December 20, 2022 |
Filing
211
ORDER granting 210 Letter Motion to Stay re: 210 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay Processing and Status Update addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from AUSA Ellen Blain dated December 19, 2022. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/20/2022) (kv)
|
August 31, 2022 |
Filing
201
ORDER: The Court will hold a telephonic conference on September 22, 2022 at 3:00PM Eastern Time. All Parties shall appear and should contact the Court at 1-888-363-4749 (access code: 3768660). ( Telephone Conference set for 9/22/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/31/2022) (ate)
|
July 27, 2022 |
Filing
197
ORDER: The parties are directed to file a joint status report on or before August 17, 2022 regarding proposed next steps. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to lift the stay in this action. Case Stay Lifted. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/27/2022) (ate)
|
December 10, 2020 |
Filing
170
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the Defendants' letter. (ECF No. 169). Accordingly, the Court stays this matter pending the disposition of the appeal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/10/2020) (jca)
|
October 21, 2020 |
Filing
162
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' joint status report. (ECF No. 161). The parties shall file a joint status report by December 11, 2020. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/21/2020) (js)
|
September 13, 2020 |
Filing
158
OPINION & ORDER re: 143 MOTION for Reconsideration in Part of the Court's September 16 and 23 Orders. filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. For the reasons set forth below, Defendants' motion for reconsideration is hereby DENIED. I had enough information from DOS's and USCIS's affidavits to conduct the required de novo review of the agencies' withholdings. I deter mined that the 7(E) exemption did not apply to certain sections of the FAM and the TRIG questions. No supplemental submissions or in camera review is necessary. Defendants have not met the burden to warrant reconsideration of these determinations. Defendants' motion for reconsideration is DENIED in full. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/13/2020) (rj)
|
September 23, 2019 |
Filing
141
OPINION AND ORDER re: 95 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to USCIS and ICE filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to OLC, ICE and the S tate Department filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of Justice, 104 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to ICE and USCIS filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbi a University. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: (1) ICE's Mot ion is granted and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion is denied with respect to its application of Exemption 5 to the First Amendment Concerns Memo, the 235(c) Memo, the EO Implementation Memo. (2) Plaintiff's Cross-Motion is granted and ICE's M otion is denied with respect to the Extreme Vetting Memo, the Foreign Policy Provisions Memo, and the HSI Updates Memo. ICE must re-assess its applied exemptions to these records, using this Opinion as guidance, and disclose all responsive non-exempt materials that can reasonably be segregated from exempt materials. (3) USCIS' Motion is granted and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion denied with respect to the TRIG Options Paper and TRIG Exemptions. (4) Plaintiff's Cross-Motion is granted an d USCIS' motion is denied with respect to the Acting Director Memo and Senior Policy Council Paper. USCIS must release the reasonably segregable information in these records. (5) The government's motions for summary judgment regarding the unchallenged documents are granted. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/23/2019) (ne)
|