Baten-Perez et al v. Ak Cafe of New York LLC et al
Plaintiff: Efrain Baten-Perez
Defendant: Ak Cafe of New York LLC, Ali Babas Terrace Inc., Ali Babas Turkish Cuisine Inc. and Ali Riza Dogan
Case Number: 1:2017cv05931
Filed: August 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: In light of the pending motion(s), the final pretrial conference scheduled for February 26, 2021, is rescheduled to May 21, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17C. SO ORDERED., ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/17/2021) (ama)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: In light of the pending motion(s), the final pretrial conference scheduled for November 13, 2020, is rescheduled to February 26, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17C. ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/9/2020) (cf)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 57 denying Motion to Strike document from the record. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will in this instance deem the filing of the amended motion an application for reinstatement, which is granted as of today. The summary judgment mot ion shall be briefed in accordance with SDNY Local Civil Rule 6.1, with today being deemed the filing date of the motion. The foregoing motion to strike is denied. DE # 57 resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/27/2020) (ama)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: terminating 49 Motion for Summary Judgment. ORDERED, that the above-referenced motion (docket entry no. 49) is hereby TERMINATED for purposes of the Court's docket, without prejudice to reinstatement upon application, upon notice to ad verse parties and accompanied by the requisite certification; it isfurther ORDERED, that no response to the motion is required unless a reinstatement application is granted, in which case the time to respond of any adverse party will be calculated fr om the date of service of the order of reinstatement and in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Furthermore, the Court directs Defendants' attention to S.D.N.Y. Local Civil Rules 6.1(b), 7.2, and 12.1. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/14/2020) (ama)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baten-Perez et al v. Ak Cafe of New York LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Baten-Perez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ak Cafe of New York LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Babas Terrace Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Babas Turkish Cuisine Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Riza Dogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?