2020 re: #276 LETTER MOTION to Compel addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated March 5, 2020. . Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5).(Tillery, Khari)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER MOTION for Discovery Seeking Disqualification of Defendant's Expert addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated March 9, 2020. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc., MDSOL Europe Limited, Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 Part 1, #4 Exhibit 3 Part 2, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #279 .(Ray, Claudia)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 279 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Seeking Disqualification of Defendant's Expert addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated March 9, 2020. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7).(Ray, Claudia)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 278 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated 03/06/20 re: #275 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Sanctions addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated March 3, 2020. . Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ben Rothstein in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3).(Tillery, Khari)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 277 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated March 6, 2020 re: Status. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc...(Ray, Claudia)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 276 LETTER MOTION to Compel addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated March 5, 2020. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7).(Ray, Claudia)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 275 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Sanctions addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated March 3, 2020. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6).(Ray, Claudia)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 274 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Benjamin A. Yaghoubian on behalf of MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. New Address: Kirkland & Ellis LLP, 2049 Century Park East, Suite 3700, Los Angeles, CA, USA 90067, 310-552-4200..(Yaghoubian, Benjamin)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 273 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated February 11, 2020 re: Public Version of DKT268. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A).(Ray, Claudia)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 272 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: granting #271 Motion to Seal Document. ENDORSEMENT: Granted So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 2/6/2020) (js)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #272 Order on Motion to Seal Document, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case..(js)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 271 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Seal Document Regarding Docket Entry No. 268 and 269 addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated February 5, 2020. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc...(Ray, Claudia)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER: Plaintiff's application to set a briefing schedule for the described spoliation motion is denied without prejudice to renew following the close of expert discovery on the issue. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger)(Text Only Order) (Lehrburger, Robert)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 269 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated 01/30/2020 re: #268 LETTER MOTION for Discovery requesting briefing schedule addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated January 27, 2020. . Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Tillery, Khari)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 268 LETTER MOTION for Discovery requesting briefing schedule addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated January 27, 2020. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Ray, Claudia)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 267 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated January 22, 2020 re: Status. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting #265 Letter Motion for Conference. APPLICATION GRANTED. The case management conference shall take place on April 16, 2020, at 10:30 A.M. Per the Case Management Plan, pre-motion letters, if any, are due by April 2, 2020. Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/16/2020) (cf)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 265 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference regarding post discovery case management conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated January 15, 2020. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting #263 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Deposition due by 3/13/2020. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 1/15/2020) (mml)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 263 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery regarding expert depositons addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated January 15, 2020. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated December 5, 2019 re: Status. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER: The parties' joint application (Dkt. 260) to maintain under seal two exhibits to their November 22, 2019 joint letter motion regarding a discovery issue is granted (Dkt. 258-1, 258-2). (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger)(Text Only Order) (Lehrburger, Robert)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated December 4, 2019. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Tillery, Khari)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER: This order resolves the discovery issue raised by the parties in their joint letter dated November 22, 2019. Veeva's request for an additional 30(b)(6) deposition and to compel Medidata to further specify trade secrets in the Tsai Retained Documents is DENIED. As Medidata explains, the Tsai materials are being offered merely as additional evidence of misappropriation, not as a basis for claiming any new trade secrets not already identified. The case has been delayed enough, including due to Veeva's lapses with respect to the Tsai documents. It is time to wrap up discovery. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 11/25/2019) (Lehrburger, Robert)
November 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated 11/22/2019 re: Discovery. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tillery, Khari)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER granting #255 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 10/30/2019) (ks)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Arnett on behalf of MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Arnett, Patrick)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to complete fact depositions addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated October 30, 2019. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 254 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated October 21, 2019 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting #252 Motion to Seal Document (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger)(Text Only Order) (Farkas, Brian)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document Letter motion for a protective order retaining all redactions submitted as part of the parties' joint letter dated September 12, 2019 addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated September 24, 2019. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 SCHEDULING ORDER: November 1, 2019 - Medidata to complete fact depositions. December 20, 2019 - Veeva to complete fact deposition(s), if any. January 10, 2020 - Supplemental expert reports based on additional discovery. January 31, 2020 - Supplemental rebuttal reports based on additional discovery. February 10-21, 2020 Expert depositions. Expert Deposition due by 2/21/2020. Discovery due by 1/31/2020. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 9/23/2019) (mml)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated September 20, 2019 re: an additional discovery schedule. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2)(Ray, Claudia)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER: This Order resolves the issues raised in the parties' joint letter filed on September 12, 2019. The four discovery requests described by Medidata are reasonable and proportionate; accordingly, Veeva shall comply with those four requests (i.e., hard drive filenames and documents; messaging app documents; affirm date Mr. Tsai received litigation hold; and provide list of particular employees). Additionally, the Court agrees with Veeva, that the parties should meet and confer on a comprehensive schedule. There is no reason the remaining schedule cannot be set, just as there is no reason schedules cannot be set at the outset of cases for which no discovery has been taken. Whether any schedule should be modified in the future can be dealt with when and if the issue arises. Accordingly, by September 20, the parties shall file a proposed schedule. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 9/13/2019) (Lehrburger, Robert)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 248 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated September 12, 2019 re: efforts to meet and confer and additional discovery. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Ray, Claudia)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for a protective order to prevent expert depositions from going forward at this time is denied, with the understanding that the parties have agreed that expert Davies will be deposed only once at a later time. The deposition of damages expert Hall shall go forward at this time. If Hall supplements his report later on based on information provided in the Tsai discovery, the parties shall meet and confer as to the scope/limits of a second deposition of Hall. This resolves Dkt. 243. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger)(Text Only Order) (Lehrburger, Robert)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated September 10, 2019 re: #243 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Protective Order addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated September 6, 2019. . Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tillery, Khari)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting #244 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger)(Text Only Order) (Giglio, Amanda)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File /To Supplement the report ordered by the Court addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated September 9, 2019. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 243 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Conference / Protective Order addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated September 6, 2019. