Essex Capital Corporation v. Garipalli et al
Plaintiff: |
Essex Capital Corporation |
Defendant: |
Vivek Garipalli, Sequoia Healthcare Services, LLC, Winthrop Hayes and Does 1 through 10 inclusive |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv06347 |
Filed: |
August 21, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
Presiding Judge: |
John F. Keenan |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Fraud |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 3, 2020 |
Filing
60
ORDER granting 59 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference is adjourned from March 10, 2020 to Wednesday, April 15, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 20-C. Status Conference set for 4/15/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John F. Keenan. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/3/2020) (mro)
|
February 4, 2020 |
Filing
58
ORDER granting 57 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Both parties in agreement, the February 10, 2020 conference is adjourned to March 10, 2020. The parties are directed to keep the Court apprised of the status of their anticipated settlement. Next conference: March 10, 2020 at 11 a.m. Status Conference set for 3/10/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge John F. Keenan. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/4/2020) (cf)
|
November 12, 2019 |
Filing
54
ORDER granting 53 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting 53 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED: In light the Parties' representation that a settlement in this matter has been Respectfully, reached, the Settlement Conference currently scheduled for November 20, 2019 is hereby adjourned sine die. All Discovery deadlines are hereby extended 60 days. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/12/2019) (mro)
|
December 18, 2018 |
Filing
30
OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons stated above, Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's complaint is GRANTED with respect to the claims for breach of contract and promissory estoppel, but DENIED with respect to the two claims of fraudule nt inducement. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion docketed at ECF No. 22. So ordered. re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Winthrop Hayes, Vivek Garipalli, Sequoia Healthcare Services, LLC. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/18/2018) (rjm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?