Williams v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Crecita Williams
Defendant: United States of America, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Executive Assistant Plourde and John and Jane Doe(s)
Case Number: 1:2017cv06779
Filed: September 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Pauley
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER: It has been reported to the Court that mediation was successful in this case and that the parties have reached a settlement. By no later than May 31, 2022, the parties shall either file a stipulation of dismissal or update the Court on t he status of settlement. If the parties seek to have the Court retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement, the terms of the agreement must be placed on the public record and "so ordered" by the Court. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/9/2022) (ate)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: The parties are directed to advise the Court within 30 days when they wish to schedule the settlement conference. The parties should do so by filing a letter-motion on the docket that indicates at least three dates that are mutually conv enient for the parties. Alternatively, counsel are free to e-mail my deputy clerk, David Tam, at David_Tam@nysd.uscourts.gov to find a mutually convenient date for the parties and the Court. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic, any settlement c onference in the foreseeable future will likely be conducted telephonically. Using the Court's conference line system, the Court will begin the settlement conference in joint session with all parties on the line before breaking into private s ession and speaking to the parties individually, as the technology the Court is using can facilitate breakout sessions with each side. However, if all parties wish to have the Court provide a video platform (Microsoft Teams or Zoom) and not simply proceed telephonically, they may so advise the Court and the Court will then schedule a conference to discuss logistics. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 2/24/2022) (ate)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER : The Court will hear oral argument on the Government's pending motion for summary judgment on February 14, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. Argument will be held via videoconference. Members of the public may listen to the argument by using the following audio-only dial-in information: Call-In Number: 917-933-2166; Access Code: 294 216 463. SO ORDERED. ( Oral Argument set for 2/14/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/11/2022) (vfr)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to change the case caption to reflect PlaintiffNicole Morrison's role as Administrator for the Estate of Roberto Grant, as follows: Nicole Morrison, as Administrator for the Estate of Roberto Grant against United States of America. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 9/25/2020) (js)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 63 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Lucas Issacharoff dated 7/6/2020. LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Lucas Is sacharoff dated 7/6/2020. Document filed by United States of America. Application granted. This Court adopts the parties' proposed schedule. The August 6, 2020 conference is rescheduled to November 20, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. So ordered. (Status Conference set for 11/20/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III). (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/7/2020) (rjm)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 OPINION & ORDER re: 41 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint: Roberto Grant was beaten to death in an MCC dormitory. Contrary to the Government's assertion, this is not a case involving an "unadorned, the-defendant-unlawfully -harmed-me accusation." Iqbal, 556 U.S. at 678. Rather, this tragedy had to stem from a cascade of failures and seems like a case where the matter speaks for itself. Recently, the death of a high-profile defendant reinvigorated public scrutiny o f MCC. The unexplained circumstances surrounding Mr. Grant's death raise troubling questions about the BOP's oversight of individuals remanded to it custody. Mr. Grant's relatives - and the public - have an interest in leave what happe ned. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motions to dismiss the Amended Complaint is granted in part and denied in part. The Bivens claims are dismissed against all Defendants. The Federal Torts Claims Act claims are dismissed as to the Bureau of Prisons and the individual defendants, but may proceed against the United States. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/18/2019) (jwh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crecita Williams
Represented By: Andrew C. Laufer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Assistant Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?