Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University et al v. Trump et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp and Nicholas Pappas
Defendant: Donald J. Trump, Sean M Spicer and Daniel Scavino
Case Number: 1:2017cv05205
Filed: July 11, 2017
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2018 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 74 LETTER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (tro)
June 5, 2018 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for 73 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Scavino, Donald J. Trump were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
June 5, 2018 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 73 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
June 4, 2018 Appeal Fee Not Required for 73 Notice of Appeal. Appeal filed by U.S. Government. (tp)
June 4, 2018 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - Appeal Fee Due: for 73 Notice of Appeal. Appeal fee due by 6/18/2018. (tp) Modified on 6/5/2018 (tp).
June 4, 2018 73 NOTICE OF APPEAL from 72 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Daniel Scavino, Donald J. Trump. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Baer, Michael)
May 23, 2018 72 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion for Summary Judgment. We conclude that we have jurisdiction to entertain this dispute. Plaintiffs have established legal injuries that are traceable to the conduct of the President and Daniel Scavino and, despite defendants' suggestions to the contrary, their injuries are redressable by a favorable judicial declaration. Plaintiffs lack standing, however, to sue Sarah Huckabee Sanders, who is dismissed as a defendant. Hope Hicks is also dismissed as a defendant, in light of her resignation as White House Communications Director. Turning to the merits of plaintiffs' First Amendment claim, we hold that the speech in which they seek to engage is protected by the First Amendment and that the President and Scavino exert governmental control over certain aspects of the @realDonaldTrump account, including the interactive space of the tweets sent from the account. That interactive space is susceptible to analysis under the Supreme Court's forum doctrines, and is properly characterized as a designated public forum. The viewpoint-based exclusion of the individual plaintiffs from that designated public forum is proscribed by the First Amendment and cannot be justified by the President's personal First Amendment interests. In sum, defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part, and plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motions pending at docket entries 34 and 42. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 5/23/2018) (ama)
April 4, 2018 71 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jameel Jaffer dated April 4, 2018 re: the Court's March 13, 2018 letter and Defendants' March 28, 2018 response. Document filed by Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas.(Jaffer, Jameel)
March 28, 2018 70 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Michael H. Baer dated March 28, 2018 re: the Court's March 13, 2018 letter. Document filed by Daniel Scavino, Sean M Spicer, Donald J. Trump.(Baer, Michael)
March 23, 2018 69 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/8/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 23, 2018 68 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/8/2018 before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 16, 2018 67 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jameel Jaffer dated March 16, 2018 re: the relevance of the D.C. Circuit's decision in Swan v. Clinton. Document filed by Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas.(Jaffer, Jameel)
March 13, 2018 66 LETTER addressed to Jameel Jaffer, Esq., Katherine Fallow, Esq., Michel Baer, Esq., from Hon. Naomi Reice Buchwald, United States District Judge dated 3/13/2018 re: At oral argument, the government stated that the blocking of Twitter users on the @POTUS and @WhiteHouse accounts would "likely would run afoul of the First Amendment but not because of public forum doctrine" and that "it is probably true that government cannot block individuals purely on the basis of viewpoint from a government account like the @POTUS account," Hr'g Tr. 26:19-20, 29:16-18. We understood the totality of the government's position to be that the First Amendment prohibits the blocking of users from those accounts. We neglected, however, to address the impact of this position on the question currently before the Court-whether such blocking may occur on the @RealDonaldTrump account. Accordingly, we request that the government submit, by March 28, a letter brief of no more than five pages clarifying its position. If the government continues to take the position that users may not be blocked from the @POTUS and @WhiteHouse accounts, it should explain all of the ways in which the First Amendment analysis differs for those two accounts on the one hand and the @RealDonaldTrump account on the other. If the government no longer takes the position that such blocking is unconstitutional, it should explain why such blocking is in fact permissible. The plaintiffs may submit a responsive letter within seven days of the government's letter. (ama)
March 8, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Oral Argument held on 3/8/2018 re: 42 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (ade)
March 6, 2018 65 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Michael H. Baer dated March 6, 2018 re: Defendants' summary judgment briefing. Document filed by Daniel Scavino, Sean M Spicer, Donald J. Trump.(Baer, Michael)
March 1, 2018 64 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 63 Letter, filed by Joseph Papp, Brandon Neely, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Eugene Gu, Philip Cohen, Nicholas Pappas, Holly Figueroa, Rebecca Buckwalter. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/1/2018) (ap)
February 26, 2018 63 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jameel Jaffer dated February 26, 2018 re: Counsel for Plaintiffs division of time during the March 8, 2018 oral argument on the pending cross-motions for summary judgment. Document filed by Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas.(Jaffer, Jameel)
