Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC v. Facebook Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC |
Defendant: |
Facebook Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv03473 |
Filed: |
May 9, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
Presiding Judge: |
John G. Koeltl |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
35 U.S.C. § 271 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 17, 2022 |
Filing
317
ORDER granting 316 Letter Motion to Stay re: 316 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay deadline for filing any request for costs and/or fees under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d) addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Heidi L. Keefe dated 03/17/2022. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/17/2022) (ks)
|
January 21, 2022 |
Filing
304
ORDER. Counsel for both parties are requested to submit a joint letter containing a list of all the expert reports that have been submitted to the Court in this case, along with the docket entry associated with each expert report. Counsel is als o requested to email a courtesy cop y of each expert report to: koelt lnysdchambers@nysd.us courts.gov. No further paper courtesy copies are required at this time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/20/22) (yv)
|
December 20, 2021 |
Filing
303
ORDER: As discussed at today's conference, oral argument regarding the parties' outstanding motions will be held in person on January 28, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. at 500 Pearl St, New York, NY 10007, Courtroom 14A. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/20/2021) ( Oral Argument set for 1/28/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (ks)
|
July 12, 2021 |
Filing
292
ORDER granting 286 Letter Motion to Seal. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/12/2021) (va)
|
May 21, 2021 |
Filing
252
ORDER granting 240 Letter Motion to Seal. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/21/2021) (ks)
|
April 14, 2020 |
Filing
187
ORDER: The parties are directed to file a Rule 26(f) report to the Court by April 30, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/14/2020) (ks)
|
November 20, 2017 |
Filing
80
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 41 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section1404(a). filed by Facebook Inc. The Court has considered all of the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed, the arguments are either moot or without merit. For the foregoing reasons, Facebook has failed to establish that this case warrants a transfer to the Northern District of California, and its motion pursuant to § 1404(a) is denied. The Clerk is directed to close the motion at docket number 41. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/20/17) (yv)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?