Salvat v. Construction Resources Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Marline Salvat
Defendant: Empire Outlet Builders, LLC, Construction Resources Corp., L.P. Ciminelli, Inc. and Anthony Sango
Case Number: 1:2017cv04002
Filed: May 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AGAINST CONSTRUCTION RESOURCES CORP., AND EMPIRE OUTLET BUILDERS, LLC.: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned parties in the above captioned action, (Plaintiff Marline Salvat and Defendants Construction Resources Corp., and Empire Outlet Builders, LLC), by and through their undersigned counsel that, in accordance with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Amended Complaint in the above-captioned action, and all claims against Defendants Construction Resources Corp., and Empire Outlet Builders, LLC, alleged therein, be dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own fees and costs and that Marline Salvat is precluded from bringing any further claims under Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964, 42 U.S.C. 2000e et seq., or any federal, state, or local law, for discrimination, including sexual harassment, against Defendants Construction Resources Corp., and Empire Outlet Builders, LLC, for the period set forth in the Amended Complaint. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED., Construction Resources Corp., Construction Resources Corp., Construction Resources Corp., Construction Resources Corp., Empire Outlet Builders, LLC, Empire Outlet Builders, LLC, Empire Outlet Builders, LLC, Empire Outlet Builders, LLC, Construction Resources Corp. and Construction Resources Corp. terminated. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/22/2018) (ama)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Marline Salvat. (Gourarie, Chaya)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #88 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The application is GRANTED. The telephone conference is ADJOURNED sine die. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 7/10/2018) (cf)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Chaya M. Gourarie dated July 10, 2018. Document filed by Marline Salvat.(Gourarie, Chaya)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER. IT IS ADJUDGED AND ORDERED that Defendant Anthony Sango is hereby in default, and judgment is entered against Defendant Anthony Sango in the amount to be determined at an inquest of damages. The inquest is deferred pending the disposition of all claims against the non-defaulting Defendants. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/29/2018) (rjm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2018: #1 Appeal Package) (rjm).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Request to Enter Default, Declaration of Chaya M. Gourarie in Support of Request to Enter Default Judgment, Clerks Certificate of Default, and Order to Show Cause served on Anthony Sango on June 11, 2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Marline Salvat. (Gourarie, Chaya)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Show Cause Hearing held on 6/29/2018. (Court Reporter Vincent Bologna) (Brantley, Michael)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: It is hereby ordered that Defendant Anthony Sango show cause before the Honorable Valerie E. Caproni of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, located at 40 Foley Square, in the city, State and County of New York at 10:00 a.m. on the 29th of June, 2018, why a judgment of default should not be entered against Defendant Anthony Sango, pursuant to Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. All other provisions as further set forth in this Order. So Ordered Show Cause Hearing set for 6/29/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Show Cause Response due by 6/22/2018. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/7/2018) (js)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 6/27/2018. (js)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AGAINST L.P. CIMINELLI, INC.: In accordance with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Amended Complaint and all claims against Defendant L.P. Ciminelli are dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear their own fees and costs. (As further set forth herein.) L.P. Ciminelli, Inc., L.P. Ciminelli, Inc., L.P. Ciminelli, Inc. and L.P. Ciminelli, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/6/2018) (kgo)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Chaya M. Gourarie dated June 5, 2018 re: status update and stipulation of voluntary dismissal against L.P. Ciminelli, Inc. Document filed by Marline Salvat. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Against L.P. Ciminelli, Inc.)(Gourarie, Chaya)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: as to Anthony Sango, issued on May 25, 2018. (dt)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 DECLARATION of Chaya M. Gourarie in Support re: #80 Request to Enter Default. Document filed by Marline Salvat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gourarie, Chaya)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT against Anthony Sango . Document filed by Marline Salvat. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Certificate of Default)(Gourarie, Chaya)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 SCHEDULING ORDER: This matter has been referred to the undersigned for settlement purposes. The Court will hold a Pre-Conference Telephone Call on Wednesday, July 11, 2018 at 3:30 p.m. Please call Chambers at 212-805-0260 when all counsel are on the line. (Telephone Conference set for 7/11/2018 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 5/22/2018) (rro)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. To the extent Magistrate Judge Wang's schedule permits, the Court respectfully requests that the settlement conference be scheduled after the close of discovery on June 29, 2018 and well before the Defendants' motions for summary judgment are due on September 7, 2018. Within one week after the completion of the settlement conference, the parties shall submit a joint letter notifying the Court whether settlement efforts were successful. (Discovery due by 6/29/2018., Motions due by 9/7/2018.