January 30, 2018 62 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Alexander Abraham Abdo on behalf of Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas. New Address: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, 475 Riverside Drive, Suite 302, New York, NY, United States 10115, (646) 745-8500. (Abdo, Alexander)
January 26, 2018 61 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Daniel Halainen dated January 26, 2018 re: Plaintiffs' January 23, 2018 Letter. Document filed by Daniel Scavino, Sean M Spicer, Donald J. Trump.(Halainen, Daniel)
January 23, 2018 60 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jameel Jaffer dated January 23, 2018 re: Notice of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jaffer, Jameel)
January 8, 2018 59 Featured Case ORDER: Oral argument on the pending cross-motions for summary judgment shall be held on March 8, 2018, at 11:00 A.M., at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, in Courtroom 21A. SO ORDERED., ( Oral Argument set for 3/8/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 21A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/08/2018) (ama)
December 26, 2017 58 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Michael Baer dated December 26, 2017 re: Plaintiffs' December 21, 2017 Letter. Document filed by Daniel Scavino, Sean M Spicer, Donald J. Trump.(Baer, Michael)
December 21, 2017 57 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jameel Jaffer dated December 21, 2017 re: the government's concession concerning the President's tweets. Document filed by Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas.(Jaffer, Jameel)
December 1, 2017 56 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 42 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas. (Jaffer, Jameel)
November 17, 2017 55 RESPONSE re: 45 Rule 56.1 Statement . Document filed by Daniel Scavino, Sean M Spicer, Donald J. Trump. (Baer, Michael)
November 17, 2017 54 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 42 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Daniel Scavino, Sean M Spicer, Donald J. Trump. (Baer, Michael)
November 9, 2017 53 Featured Case ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting 52 Motion for Andrew Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 11/9/2017) (kgo)
November 9, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 52 MOTION for Andrew Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14347628. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
November 9, 2017 52 MOTION for Andrew Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14347628. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Amici Curiae Federal Courts Scholars. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Andrew)
November 6, 2017 51 BRIEF AMICI CURIAE. Document filed by Amici Curiae Federal Courts Scholars.(Burgess, Brian)
November 6, 2017 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Timothy Burgess on behalf of Amici Curiae Federal Courts Scholars. (Burgess, Brian)
November 6, 2017 49 BRIEF of Amicus Curiae. Document filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation.(Stoltz, Mitchell)
November 6, 2017 48 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Mitchell L. Stoltz on behalf of Electronic Frontier Foundation.(Stoltz, Mitchell)
November 6, 2017 47 BRIEF . Document filed by Amici First Amendment Scholars.(Geltzer, Joshua)
November 3, 2017 46 RESPONSE re: 36 Rule 56.1 Statement . Document filed by Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas. (Jaffer, Jameel)
November 3, 2017 45 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas. (Jaffer, Jameel)
November 3, 2017 44 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jameel Jaffer dated November 3, 2017 re: Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment. Document filed by Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas.(Jaffer, Jameel)
November 3, 2017 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 42 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and In Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas. (Jaffer, Jameel)
November 3, 2017 42 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas.(Jaffer, Jameel)
October 30, 2017 41 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 38 Motion for Joshua Geltzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/30/2017) (js)
October 30, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 11/3/2017. Responses due by 11/17/2017 Replies due by 12/1/2017. (js)
October 30, 2017 40 Featured Case ORDER granting 39 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered. Motions due by 10/13/2017.. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/30/2017) (js)
October 27, 2017 39 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to include a date for any amicus briefs to be filed, adjusting the remaining deadlines. addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jameel Jaffer dated October 27, 2017. Document filed by Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas.(Jaffer, Jameel)
October 27, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 38 MOTION for Joshua Geltzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14294232. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 27, 2017 38 MOTION for Joshua Geltzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14294232. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Amici First Amendment Scholars. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Affidavit)(Geltzer, Joshua)
October 13, 2017 37 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Michael H. Baer dated October 13, 2017 re: Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Daniel Scavino, Sean M Spicer, Donald J. Trump.(Baer, Michael)
October 13, 2017 36 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Daniel Scavino, Sean M Spicer, Donald J. Trump. (Baer, Michael)
October 13, 2017 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Daniel Scavino, Sean M Spicer, Donald J. Trump. (Baer, Michael)