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ray, Claudia) Modified on 11/22/2019 (db).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated September 5, 2019 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting #238 Letter Motion for Discovery. This Order addresses the discovery issues raised by the parties in Dkt. 238, 239 and 240. 1. Plaintiff is granted leave to issue a subpoena to Mr. Tsai. 2. Expert discovery shall be completed as per the existing schedule. 3. No later than September 9, 2019, the parties shall meet and confer and report to the Court as to any additional discovery and schedule warranted by the information recently brought to light about Mr. Tsai. 4. Defendant shall take reasonable steps to determine whether there are any additional current Veeva employees who (a) are former Medidata employees and (b) have had any responsibility for the products at issue and (c) have Medidata documents in their possession, whether personal or otherwise. The Clerk is respectfully directed to close Dkt. 238 and mark it as granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 8/28/2019) (mml)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated August 28, 2019 re: #238 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Request for Leave to Serve Subpoena on Anthony Tsai addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated August 22, 2019. . Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated 08/27/2019 re: #238 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Request for Leave to Serve Subpoena on Anthony Tsai addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated August 22, 2019. . Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Tillery, Khari)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 238 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Request for Leave to Serve Subpoena on Anthony Tsai addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated August 22, 2019. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Ray, Claudia)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated July 22, 2019 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 236 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated June 6, 2019 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Andrew T. Hambelton on behalf of Veeva Systems Inc.. New Address: Blank Rome LLP., 1271 Avenue of Americas, New York, New York, 10020, 212-885-5000. (Hambelton, Andrew)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin David Rothstein on behalf of Veeva Systems Inc.. (Rothstein, Benjamin)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting #232 Letter Motion for Discovery. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger)(Text Only Order) (rsh)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Revised Schedule addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated May 17, 2019. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting #230 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 5/14/2019) (mml)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time regarding Proposed Schedule addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated May 13, 2019. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Kevin Joseph Bruno on behalf of Veeva Systems Inc.. New Address: Blank Rome LLP., 1271 Avenue of Americas, New York, New York, 10020, 212-885-5000. (Bruno, Kevin)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF WILLIAM D. WILLIAMS. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Williams, William)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting #226 Motion to Seal Document. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 5/8/2019) (mml) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document Retaining Redactions in Dkts. 223 and 224 addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated May 7, 2019. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER terminating #219 Letter Motion to Compel; terminating #223 Letter Motion for Discovery. In accordance with today's telephonic discovery conference addressing issues in Dkt. Nos. 219 and 223, the Court orders as follows. 1. Medidata Solutions, Inc. ("Medidata") shall provide to Veeva Systems, Inc. ("Veeva") a four-week historical period within which Veeva will search for responsive documents relating to the inception and development of the products at issue in this litigation. Medidata may provide separate four-week windows for the two products at issue. Veeva's search will be limited to the ten existing custodians. The parties shall meet and confer with respect to the schedule for Medidata's request and Veeva's responsive production, as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 5/1/2019) Copies Sent By Chambers. (mml)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger: Telephone Conference held on 5/1/2019 at 10:00 a.m. (rsh)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated April 30, 2019 re: #223 LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated 04/25/2019. . Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Ray, Claudia)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated 04/25/2019. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Tillery, Khari)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated April 22, 2019 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 5/1/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. The parties shall call the teleconference line at (888)-398-2342 and enter access code: 9543348. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 4/22/2019) (rsh)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated 4/19/2019 re: #219 LETTER MOTION to Compel Veeva Systems Inc. to produce documents concerning the development and design of its EDC and CTMS products addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated April 16, 2019. . Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 (Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 8 (Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 9 (Under Seal), #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13 (Under Seal), #14 Exhibit 14 (Under Seal), #15 Exhibit 15 (Under Seal))(Tillery, Khari)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 LETTER MOTION to Compel Veeva Systems Inc. to produce documents concerning the development and design of its EDC and CTMS products addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated April 16, 2019. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Ray, Claudia)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER: granting #217 Letter Motion for Discovery. ( Parties to exchange Expert Reports regarding issues on which that party has the burden of proof: May 24, 2019; Parties to exchange Rebuttal Expert Reports: July 12, 2019; Expert Depositions: July 22 -August 2, 2019). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 3/22/2019) (ama)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - JOINT LETTER MOTION for Discovery Deadline addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated March 22, 2019. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia) Modified on 5/6/2019 (db).
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Deposition due by 8/2/2019. (ama)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting #215 Letter Motion for Discovery. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 3/19/19) (yv)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Discovery Deadline addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated March 18, 2019. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated March 15, 2019 re: Public Versions of Dkt. 199 Exhibit D and Dkt. 205 Exhibit B. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ray, Claudia)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting #212 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 3/14/2019) (mro)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated March 14, 2019. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #208 Letter filed by Veeva Systems Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 3/11/2019) (mml)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting #209 Motion to Seal Document. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 3/11/2019) (mml)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document re Retaining Redactions in Dkts. #197 #201 #202 #203 addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Molly C. Villagra dated March 8, 2019. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Villagra, Molly)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated March 8, 2019 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Tillery, Khari)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #208 Endorsed Letter. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (mml)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS terminating #194 Letter Motion for Conference ; granting in part and denying in part #197 Letter Motion to Compel; terminating #199 Letter Motion to Compel; denying #201 Letter Motion to Compel; denying #202 Letter Motion to Compel. Dkt. 194: Veeva Motion, Protective Order Against 30(b)(6) Topics Noticed By Medidata, 1. Veeva waited unduly long to seek relief regarding the topics noticed by Medidata. Medidata contends that Veeva thereby waived its right to seek a protective order, citing Fort Worth Employees' Retirement Fund v. J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., No. 09 Civ. 3701, 2013 WL 6439069, at *2 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 9, 2013). In that case, however, Magistrate Judge Francis found that although the weight of authority held the burden to obtain relief lies with the recipient of the deposition notice, "the issue is not free from doubt" and went on to consider the dispute on the merits. This Court elects to do the same for this motion, as further set forth in this Order. Dkt. 197: Medidata Motion, Johnston and Carty Files and Other Medidata Document Requests, 1. Jill Johnston files: Denied. Judge Schofield imposed limits on document custodians and hours to be expended on ESI production. According to Veeva, it has already produced hundreds of documents relating to Ms. Johnston, even if not directly collected from her files. Although the undersigned has permitted Medidata to depose Ms. Johnston, Medidata has not shown good cause to exceed the ESI and custodian limits. 2. Drew Carty files: Granted. Medidata asks for a narrow, targeted search of Mr. Carty's files for information concerning the "Rave Specification," allegedly proprietary information provided to Veeva by a customer. Medidata specifically is trying to discover what happened to the Rave Specification once it was shared internally at Veeva. Medidata has demonstrated good cause for this limited search. Veeva shall conduct a narrow, targeted search of Mr. Carty's files for information related to the Rave Specification, as further set forth in this Order. Dkt. 199: Veeva Motion, Specific Identification of Trade Secrets in Interrogatories 5 and 7, 1. The Court does not find this motion to be untimely given the sequence of discovery events, as further set forth in this Order. Dkt. 201: Veeva Motion, Compel Production of Documents from Medidata, 1. Veeva, having waited until the end of fact discovery, seeks to compel production of documents in response to various requests, Medidata's objections to which were made months ago (the most recent being in December 2018). With one exception made in the interest of justice, the motion is denied as untimely and also denied on the merits of each request. Dkt. 202: Veeva Motion, Compel Production from Medidata for Document Requests 57, 58 and 76, 1. Veeva seeks to compel production of document requests asserted months ago seeking information about Medidata's access to and communications about Veeva's products and comparisons between the parties' eTMF products. 