Holmes v. Apple Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Tyrone Holmes |
Defendant: |
Apple Inc., Amazon.com, LLC and Checkpoint Fluidic Systems International, Ltd. |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv04557 |
Filed: |
June 16, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Edgardo Ramos |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Injury |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 29, 2022 |
Filing
165
ORDER: On July 26, 2022, pro se Plaintiff Tyrone Holmes filed a document that was coded on ECF as a motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis and a "notice of appeal." The document itself, however, is titled only "notice of appeal" and does not mention an intent to seek in forma pauperis status. The Court construes this filing as a notice of appeal. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, he must complete and file the attached application with this Court. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/29/2022) (ate)
|
June 27, 2022 |
Filing
163
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 150 MOTION for Recusal . filed by Tyrone Holmes. Plaintiff's motion to vacate is denied. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at docket 150 and mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/27/22) (yv)
|
April 14, 2020 |
Filing
142
ORDER granting 131 Motion for Attorney Fees. For the foregoing reasons, Amazon's motion is GRANTED. Amazon is directed to submit a bill of costs within ten days. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, Doc. 131. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/14/2020) (mro)
|
July 23, 2018 |
Filing
121
OPINION AND ORDER re: 91 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Amazon.com, LLC, 97 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Or, In The Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc., 67 MOTION NOTIC E OF CROSS-MOTION filed by Tyrone Holmes, 48 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Checkpoint Fluidic Systems International, Ltd. For the reasons stated above, it is ORDERED that: 1. Holmes' motion to am end the Complaint (Doc. 47) is DENIED; 2. CheckPoint's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (Doc. 48) is GRANTED; 3. Holmes' motion for jurisdictional discovery (Doc. 67) is DENIED; 4. Amazon's motion (Doc. 91) is gr anted in the following respects: (1) judgment will be entered against Amazon in the amount of $2,351 on Claim 1; (2) summary judgment is granted in Amazon's favor on Claims 2, 3, 4, and 5; and (3) judgment on the pleadings is granted in Am azon's favor on Claims 6, 7, and 8. 5. Apple's motion for entry of judgment on the pleadings (Doc. 97) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions and close the case. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/23/2018) (mro)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?