October 13, 2017 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Daniel Scavino, Sean M Spicer, Donald J. Trump.(Baer, Michael)
October 13, 2017 33 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits to Stipulation. Document filed by Daniel Scavino, Sean M Spicer, Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Baer, Michael)
October 3, 2017 32 Featured Case ORDER granting 30 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/3/2017) (mro)
October 2, 2017 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Amy Fallow on behalf of Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas. (Fallow, Katherine)
September 28, 2017 30 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Stipulation addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Michael H. Baer dated 09/28/2017. Document filed by Daniel Scavino, Sean M Spicer, Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation)(Baer, Michael)
September 26, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 11/3/2017. Motions due by 10/13/2017. Responses due by 11/13/2017. Replies due by 11/22/2017. (ap)
September 26, 2017 29 Featured Case ORDER: terminating 28 Letter Motion for Conference. The parties proposed schedule and page limits are acceptable to the Court. Motion due by 10/13/2017. Response due by 11/13/2017. Cross Motion due by 11/3/2017. Reply due by 11/22/2017. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 9/26/2017) (ap)
September 25, 2017 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [28-1] Stipulation Attachment pursuant to Order 32 filed on 10/3/2017. (mro)
September 25, 2017 28 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference re: proposed summary judgment briefing schedule addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Michael H. Baer dated 09/25/2017. Document filed by Daniel Scavino, Sean M Spicer, Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation)(Baer, Michael)
September 15, 2017 27 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jameel Jaffer dated September 15, 2017 re: an update on the status of negotiations as to a joint stipulation of facts. Document filed by Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas.(Jaffer, Jameel)
September 11, 2017 26 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 25 Letter filed by Daniel Scavino, Sean M Spicer, Donald J. Trump. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted., Daniel Scavino answer due 9/29/2017; Sean M Spicer answer due 9/29/2017; Donald J. Trump answer due 9/29/2017. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 9/11/2017) (ama)
September 8, 2017 25 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Daniel Halainen dated 09/08/2017 re: Knight First Amendment Institute, et al. v. Trump, et al., Case No. 17-cv-5205 (NRB). Document filed by Daniel Scavino, Sean M Spicer, Donald J. Trump.(Halainen, Daniel)
September 7, 2017 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Halainen on behalf of Daniel Scavino, Sean M Spicer, Donald J. Trump. (Halainen, Daniel)
August 31, 2017 23 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jameel Jaffer dated 08/31/2017 re: Knight First Amendment Institute, et al. v. Trump, et al., Case No. 17-CV-5205 (NRB). Document filed by Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas.(Jaffer, Jameel)
August 15, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Telephone Conference held on 8/15/2017. (ade)
August 14, 2017 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Abraham Abdo on behalf of Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas. (Abdo, Alexander)
August 11, 2017 21 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Michael Baer dated 08/11/2017 re: 13 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: Motion for a Preliminary Injunction addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jameel Jaffer dated 8/8/2017. . Document filed by Daniel Scavino, Sean M Spicer, Donald J. Trump. (Baer, Michael)
August 9, 2017 20 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 17 Motion for Jessica Ring Amunson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 8/9/2017) (ap)
August 9, 2017 19 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 18 Motion for Tassity S. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 8/9/2017) (cf)
August 9, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 18 MOTION for Tassity S. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., 17 MOTION for Jessica Ring Amunson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 8, 2017 18 MOTION for Tassity S. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing (Connecticut), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Tassity)
August 8, 2017 17 MOTION for Jessica Ring Amunson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing (District of Columbia), # 3 Certificate of Good Standing (Maryland), # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Amunson, Jessica)
August 8, 2017 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Hendry Baer on behalf of Daniel Scavino, Sean M Spicer, Donald J. Trump. (Baer, Michael)
August 8, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 15 MOTION for Tassity S. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13992063. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reasons: 1) missing Attorney Affidavit or Declaration - see Local Rule 1.3; and 2) missing Certificate of Good Standing from Maryland Court of Appeals. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit or Declaration - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
August 8, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 14 MOTION for Jessica Ring Amunson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13992015. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Attorney Affidavit or Declaration - see Local Rule 1.3. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit or Declaration - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
August 8, 2017 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Tassity S. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13992063. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing (Connecticut), # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Tassity) Modified on 8/8/2017 (jc).
