Dobbs et al v. Metropolitan Transit Authority et al
Plaintiff: Alexandria Dobbs and Frank Perino
Defendant: Metropolitan Transit Authority, New York City Transit Authority, John Doe and John Doe 2
Case Number: 1:2017cv08199
Filed: October 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew L. Carter
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting 121 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/15/2021) (js)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting 117 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/15/2021) (js)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 OPINION AND ORDER: re: 90 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. filed by Metropolitan Transit Authority, New York City Transit Authority, 94 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. filed by Advance Transit Co. Inc., John Doe 2. Alexandria Hobbs and Frank Perino brought this action against Defendants the New York City Transit Authority, the Metropolitan Transit Authority, Advance Transit Co. Inc., and John Doe 2, claiming violat ions of Titles II and III of the Americans with Disabilities Act, the Rehabilitation Act, New York City Human Rights Law, and New York State Human Rights Law. (Second Amended Complaint ("SAC")). Defendants separately moved to dismiss t he Complaint. (ECF Nos. 90, 94). Those motions are DENIED. All other provisions as further set forth in this order. Although this issue was not briefed by the parties, the Court also notes that this case may raise standing problems given the alleg ations of a past injury that potentially may be remedied by the provision of accessible policies to plaintiffs. See Muhammad v. Annucci, et al., No. 19-cv- 3528, 2020 WL 1303571 (S.D.N.Y. Mar. 19, 2020). The parties should be prepared to address this issue going forward. The parties should submit a status report in this matter by September 24, 2020 stating how they would like to proceed. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/10/2020) (js)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 87 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/21/2019) (rj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dobbs et al v. Metropolitan Transit Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria Dobbs
Represented By: James E. Bahamonde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Perino
Represented By: James E. Bahamonde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Transit Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Transit Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?