Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law v. United States Department of State
Plaintiff: Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law
Defendant: United States Department of State
Case Number: 1:2017cv07520
Filed: October 2, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Paul G. Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES ANDEXPENSES AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTSgranting 104 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Unopposed Letter-Motion to Extend Time for Filing Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and Notice of Taxation of Costs, it is hereby ORDERED that any motion by Plaintiff for attorneys' fees and expenses and any notice by Plaintiff of taxation of costs is due 45 days after receipt by this Court of the mandate of the Court of Appeals in any appeal, or 45 days after the date on which the time to appeal has expired if no appeal is taken. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/20/2025) (sgz)
March 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 102 Letter Motion to Stay re: 100 Order. This Court's March 10, 2025 Order is stayed until April 11, 2025. In the event that the Government files a timely, notice of appeal, this Court's Order will be stayed pending resolution of the appeal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/13/2025) (sgz)
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 101 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: 100 Order. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated March 10, 2025, Defendant's motion for summary judgment and Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment are each granted in part and denied in part; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Tammi M Hellwig on 03/11/2025) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of right to appeal) (nd)
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER re: 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by United States Department of State, 48 CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. For the reasons stated above, Defendant's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 43) and Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 48) are each granted in part and denied in part. More specifically, the Court rules that: 1. At tachments A and B to the July 9, 2017 Report are not subject to disclosure; 2. the first three pages of the September 15, 2017 Memorandum will be disclosed to Plaintiff within ten days of this Order, but the remainder of the document is not subj ect to disclosure; and 3. Attachment A to the September 15, 2017 Memorandum is not subject to disclosure. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment and to close this case. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/10/2025) (ar) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: The conference currently scheduled for September 21, 2022 is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/20/2022) (ks)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 86 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference currently scheduled for September 20, 2022 will instead take place on September 21, 2022 at 2:30 p.m. by telephone. The parties are directed to dial 888-363-4749 to participa te, and to enter the access code 6212642. The press and public may obtain access to the telephone conference by dialing the same number and using the same access code. The Court is holding multiple telephone conferences on this date. The parties sh ould call in at the scheduled time and wait on the line for their case to be called. At that time, the Court will un-mute the parties' lines. One day before the conference, the parties must email Michael_Ruocco@nysd.uscourts.gov and Gardep heNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov with the phone numbers that the parties will be using to dial into the conference so that the Court knows which numbers to un-mute. The email should include the case name and case number in the subject line. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/19/2022) Telephone Conference set for 9/21/2022 at 02:30 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (ks)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: The conference currently scheduled for September 16, 2022 will instead take place on Tuesday, September 20, 2022 at 10:15 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/13/2022) ( Status Conference set for 9/20/2022 at 10:15 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (ks)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: The conference currently scheduled for September 8, 2022 will instead take place on Friday, September 16, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/2/2022) ( Status Conference set for 9/16/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (ks)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: The Court will conduct a conference in this matter on Thursday, September 8, 2022 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/18/2022) ( Status Conference set for 9/8/2022 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (ks)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re: 22 MOTION to Expedite Freedom of Information Act Action filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. For the reasons stated above, Plaintiff's motion t o expedite is granted. Defendant will produce all non-exempt materials and a declaration-consistent with Vaughn v. Rosen, 484 F.2d 820 (D.C. Cir. 1973)-explaining what exemptions apply to any materials withheld. Both the production of non-exempt materials and the Vaughn index will be produced by February 9, 2018. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion (Dkt. No. 22). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/10/2018) (mro)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law v. United States Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law
Represented By: Richard B Katskee
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Represented By: Jaclyn E. Martinez Resly
Represented By: Neil Kenneth Roman
Represented By: Johnathan James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?