2. The motion is denied as untimely; Medidata objected to these requests in October 2018. It is too late to bring them to the Court's attention on the eve of the conclusion of fact discovery. Fact discovery is extended solely for the purpose of completing discovery permitted pursuant to this or previous orders. The parties shall meet and confer and, no later than March 14, 2019, propose a schedule to the Court for swift completion of discovery. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 3/6/2019) Copies Sent By Chambers. (mml)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated March 5, 2019 re: #202 LETTER MOTION to Compel Medidata Solutions, Inc. to produce documents re: Medidata access to Veeva products addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Reid P. Mullen dated February 28, 2019. . Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ray, Claudia)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated March 5, 2019 re: #199 LETTER MOTION to Compel Medidata Solutions to Supplement Interrogatory Response and Provide Additional Deposition Time addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated February 28, 2019. . Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Ray, Claudia)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated March 5, 2019 re: #201 LETTER MOTION to Compel Medidata Solutions to Search for and Produce Categories of Documents addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated February 28, 2019. . Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Ray, Claudia)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated March 1, 2019 re: #197 LETTER MOTION to Compel regarding search, collection and production of documents addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated February 26, 2019. . Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Tillery, Khari)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 LETTER MOTION to Compel Medidata Solutions, Inc. to produce documents re: Medidata access to Veeva products addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Reid P. Mullen dated February 28, 2019. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Mullen, Reid)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 LETTER MOTION to Compel Medidata Solutions to Search for and Produce Categories of Documents addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated February 28, 2019. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Tillery, Khari)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated February 28, 2019 re: #194 LETTER MOTION for Conference and a Protective Order regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Reid P. Mullen dated 02/25/2019. . Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Ray, Claudia)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 LETTER MOTION to Compel Medidata Solutions to Supplement Interrogatory Response and Provide Additional Deposition Time addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated February 28, 2019. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Tillery, Khari)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance - Bonnie L. Jarrett. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Jarrett, Bonnie)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 LETTER MOTION to Compel regarding search, collection and production of documents addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated February 26, 2019. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Ray, Claudia)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #195 Letter Motion for Discovery. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 2/26/2019) (mml)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated February 26, 2019. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Deposition due by 6/14/2019. (mml)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Conference and a Protective Order regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Reid P. Mullen dated 02/25/2019. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Mullen, Reid) Modified on 3/15/2019 (db).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #192 Letter filed by Veeva Systems Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 2/21/2019) (mml)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Molly C. Villagra dated 02/20/2019 re: Redactions in Medidata's Opposition to Motion to Quash. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Villagra, Molly)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER terminating #187 Letter Motion for Conference; terminating #189 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. This order addresses the discovery issues raised at Dkt. 185, 187 and 189. 1. The fact discovery deadline is extended two weeks to February 28, 2019. 2. Veeva may not take a 30(b)(6) deposition regarding Topics 26, 28(i)-(ii) and 31. Topics 26 and 28(i)-(ii) seek information that is not relevant or otherwise proportional to the needs of the case. As to Topic 31, Medidata's 30(b)(6) witnesses apparently have already testified concerning comparisons of the parties' products. The remainder of the information sought by this request is irrelevant or otherwise not proportional to the needs of the case. Further, Medidata objected to these topics at an earlier time, and the parties reached an impasse on January 7, 2019. Veeva could have moved to compel but did not, instead serving a notice on February 6, 2019 for the same 30(b)(6) topics to which Medidata previously had objected. Veeva should have acted earlier. 3. The stay previously issued with respect to the subpoena served on Ms. Johnston is lifted. Medidata may proceed to depose Ms. Johnston and obtain the documents requested. Medidata has sufficiently explained the unique nature of Ms. Johnston's knowledge, the timing of the request, and why Medidata should be permitted to take an eleventh deposition. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 2/12/2019) Copies Sent By Chambers. (mml)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated February 12, 2019 re: #189 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated February 11, 2019. . Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery due by 2/28/2019. (mml)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated February 11, 2019. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tillery, Khari)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated February 8, 2019 re: Opposition to the motion to quash filed by Veeva Systems Inc. and non-party Jill Johnston. (Dkt. 185.). Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted, #2 Exhibit B - Heinz Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - 2019.02.07 Tillery Email)(Ray, Claudia)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 LETTER MOTION for Conference and a Protective Order regarding a Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated February 7, 2019. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Veeva's Fourth Amended 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Medidata's Amended Objections and Responses to Second Amended 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice, #3 Exhibit 3 - Veeva's Third Amended 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice, #4 Exhibit 4 - Email to Counsel re Veeva's 4th Amended 30(b)(6) Notice, #5 Exhibit 5 - Veeva's Second Set of Request for Production, #6 Exhibit 6 - Medidata's Objections and Responses to Veeva's Second Set of Request for Production)(Ray, Claudia)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's February 5, 2019 letter (ECF 185)moving to quash a subpoena served on February 1, 2019 for the deposition of a non-party prior employee, Ms. Johnston. The subpoena notices the deposition for February 7, 2019 (with documents to be produced two days prior) or such other date as the witness may be available to February 14, 2019 (the last day to take depositions). The letter is sent on behalf of both Defendants and Ms. Johnston. The Court grants Defendants' alternative request for relief. Accordingly, the subpoena is stayed. Plaintiffs shall file a response, if any, no later than February 8, 2019. In the meantime, the parties shall meet and confer as to whether there is some specific area of information that Plaintiffs need to elicit from Ms. Johnston that they have not been able to elicit from other witnesses and, if there is such information, whether a compromise can be reached, including one that would permit the deposition to go forward after February 14, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 02/06/2019) (Lehrburger, Robert)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated 02/05/2019 re: Motion to Quash Subpoena of Jill Johnston. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc., Jill Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tillery, Khari)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated January 22, 2019 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
December 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Medidata's 12/14/18 request to file certain information under seal. The information is a portion of answers to interrogatories. The totality of the passage designated for sealing is overbroad. Medidata may redact for public record only the project names identified in the passage. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 12/15/2018) (Lehrburger, Robert) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
