Weiss v. City University of New York et al
Plaintiff: Faigy Rachel Weiss
Defendant: City University of New York, The CUNY Board of Trustees, Hunter College of The City University of New York, The Silberman School of Socal Work at Hunter College, Nireata D. Seals, John Rose, Jennifer Raab and Roberta Nord
Case Number: 1:2017cv03557
Filed: May 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Vernon S. Broderick
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER: On November 2, 2020, I granted the parties' request to adjourn the remaining discovery deadlines pending resolution of Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's second amended complaint. (Doc. 130.) It is hereby: ORDERED that the hearing scheduling in this matter for February 19, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. is adjourned. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/16/2021) (nb)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/14/2020) (rro)
November 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 OPINION & ORDER re: 78 SECOND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (superseding ECF Doc. 77) filed by Members of the City University of New York Board of Trustees, Roberta Nord, Nireata D. Seals, Jennifer Raab, MEMBERS OF THE CIT Y UNIVERSITY OF NEW YORK BOARD OF TRUSTEES. For the reasons stated herein, Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction is DENIED. Her request to disqualify the Attorney General's Office from representing Defendants is also DENIED. Defe ndants' request to dismiss Plaintiff's previously dismissed claims is GRANTED. The following claims remain in the Second Amended Complaint: (1) Title VI claim against CUNY; (2) § 1983 claims against the CUNY Board of Trustees, Milliken , Seals, Rose, Raab, and Nord in their individual capacities; (3) § 1981 claims against the CUNY Board of Trustees, Milliken, Seals, Rose, Raab, and Nord in their individual capacities; and (4) Plaintiff's claim against Letitia James, Attor ney General of New York, in her official and individual capacity.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's June 20, 2019 motion to dismiss, (Doc. 78), is denied as moot. Defendants are directed to file their anticipated motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint by December 6, 2019. Plaintiff's opposition shall be due by February 4, 2020. Defendant's reply shall be due by March 5, 2020. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at Document 78. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 12/6/2019., Responses due by 2/4/2020, Replies due by 3/5/2020.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/10/2019) (rro)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 OPINION & ORDER re: 36 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Roberta Nord, Nireata D. Seals, Jennifer Raab, John Rose, City University of New York, 47 MOTION to Dismiss 8/9/2018 Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Am ended Complaint on behalf of Defendants Members of the CUNY Board of Trustees, Eric T. Schneiderman and Barbara D. Underwood [In Further Support of ECF # 37, Banks Declaration & filed by Members of the City University of New York Board of Trustees, Eric T. Schneiderman, MEMBERS OF THE CITY UNIVERSITY OF NEW YORK BOARD OF TRUSTEES. For the reasons stated herein, Defendants' motion to dismiss, (Doc. 36), is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Specifically, all of Plaintiff's claims a re dismissed except the following claims: (1) Title VI claim against CUNY; (2) § 1983 claims against the CUNY Board of Trustees, Milliken, Seals, Rose, Raab, and Nord in their individual capacities; and (3) § 1981 claims against the CUNY Bo ard of Trustees, Milliken, Seals, Rose, Raab, and Nord in their individual capacities. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the open motions at Doc. Nos. 36 and 47 and mail a copy of this Opinion and Order to the pro se Plaintiff. Defendants shall file an Answer to the Amended Complaint within twenty-one days of the date of this Opinion and Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/18/2019) (anc) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weiss v. City University of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faigy Rachel Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City University of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The CUNY Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter College of The City University of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Silberman School of Socal Work at Hunter College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nireata D. Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Raab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberta Nord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?