Wheeler v. Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Rod Wheeler
Defendant: Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc., Fox News Network LLC, Malia Zimmerman and Ed Butowsky
Case Number: 1:2017cv05807
Filed: August 1, 2017
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: George B. Daniels
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2017 55 Featured Case ORDER denying 51 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: DENIED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/12/2017) (jwh)
October 12, 2017 54 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jeanne M. Christensen dated October 12, 2017 re: Defendant Ed Butowsky's October 11, 2017 Letter (Dkt. No. 52). Document filed by Rod Wheeler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - September 7, 2017 Letter)(Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
October 12, 2017 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Alan Shooman on behalf of Ed Butowsky(in his professional capacity), Ed Butowsky(in his individual capacity). (Shooman, Jeffrey)
October 11, 2017 52 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Davis Harrison dated October 11, 2017 re: Plaintiff's Request for Extensions of Time to File Oppositions. Document filed by Ed Butowsky(in his professional capacity), Ed Butowsky(in his individual capacity).(Harrison, David)
October 11, 2017 51 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jeanne M. Christensen dated October 11, 2017. Document filed by Rod Wheeler.(Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
September 27, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/23/2017 (yv)
September 27, 2017 50 Featured Case ORDER granting 48 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered. (Amended Pleadings due by 10/23/2017.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/27/17) (yv)
September 27, 2017 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Haym Weiner on behalf of Malia Zimmerman(in her professional capacity). (Weiner, Daniel)
September 26, 2017 48 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Motions and File Amended Complaint addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jeanne M. Christensen dated September 26, 2017. Document filed by Rod Wheeler.(Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
September 20, 2017 47 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Carolyn Beth Rendell on behalf of Ed Butowsky(in his professional capacity), Ed Butowsky(in his individual capacity). New Address: Spiro Harrison, 830 MORRIS TURNPIKE, 2ND FLOOR, Short Hills, NJ, United States 07078, 9732320881. (Rendell, Carolyn)
September 20, 2017 46 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jason Charles Spiro on behalf of Ed Butowsky(in his professional capacity), Ed Butowsky(in his individual capacity). New Address: Spiro Harrison, 830 MORRIS TURNPIKE, 2ND FLOOR, SHORT HILLS, New Jersey, United States 07078, 9732198642. (Spiro, Jason)
September 19, 2017 45 DECLARATION of David B. Harrison in Support re: 43 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff and his Counsel Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11.. Document filed by Ed Butowsky(in his professional capacity), Ed Butowsky(in his individual capacity). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20)(Harrison, David)
September 19, 2017 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 43 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff and his Counsel Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11. . Document filed by Ed Butowsky(in his professional capacity), Ed Butowsky(in his individual capacity). (Harrison, David)
September 19, 2017 43 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff and his Counsel Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11. Document filed by Ed Butowsky(in his professional capacity), Ed Butowsky(in his individual capacity).(Harrison, David)
September 19, 2017 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dane Hal Butswinkas on behalf of Fox News Network LLC, Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc.. (Butswinkas, Dane)
September 18, 2017 41 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Kevin T. Baine dated September 18, 2017. Document filed by Fox News Network LLC, Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc., Malia Zimmerman(in her professional capacity), Malia Zimmerman(in her individual capacity).(Baine, Kevin)
September 18, 2017 40 DECLARATION of Joseph M. Terry in Support re: 38 FIRST MOTION to Compel Arbitration pursuant to FAA, 9 USC 1-16 et seq.FIRST MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Fox News Network LLC, Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc., Malia Zimmerman(in her professional capacity), Malia Zimmerman(in her individual capacity). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11)(Baine, Kevin)
September 18, 2017 39 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 38 FIRST MOTION to Compel Arbitration pursuant to FAA, 9 USC 1-16 et seq.FIRST MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Fox News Network LLC, Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc., Malia Zimmerman(in her professional capacity), Malia Zimmerman(in her individual capacity). (Baine, Kevin)
September 18, 2017 38 FIRST MOTION to Compel Arbitration pursuant to FAA, 9 USC 1-16 et seq., FIRST MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Document filed by Fox News Network LLC, Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc., Malia Zimmerman(in her professional capacity), Malia Zimmerman(in her individual capacity).(Baine, Kevin)
September 18, 2017 37 DECLARATION of Ed Butowsky in Support re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(2).. Document filed by Ed Butowsky(in his professional capacity), Ed Butowsky(in his individual capacity). (Harrison, David)
September 18, 2017 36 DECLARATION of David B. Harrison in Support re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(2).. Document filed by Ed Butowsky(in his professional capacity), Ed Butowsky(in his individual capacity). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Harrison, David)
September 18, 2017 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(2). . Document filed by Ed Butowsky(in his professional capacity), Ed Butowsky(in his individual capacity). (Harrison, David)
September 18, 2017 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(2). Document filed by Ed Butowsky(in his professional capacity), Ed Butowsky(in his individual capacity).(Harrison, David)
September 13, 2017 33 Featured Case ORDER granting 30 Motion for Joseph M. Terry to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/13/2017) (jwh)
September 13, 2017 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carolyn Beth Rendell on behalf of Ed Butowsky(in his professional capacity), Ed Butowsky(in his individual capacity). (Rendell, Carolyn)
September 12, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 31 MOTION for William Jefferson Vigen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14112321. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
September 11, 2017 31 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for William Jefferson Vigen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14112321. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fox News Network LLC, Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Vigen, William) Modified on 9/12/2017 (wb).
