Oakley v. Dolan et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Charles Oakley sued Defendants James Dolan, MSG Networks, Inc., The Madison Square Garden Company and MSG Sports & Entertainment, LLC for defamation per se, libel, slander, assault, battery, false imprisonment, abuse of process, and denial of a public accommodation in violation of the ADA, NYSHRL, and NYCHRL. Plaintiff alleged that Defendants forcibly removed him from a New York Knicks game at Madison Square Garden on February 8, 2017, and justified the ejection by publicly accusing him of abusing fans and staff, acting inappropriately, and struggling with alcoholism. Plaintiff contends these accusations are false and defamatory.

Plaintiff: Charles Oakley
Defendant: James Dolan, MSG Networks, Inc., The Madison Square Garden Company and MSG Sports & Entertainment, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv06903
Filed: September 12, 2017
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 42:12132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2018 34 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/12/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 7, 2018 33 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/12/2018 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/28/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 2, 2018 32 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Kenneth Daniel Walsh on behalf of Charles Oakley. New Address: Wigdor LLP, 85 Fifth Avenue, Fifth Floor, New York, NY, United States 10003, 212-257-6800. (Walsh, Kenneth)
January 19, 2018 31 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Alex Jeffrey Hartzband terminated. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/19/2018) (mro)
January 19, 2018 30 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 29 Letter filed by Charles Oakley. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/9/2018.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/19/2018) (mro) (Main Document 30 replaced on 1/22/2018) (mro).
January 19, 2018 29 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Douglas H. Wigdor dated January 19, 2018 re: Status Update Pursuant to the Court's January 12, 2018 Order. Document filed by Charles Oakley.(Wigdor, Douglas)
January 16, 2018 28 MOTION for Alex J. Hartzband to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Charles Oakley.(Varghese, Renan)
January 12, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Premotion Conference held on 1/12/2018. Renan Varghese and Douglas Wigdor present for Plaintiff. Randy Mastro and Sarah Kushner present for Defendants. Court reporter present. The Court held a premotion conference on Defendants' contemplated motion to dismiss. The parties shall submit a joint letter to the Court by January 19, 2018, updating the Court as to: (1) whether plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, (2) the type of motion Defendants wish to make, (3) a proposed briefing schedule, and (4) whether the Court should stay discovery. (Nessim, Daniel) Modified on 1/12/2018 (Skolnik, Brandon).
December 18, 2017 27 Featured Case ORDER granting 26 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The premotion conference is adjourned to January 12, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. The deadline for initial disclosures is adjourned to January 19, 2018. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 1/12/2018 at 02:30 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/18/2017) (ras)
December 16, 2017 26 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Randy M. Mastro dated December 15, 2017. Document filed by James Dolan(in his professional capacity), James Dolan(in his individual capacity), MSG Networks, Inc., MSG Sports & Entertainment, LLC, The Madison Square Garden Company.(Mastro, Randy)
December 13, 2017 25 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Plaintiff & Defendants dated December 13, 2017 re: Joint Letter + Proposed CMP. Document filed by James Dolan(in his professional capacity), James Dolan(in his individual capacity), MSG Networks, Inc., MSG Sports & Entertainment, LLC, The Madison Square Garden Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed CMP)(Mastro, Randy)
December 1, 2017 24 LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Renan F. Varghese dated December 1, 2017 re: Opposition to Defendants' November 13, 2017 Pre-Motion Conference Letter. Document filed by Charles Oakley.(Varghese, Renan)
November 15, 2017 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Daniel Walsh on behalf of Charles Oakley. (Walsh, Kenneth)
November 14, 2017 23 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 21 Letter filed by Charles Oakley. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' premotion letter no later than December 1, 2017. As set forth in the Court's September 18, 2017 order, the parties shall submit their joint letter and proposed-case management plan no later than December 13, 2017. The initial conference currently scheduled for November 28, 2017 is adjourned to December 20, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. and shall also function as a premotion conference for Defendants' contemplated motion to dismiss. The Court finds that the presumption in favor of open records has been overcome by the privacy interests presented by the redacted material in this letter and grants Plaintiff's sealing request. (Initial Conference set for 12/20/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/14/2017) (ras) Modified on 12/18/2017 (ras).