December 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER: The court is in receipt of the parties' joint letter regarding timing for a settlement conference. The court's settlement calendar schedules about 2-3 months out. Accordingly, the parties shall coordinate with each other and the Court's Deputy to schedule a settlement conference for March 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 12/15/2018) (Lehrburger, Robert)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated December 14, 2018 re: ADR. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Tillery, Khari)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER terminating #171 Letter Motion to Compel. Based upon a review of the parties' submissions, the December 13, 2018 telephone conference, and all prior proceedings, it is hereby ORDERED as follows. With respect to Interrogatory 5 and 7, Medidata must identify specific page numbers within the Retained Medidata Documents for each trade secret that Medidata believes may have been misappropriated. With respect to Interrogatory 17, Medidata must supply responses to Interrogatory 17(i)-(iv). Interrogatory 19(v), which requests that Medidata identify all facts supporting their contention, need not be answered at this time. Based upon further discovery, Medidata may be required to amend or supplement these responses at a later date. The parties shall meet and confer to identify a date by which Medidata shall supplement its responses. The parties must inform the court if they are unable to agree upon a schedule by December 19, 2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 12/13/2018) Copies Sent By Chambers. (mml)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger: Telephone Conference held on 12/13/2018 at 10:00 a.m. (rsh)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William David Williams on behalf of Veeva Systems Inc.. (Williams, William)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ANSWER to #77 Amended Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Tillery, Khari)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Tillery, Khari)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 12/13/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. Parties shall jointly call the chambers conference line at (212) 805-0113. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 12/10/2018) (rsh)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated December 7, 2018 re: #171 LETTER MOTION to Compel Medidata to Respond to Interrogatories addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated December 4, 2018. . Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hearing transcript)(Ray, Claudia)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER: The Court appreciates the joint status report filed by the parties and that the parties are working cooperatively (Dkt. 173). Please note, however, that for status reports the Court does not require a line-by-line listing of discovery requests/responses or individual dates and quantities of productions. Summary description is sufficient. The rules cited in the report do not appear to my individual rules (e.g., my Rule IV concerns Settlement Procedures). The parties should act accordingly for future status updates. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 12/7/2018) (Lehrburger, Robert)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated December 6, 2018 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting #170 Letter Motion to Continue: As requested, this confirms that the December 20, 2018 case management conference is cancelled. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger)(Text Only Order) (Lehrburger, Robert)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION to Compel Medidata to Respond to Interrogatories addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated December 4, 2018. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Tillery, Khari) Modified on 1/4/2019 (db).
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Continue December 20, 2018 Case Management Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated December 4, 2018. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Tillery, Khari)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #167 Motion for Jordan M. Heinz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 OPINION AND ORDER re: #104 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Veeva Systems Inc. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's motion to dismiss is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Docket Number 104. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/26/2018) (mro)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MOTION for Jordan M. Heinz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15941704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Heinz, Jordan)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #167 MOTION for Jordan M. Heinz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15941704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the conference in this matter scheduled for November 1, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. is adjourned sine die. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/26/2018) (mro)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 SECOND REVISED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to a trial before a Magistrate Judge at this time. The case is to be tried to a jury. The parties anticipate that the trial of this case will require 10 days. Deposition due by 2/7/2019. Fact Discovery due by 2/14/2019. Expert Discovery due by 4/30/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 10/22/2018) (mml)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Anderson, Christa)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #161 Letter filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 10/19/2018) (ama)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #160 Motion to Seal Document. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 10/19/2018) (mml) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated October 18, 2018 re: Request for correction of September 24, 2018 transcript.. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document #159 Notice of Filing Transcript, Request for Redactions Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 5.2(e) and 26(c) addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated October 18, 2018. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Status Conference proceeding held on 9/24/2018 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.(vba)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Status Conference held on 9/24/2018 before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/15/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/13/2019.(vba)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' October 11, 2018 joint letter concerning the discovery schedule and deadlines. The deadlines in the currently operative scheduling order (Dkt. 128) are extended by 30 days each. In the mean time, the parties shall meet and confer about remaining discovery and a revised schedule and shall submit a proposed revised schedule to the Court no later than October 19, 2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 10/12/2018) (Lehrburger, Robert)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 LETTER addressed to Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated 10/11/2018 re: Extension of Discovery. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Tillery, Khari)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #154 Motion to Seal Document. Good cause having been found, the request to redact is granted for substantially the reasons set forth herein. Defendant shall coordinate with the court reporter to implement the redactions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 10/10/2018) (mml) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document #152 Notice of Filing Transcript, Request for Redactions Pursuant to Fed. Rule 5.2(e) addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Khari J. Tillery dated October 9, 2018. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Tillery, Khari)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Claudia Elizabeth Ray re #151 Transcript,,.(Ray, Claudia)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Status Conference proceeding held on 9/24/2018 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.(vba)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Status Conference held on 9/24/2018 before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/22/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/1/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/31/2018.(vba)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #109 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Veeva Systems Inc., #99 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Veeva Systems Inc., #63 Corrected Notice of Appeal, filed by Veeva Systems Inc. USCA Case Number 17-2694 (L), 18-681 (CON). UPON DUE CONSIDERATION WHEREOF, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the order entered on February 27, 2018, is AFFIRMED, and that the appeal arising out of the order entered on August 16, 2017, is DISMISSED AS MOOT. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 09/27/2018. (nd)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Transmission of USCA Mandate to the District Judge re: #150 USCA Mandate,,. (nd)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER as reflected in today's Status/Discovery Conference transcript. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 9/24/2018) (Lehrburger, Robert)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger: Status Conference held on 9/24/2018 at 3:00 p.m. (rsh)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Christa Anderson dated September 21, 2018 re: #145 LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Deposition of Mr. Brian Longo addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated September 18, 2018. . Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Anderson, Christa)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated September 20, 2018 re: #140 LETTER MOTION to Compel Tarek Sherif, Medidata to Deposition, produce documents addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Christa M. Anderson dated September 17, 2018. . Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated September 19, 2018 re: #137 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference re Medidata's failure to search for and produce ESI from certain individuals addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Christa M. Anderson dated September 12, 2018. . Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Deposition of Mr. Brian Longo addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated September 18, 2018. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Claudia Elizabeth Ray to RE-FILE Document #142 LETTER MOTION to Compel Veeva System Inc. to make Mr. Brian Longo available for deposition addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated September 18, 2018. Use the event type Conference found under the event list Motion (Letter). (db)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Christa M. Anderson dated September 18, 2018 re: #136 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Letter regarding Gassner and Wallach addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated September 11, 2018. . Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Anderson, Christa)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Christa M. Anderson dated September 18, 2018 re: #135 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Letter regarding Custodians and Search Terms addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated September 11, 2018. . Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Christa)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION to Compel Veeva System Inc. to make Mr. Brian Longo available for deposition addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Claudia Ray dated September 18, 2018. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia) Modified on 9/19/2018 (db).