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/22/2018) (cf)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: It is hereby ordered that fact discovery is extended through June 29, 2018. It is further ordered that Plaintiff's deadline to move for an order to show cause for a default judgment against defendant Sango is June 1, 2018. It is further ordered that the following schedule shall apply to defendant's forthcoming motions for summary judgment: Defendants' motions for summary judgment are due by September 7, 2018; Plaintiff's opposition is due by October 5, 2018; and Defendants' replies are due by October 19, 2018. So Ordered ( Fact Discovery due by 6/29/2018., Motions due by 9/7/2018., Responses due by 10/5/2018, Replies due by 10/19/2018.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/21/2018) (js)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 5/18/2018. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Anita Traobetta) (Brantley, Michael)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Chaya M. Gourarie dated May 16, 2018 re: case status. Document filed by Marline Salvat.(Gourarie, Chaya)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying #74 Motion for Reconsideration. Application DENIED. None of these discovery "challenges" should have been unanticipated to the experienced lawyers in this case. The court will address discovery at the parties' previously scheduled conference on May 18, 2018. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/11/2018) (ras)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - CONSENT MOTION for Reconsideration re; #71 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery,, . Document filed by Marline Salvat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Gourarie, Chaya) Modified on 5/14/2018 (db).
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ANSWER to #41 Crossclaim. Document filed by Empire Outlet Builders, LLC.(Tomari, Anthony)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Amended Subpoena Duces Tecum served on Marline Salvat, Construction Resources Corp., Empire Outlet Builders LLC and Anthony Sango on May 10, 2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by L.P. Ciminelli, Inc.. (Babchik, Jack)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying #68 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Application Denied. The parties have not explained why they have waited to raise this issue until less than a week before the end of fact discovery or why they have failed to conduct depositions in the time alloted by the Court. At the parties' initial pre-trial conference, the Court warned the parties that May 14, 2018 was a "firm" deadline for the completion of fact discovery, including depositions. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/9/2018) (js)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE Subpoena Duces Tecum as to Metal Lathers 46 document(s): Notice of Amended Subpoena Duces Tecum on July 7, 2018 at 10:00 a.m..Document filed by L.P. Ciminelli, Inc..(Babchik, Jack)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE Subpoena Duces Tecum as to Metal Lathers 46 document(s): Employment records of Marline Salvat on July 7, 2018 at 10:00 a.m..Document filed by L.P. Ciminelli, Inc..(Babchik, Jack)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from 17-4002 dated May 9, 2018. Document filed by Marline Salvat.(Gourarie, Chaya)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ANSWER to #48 Crossclaim. Document filed by L.P. Ciminelli, Inc..(Babchik, Jack)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ANSWER to #41 Crossclaim. Document filed by L.P. Ciminelli, Inc..(Babchik, Jack)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by L.P. Ciminelli, Inc..(Gold, Brittany)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by L.P. Ciminelli, Inc..(Babchik, Jack)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brittany A. Gold on behalf of L.P. Ciminelli, Inc.. (Gold, Brittany)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Amended pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 14 days. Fact Discovery due by 5/14/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. All expert discovery, including reports, production of underlying documents, and depositions, shall be completed no later than 45 days. This case is to be tried to a jury. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/14/2017) (rj)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Marline Salvat.(Gourarie, Chaya)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 OPINION AND ORDER re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. filed by L.P. Ciminelli, Inc.. LPC's motion to dismiss is DENIED. The parties are directed to submit a proposed case management plan by December 11, 2017. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/7/2017) (kgo)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. and Affidavit in Support. Document filed by L.P. Ciminelli, Inc.. (Gold, Brittany)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. . Document filed by L.P. Ciminelli, Inc.. (Gold, Brittany)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ANSWER to #48 Crossclaim. Document filed by Construction Resources Corp..(Wickline, Donovan)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Marline Salvat. (Norinsberg, Jon)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' initial pre-trial conference is adjourned sine die and discovery is stayed sine die, pending the Court's resolution of L.P. Ciminelli's motion to dismiss, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/17/2017) (ap)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/15/2017) (kgo)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/17/2017 Replies due by 8/25/2017. (kgo)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to submit Opposition/Reply papers addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Chaya M. Gourarie dated August 14, 2017. Document filed by Marline Salvat.