November 14, 2017 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Renan F. Varghese dated November 14, 2017 re: Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Request for Pre-motion Conference. Document filed by Charles Oakley.(Varghese, Renan)
November 14, 2017 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Kushner on behalf of James Dolan(in his professional capacity), James Dolan(in his individual capacity), MSG Networks, Inc., MSG Sports & Entertainment, LLC, The Madison Square Garden Company. (Kushner, Sarah)
November 13, 2017 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Randy M. Mastro dated November 13, 2017 re: Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by James Dolan(in his professional capacity), James Dolan(in his individual capacity), MSG Networks, Inc., MSG Sports & Entertainment, LLC, The Madison Square Garden Company.(Mastro, Randy)
September 25, 2017 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Randy M. Mastro on behalf of James Dolan(in his professional capacity), James Dolan(in his individual capacity), MSG Networks, Inc., MSG Sports & Entertainment, LLC, The Madison Square Garden Company. (Mastro, Randy)
September 18, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 01:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (mro)
September 18, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: James Dolan(in his professional capacity) answer due 11/13/2017; James Dolan(in his individual capacity) answer due 11/13/2017; MSG Networks, Inc. answer due 11/13/2017; MSG Sports & Entertainment, LLC answer due 11/13/2017; The Madison Square Garden Company answer due 11/13/2017. (mro)
September 18, 2017 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The request is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than November 13, 2017. As set forth in the Court's September 18, 2017 order (Doc. No. 15), the parties shall submit their joint letter and proposed case-management plan no later than November 21, 2017. The initial conference currently scheduled for October 19, 2017 is adjourned to November 28, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/18/2017) (mro)
September 18, 2017 16 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Jim Walden dated 9/18/2017. Document filed by James Dolan(in his professional capacity), James Dolan(in his individual capacity), MSG Networks, Inc., MSG Sports & Entertainment, LLC, The Madison Square Garden Company.(Walden, James)
September 18, 2017 15 Featured Case ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiff shall file affidavits of service forthwith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties shall appear for an initial conference on Thursday, October 19, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 905 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, by October 12, 2017, the parties shall jointly submit a letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: A brief statement of the nature of the action and the principal defenses thereto...The estimated length of trial; and any other information that the parties believe may assist this Court in resolving this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, by October 12, 2017, the parties shall submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. A template for the order is available at: http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Sullivan, and as further set forth herein. (Initial Conference set for 10/19/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/18/2017) (ras)
September 14, 2017 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Walden on behalf of James Dolan(in his professional capacity), James Dolan(in his individual capacity), MSG Networks, Inc., MSG Sports & Entertainment, LLC, The Madison Square Garden Company. (Walden, James)
September 14, 2017 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Milton L. Williams, Jr on behalf of James Dolan(in his professional capacity), James Dolan(in his individual capacity), MSG Networks, Inc., MSG Sports & Entertainment, LLC, The Madison Square Garden Company. (Williams, Milton)
September 13, 2017 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MSG Sports & Entertainment, LLC. (kl)
September 13, 2017 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Madison Square Garden Company. (kl)
September 13, 2017 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MSG Networks, Inc.. (kl)
September 13, 2017 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Dolan(in his professional capacity), James Dolan(in his individual capacity). (kl)
September 13, 2017 Case Designated ECF. (kl)
September 13, 2017 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (kl)
September 13, 2017 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (kl)
September 12, 2017 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alex Jeffrey Hartzband on behalf of Charles Oakley. (Hartzband, Alex)
September 12, 2017 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Renan F Varghese on behalf of Charles Oakley. (Varghese, Renan)
September 12, 2017 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSG Sports & Entertainment, LLC, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Charles Oakley. (Wigdor, Douglas)
September 12, 2017 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Madison Square Garden Company, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Charles Oakley. (Wigdor, Douglas)
September 12, 2017 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSG Networks, Inc., re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Charles Oakley. (Wigdor, Douglas)
September 12, 2017 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Dolan, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Charles Oakley. (Wigdor, Douglas)
September 12, 2017 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wigdor, Douglas)
September 12, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against James Dolan(in his professional capacity), James Dolan(in his individual capacity), MSG Networks, Inc., MSG Sports & Entertainment, LLC, The Madison Square Garden Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14114283)Document filed by Charles Oakley.(Wigdor, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oakley v. Dolan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Oakley
Represented By: Alex Jeffrey Hartzband
Represented By: Renan F Varghese
Represented By: Douglas Holden Wigdor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dolan
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Represented By: James Walden
Represented By: Milton L. Williams, Jr
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Represented By: James Walden
Represented By: Milton L. Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSG Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Represented By: James Walden
Represented By: Milton L. Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Madison Square Garden Company
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Represented By: James Walden
Represented By: Milton L. Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSG Sports & Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Represented By: James Walden
Represented By: Milton L. Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?