August 8, 2017 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jessica Ring Amunson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13992015. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing (District of Columbia), # 2 Certificate of Good Standing (Maryland), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Amunson, Jessica) Modified on 8/8/2017 (jc).
August 8, 2017 13 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: Motion for a Preliminary Injunction addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jameel Jaffer dated 8/8/2017. Document filed by Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas.(Jaffer, Jameel)
July 27, 2017 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Daniel Scavino served on 7/14/2017, answer due 8/4/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Brandon Neely; Philip Cohen; Joseph Papp; Rebecca Buckwalter; Nicholas Pappas; Holly Figueroa; Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University; Eugene Gu. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Delivery Confirmation)(Jaffer, Jameel)
July 27, 2017 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Sean M Spicer served on 7/14/2017, answer due 8/4/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Brandon Neely; Philip Cohen; Joseph Papp; Rebecca Buckwalter; Nicholas Pappas; Holly Figueroa; Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University; Eugene Gu. (Jaffer, Jameel)
July 27, 2017 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Donald J. Trump served on 7/14/2017, answer due 8/4/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Brandon Neely; Philip Cohen; Joseph Papp; Rebecca Buckwalter; Nicholas Pappas; Holly Figueroa; Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University; Eugene Gu. (Jaffer, Jameel)
July 12, 2017 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sean M Spicer. (kl)
July 12, 2017 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daniel Scavino. (kl)
July 12, 2017 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donald J. Trump. (kl) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/12/2017) (kl).
July 12, 2017 Case Designated ECF. (kl)
July 12, 2017 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (kl)
July 12, 2017 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (kl)
July 11, 2017 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sean M. Spicer, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas. (Jaffer, Jameel)
July 11, 2017 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Daniel Scavino, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas. (Jaffer, Jameel)
July 11, 2017 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald J. Trump, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Rebecca Buckwalter, Philip Cohen, Holly Figueroa, Eugene Gu, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Brandon Neely, Joseph Papp, Nicholas Pappas. (Jaffer, Jameel)
July 11, 2017 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University.(Jaffer, Jameel)
July 11, 2017 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Jaffer, Jameel)
July 11, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel Scavino, Sean M Spicer, Donald J. Trump. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13881127)Document filed by Brandon Neely, Philip Cohen, Joseph Papp, Rebecca Buckwalter, Nicholas Pappas, Holly Figueroa, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Eugene Gu.(Jaffer, Jameel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
Represented By: Jessica Ring Amunson
Represented By: Jameel Jaffer
Represented By: Tassity S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Buckwalter
Represented By: Jameel Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Cohen
Represented By: Jameel Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Figueroa
Represented By: Jameel Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Gu
Represented By: Jameel Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Neely
Represented By: Jameel Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Papp
Represented By: Jameel Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Pappas
Represented By: Jameel Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Michael Hendry Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean M Spicer
Represented By: Michael Hendry Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Scavino
Represented By: Michael Hendry Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?