Riverkeeper, Inc. et al v. Pruitt et al
Plaintiff: Riverkeeper, Inc., Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc., Connecticut Fund for the Environment, Inc., Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Raritan Baykeeper, Inc., Bronx Council for Environmental Quality, Inc., Newtown Creek Alliance, Jamaica Bay Ecowatchers and Hudson River Watertrail Association
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency, Scott Pruitt and Catherine McCabe
Case Number: 1:2017cv04916
Filed: June 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Vernon S. Broderick
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting 203 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File ; granting 203 Letter Motion to Stay re: 203 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File joint status report due June 27, 2024 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from AUSA Tomoko Onozawa dated June 24, 2024. LETTER MOTION to Stay of litigation until August 13, 2024 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from AUSA Tomoko Onozawa dated June 24, 2024. APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/26/2024) (jca)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting 201 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File ; granting 201 Letter Motion to Stay re: 201 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File joint status report due June 5, 2024 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick f rom AUSA Tomoko Onozawa dated June 3, 2024. LETTER MOTION to Stay to continue stay of litigation until July 2, 2024 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from AUSA Tomoko Onozawa dated June 3, 2024. APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/5/2024) (jca)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting 199 Letter Motion to Stay re: 199 EIGHTH LETTER MOTION to Stay ECF Nos. 128, 150, 145, 154, 173 and Joint Status Report addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from AUSA Tomoko Onozawa dated March 6, 2024., 173 MOTION to Amend/Correct 123 Answer to Amended Complaint ., 145 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment ., 128 MOTION for Summary Judgment ., 154 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment ., 150 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/7/2024) (tg)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting 197 Letter Motion to Stay re: 197 SEVENTH LETTER MOTION to Stay ECF Nos. 128, 150, 145, 154, 173 and Joint Status Report addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from AUSA Tomoko Onozawa dated Sept. 26, 2023. APPLICA TION GRANTED SO ORDERED. Action on the pending motions shall be held in abeyance pending a further status letter from the parties. The parties shall file a further status letter by March 6, 2024. Any party may file a letter with this Court to t erminate the abeyance period prior to March 6, 2024, but must first notify the remaining parties at least two weeks prior to filing its letter, with the parties to engage in a meet and confer as soon as reasonably practicable. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/27/2023) (jca)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting 195 Letter Motion to Stay re: 195 SIXTH LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from AUSA Tomoko Onozawa dated March 10, 2023. APPLICATION GRANTED. I shall hold any decision on motions pending in this matter in abeyance until October 2, 2023. The parties shall submit a further joint status letter by September 27, 2023. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/13/2023) (kv)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting 193 Letter Motion to Stay re: 193 FIFTH LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from AUSA Tomoko Onozawa dated February 8, 2023. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/9/2023) (kv)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting 191 Letter Motion to Stay re: 191 FOURTH LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from AUSA Tomoko Onozawa dated January 17, 2023. APPLICATION GRANTED. Parties shall submit a joint status letter by February 8, 2023. The Court shall defer any ruling on pending motions until February 10, 2023. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/18/2023) (kv)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting 189 Letter Motion to Stay re: 189 THIRD LETTER MOTION to Stay further action in ECF Nos. 128, 150, 145, 154, 173 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from AUSA Tomoko Onozawa dated November 14, 2022. APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED. The parties shall submit a further joint status letter by January 17, 2023. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/15/2022) (jca)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting 187 Letter Motion to Stay re: 187 SECOND LETTER MOTION to Stay further action on ECF Nos. 128, 145, 150, 154, 173 until Nov. 18, 2022 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from AUSA Tomoko Onozawa dated Sept. 12, 2022. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/13/2022) (tg)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER: granting 184 Letter Motion to Stay re: 184 LETTER MOTION to Stay further action on ECF Nos. 128, 145, 150, 154, 173 until September 16, 2022 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from AUSA Tomoko Onozawa dated August 10, 2022. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/12/2022) (ama)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER: I am in receipt of Intervenor-Defendant New York State Department of Conservation's motion for leave to amend answer to its crossclaim. (Doc. 173.) Pursuant to the Local Rules, it is hereby: ORDERED that any opposition to this motion s hall be submitted on or before January 19, 2021. Any reply memorandum of law shall be submitted on or before January 26, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 1/19/2021, Replies due by 1/26/2021.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/11/2021) (rro)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER: This case has been reassigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, in light of the public health crisis, the Court will not be holding an initial pretrial conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/27/2020) (rro)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 OPINION & ORDER re: 108 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 107 Clerk's Judgment 106 Memorandum & Opinion MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint 107 Clerk's Judgment filed by Connecticut Fund for the E nvironment, Inc., Hudson River Watertrail Association, Riverkeeper, Inc., Newtown Creek Alliance, Bronx Council for Environmental Quality, Inc., Jamaica Bay Ecowatchers, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Raritan Baykeeper, Inc., Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc.For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration or to amend the judgment and for leave to file an amended complaint, (Doc. 108), is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to vacate the judgment entered on March 18, 2019, (Doc. 107), and reopen this case; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their proposed amended complaint no later than thirty (30) days after entry of this Opini on & Order. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' amended complaint no later than thirty (30) days after the filing of the amended complaint. SO ORDERED. Case reopened. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/12/2020) (rro)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 OPINION & ORDER re: 87 CROSS MOTION to Dismiss and for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Catherine McCabe, Scott Pruitt, United States Environmental Protection Agency, 89 CROSS MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by New York State Department of Environmental Conservation, 91 CROSS MOTION to Dismiss CROSS MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by CITY OF NEW YORK, 76 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Connecticut Fund for the Environment, Inc., Hudson River Watertrail Association, Riverkeeper, Inc., Newtown Creek Alliance, Bronx Council for Environmental Quality, Inc., Jamaica Bay Ecowatchers, Natural Resources Defense C ouncil, Inc., Raritan Baykeeper, Inc., Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' cross-motions to dismiss the first cause of action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction are GRANTED, and all other motions and cro ss-motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment for Defendants and close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/15/2019) (rro) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 OPINION & ORDER re: 39 MOTION to Stay, filed by Catherine McCabe, Scott Pruitt, United States Environmental Protection Agency. Defendants' motion to stay is DENIED, and as further set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/20/2018) (ras)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riverkeeper, Inc. et al v. Pruitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riverkeeper, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Douglas Ommen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Douglas Ommen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connecticut Fund for the Environment, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Douglas Ommen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Douglas Ommen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raritan Baykeeper, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Douglas Ommen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bronx Council for Environmental Quality, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Douglas Ommen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newtown Creek Alliance
Represented By: Todd Douglas Ommen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamaica Bay Ecowatchers
Represented By: Todd Douglas Ommen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hudson River Watertrail Association
Represented By: Todd Douglas Ommen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?