Eaton & Van Winkle, LLP v. Ren et al
Plaintiff: |
Eaton & Van Winkle, LLP |
Defendant: |
Yunling Ren and Christine Waldbaum |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv06118 |
Filed: |
August 14, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Unassigned |
Nature of Suit: |
Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 1001 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 17, 2020 |
Filing
71
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: 70 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. in favor of Christine A. Waldbaum against Eaton & Van Winkle,LLP. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated March 16, 2020, Ren's Motion for reconsideration is denied; Christine Waldbaum's motion for summary judgment is granted; Eaton & Van Winkle,LLP is directed to disburse the funds in Maxim Waldbaum's 401(k) account to Christine Waldbaum's forthwith; accordingly, these cases are closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 3/17/2020) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal) (dt) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
|
March 16, 2020 |
Filing
70
ORDER granting 59 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the reasons stated above, Ren's motion for reconsideration is denied. Christine Waldbaum's motion for summary judgment is granted. Eaton & Van Winkle, LLP is directed to disburse the funds in Maxim Waldbaum's 40l(k) account to Christine Waldbaum forthwith. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions (Dkt. Nos. 52, 59), close the cases, and mail a copy of this order to pro se Defendants Yunling Ren and Maxim Waldbaum. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/16/2020) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. Modified on 3/16/2020 (jca).
|
September 21, 2018 |
Filing
45
OPINION AND ORDER re: 21 APPLICATION for the Court to Request Counsel, filed by Christine A. Waldbaum. By motion dated January 19, 2018 (Docket Item 21), defendant Christine A. Waldbaum seeks the appointment of pro bono counsel. For the reas ons set forth below, Ms. Waldbaum's motion is granted. Accordingly, the Court's Pro Se Office is respectfully requested to seek pro bono counsel to represent defendant Christine Waldbaum in this matter. The Clerk of the Court is requested to mark Docket Item 21 closed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 9/21/2018) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jca) Transmission to Office of Pro Se Litigation for processing.
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?