September 11, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 30 MOTION for Joseph Marshall Terry, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14110914. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
September 11, 2017 30 MOTION for Joseph Marshall Terry, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14110914. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fox News Network LLC, Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Terry, Joseph)
September 7, 2017 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Charles Spiro on behalf of Ed Butowsky(in his professional capacity). (Spiro, Jason)
September 6, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Ed Butowsky(in his professional capacity) answer due 9/18/2017; Ed Butowsky(in his individual capacity) answer due 9/18/2017. (jwh)
September 6, 2017 28 Featured Case ORDER FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT granting 25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: This Court having reviewed Defendant Ed Butowsky's Request for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint hereby Grants the Request and Orders Defendant Butowsky to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before September 18, 2017. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/6/2017) (jwh)
September 6, 2017 27 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 22 Motion for Carolin Sahimi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/6/2017) (jwh)
September 6, 2017 26 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 21 Motion for David H. Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/6/2017) (rjm)
September 5, 2017 25 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from David B. Harrison dated September 5, 2017. Document filed by Ed Butowsky(in his professional capacity), Ed Butowsky(in his individual capacity).(Harrison, David)
September 5, 2017 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Butler Harrison on behalf of Ed Butowsky(in his professional capacity), Ed Butowsky(in his individual capacity). (Harrison, David)
September 5, 2017 23 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 Motion for Katherine A. Petti to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/5/2017) (jwh)
September 5, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 21 FIRST MOTION for David H. Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., 22 FIRST MOTION for Carolin Sahimi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 1, 2017 22 FIRST MOTION for Carolin Sahimi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Malia Zimmerman(in her professional capacity). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Carolin Sahimi in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Sahimi, Carolin)
September 1, 2017 21 FIRST MOTION for David H. Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Malia Zimmerman(in her professional capacity). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David H. Stern in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, # 4 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Stern, David)
September 1, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 19 FIRST MOTION for David H. Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14083490. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., 20 FIRST MOTION for Carolin Sahimi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14083664. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California (our court does not accept state bar certificates). Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
September 1, 2017 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Carolin Sahimi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14083664. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Malia Zimmerman(in her professional capacity). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of CarolinSahimi in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit CA Certificate of Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Sahimi, Carolin) Modified on 9/1/2017 (jc).
September 1, 2017 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for David H. Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14083490. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Malia Zimmerman(in her professional capacity). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David H. Stern in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit The State Bar of California Certificate of Standing, # 3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, # 4 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Stern, David) Modified on 9/1/2017 (jc).
August 30, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 18 FIRST MOTION for Katherine Anne Petti to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14072609. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 30, 2017 18 FIRST MOTION for Katherine Anne Petti to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14072609. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fox News Network LLC, Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit GA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Petti, Katherine)
August 25, 2017 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Fox Television Stations, Inc., Corporate Parent Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc. for Fox News Network LLC. Document filed by Fox News Network LLC, Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc..(Baine, Kevin)
August 24, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Kevin Taylor Baine to RE-FILE Document 14 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
August 15, 2017 16 Featured Case ORDER ON REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT: on re: 15 Letter, filed by Fox News Network LLC, Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc. This Court, having reviewed Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc. and Fox News Network, LLC's ("Fox Defendants") Request for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint, hereby GRANTS the request and ORDERS that the Fox Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before September 18, 2017. Fox News Network LLC answer due 9/18/2017; Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc. answer due 9/18/2017. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/15/2017) (ap)
August 14, 2017 15 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Kevin T. Baine dated August 14, 2017 re: Request for Extension of Time. Document filed by Fox News Network LLC, Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baine, Kevin)
August 14, 2017 14 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Fox News Network LLC, Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc..(Baine, Kevin) Modified on 8/24/2017 (lb).
August 14, 2017 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Taylor Baine on behalf of Fox News Network LLC, Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc.. (Baine, Kevin)
August 9, 2017 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Fox News Network LLC served on 8/7/2017, answer due 8/28/2017. Service was accepted by N. Dougherty. Document filed by Rod Wheeler. (Wigdor, Douglas)
August 9, 2017 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc. served on 8/7/2017, answer due 8/28/2017. Service was accepted by N. Dougherty. Document filed by Rod Wheeler. (Wigdor, Douglas)
August 2, 2017 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fox News Network LLC, Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc.. (pc)
August 2, 2017 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ed Butowsky(in his professional capacity), Ed Butowsky(in his individual capacity). (pc)
August 2, 2017 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Malia Zimmerman(in her professional capacity), Malia Zimmerman(in her individual capacity). (pc)
August 2, 2017 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 2, 2017 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 2, 2017 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 2, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Douglas Holden Wigdor. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code XX Out of State. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (pc)
August 1, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 9/1/2017. (mro)
August 1, 2017 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael John Willemin on behalf of Rod Wheeler. (Willemin, Michael)
August 1, 2017 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeanne-Marie Bates Christensen on behalf of Rod Wheeler. (Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
August 1, 2017 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ed Butowsky, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Rod Wheeler. (Wigdor, Douglas)
August 1, 2017 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Malia Zimmerman, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Rod Wheeler. (Wigdor, Douglas)
August 1, 2017 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc. and Fox News Network LLC, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Rod Wheeler. (Wigdor, Douglas)
August 1, 2017 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wigdor, Douglas)
August 1, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against Ed Butowsky(in his professional capacity), Ed Butowsky(in his individual capacity), Fox News Network LLC, Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc., Malia Zimmerman(in her professional capacity), Malia Zimmerman(in her individual capacity). (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13963549)Document filed by Rod Wheeler.(Wigdor, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Taylor Baine
Represented By: Katherine Anne Petti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox News Network LLC
Represented By: Kevin Taylor Baine
Represented By: Katherine Anne Petti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malia Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Butowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rod Wheeler
Represented By: Jeanne-Marie Bates Christensen
Represented By: Douglas Holden Wigdor
Represented By: Michael John Willemin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?