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER MOTION to Compel Medidata to produce documents addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Christa M. Anderson dated September 17, 2018. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Anderson, Christa)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 LETTER MOTION to Compel Tarek Sherif, Medidata to Deposition, produce documents addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Christa M. Anderson dated September 17, 2018. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. Return Date set for 9/20/2018 at 11:59 PM.(Anderson, Christa)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status and Discovery Conference set for 9/24/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. Parties are instructed to review and adhere to Judge Lehrburgers individual rules and practices. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 9/13/2018) (rsh)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so redesignated. (wb)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/12/2018) (cf)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference re Medidata's failure to search for and produce ESI from certain individuals addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Christa M. Anderson dated September 12, 2018. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Hambelton, Andrew) Modified on 9/21/2018 (ldi).
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Letter regarding Gassner and Wallach addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated September 11, 2018. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Letter regarding Custodians and Search Terms addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated September 11, 2018. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #131 Motion for Benjamin A. Yaghoubian to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/26/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/26/2018 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Moore, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/11/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #131 MOTION for Benjamin A. Yaghoubian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15538265. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MOTION for Benjamin A. Yaghoubian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15538265. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit of Benjamin A. Yaghoubian, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Yaghoubian, Benjamin)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Nelson Draper on behalf of MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Draper, David)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #125 Motion for Reid Mullen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 SECOND REVISED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is to be tried to a jury. A party wishing to file a summary judgment or other dispositive motion shall file a pre-motion letter at least two weeks before the conference and in the form provided in the Court's Individual Rule III.A.1. Any party wishing to oppose shall file a responsive letter as provided in the same Individual Rule. The motion will be discussed at the conference. ii. If no pre-motion letter is timely filed, this conference will be canceled and the matter placed on the Court's trial-ready calendar. The parties will be notified of the assigned trial-ready date and the filing deadlines for pretrial submissions. The parties are warned that any settlement discussions will not stay pretrial deadlines or the trial date. Deposition due by 10/12/2018. Fact Discovery due by 10/19/2018. Expert Discovery due by 12/7/2018. Pre-Motion Conference set for 12/20/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 1-2 weeks. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/25/2018) (kgo) Modified on 10/15/2018 (kgo).
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #126 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Application GRANTED. The deadline for fact discovery is extended from August 27, 2018, to October 19, 2018. A revised case management plan will issue. No further discovery extensions will be granted absent extenuating circumstances. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/25/2018) (kgo)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery due by 10/19/2018. (kgo)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Christa M. Anderson dated July 24, 2018. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Second Revised Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Anderson, Christa)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MOTION for Reid Mullen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Reid Mullen in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullen, Reid)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Reid Mullen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15332531. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Reid Mullen in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullen, Reid) Modified on 7/17/2018 (wb).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #124 MOTION for Reid Mullen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15332531. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #125 MOTION for Reid Mullen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated June 28, 2018 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #121 Motion for Divya Musinipally to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION for Divya Musinipally to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15151264. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Musinipally, Divya)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #121 MOTION for Divya Musinipally to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15151264. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Divya Musinipally to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15095367. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michelle Marlborough, Alan Mateo, Sondra Pepe, Jason Rizzo, Veeva Systems Inc., Richard Young. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Musinipally, Divya) Modified on 5/21/2018 (bcu).
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #120 MOTION for Divya Musinipally to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15095367. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... The parties' stipulated protective order is approved, except as to any provisions requiring documents to be filed under seal, which are hereby stricken. The parties shall comply with Individual Rule 1.C.3 should they want to file a document under seal. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/17/2018) (kgo)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Andrew T. Hambelton dated May 16,2018 re: Requesting Judge to So Order the Proposed Stipulated Order. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Hambelton, Andrew)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #104 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. . Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Anderson, Christa)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED as to Request No. 34, that Defendant shall produce all documents and communications concerning the conception, creation, development, testing or launch of the Veeva Vault Product, that reference Medidata, its former employees (including as named recipients of any communication), or its intellectual property or other assets, for the period from (1) the earliest date on which any Former Employee commenced work for Veeva, or (2) January 1, 2014, whichever is earlier. The parties shall confer as to which former employees are relevant. These limitations are without prejudice to Plaintiffs making a broader discovery request after the resolution of the motion to dismiss. It is further ORDERED as to Requests No. 38-44 and 46-49, that Defendant shall produce cease and desist letters, or other similar nonpublic demand letters, that it has received from its competitors, other than those in which it is in litigation. Defendant shall produce any response it made to such letters from competitors. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/26/2018) (anc)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Telephone Conference held on 4/26/2018. (jcs)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #112 Letter, filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: A telephonic conference will be held on April 26, 2018 at 11:10 A.M. to discuss this matter. Counsel shall call Chambers at 212-805-0288 when all participants are on the line. ( Telephone Conference set for 4/26/2018 at 11:10 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/23/2018) (kgo)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 DECLARATION of Bonnie L. Jarrett in Opposition re: #104 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT.. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2017.08.23 Medidata's Demurrer Motion, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2017.08.23 Medidata's Anti-SLAPP Motion, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order granting Medidata's Motion for Demurrer, #4 Exhibit 4 - Veeva's First Amended Complaint - California State Action, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2018.02.06 Medidata's Demurrer Motion to First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2018.02.06 Medidata's Anti-SLAPP Motion to First Amended Complaint)(Ray, Claudia)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #104 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. . Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated April 13, 2018 re: Discovery Dispute in Response to #110 Order. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ray, Claudia)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 3/29/2018. (Lewis, Barton)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 REVISED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trialis one to two weeks. Deposition due by 9/28/2018. Fact Discovery due by 8/27/2018. Expert Discovery due by 10/10/2018. Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/29/2018) (kgo)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that by April 12, 2018, the parties shall confer in an effort to agree on the scope of discovery as to discovery requests already served. If the parties cannot agree, the parties shall file a joint letter by April 13, 2018, to outline the discovery issues in dispute. ORDERED that by April 19, 2018, Plaintiffs shall file an opposition. By May 3, 2018, Defendants shall file a reply. The parties shall comply with the Court's Individual Rules regarding the filing of motions. Responses due by 4/19/2018 Replies due by 5/3/2018. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/29/2018) (kgo)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: #99 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #97 Memorandum & Opinion,. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Anderson, Christa)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - CORRECTED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: #99 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #97 Memorandum & Opinion,. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Anderson, Christa) Modified on 3/29/2018 (tp).