(Gourarie, Chaya)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: WHEREAS the parties' initial pre-trial conference is currently scheduled for August 11, 2017; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' conference is adjourned to 10:00 a.m. on August 18, 2017. Initial Conference set for 8/18/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/9/2017) (kgo)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Chaya M. Gourarie, Esq. dated August 7, 2017 re: Joint Letter and Proposed Case Management Plan. Document filed by Marline Salvat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Case Management Plan)(Norinsberg, Jon)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #47 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/4/2017) (kgo)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Empire Outlet Builders, LLC.(Tomari, Anthony)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint,., CROSSCLAIM against Construction Resources Corp., L.P. Ciminelli, Inc., Anthony Sango. Document filed by Empire Outlet Builders, LLC.(Tomari, Anthony)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Letter and Proposed Civil Case Management Plan addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Chaya Gourarie, Esq. dated August 2, 2017. Document filed by Marline Salvat.(Norinsberg, Jon)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED. Empire Outlet Builders, LLC answer due 8/4/2017. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/26/2017) (kgo)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #22 Amended Complaint, #37 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Anthony J. Tomari dated 07/25/17. Document filed by Empire Outlet Builders, LLC.(Tomari, Anthony)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Anthony Sango served on 7/21/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. Service was accepted by Jane Doe (Co-Tenant). Document filed by Marline Salvat. (Norinsberg, Jon)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #42 Letter filed by Marline Salvat. ENDORSEMENT: Application DENIED. Plaintiff's opposition is due by August 14, 2017. L.P. Ciminelli's reply is due by August 21, 2017. ( Responses due by 8/14/2017, Replies due by 8/21/2017.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/24/2017) (kgo)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Chaya M. Gourarie dated July 21, 2017 re: To endorse briefing schedule. Document filed by Marline Salvat.(Gourarie, Chaya)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Construction Resources Corp..(Wickline, Donovan)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. . Document filed by L.P. Ciminelli, Inc.. (Gold, Brittany)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AFFIRMATION of Brittany A. Gold in Support re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint.. Document filed by L.P. Ciminelli, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Summons and Complaint filed in US Distrct court for the Southern District of NY on June 26, 2017, #2 Exhibit B - EEOC Charge filed on or about January 26, 2017, #3 Exhibit C - Summons and Complaint filed in NYS Supreme Court on December 9, 2016, #4 Exhibit D - Amended Summons and Complaint filed on January 25, 2017 in NYS Supreme Court, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Right to Sue dated April 7, 2017, #6 Exhibit F - Summons and Complaint filed in the US District Court for the Southern District of NY on May 26, 2017, #7 Exhibit G - Defendant Ciminelli's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint without Exhibits, #8 Exhibit H - Construction Management Agreement between Ciminelli and EOB dated May 13, 2015)(Gold, Brittany)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Document filed by L.P. Ciminelli, Inc.. Return Date set for 8/14/2017 at 10:30 AM.(Gold, Brittany)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED. Empire Outlet Builders, LLC answer due 7/28/2017. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/10/2017) (mro)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Anthony J. Tomari, Esq. dated July 6, 2017. Document filed by Empire Outlet Builders, LLC.(Tomari, Anthony)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys, that: (1) Counsel for Defendant L.P. Ciminelli, Inc. hereby acknowledge and accept service of the Amended Summons and Complaint filed in the above-captioned matter (Dkt. No. 22), and (2) the time of defendant, L.P. Ciminelli, Inc.'s to respond to plaintiff's amended complaint in the above-captioned matter is extended to and including July 31, 2017. So Ordered. (L.P. Ciminelli, Inc. answer due 7/31/2017.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/6/17) (yv)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony John Tomari on behalf of Empire Outlet Builders, LLC. (Tomari, Anthony)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Terminate Mediation Case Tracking Deadlines: Mediator Schedule Deadline (rpr)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 7/28/2017.(cda)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The parties' initial conference is adjourned to 10:00 a.m. on August 11, 2017. The parties' joint pre-conference letter is due by August 3, 2017. Mediation is adjourned sine die pending the parties' initial status conference. Initial Conference set for 8/11/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/27/2017) (kgo)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying without prejudice #14 Motion to Dismiss. WHEREAS on June 15, 2017 defendant L.P. Ciminelli, Inc. moved to dismiss the Complaint; and WHEREAS on June 26, 2017, Plaintiff filed a First Amended Complaint; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that L.P. Ciminelli, Inc.'s motion to dismiss, Dkt. 14, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the open motion at docket entry 14. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/27/2017) (kgo)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to L.P. Ciminelli, Inc.. (pc)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Empire Outlet Builders, LLC. (pc)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony Sango. (pc)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Construction Resources Corp.. (pc)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: #22 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Marline Salvat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D)(Norinsberg, Jon)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Anthony Sango, re: #22 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Marline Salvat. (Norinsberg, Jon)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Empire Outlet Builders, LLC, re: #22 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Marline Salvat. (Norinsberg, Jon)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to L.P. Ciminelli, Inc., re: #22 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Marline Salvat. (Norinsberg, Jon)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Constructions Resources Corp., re: #22 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Marline Salvat. (Norinsberg, Jon)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Construction Resources Corp., Empire Outlet Builders, LLC, L.P. Ciminelli, Inc., Anthony Sango with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Marline Salvat. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Marline Salvat.(Norinsberg, Jon)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Chaya M. Gourarie dated June 26, 2017. Document filed by Marline Salvat.(Gourarie, Chaya)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (http://nysd.uscourts.gov/mediation). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 7/6/2017. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/15) (mf)
June 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Construction Resources Corp..(Wickline, Donovan)
June 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Construction Resources Corp..(Wickline, Donovan)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/14/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/19/2017) (mro)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by L.P. Ciminelli, Inc.. (Gold, Brittany)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIRMATION of Brittany A. Gold in Support re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by L.P. Ciminelli, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Right to Sue, #5 Exhibit E - Summons and Complaint filed in US District Court for the Southern District of NY)(Gold, Brittany)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by L.P. Ciminelli, Inc.. Return Date set for 7/17/2017 at 10:30 AM.(Gold, Brittany)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Norinsberg, Jon)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony Sango. (jvs)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Construction Resources Corp. (jvs)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to L.P. Ciminelli, Inc. (jvs)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Empire Outlet Builders, LLC. (jvs)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jvs)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jvs)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Bennitta Lisa Joseph. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331; Nature of Suit code 790 (Labor: Other); County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:2000; the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 442 (Civil Rights: Jobs); the County code has been modified to Kings;. (jvs)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jvs)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Bennitta Lisa Joseph to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated April 2014;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated July 2016. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated April 2014 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jvs)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bennitta Lisa Joseph on behalf of Marline Salvat. (Joseph, Bennitta)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chaya Mushke Gourarie on behalf of Marline Salvat. (Gourarie, Chaya)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anthony Sango, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marline Salvat. (Norinsberg, Jon)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Construction Resources Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marline Salvat. (Norinsberg, Jon)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to L.P. Ciminelli, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marline Salvat. (Norinsberg, Jon)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Empire Outlet Builders, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marline Salvat. (Norinsberg, Jon)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Norinsberg, Jon)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Construction Resources Corp., Empire Outlet Builders, LLC, L.P. Ciminelli, Inc., Anthony Sango. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13714812)Document filed by Marline Salvat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Right to Sue letter)(Norinsberg, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salvat v. Construction Resources Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Outlet Builders, LLC
Represented By: Anthony John Tomari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Construction Resources Corp.
Represented By: Donovan Lourde Wickline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.P. Ciminelli, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Babchik
Represented By: Brittany A. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Sango
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marline Salvat
Represented By: Bennitta Lisa Joseph
Represented By: Chaya Mushke Gourarie
Represented By: Jon Louis Norinsberg
Represented By: Jon L. Norinsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?