Enriquez v. City Of New York et al
Plaintiff: Diangelo Enriquez
Defendant: City Of New York, Charles Hirsch, Barbara Sampson, Does 1-4 and John Does 1-3
Case Number: 1:2017cv04293
Filed: June 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Vernon S. Broderick
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: It has been reported to this Court by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron that the Parties have agreed to a settlement of this case. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the application to restore the action is made by November 23, 2020. If no such application is made by that date, today's dismissal of the action is with prejudice. See Muze, Inc. v. Digital On Demand, Inc., 356 F.3d 492, 494 n.1 (2d Cir. 2004). (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 9/22/2020) (mro)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 92 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Request GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 9/10/2020) (Aaron, Stewart)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A settlement conference is scheduled before Magistrate Judge Stewart Aaron on Thursday, September 17, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. The settlement shall proceed by telephone unless the parties advise the C ourt that they have access to and prefer proceeding by alternative remote means, such as by video. The Court will provide dial-in information to the parties by email before the conference. The parties must comply with the Settlement Conference Proc edures for Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-stewart-d-aaron. SO ORDERED. (Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 9/17/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 7/31/2020) (kl)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: The Court held a telephonic Status Conference in this case on July 22, 2020. All parties were represented at the conference by counsel. As discussed at the Conference, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff must provide outstanding m edical releases by July 31, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants must produce documents or information relating to the five categories of information they have agreed to provide as enumerated on Page 2 of ECF #81 by August 7, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent the Parties have any outstanding discovery disputes, letter motions to compel information must be filed by no later than August 28, 2020. Letter Oppositions to any such motions must be filed by September 9 , 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Post-Discovery Conference will be held on January 6, 2021 at 11:00AM in Courtroom 18C of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Counsel are instructed to review the Cou rt's Individual Practices regarding submissions in advance of that conference. The Parties are instructed to negotiate in good faith to resolve any outstanding disputes and to schedule depositions. All prior discovery deadlines remain in effect. Those deadlines and the deadlines memorialized herein will not be extended. As the parties were admonished and acknowledged at the July 22 Conference, failure to comply with the deadlines set forth in this order or prior schedu ling orders may result in sanctions, including preclusion at trial of information not provided or dismissal of claims or defenses. ( Motions due by 10/28/2020., Responses due by 9/9/2020, Status Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 7/22/2020) (mro)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 79 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. The conference scheduled for June 24, 2020 is adjourned to July 22, 2020 at 11:30AM. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the conference will be held telephonically. To part icipate, dial 888-278-0296 and enter access code 5195844. The Parties' deadline for submitting a joint status letter is extended to July 15, 2020. The Parties are advised that the deadline for fact discovery remains November 1, 2020, and that all discovery must be completed by December 24, 2020. The Court is unlikely to extend either deadline. The Parties are highly encouraged to conduct as much discovery as possible remotely and to confer as needed to resolve discovery disputes. Such consultation does not require in person communications. Telephone Conference set for 7/22/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 6/17/2020) (mro)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 77 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference is adjourned to June 24, 2020 at 11:30AM. The Parties should submit the joint status letter as set forth in ECF #76 on or before June 17. Status Conference set for 6/24/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 5/12/2020) (mro)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER terminating 73 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; terminating 73 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Parties are instructed to confer over a proposed schedule for the completion of discovery to the exte nt it is not already complete. The Parties should submit a Proposed Case Management, in the form specified on the Court's website, by Friday, April 24, 2020. The Court will review the Parties proposal and adjust the dates proposed as necess ary. The Court will also schedule a post-discovery conference at that time. Along with the proposed case management plan, the Parties should file a joint letter explaining the status of discovery and the anticipated outstanding discovery issues. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 4/13/2020) (mro)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER, It is hereby ORDERED that the Post-Discovery Conference scheduled to take place on Thursday, March 19, 2020 is adjourned to May 6, 2020 at 10:30AM. No later than April 28, 2020, the parties should file (i) a joint status letter of no more t han 3 pages, and (ii) any premotion letters in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-mary-kay-vyskocil. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 5/6/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/16/20) (yv)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION OF CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER..regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. SO ORDERED. (Motions terminated: 65 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File confidentiality order addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from David B. Rankin and Alan H. Scheiner dated January 30, 2020. filed by Diangelo Enriquez.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/4/2020) (rro)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enriquez v. City Of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diangelo Enriquez
Represented By: David Bruce Rankin
Represented By: Michael L Spiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Represented By: Arthur Gabriel Larkin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Hirsch
Represented By: Arthur Gabriel Larkin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Sampson
Represented By: Arthur Gabriel Larkin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?