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Notice to attorney Anderson, Christa to RE-FILE Document No. #108 Corrected Notice of Appeal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the appeal. Re-file the appeal using the event type Amended Notice of Appeal found under the event list Appeal Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - select the correct order/judgment being appealed. (tp)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #109 Amended Notice of Appeal. (tp)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order First Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Supplemental Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #109 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Veeva Systems Inc. USCA Case Number 18-0681, were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated March 28, 2018 re: Opposing #106 Pre-Motion Letter re Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Appeal Fee Payment: for #99 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-14849432. (Hambelton, Andrew)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 18-681 from the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit assigned to #99 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (nd)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Christa M. Anderson dated 3/22/2018 re: Pre-Motion Letter re Defendant Veeva Systems Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Hambelton, Andrew)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #104 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. . Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Anderson, Christa)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Anderson, Christa)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT RE REVISED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Anderson, Christa)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Christa M. Anderson dated 03/15/2018 re: addressing the status of the appeal. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Anderson, Christa)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #100 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for March 22, 2018 addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Kevin J. Bruno dated 3/13/2018. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc. Application GRANTED. The pre-trial conference currently scheduled for March 22, 2018, at 10:30 A.M. is adjourned until March 29, 2018, at 11:00 A.M. (Pretrial Conference set for 3/29/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield). (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/14/2018) (rjm)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for March 22, 2018 addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Kevin J. Bruno dated 3/13/2018. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Hambelton, Andrew)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from #98 Scheduling Order,,. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Anderson, Christa)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Appeal Fee Due: for #99 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. Appeal fee due by 3/23/2018. (tp)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #99 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Veeva Systems Inc. were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #99 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (tp)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that by March 15, 2018, the parties shall file a joint status letter informing the Court of the status of the appeal of the opinion and order, dated August 16, 2017, and whether Defendants intend to withdraw that appeal, per their letter dated October 5, 2017; it is further ORDERED that by March 15, 2018, the parties shall file a revised case management plan, in light of the SAC and the opinion and order, dated February 27, 2018; it is further ORDERED that a pretrial conference will be held on March 22, 2018, at 10:30 A.M. Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/1/2018) (kgo)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 OPINION AND ORDER re: #82 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Renewed Motion to Compel Arbitration addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Christa Anderson dated October 5, 2017, filed by Veeva Systems Inc. Defendant's motion to compel arbitration and stay the case is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Docket No. 82, and as further set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/27/2018) (ras)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Blackrock, Inc. for Medidata Solutions, Inc.. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Claudia Elizabeth Ray to RE-FILE Document #95 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia) Modified on 2/20/2018 (lb).
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Christa Anderson dated January 2, 2018 re: #82 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Renewed Motion to Compel Arbitration addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Christa Anderson dated October 5, 2017. . Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Tillery, Khari)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #92 Letter, filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED in part DENIED in part. The letter motion, dated October 5, 2017 (Dkt. 82) and the letter response, dated October 12, 2017 (Dkt. 83), are respectively construed as a motion to compel arbitration and an opposition to that motion. By January 2, 2018, Defendant shall file a reply, not to exceed three pages, single-spaced. The parties may may proceed with document discovery. If the motion to compel arbitration is denied, a status conference will be held to discuss a discovery schedule. (Replies due by 1/2/2018.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/22/2017) (ras)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated December 21, 2017 re: Update on California Superior Court case and Discovery Clarification. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ray, Claudia)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #88 Motion for Molly Caldwell Villagra to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 9/28/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 9/28/2017 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Huggins, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/16/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION for Molly Caldwell Villagra to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Molly Caldwell Villagra, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Villagra, Molly)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Molly Caldwell Villagra to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14279719. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Molly Villagra, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Villagra, Molly) Modified on 10/24/2017 (ma).
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #87 MOTION for Molly Caldwell Villagra to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14279719. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from THE SUPREME COURT OF CALIFORNIA.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ma)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #88 MOTION for Molly Caldwell Villagra to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting in part #84 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED in part. The deadline to respond to the Second Amended Complaint, either through an answer or a motion to dismiss, is adjourned sine die pending the Court's resolution of Defendants' motion to compel arbitration [Dkt. No. 82]. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/23/17) (yv)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated October 20, 2017 re: #84 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Andrew T. Hambelton dated October 20, 2017. . Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Andrew T. Hambelton dated October 20, 2017. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Hambelton, Andrew)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated October 12, 2017 re: #82 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Renewed Motion to Compel Arbitration addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Christa Anderson dated October 5, 2017. . Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Renewed Motion to Compel Arbitration addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Christa Anderson dated October 5, 2017. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Anderson, Christa)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/28/2017. (jcs)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER: denying as moot #69 Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED that Defendant shall file its letter regarding a renewed motion to compel arbitration by October 5, 2017, and Plaintiff shall file its letter response by October 12, 2017. Neither letter shall exceed five pages. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Docket # 69 as moot in light of the Second Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/28/2017) (ap)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the proceeding in this matter, previously scheduled for September 28, 2017 at 11:30 a.m., shall be rescheduled for September 28, 2017 at 10:50 a.m., due to a scheduling conflict. Initial Conference set for 9/28/2017 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/25/2017) (kgo)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated September 21, 2017 re: Joint Rule 26(f) Letter. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Ray, Claudia)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated September 20, 2017 re: Redline Version of Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redline)(Ray, Claudia)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #31 Amended Complaint,, against Veeva Systems Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc., MDSOL Europe Limited. Related document: #31 Amended Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W)(Ray, Claudia)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated September 12, 2017 re: #65 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #60 Memorandum & Opinion, addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Christa M. Anderson dated August 28, 2017. . Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Appeal Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #63 Corrected Notice of Appeal. Filing fee $ 505.00. Pay.gov receipt number 0208-14104964, paid on 09/08/2017. [USCA Case No. 17-2694].(nd)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #73 Letter filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Individual Rule III.C.2. reflects Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B), which allows plaintiffs to amend their pleadings once as a matter of course. Plaintiffs' letter is construed as an application for leave to amend the First Amended Complaint in lieu of opposing the pending motion. Such application is granted, and Plaintiffs shall file a second amended complaint by September 20, 2017. Plaintiffs shall simultaneously file a letter attaching a redline showing changes from the current complaint. If Plaintiffs amend, Defendant shall by October 11, 2017, file an answer, a new motion to dismiss, or a letter stating its intention to rely on the previously filed motion. If Defendant moves to dismiss, by October 12, 2017, the parties shall file an agreed upon proposed briefing schedule. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 9/20/2017. Motions due by 10/12/2017.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/8/2017) (anc)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated September 7, 2017 re: Request For Clarification of Individual Rule III(C)(2). Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #72 Letter, filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss by 9/20/17. Defendant shall file its reply by 10/4/17. ( Responses due by 9/20/2017, Replies due by 10/4/2017.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/6/2017) (kgo)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Andrew T. Hambelton dated September 6, 2017 re: Requested Briefing Schedule Related to Defendant Veeva System Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint and Request for Oral Argument. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Hambelton, Andrew)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #67 Response in Support of Motion; granting #65 Letter Motion for Conference. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's proposed motion to stay proceedings pending appeal of the Order denying the motion to compel arbitration will be discussed at the Initial Pretrial Conference on 9/28/17. Plaintiff shall file a responsive letter by 9/12/17. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/30/2017) (kgo)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/12/2017 (kgo)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #28 MEMO ENDORSEMENT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (kgo)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #69 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Anderson, Christa)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Anderson, Christa)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Kevin J Bruno dated August 29, 2017 re: #65 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #60 Memorandum & Opinion, addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Christa M. Anderson dated August 28, 2017. . Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Bruno, Kevin)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #64 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference is adjourned until 9/28/17 at 11:30 AM. The parties shall file a joint letter and proposed Case Management Plan by 9/21/17. Initial Conference set for 9/28/2017 at 11:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/29/2017) (kgo)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #60 Memorandum & Opinion, addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Christa M. Anderson dated August 28, 2017. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Anderson, Christa)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for September 15, 2017 addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Kevin J. Bruno dated 8/28/17. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Bruno, Kevin)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Appeal Fee Due: for #63 Corrected Notice of Appeal. Appeal fee due by 9/11/2017. (tp)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #63 Corrected Notice of Appeal. (tp)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #63 Corrected Notice of Appeal filed by Veeva Systems Inc. were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CORRECTED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: #62 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #60 Memorandum & Opinion,. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Tillery, Khari)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Notice to attorney Tillery, Khari to RE-FILE Document No. #62 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the order/judgment being appealed was not selected. Re-file the appeal using the event type Corrected Notice of Appeal found under the event list Appeal Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - select the correct order/judgment being appealed. (tp)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 FILING ERROR - NO ORDER SELECTED FOR APPEAL - NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Tillery, Khari) Modified on 8/25/2017 (tp).
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall attend an initial pretrial conference on September 15, 2017, at 10:50 a.m. By September 8, 2017, the parties shall file a joint letter and proposed Case Management Plan as set forth in the February 6, 2017, Order. Initial Conference set for 9/15/2017 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/17/2017) (kgo)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 OPINION AND ORDER re: #42 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action. filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's motion to compel arbitration and stay the case is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Docket No. 42. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/16/2017) (kgo)
August 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Christa Anderson dated August 6, 2017 re: August 1, 2017 Letter from Claudia Ray (Docket No. 58). Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Tillery, Khari)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated August 1, 2017 re: Request for Clarification Order. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Annex A)(Ray, Claudia)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #56 Letter filed by Veeva Systems Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Ms. Sanchez as counsel for Defendant. Attorney Andrea Nill Sanchez terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/17/2017) (ap)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Andrea Nills Sanchez dated July 14, 2017 re: Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Nill Sanchez, Andrea)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #42 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action. . Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Bruno, Kevin)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 DECLARATION of Claudia Ray in Opposition re: #42 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action.. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2017.02.21 Veeva Letter.pdf, #2 Exhibit 2-2017.02.28 Medidata Letter)(Ray, Claudia)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #42 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action. . Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Andrea Nill Sanchez to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Andrea Nill Sanchez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13424470. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nill Sanchez, Andrea)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #51 MOTION for Andrea Nill Sanchez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13424470. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Firm Name and Email Address Change. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Anderson, Christa)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #48 Letter, filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Medidata's opposition to Veeva's Motion to Compel Arbitration shall be filed by March 17, 2017. Veeva's reply brief shall be filed by March 24, 2017. ( Responses due by 3/17/2017, Replies due by 3/24/2017.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/8/2017) (kgo)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Kevin J. Bruno dated March 7, 2017 re: Proposed Briefing Schedule on Defendant Veeva System Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action and Request for Oral Argument. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Bruno, Kevin)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Christa Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #38 Khari J. Tillery to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and granting #40 Motion for Elizabeth Egan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #44 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Time to Serve Initial Disclosures addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Kevin J. Bruno dated March 3, 2017. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for March 23, 2017, is adjourned sine die pending resolution of Defendants' motion to compel arbitration. The parties' obligations to serve initial disclosures are likewise adjourned pending resolution of Defendants' motion. The following hearing(s) was terminated: Initial Conference. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/7/2017) (rjm)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Claudia Ray dated March 3, 2017 re: #44 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Time to Serve Initial Disclosures addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Kevin J. Bruno dated March 3, 2017. . Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Time to Serve Initial Disclosures addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Kevin J. Bruno dated March 3, 2017. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Bruno, Kevin)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #42 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action. . Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc.. (Bruno, Kevin)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action. Document filed by Veeva Systems Inc..(Bruno, Kevin)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS MATEO, MARLBOROUGH, PEPE, RIZZO AND YOUNG PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Plaintiffs Medidata Solutions, Inc. and MDSOL Europe Limited (collectively, "Medidata"), by and through its undersigned counsel, voluntarily dismiss without prejudice Defendants Alan Mateo ("Mateo"), Michelle Marlborough ("Marlborough"), Sondra Pepe ("Pepe"), Jason Rizzo ("Rizzo") and Richard Young ("Young") (collectively, the "Former Employee Defendants") pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). According to Rule 41(a)(1), an action may be dismissed by a plaintiff without order of court by filing a notice of dismissal at any time before service by the adverse party of an answer or motion for summary judgment. The Former Employee Defendants have not yet answered Medidata's First Amended Complaint, or moved for summary judgment. Accordingly, Medidata voluntarily dismisses as to the Former Employee Defendants without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i). SO ORDERED. Party Sondra Pepe, Jason Rizzo, Richard Young, Michelle Marlborough and Alan Mateo terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/1/2017) (kgo) Modified on 3/1/2017 (kgo).
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Elizabeth Egan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13368984. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michelle Marlborough, Alan Mateo, Sondra Pepe, Jason Rizzo, Veeva Systems Inc., Richard Young. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Egan, Elizabeth)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #40 MOTION for Elizabeth Egan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13368984. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bonnie Leigh Jarrett on behalf of MDSOL Europe Limited, Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Jarrett, Bonnie)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Khari J. Tillery to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13364585. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michelle Marlborough, Alan Mateo, Sondra Pepe, Jason Rizzo, Veeva Systems Inc., Richard Young. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tillery, Khari)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Christa Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13364445. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michelle Marlborough, Alan Mateo, Sondra Pepe, Jason Rizzo, Veeva Systems Inc., Richard Young. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Christa)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #38 MOTION for Khari J. Tillery to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13364585. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #37 MOTION for Christa Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13364445. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the First Amended Complaint is adjourned until 14 days following the docketing of the order on Defendants' anticipated motion to compel arbitration. Defendants shall file their motion to compel arbitration no later than March 3, 2017. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/27/2017) (cf)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint until after the Court hears and rules on Defendants' forthcoming motion to compel arbitration and stay this litigation addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Kevin J. Bruno dated February 27, 2017. Document filed by Michelle Marlborough, Alan Mateo, Sondra Pepe, Jason Rizzo, Veeva Systems Inc., Richard Young.(Hambelton, Andrew)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 3/3/2017. (cf)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Medidata Solutions, Inc., Corporate Parent Medidata Technology LLP, Corporate Parent Medidata International, Inc., Corporate Parent Medidata Technology Partner LLC for MDSOL Europe Limited. Document filed by MDSOL Europe Limited.(Loy, Joseph)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Allen Loy on behalf of MDSOL Europe Limited. (Loy, Joseph)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yosef J Riemer on behalf of MDSOL Europe Limited. (Riemer, Yosef)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,, against Michelle Marlborough, Alan Mateo, Sondra Pepe, Jason Rizzo, Veeva Systems Inc., Richard Young with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc., MDSOL Europe Limited. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T)(Ray, Claudia)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff may file the two confidential former employee settlement/severance agreements under seal in conjunction with its anticipated FAC, but shall not redact the existence of the agreements from the FAC. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall email Chambers a copy of the complete, unredacted FAC and associated exhibits, and shall email Chambers a copy of its February 10, 2017, letter and attachments. ORDERED that Defendants deadline to respond to the initial Complaint is extended to February 24, 2017. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Docket No. 28. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/17/2017) (kgo)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Michelle Marlborough answer due 2/24/2017; Alan Mateo answer due 2/24/2017; Sondra Pepe answer due 2/24/2017; Jason Rizzo answer due 2/24/2017; Veeva Systems Inc. answer due 2/24/2017; Richard Young answer due 2/24/2017. (kgo)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Kevin J. Bruno dated February 16,2017. Document filed by Michelle Marlborough, Alan Mateo, Sondra Pepe, Jason Rizzo, Veeva Systems Inc., Richard Young.(Bruno, Kevin)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Joseph Bruno on behalf of Michelle Marlborough, Alan Mateo, Sondra Pepe, Jason Rizzo, Veeva Systems Inc., Richard Young. (Bruno, Kevin)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew T. Hambelton on behalf of Michelle Marlborough, Alan Mateo, Sondra Pepe, Jason Rizzo, Veeva Systems Inc., Richard Young. (Hambelton, Andrew)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Service re: #24 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference,,,. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Loy, Joseph)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court at the time and place listed below. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: March 23, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1106 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Parties who are not local (within the Metropolitan tri-state area) may request to attend by phone by filing a letter motion via ECF. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. Initial Conference set for 3/23/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/06/2017) (ama)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Richard Young served on 1/27/2017, answer due 2/17/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Loy, Joseph)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Sondra Pepe served on 1/30/2017, answer due 2/21/2017. Service was accepted by Sondra Pepe. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Loy, Joseph)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Alan Mateo served on 1/27/2017, answer due 2/17/2017. Service was accepted by Alan Mateo. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Loy, Joseph)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Michelle Marlborough served on 1/27/2017, answer due 2/17/2017. Service was accepted by Michelle Marlborough. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Loy, Joseph)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Jason Rizzo served on 1/28/2017, answer due 2/21/2017. Service was accepted by Jason Rizzo. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Loy, Joseph)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Veeva Systems Inc. served on 1/27/2017, answer due 2/17/2017. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, as agent. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Loy, Joseph)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Young. (kl)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Veeva Systems Inc. (kl)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jason Rizzo. (kl)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sondra Pepe. (kl)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alan Mateo. (kl)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michelle Marlborough. (kl)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (kl)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. (kl)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (kl)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yosef J Riemer on behalf of Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Riemer, Yosef)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Allen Loy on behalf of Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Loy, Joseph)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Richard Young, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Veeva Systems Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jason Rizzo, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sondra Pepe, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alan Mateo, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michelle Marlborough, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ray, Claudia)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michelle Marlborough, Alan Mateo, Sondra Pepe, Jason Rizzo, Veeva Systems Inc., Richard Young. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13241730)Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Ray, Claudia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medidata Solutions, Inc. v. Veeva Systems Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veeva Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Mateo
Represented By: Divya Musinipally
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Bruno
Represented By: Elizabeth Egan
Represented By: Christa Anderson
Represented By: Andrew T. Hambelton
Represented By: Khari J. Tillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Marlborough
Represented By: Divya Musinipally
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Bruno
Represented By: Elizabeth Egan
Represented By: Christa Anderson
Represented By: Andrew T. Hambelton
Represented By: Khari J. Tillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sondra Pepe
Represented By: Divya Musinipally
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Bruno
Represented By: Elizabeth Egan
Represented By: Christa Anderson
Represented By: Andrew T. Hambelton
Represented By: Khari J. Tillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Young
Represented By: Divya Musinipally
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Bruno
Represented By: Elizabeth Egan
Represented By: Christa Anderson
Represented By: Andrew T. Hambelton
Represented By: Khari J. Tillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veeva Systems Inc.
Represented By: Divya Musinipally
Represented By: Molly Caldwell Villagra
Represented By: Reid P. Mullen
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Bruno
Represented By: Elizabeth Egan
Represented By: Christa Anderson
Represented By: William David Williams
Represented By: Andrew T. Hambelton
Represented By: Khari J. Tillery
Represented By: Andrea Nill Sanchez
Represented By: Benjamin David Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Rizzo
Represented By: Divya Musinipally
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Bruno
Represented By: Elizabeth Egan
Represented By: Christa Anderson
Represented By: Andrew T. Hambelton
Represented By: Khari J. Tillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medidata Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Mitchell Heinz
Represented By: Benjamin A. Yaghoubian
Represented By: Yosef J Riemer
Represented By: Joseph Allen Loy
Represented By: Bonnie Leigh Jarrett
Represented By: Claudia Elizabeth Ray
Represented By: David Nelson Draper
Represented By: Patrick Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MDSOL Europe Limited
Represented By: Jordan Mitchell Heinz
Represented By: Benjamin A. Yaghoubian
Represented By: Yosef J Riemer
Represented By: Joseph Allen Loy
Represented By: Bonnie Leigh Jarrett
Represented By: Claudia Elizabeth Ray
Represented By: David Nelson Draper
Represented By: Patrick Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jill Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?